Empire Today, LLC v. National Floors Direct, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Empire Today, LLC
Defendant: National Floors Direct, Inc., Rajendro Bisso, Samuel Rosenberg, Barry Amidon, Jack Danhof, Danhof Home Improvement, Dan Esposito, Foxon Flooring, LLC, Greg Hickey, RMC.com, LLC, Robert Johnson, August-Eleven, LLC, Diane Johnston, DL Johnston, LLC, Louis Lamour, Louis Lamour Enterprises, LLC, Sean Maclellan, Snix Corp, Inc., Joseph Ouellette, JOSLS LLC, Robert Paiva, Paiva Enterprises, LLC, Donald Plouff, Hard Knocks Corporation, Donald Talbot, DTalbot Designs, LLC, Lawrence Tattenbaum, Lawrence Tattenbaum, LLC, Joseph Vaudo, Joseph Vaudo, LLC, David Walsh and Corner Designs, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv11999
Filed: December 2, 2008
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Joseph L. Tauro
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2011 356 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT. The remaining issues in this action came to a hearing before this court. The issues in Count IX of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint 148 and Count V of National Floor Direct Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaim to Empire's Third Amended Complaint 160 have been tried and heard and decision has been rendered. FINAL JUDGMENT is therefore entered in this action in accordance with this court's June 2, 2011 ORDER 351 and MEMORANDUM 352 . IT IS SO ORDERED. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
June 2, 2011 352 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 12, 2010 277 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. After reviewing the Parties' submissions, this court hereby ORDERS that: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Damages Expert Report and Trial Testimony 275 IS DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Strik e the Testimony of Mark Hosfield, Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend, and Motion for Directed Verdict on All counts 276 IS DENIED. Defendants' Motion for Directed Verdict on All Counts 276 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 27, 2010 249 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered ALLOWED IN PART 244 Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony at Trial. Mr. Rose may testify to the extent that the testimony is relevant to Plaintiff's legitimate motives for filing suit in reply to Defendant 's counterclaim against Plaintiff for abuse of process. Defendant's reply 247 is ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. It is ALLOWED as to the exclusion of Mr. Rose's testimony at trial. It is DENIED as to the Motion to Dismiss and in all other respects. Defendant's 246 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Mark Hosfield of September 27, 2010 is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 23, 2010 241 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered ALLOWED 210 Motion in Limine; ALLOWED 211 Motion to Quash; DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE 212 Motion in Limine; DENIED 214 Motion in Limine; ALLOWED 215 Motion in Limine; ALLOWED 216 Motion in Limine; ALLOWE D 218 Motion in Limine; ALLOWED 219 Motion in Limine; ALLOWED 220 Motion in Limine; ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART 221 Motion in Limine. This Motion is ALLOWED with respect to Exhibits 3, 42, and 45. The Exhibits' relevance if any, is substantially outweighed by the likelihood of confusing the jury. In all other respects, this Motion is DENIED; ALLOWED 225 Motion in Limine; ALLOWED 239 Motion in Limine. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 31, 2010 194 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered after Status Conference held on 8/31/10, this Court hereby orders that: ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART 171 Motion to Compel; DENIED AS MOOT 173 Motion to Compel. By 9/3/10 At 4:00 PM Plaintiff shall provid e Defendant National Floors Direct with all of the declarations that Plaintiff has obtained before that time as part of its settlement with other Defendants. By 9/20/2010 the Parties shall file all Objections to depositions and Rrebuttal deadline to Plaintiff's most recent expert reports due by 9/24/2010. NO FURTHER REPLIES SHALL BE ALLOWED. Trial is scheduled for 9/27/2010 at 10:00 AM. All other pending matters have been resolved, as attested to by the Parties. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empire Today, LLC v. National Floors Direct, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empire Today, LLC
Represented By: Roger A. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Floors Direct, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajendro Bisso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Amidon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Danhof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danhof Home Improvement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Esposito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foxon Flooring, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMC.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: August-Eleven, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DL Johnston, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Lamour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Lamour Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Maclellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snix Corp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Ouellette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSLS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Paiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paiva Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Plouff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hard Knocks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTalbot Designs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Tattenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Tattenbaum, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Vaudo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Vaudo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corner Designs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?