Red Bend Software, Inc. et al v. Google Featured Case

Plaintiffs allege that Defendant Google Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 6,546,552 entitled \"Difference Extraction Between Two Versions of Data-Tables Containing Intra-References.\" Specifically, Plaintiffs allege that Defendant\'s implementation of its differential compression algorithm for making Google Chrome updates significantly smaller (\"Courgette\") infringes on one or more claims of the \'522 patent. Additionally, Plaintiffs charge that Google\'s publication and distribution of the source code for the algorithm induces others\' infringement of one or more claims of the \'522 patent.

Plaintiff: Red Bend Software, Inc. and Red Bend, Ltd.
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv11813
Filed: October 26, 2009
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Douglas P. Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2010 119 EXHIBIT re 118 Notice of Supplemental Authorities by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Tempesta, Jennifer)
November 3, 2010 118 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Tempesta, Jennifer)
September 22, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 117 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph C. Akalski by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd. (Lovett, Jarrett)
September 13, 2010 117 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph C. Akalski Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3062528 by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cloherty, Daniel)
September 3, 2010 116 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
September 3, 2010 115 Transcript of Markman and Motion Hearing held on August 18, 2010, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at 617-439-3214 Redaction Request due 9/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 20, 2010 114 Stipulated Discovery and Pre-Trial Schedule. (Austern, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/25/2010 (to correct entry type) (York, Steve).
August 20, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot 106 Motion for Extension of Time to File; finding as moot 107 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (Lovett, Jarrett)
August 19, 2010 113 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel re Post Markman Hearing Proposed Claim Constructions. (Tempesta, Jennifer)
August 18, 2010 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Markman Hearing held on 8/18/2010. 99 Red Bend's Motion to Compel Production of Documents is DENIED except to extent of additional production offered by Google. Claim construction is taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at 617-439-3214)(Attorneys present: Scheinfeld, Cloherty, Williams, Tempesta for the pltff; Manning, Abrams, Bertin, Magee, Trinh, Austern for the deft) (Lovett, Jarrett)
August 16, 2010 112 Supplemental Notice of Supplemental Authorities re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tempesta, Jennifer)
August 16, 2010 111 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Tempesta, Jennifer)
August 16, 2010 110 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re 99 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Jennifer C Tempesta on behalf of Red Bend Software, Inc.. (Tempesta, Jennifer)
August 12, 2010 109 DECLARATION re 108 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by David Magee by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A [SEALED], # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C [SEALED], # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F [SEALED], # 7 Exhibit G [SEALED])(Magee, David)
August 12, 2010 108 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 99 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Google Inc.. (Magee, David)
August 11, 2010 107 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 12, 2010 to File Opposition to Red Bend's Motion to Compel by Google Inc..(Magee, David)
August 9, 2010 106 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 11, 2010 to File Opposition to Motion to Compel by Google Inc..(Magee, David)
August 5, 2010 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for 94 Declaration,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (York, Steve)
August 3, 2010 105 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Regarding Claim Construction and PreHearing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tempesta, Jennifer)
July 29, 2010 104 DECLARATION re 103 Brief of Stephen Edwards In Support of Red Bend's Responsive Claim Contruction Brief by Red Bend Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Tempesta, Jennifer)
July 29, 2010 103 BRIEF by Red Bend Software, Inc. Red Bend's Responsive Claim Construction Brief. (Tempesta, Jennifer)
July 29, 2010 102 BRIEF by Google Inc. GOOGLE INC.S RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF. (Magee, David)
July 27, 2010 101 Sealed Declaration re 100 Declaration re 99 Motion to Compel Production of Documents of Jennifer Tempesta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(York, Steve)
July 26, 2010 100 DECLARATION re 99 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents of Jennifer Tempesta by Red Bend Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Tempesta, Jennifer)
July 26, 2010 99 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Red Bend Software, Inc..(Tempesta, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2010: # 1 (Sealed Version) of Motion) (York, Steve).
