Financial Resources Network, Inc. et al v. Brown & Brown, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Financial Resources Network, Inc., Financial Family Holdings LLC, Rosalind Herman and Gregg D. Caplitz
Defendant: Brown & Brown, Inc., Brown & Brown of California, Inc., American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Zurich North America Company and Calsurance
Case Number: 1:2009cv11315
Filed: August 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: William G. Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT. The issues having been duly heard and decisions rendered by the court, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that plaintiffs take nothing and that this action be dismissed. (Patton, Christine)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. In accordance with the foregoing discussion, the motion for summary judgment filed by defendants (Docket Entry 119 ) is ALLOWED except for Count V with respect to the 2004-20 05 policy period and for Count VI. Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment (Docket Entry 115 ) under Rules 56(a) and Rule 56(g) is DENIED. The parties shall appear for a status conference on April 2, 2013, at 2:30 p.m. to set a trial date.(Garvin, Brendan)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER RE:DEFENDANTS SECOND RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOCKET ENTRY # 119); PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOCKET ENTRY # 115). Defendants are therefore directed to inform this court on or before March 4, 2013, whether they wish to incorporate the facts and the arguments they present to oppose plaintiffs partial summary judgment motion to also support their summary judgment motion.(Feeney, Eileen)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE:DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS DENIAL OF THEIR RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNTS III, IV, V AND VI OF THE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOCKET ENTRY # 111)is ALLOWED only to the extent that defendants and plaintiffs may each file one summary judgment motion subject to the above parameters. (Feeney, Eileen)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: PROCEDURAL ORDER. ORDER entered. (Feeney, Eileen)
March 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered In accordance with the foregoing discussion, defendants motion to strike portions of the affidavits of Gregg Caplitz and Rosalind Herman (Docket Entry # 103) is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. T he motion to strike plaintiffs cross motion for partial summary judgment (Docket Entry # 99) is ALLOWED and plaintiffs cross motion for partial summary judgment (Docket Entry #92) and amended cross motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry # 100) are therefore DENIED as untimely. The renewed motion for summary judgment filed by defendants (Docket Entry # 85) is ALLOWED as to Count II and DENIED as to the remaining counts. (Feeney, Eileen)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANTS AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY AND ZURICH NORTH AMERICA COMPANY (DOCKET ENTRY # 46); is ALLOWED in part and DENI ED in part. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANTS BROWN & BROWN OF CALIFORNIA, INC., BROWN & BROWN, INC., AND CALSURANCE (DOCKET ENTRY # 54); is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. PLAINTIFFS CROSS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOCKET ENTRY #59) IS denied. The parties shall appear for a status conference at 2:30 p.m. on December 15, 2010, to address the deadlines for fact and expert discovery and dispositive motions. (Feeney, Eileen)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Financial Resources Network, Inc. et al v. Brown & Brown, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Resources Network, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Family Holdings LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind Herman
Represented By: Robert D. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg D. Caplitz
Represented By: Robert D. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Brown, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Grossbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Brown of California, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Grossbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: David A. Grossbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich North America Company
Represented By: David A. Grossbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calsurance
Represented By: David A. Grossbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?