Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority v. Anderson et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority alleged that Defendants Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan and Alessandro Chiesa (i) claimed to have circumvented the security features of Plaintiff's computerized CharlieTicket and CharlieCard fare media system; (ii) publicly offered free subway rides for life to interested parties over the Internet; and (iii) planned to allow others to duplicate their claimed breaking of the Fare Media's security systems by presenting a paper, releasing software tools and giving demonstrations at the DEFCON hackers convention. Plaintiff alleged that Defendant Massachusetts Institute of Technology negligently supervised Defendants MIT students.

Plaintiff: Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority
Defendant: Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa and Massachusetts Institute of Technology
Case Number: 1:2008cv11364
Filed: August 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: George A. OToole
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2009 Filing 67 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
December 4, 2008 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing : Status Conference set for 1/26/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly. (Lyness, Paul)
October 7, 2008 Filing 64 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 29, 2008 Filing 63 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Emily A. Berger (Berger, Emily)
August 26, 2008 Filing 62 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 26, 2008 Filing 61 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on August 19, 2008, before Judge O'Toole. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso at 617/737-8728. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 9/15/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 19, 2008 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Electronic ORDER entered granting 26 Motion for Reconsideration. Motion addressed during Motion hearing held on 8/19/08. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 19, 2008 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 8/19/2008 re 16 MOTION to Modify Terms But Not Duration of Temporary Restraining Order filed by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, 50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority ; After hearing argument from all sides. Court DENIED 50 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and dissolves Temporary Restraining Order; GRANTS 26 Motion for Reconsideration of TRO; 16 Motion for Modification, is MOOT; 33 Motion for Protective Order and 40 Motion for Reconsideration and/or Modification of August 14, 2008 Discovery Order are PENDING.(Court Reporter: Marcia Patrisso.)(Attorneys present: Plaintiff: I. Mahony, M. Bodoin, T. Darling Individual Defendants: C. Cohn, M. Hoffman, A. Kessel, J. Reinstein, L. Kolodney, T. Brown. On the phone: Atty. Granick, Atty. Opsahl, Atty. McSherry, Defendant Z. Anderson, R. Ryan. MIT: J. Swope ) (Edge, Eugenia) Modified on 8/20/2008 (Edge, Eugenia).
August 19, 2008 Filing 60 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 19, 2008 Filing 59 Transcript of Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on August 9, 2008, before Judge Woodlock. Transcribed by Maryann Young at 508/384-2003. The Transcript may be purchased through Maryann Young viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 9/8/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 18, 2008 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Support re 50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion to Convert Temporary Restraining Order to Time-Limited Preliminary Injunction--Leave to File Granted on August 18, 2008 filed by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 18, 2008 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Electronic ORDER entered granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 55 Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (OToole, George)
August 18, 2008 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Support re 50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONVERT TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 18, 2008 Filing 56 DECLARATION re 50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Third Supplemental Declaration of Ieuan G. Mahony by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 18, 2008 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Exceeding Page Limit by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority.(Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 18, 2008 Filing 54 DECLARATION re 50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of William A. Mitchell, Jr. by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 18, 2008 Filing 53 DECLARATION re 50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Declaration of Scott Henderson by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 18, 2008 Filing 52 DECLARATION re 50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Declaration of Joseph Kelley by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 18, 2008 Filing 51 DECLARATION re 50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction DECLARATION OF MAXIMILLIAN J. BODOIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 18, 2008 Filing 50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Preliminary Injunction)(Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 18, 2008 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 26 MOTION for Reconsideration re 12 Order on Motion for TRO -- Declaration of Corynne McSherry filed by Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Brown, Thomas)
August 18, 2008 Filing 48 DECLARATION re 47 Reply to Response to Motion Declaration of Zack Anderson in Reply to Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration of Temporary Restraining Order by Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kessel, Adam)
August 18, 2008 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to 26 MOTION for Reconsideration re 12 Order on Motion for TRO filed by Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa. (Kessel, Adam)