July 15, 2010 98 DECLARATION re 96 Brief by Stephen A. Edwards by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Tempesta, Jennifer)
July 15, 2010 97 DECLARATION re 96 Brief by Jennifer C. Tempesta by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, part 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Tempesta, Jennifer)
July 15, 2010 96 BRIEF by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd. Opening Claim Construction Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Tempesta, Jennifer)
July 15, 2010 95 DECLARATION re 93 Brief by Martin G. Walker by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Magee, David)
July 15, 2010 94 DECLARATION re 93 Brief by Susan Baker Manning by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Magee, David) (Attachment 5 replaced on 7/15/2010) (York, Steve). (Attachment 6 replaced on 7/15/2010) (York, Steve).
July 15, 2010 93 BRIEF by Google Inc. GOOGLE INC.S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF. (Magee, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2010: # 1 Brief (Sealed Version)) (York, Steve).
June 25, 2010 92 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Google Inc.. Document received: Revised Stipulation for Modification of Claim Construction Schedule. (Magee, David)
June 22, 2010 91 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Google Inc.. Document received: Stipulation for Modification of Claim Construction Schedule. (Magee, David)
June 22, 2010 90 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 22, 2010 89 Transcript of Status Conference held on June 21, 2010, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com Redaction Request due 7/13/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2010. (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 21, 2010 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status Conference held on 6/21/2010. Oral argument's heard; a Stipulated Order re deadlines as provided at the hearing held today shall be filed; 86 Motion to Strike 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED; Markman Hearing is rescheduled for 8/18/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at 617-737-4410)(Attorneys present: Abrams, Cloherty, Magee, Scheinfeld, and Trinh) (Lovett, Jarrett)
June 18, 2010 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing : Status Conference set for 6/21/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
June 18, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 85 Emergency MOTION to Schedule Status Conference by Google Inc. (Lovett, Jarrett)
June 17, 2010 88 Opposition re 85 Emergency MOTION for Hearing on case status and schedule filed by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1-3)(Tempesta, Jennifer)
June 17, 2010 87 DECLARATION re 86 MOTION to Strike Red Bend's Motion for Preliminary Injunction of Susan Baker Manning by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF)(Magee, David) (Attachment 16 replaced on 6/17/2010) (York, Steve). (Attachment 29 replaced on 6/17/2010) (York, Steve). (Attachment 30 replaced on 6/17/2010) (York, Steve).
June 17, 2010 86 MOTION to Strike Red Bend's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Google Inc..(Magee, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2010: # 1 Sealed Motion to Strike) (York, Steve).
June 17, 2010 85 Emergency MOTION for Hearing on case status and schedule by Google Inc..(Magee, David)
June 17, 2010 84 Letter/request (non-motion) from Susan Baker Manning Requesting Emergency Status Conference. (Magee, David)
June 8, 2010 83 Response by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd. to 81 Notice of Supplemental Authorities Google's Post-Hearing Notice. (Tempesta, Jennifer)
June 4, 2010 82 Document disclosure by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Invalidity Chart (Anticipation), # 2 Exhibit B - Invalidity Chart (Obviousness))(Magee, David)
June 4, 2010 81 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - PTO Office Action)(Magee, David)
June 2, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 80 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 1, 2010 to Exchange Claim Terms and Proposed Constructions by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd. (Lovett, Jarrett)
May 28, 2010 80 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 1, 2010 to Exchange Claim Terms and Proposed Constructions by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd..(Tempesta, Jennifer)
May 28, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 77 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Claim Construction Briefing: Parties file Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs due 6/25/10; Reply claim construction briefs due 7/2/10; Parties Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement due 7/6/10; all other dates in the 5/10/10 scheduling Order shall remain unchanged, except that the Markman Hearing is rescheduled for 7/28/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
May 26, 2010 79 Document disclosure by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Invalidity Chart (Anticipation), # 2 Exhibit B - Invalidity Chart (Obviousness))(Magee, David)
