Ligeri v. Youtube, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Benjamin Ligeri sued Defendants YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC, Google Inc. and various YouTube and Google employees and agents and alleged that Defendants had not compensated him for the traffic generated by videos Plaintiff had uploaded to YouTube.

Plaintiff: Benjamin Ligeri
Defendant: Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube Team, Youtube Partner Support Team, Employees and Agents, GOOGLE, INC., Harry LNU, Heather LNU, Wynston LNU, Kavitha LNU and Evelyn LNU
Case Number: 1:2008cv11394
Filed: August 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Bristol
Presiding Judge: Douglas P. Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2009 Appeal Record Returned: 21 Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
September 10, 2009 Filing 29 MANDATE of USCA as to 21 Notice of Appeal, filed by Benjamin Ligeri. Appeal 21 Terminated. Mandate issued in the USCA 9/9/2009 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2009: # 1 Main Document) (Ramos, Jeanette).
August 26, 2009 Filing 28 Letter from Benjamin Ligeri notifying the court of his intent to appeal to the United States Supreme Court. (York, Steve)
August 18, 2009 Filing 27 USCA Judgment as to 21 Notice of Appeal, filed by Benjamin Ligeri. The judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED. Judgment issued in the USCA 8/17/2009 (Ramos, Jeanette)
April 14, 2009 Filing 26 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 21 Notice of Appeal, Documents included: 23 (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 27, 2009 Filing 25 USCA Case Number 09-1071 for 21 Notice of Appeal, filed by Benjamin Ligeri. (Ramos, Jeanette)
January 15, 2009 Filing 24 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 15, 2009 Filing 23 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on December 30, 2008, before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Brenda K. Hancock at 617/439-3241. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 2/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 14, 2009 Filing 22 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 21 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(Ramos, Jeanette)
January 12, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 20 Order Dismissing Case by Benjamin Ligeri. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 2/2/2009. (Seelye, Terri)Filing Fee Not Paid.
December 30, 2008 Filing 20 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE.(Lovett, Jarrett)
December 30, 2008 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 12/30/2008: Pltff appears Pro Se; oral arguments heard; Court GRANTS 7 Motion to Dismiss for reasons as stated on the record and reflected in the stenographer's notes. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock)(Attorneys present: Berta & Conroy for the Deft's) (Lovett, Jarrett)
December 22, 2008 Filing 19 Proposed JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Conroy, James)
December 19, 2008 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, GOOGLE, INC.. (Conroy, James)
December 2, 2008 Filing 17 NOTICE OF INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ORDER FOR JOINT STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATIONS, AND ORDER FOR ELECTRONIC FILING: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/30/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
November 25, 2008 Filing 16 DECLARATION re 7 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Complaint (Reply Declaration of Lance Kavanaugh in Support of Motion) by Youtube, Inc., GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Conroy, James)
November 25, 2008 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to 7 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Complaint filed by Youtube, Inc., GOOGLE, INC.. (Conroy, James)
November 25, 2008 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 12 Assented to Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Michael A. Berta for Youtube, LLC and GOOGLE, INC. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms; granting 14 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Reply and Reply Declaration of Lance Kavanaugh in support of 7 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Complaint by Youtube, LLC, GOOGLE, INC.; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lovett, Jarrett)
November 24, 2008 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief and Reply Declaration by Youtube, LLC, GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Reply Brief, # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Declaration)(Conroy, James) Modified text on 11/25/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
November 17, 2008 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 7 to Dismiss or Transfer Complaint filed by Benjamin Ligeri. (Seelye, Terri)
November 17, 2008 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael Berta, Esq. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002192859. by Youtube, LLC, GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing)(Meixel, Jill)
November 17, 2008 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Brenner Meixel on behalf of Youtube, LLC, GOOGLE, INC. (Meixel, Jill)
October 31, 2008 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Michael Berta re 7 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Complaint by Youtube, LLC, GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B)(Conroy, James) Modified text on 11/5/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
October 31, 2008 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Lance Kavanaugh re 7 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Complaint by Youtube, LLC, GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Conroy, James) Modified text on 11/5/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
October 31, 2008 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re 7 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Complaint filed by Youtube, LLC, GOOGLE, INC.. (Conroy, James)
October 31, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Complaint by Youtube, LLC, GOOGLE, INC..(Conroy, James)
October 31, 2008 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James B. Conroy on behalf of Youtube, LLC, GOOGLE, INC. (Conroy, James)
October 31, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter E. Gelhaar on behalf of Youtube, LLC, GOOGLE, INC. (Gelhaar, Peter)
September 12, 2008 Summons Issued as to Wynston LNU, Kavitha LNU, Evelyn LNU, Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube Team, Youtube Partner Support Team, Employees and Agents, GOOGLE, INC., Harry LNU, Heather LNU. Mailed to plaintiff with USM 285 forms, U.S. Marshal service information, L.R. 4.1 and courtesy copy of the complaint. (PSSA, 4)
September 11, 2008 Filing 4 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons and the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the summons, complaint, and this Order upon the defendants as directed by plaintiff with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. Notwithstanding Local Rule 4.1 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), the plaintiff has 120 days from the date of this Order to complete service. (PSSA, 4)
August 26, 2008 Filing 3 Letter/request (non-motion) with signature page to original complaint from Benjamin Ligeri. Related Document 1 . (Seelye, Terri)
August 7, 2008 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin Ligeri.(Gawlik, Cathy)
August 7, 2008 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler (Gawlik, Cathy)
August 7, 2008 Filing 1 Unsigned COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Benjamin Ligeri. (Attachments: # 1 cmp part 2, # 2 cmp part 3, # 3 cmp part 4, # 4 civil cover and category sheets)(Gawlik, Cathy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2008: # 5 attachment 1, # 6 attachment 1 part 2, # 7 attachment 2) (Gawlik, Cathy). Modified text on 8/14/2008 (Seelye, Terri).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ligeri v. Youtube, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Ligeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube Partner Support Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employees and Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynston LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kavitha LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?