August 18, 2008 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/18/2008 8:00 PM to File Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority.(Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 18, 2008 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Electronic ORDER entered granting 43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Marcia Hoffman for Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan and Alessandro Chiesa. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 18, 2008 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered granting 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Cindy Cohn for Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan and Alessandro Chiesa. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 18, 2008 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence K. Kolodney on behalf of Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa (Kolodney, Lawrence)
August 18, 2008 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Brown on behalf of Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa (Brown, Thomas)
August 18, 2008 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marcia Hofmann Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002078724. by Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Reinstein, John)
August 18, 2008 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Cindy Cohn Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002078677. by Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Reinstein, John)
August 18, 2008 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Kessel on behalf of Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa (Kessel, Adam)
August 18, 2008 Filing fee/payment: $ 50.00, receipt number BST005392 for Order on Motion for Leave to Appear, 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jennifer Stisa Granick (Russo, Patricia)
August 17, 2008 Filing 40 MOTION for Reconsideration and/or Modification of August 14, 2008 Discovery Order by Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Russell J. Ryan)(Reinstein, John)
August 15, 2008 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Electronic ORDER entered granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time. The defendants are to respond to the discovery requests no later than 4:00PT/7:00ET on August 16, 2008. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 15, 2008 Filing 39 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to 5:00/PT 8:00 ET August 16, 2008 to Complete Discovery Response by Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kurt Opsahl, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reinstein, John)
August 15, 2008 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority re 37 Declaration. (Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 15, 2008 Filing 37 DECLARATION Supplemental Declaration of Richard Sullivan by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 15, 2008 Filing 36 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 15, 2008 Filing 35 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on August 14, 2008, before Judge O'Toole. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso at 617/737-8728. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 9/2/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 15, 2008 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by John Reinstein on behalf of Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa (Reinstein, John)
August 14, 2008 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2008 re 16 MOTION to Modify Terms But Not Duration of Temporary Restraining Order filed by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, 26 MOTION for Reconsideration re 12 Order on Motion for TRO filed by Alessandro Chiesa, Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan ; Granting 28 Request for Interim Discovery Order as to document requests 1.1, 1.2, 2.1, 5.4, 5.5. Production or responses due by 8/15/08 4:00pm eastern time., Discovery (continuance of Motion Hearing) Hearing set for 8/19/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. OToole Jr..) Parties may submit documents for Tuesdays hearing by end of business on 8/18/08. Atty. Granick request stay of discovery order to seek a writ from the 1st Circuit. Court DENIES request. (Court Reporter: Marcia Patrisso.)(Attorneys present: Attorneys present: Plaintiff: I. Mahony, M. Bodoin, T. Darling Defendant: J. Granick- for individual defendants, J. Swope-MIT) (Edge, Eugenia) .
August 14, 2008 Letter sent to Attorney Thomas F.S. Darling advising of inactive status in the Bar of this Court. Completed reregistration and ECF suapplication submitted in court. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 14, 2008 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Electronic ORDER entered granting 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Jennifer Stisa Granick for Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan and Alessandro Chiesa. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 14, 2008 Filing 33 MOTION for Protective Order by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 14, 2008 Filing 32 Sealed Document. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 14, 2008 Filing 31 DECLARATION re 30 Opposition to Motion Second Supplemental Declaration of Ieuan G. Mahony by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 14, 2008 Filing 30 Opposition re 26 MOTION for Reconsideration re 12 Order on Motion for TRO filed by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 13, 2008 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas F.S. Darling, III on behalf of Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 13, 2008 Filing 28 MOTION for Hearing Plaintiff's Request For Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Interim Discovery Order by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 13, 2008 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jennifer Stisa Granick by Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Berger, Emily)
August 13, 2008 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Electronic ORDER entered granting 21 Motion to Correct docket entry. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 13, 2008 Remark: Defendants 26 Cross Motion for reconsideration will be heard at Motion hearing scheduled for Thursday 8/14/08 @ 11:00am. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 12, 2008 Filing 26 Cross MOTION for Reconsideration re 12 Order on Motion for TRO by Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa. * Cross Motion included in 23 Response. c/s (Edge, Eugenia)
August 12, 2008 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 23 Response to Motion "to Modify Terms but not Duration of Temporary Restraining Order" and Cross Motion for Reconsideration. (Berger, Emily)