May 26, 2010 78 Document disclosure by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Preliminary Non-Infringement Charts)(Magee, David)
May 26, 2010 77 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Claim Construction Briefing by Google Inc..(Magee, David)
May 10, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ADOPTING IN PART 70 Joint statement of counsel: L.R. 16.6 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-InfringementDisclosures by 5/26/10 - Google shall identify prior art that anticipates or renders obvious the identified patent claims in question and, for each such prior art reference, shall specify whether it anticipates or is relevant to the obviousness inquiry. If applicable, Google shall also specify any other grounds for invalidity, such as indefiniteness, best mode, enablement, or written description. - If Google has not already done so, Google shall producedocuments relevant to the invalidity defenses and/or identify any such supporting documents produced by Red Bend. - If Google has not already done so, Google shall produce documents sufficient to show operation of the accused product(s) or method(s) that Red Bend identified in its preliminary infringement disclosures; Parties Exchange Claim Terms for Construction and Proposed Constructions by 5/28/10; Last day to Amend/Supplement L.R. 16.6 Preliminary Infringement Disclosures before Markman without leave of Court by 6/4/10; Last day to Amend/Supplement L.R. 16.6 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Disclosures before Markman without leaveof Court by 6/4/10, except that if Red Bend amends or supplements its preliminary infringement disclosures, Google may without further leave of Court likewise amend or supplement its disclosures within 30 days of service of the amended or supplemented infringement disclosures; Parties File Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by 6/11/10 - Each brief shall contain a list of terms construed, the partys proposed construction of each term, and evidence and argument supporting each construction - Absent leave of Court, preliminary claim construction briefs shall be limited to 25 pages double spaced, of at least 12-point Times New Roman font or equivalent, including footnotes; Parties File Reply Claim Construction Briefs (15 page limit without leave of Court) by 6/25/10; Parties File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (containing the items identified in § (B)(4)(a)-(e) of L.R. 16.6 Appendix (at pp. 5-7)) by 7/2/10; Last day to exchange technology tutorials by 7/8/10 - if the parties plan to provide tutorials in the form of briefs, declarations, computer animations, slide presentations, or other media, the parties shall exchange such materials five days before the claim construction hearing. In the alternative, the parties may present tutorialsthrough presentations by the attorneys or experts at the claim construction hearing; Markman Hearing set for 7/12/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock.(Lovett, Jarrett) Modified text on 5/10/2010 (Lovett, Jarrett).
May 3, 2010 76 Plaintiffs Sealed Preliminary Infringement Disclosures. (York, Steve)
April 30, 2010 75 Document disclosure by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Preliminary Infringement Disclosure)(Tempesta, Jennifer)
April 14, 2010 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Motion Hearing held on 4/14/2010 re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Red Bend, Ltd., Red Bend Software, Inc.; oral argument's heard, powerpoint presentation viewed; 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd. is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; a Joint Statement is due by 4/21/2010. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at 617-439-3214)(Attorneys present: Abrams, Bertin, Cloherty, Magee, Manning, Scheinfeld, Tempesta, Trinh, and Williams) (Lovett, Jarrett)
April 9, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 66 Assented to Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael Trinh for Google, Inc. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lovett, Jarrett)
April 8, 2010 69 DECLARATION re 68 Sur-Reply to Motion of Susan Baker Manning by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 38, # 2 Exhibit 39, # 3 Exhibit 40, # 4 Exhibit 41, # 5 Exhibit 42)(Magee, David)
April 8, 2010 68 SUR-REPLY to Motion re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Google Inc.. (Magee, David)
April 8, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 67 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Google Inc.; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lovett, Jarrett)
April 8, 2010 67 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File SURREPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO RED BENDS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Surreply, # 2 Exhibit B - Second Manning Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B-38, # 4 Exhibit B-39, # 5 Exhibit B-40, # 6 Exhibit B-41, # 7 Exhibit B-42)(Magee, David)
