Smith v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Cherelle Smith
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Ally Financial, Inc., Credit Acceptance Corporation, Self Financial, Inc. d/b/a Lead Bank, Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC, Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC and Self Financial, Inc. doing business as Lead Bank
Case Number: 8:2024cv00237
Filed: January 24, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2024 Filing 40 PAPERLESS NOTICE. A RULE 16 CONFERENCE and A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE is scheduled for March 28, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. to discuss #27 and #28 NOTICES OF INTENT TO FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 03280230 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties should also be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 7/31/2024. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/18/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint, [and Notice of Settlement] Credit Acceptance Corporation answer due 4/15/2024. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/18/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2024 Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint, [and Notice of Settlement] by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gamble, Geoffrey)
March 14, 2024 Filing 36 QC NOTICE: #32 Notice of Settlement filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation, #35 Notice (Other) filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation was filed incorrectly. **Please file the Motion using a proper motion event and file the text of proposed order as an attachment to the motion filing. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2024 Filing 35 [FILED IN ERROR] NOTICE by Credit Acceptance Corporation re #32 Notice of Settlement [proposed Order] (Gamble, Geoffrey) Modified on 3/14/2024 (kk5s, Deputy Clerk).
March 13, 2024 Filing 34 ANSWER to #5 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Einstein, Joy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 33 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Online Date Exchange LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Einstein, Joy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 32 [FILED IN ERROR] NOTICE of Settlement AND CONSENT MOTION TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Gamble, Geoffrey) Modified on 3/14/2024 (kk5s, Deputy Clerk).
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #29 Stipulation to Further Extend Time to Respond to Complaint; defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation is granted until March 15, 2024 to file an Answer to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/4/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2024 Filing 30 ANSWER to #5 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Torain, Tony)
February 28, 2024 Filing 29 STIPULATION re #5 Complaint, FURTHER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Credit Acceptance Corporation(Gamble, Geoffrey)
February 23, 2024 Filing 28 Correspondence re: Notice of Intent to File a Motion to Dismiss the Complaint [ECF 1-1], or in the Alternative, Motion to Sever (Briones, Elizabeth)
February 16, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE by Ally Financial, Inc. of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss (Buari, Thailer)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s First Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/15/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying without prejudice #20 Defendant Ally Financial Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/15/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Equifax Information Services, LLC's Agreed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/15/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MARGINAL ORDER approving #16 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/12/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/16/2024 (kk5s, Deputy Clerk).
February 12, 2024 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Einstein, Joy)
February 12, 2024 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ally Financial, Inc. (Buari, Thailer)
February 12, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ally Financial, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Buari, Thailer)
February 9, 2024 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torain, Tony)
February 9, 2024 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent EQUIFAX, INC. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Torain, Tony)
February 9, 2024 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Gamble, Geoffrey)
February 9, 2024 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #5 Complaint, EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Credit Acceptance Corporation(Gamble, Geoffrey)
February 9, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey M Gamble on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation (Gamble, Geoffrey)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Complaint; Defendant Wells Fargo shall have up to and including February 23, 2024 to answer, or respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/9/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to #5 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC.(Brady, Scott)
February 7, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Complaint, by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Briones, Elizabeth)
February 5, 2024 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC.(Brady, Scott)
February 5, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Brady on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Brady, Scott)
February 5, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W Styles on behalf of Cherelle Smith (Styles, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #5 Complaint, by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC.(Fisher, Thomas)
January 24, 2024 Filing 7 Removal Notification Letter sent to Plaintiff. (c/m 1/25/2024 bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2024 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (c/m 1/25/2024 bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2024 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Ally Financial, Inc., Credit Acceptance Corporation, Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, Self Financial, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, filed by Cherelle Smith.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2024 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/24/2024. (c/m 1/24/2024 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2024 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CL Holdings, LLC for Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC.(Fisher, Thomas)
January 24, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet (Fisher, Thomas)
January 24, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number C-16-CV-23-005909. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11048309), filed by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Fisher, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherelle Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey W Styles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Briones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Thailer Adelaja Buari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Geoffrey M Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Self Financial, Inc. d/b/a Lead Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Hunter Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Tony William Torain, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Joy Einstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Scott E Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Self Financial, Inc. doing business as Lead Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?