August 12, 2008 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 23 Response to Motion "to Modify Terms but not Duration of Temporary Restraining Order" and Cross Motion for Reconsideration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Berger, Emily)
August 12, 2008 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re 16 MOTION to Modify Terms But Not Duration of Temporary Restraining Order and Cross Motion for Reconsideration filed by Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa. (Berger, Emily)
August 12, 2008 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily A. Berger on behalf of Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa (Berger, Emily)
August 12, 2008 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 16 MOTION to Modify Terms But Not Duration of Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 12, 2008 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION to Correct Docket Entry by Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Swope, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2008 Remark regarding docket entry #15: Received CD containing scanned exhibits 1 thru 8. See docket entry # 20. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 12, 2008 Filing 20 EXHIBITS one thru eight re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Two, # 2 Exhibit Three, # 3 Exhibit Four, # 4 Exhibit Five, # 5 Exhibit Six, # 6 Exhibit Seven, # 7 Exhibit Eight)(Edge, Eugenia)
August 11, 2008 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority re 16 MOTION to Modify Terms But Not Duration of Temporary Restraining Order, 17 Declaration, 18 Exhibit,. (Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 11, 2008 Filing 18 EXHIBIT re 16 MOTION to Modify Terms But Not Duration of Temporary Restraining Order by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 11, 2008 Filing 17 DECLARATION re 16 MOTION to Modify Terms But Not Duration of Temporary Restraining Order Declaration of Ieuan G. Mahony in Support by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 11, 2008 Filing 16 MOTION to Modify Terms But Not Duration of Temporary Restraining Order by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority.(Mahony, Ieuan-Gael)
August 11, 2008 Filing fee/payment: $ 350.00, receipt number BST005243 for 1 Complaint (Russo, Patricia)
August 9, 2008 Filing 14 DECLARATION OF ERIC JOHANSON re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by defendants Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa (Lovett, Jarrett) Modified on 8/13/2008 (Edge, Eugenia) to correct filer of Declaration.
August 9, 2008 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Swope on behalf of Massachusetts Institute of Technology (Lovett, Jarrett)
August 9, 2008 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Motion Hearing held in courtroom 24 on 8/9/2008 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority: the individual deft's Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, and Alessandro Chiesa participate by telephone; atty Swope files an appearance on behalf of MIT; Declaration of Eric Johanson filed in open court; oral arguments heard by the Court; Court GRANTS 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Massachusetts Bay Transportation for reasons as stated on the record; an Order shall issue. (Digital Recording; 11:45-1:35)(Attorneys present: Mahony & Darling for the pltff; Swope for MIT; Ganick, Hoffman & Opsahl for the individual deft's (participate via telephone) (Lovett, Jarrett)
August 9, 2008 Filing 12 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered granting 2 Motion for TRO see order for specifics. (Woodlock, Douglas)
August 9, 2008 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority re 9 Supplemental Declaration of Ieuan G. Mahony, 10 Declaration of Scott Henderson. (Lovett, Jarrett)
August 9, 2008 Filing 10 DECLARATION OF SCOTT HENDERSON re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Lovett, Jarrett)
August 9, 2008 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF IEUAN G. MAHONY re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Lovett, Jarrett)
August 8, 2008 Filing 15 UNABLE TO SCAN EXHIBIT 1 thru 8 in support re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 8, 2008 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Motion Hearing held on 8/8/2008 in courtroom 20 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority: Pltff informs the Court that the parties are aware of today's proceedings; Court hears initial argument; a Further Hearing as to 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is set for 8/9/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The pltff is to inform the deft's of said hearing and advise them to have counsel present; pltff is further Ordered to file a supplemental affidavit by 8/9/08. (Digital Recording)(Interpreter: Mahoney and Darling for the pltff)(Attorneys present: Mahoney and Darling for the pltff) (Lovett, Jarrett)
August 8, 2008 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings (Edge, Eugenia)
August 8, 2008 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 8, 2008 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Ieuan G. Mahony by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 8, 2008 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Joseph Kelley by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 8, 2008 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Gary Foster by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 8, 2008 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Richard Sullivan by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 8, 2008 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Edge, Eugenia)
August 8, 2008 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority.(Edge, Eugenia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2008: # 1 Motion for TRO) (Edge, Eugenia).
August 8, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zack Anderson, RJ Ryan, Alessandro Chiesa, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, filed by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet)(Edge, Eugenia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority
Represented By: Ieuan-Gael Mahony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zack Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJ Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessandro Chiesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Institute of Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?