April 6, 2010 66 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael Trinh Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-2854192 by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Magee, David)
March 30, 2010 65 Sealed Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4, # 4 Part 5, # 5 Part 6, # 6 Part 7, # 7 Part 8, # 8 Part 9, # 9 Part 10) (York, Steve)
March 30, 2010 64 Sealed Declaration of Stephen A. Edwards (York, Steve)
March 30, 2010 63 Sealed Declaration of Terry H. Korn re 62 Plaintiffs' Sealed Reply in support (York, Steve)
March 30, 2010 62 Plaintiffs' Sealed Reply in support of 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (York, Steve)
March 24, 2010 61 DECLARATION re 58 Reply to Response to Motion of Terry Korn by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Tempesta, Jennifer)
March 24, 2010 60 DECLARATION re 58 Reply to Response to Motion of Stephen Edwards by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Tempesta, Jennifer)
March 24, 2010 59 DECLARATION re 58 Reply to Response to Motion of Jennifer C. Tempesta by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4,7,10, # 3 Exhibit 5-6, # 4 Exhibit 8-9, # 5 Exhibit 11-18, # 6 Exhibit 19-22, # 7 Exhibit 23-34, # 8 Exhibit 35-38, # 9 Exhibit 39, # 10 Exhibit 40-41, # 11 Exhibit 42, # 12 Exhibit 43, # 13 Exhibit 44-52, # 14 Exhibit 53)(Tempesta, Jennifer)
March 24, 2010 58 REPLY to Response to 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Tempesta, Jennifer)
March 22, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 57 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd. (Lovett, Jarrett)
March 19, 2010 57 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd..(Tempesta, Jennifer)
March 18, 2010 56 Corrected Sealed Opposition re 55 Opposition re 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (York, Steve)
March 18, 2010 55 Opposition re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (CORRECTED) filed by Google Inc.. (Magee, David)
March 2, 2010 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Entry 54 has been removed because it was incorrectly filed as a sealed document in this case (York, Steve)
March 2, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Catherine C Lacavera for Google Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (York, Steve)
March 1, 2010 54 Declaration . (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2010: # 1 Corrected Main Document) (York, Steve). Modified on 3/2/2010 (to with draw document incorrectly filed) (York, Steve).
March 1, 2010 53 Sealed Declaration of Martin G Walker re 50 Sealed Opposition re 45 Opposition to 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4, # 4 Part 5)(York, Steve)
March 1, 2010 52 Sealed Declaration of Christopher Bakewell re 50 Sealed Opposition re 45 Opposition to 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. (York, Steve)
March 1, 2010 51 Sealed Declaration of Susan Baker Manning re 50 Sealed Opposition re 45 Opposition to 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29 part 1, # 30 Exhibit 29 part 2, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37)(York, Steve)
March 1, 2010 50 Sealed Opposition by Google Inc. (York, Steve) Modified on 3/18/2010 (York, Steve). (THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN CORRECTED AND RE-DOCKETED AS ENTRY 56 )
March 1, 2010 49 DECLARATION re 45 Opposition to Motion by Brian Bershad by Google Inc.. (Magee, David)
March 1, 2010 48 DECLARATION re 45 Opposition to Motion by Martin G. Walker, PhD by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Magee, David)
March 1, 2010 47 DECLARATION re 45 Opposition to Motion by W. Christopher Bakewell by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Magee, David)
March 1, 2010 46 DECLARATION re 45 Opposition to Motion by Susan Baker Manning by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37)(Magee, David)
March 1, 2010 45 Opposition by Google Inc.. (Magee, David) (York, Steve). Modified on 3/18/2010 (York, Steve). (THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN CORRECTED AND RE-DOCKETED AS ENTRY 55 )
February 25, 2010 44 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Catherine C. Lacavera Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002798118. by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Catherine C. Lacavera)(Magee, David)
February 25, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 43 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time Until 3/1/10 to File Opposition to 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Lovett, Jarrett)
February 25, 2010 43 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/01/2010 to File Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Google Inc.(Magee, David)
February 24, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 42 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess Pages. (Lovett, Jarrett)
February 23, 2010 42 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Google Inc..(Magee, David)
February 4, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Elizabeth B Austern for Google Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (York, Steve)
February 4, 2010 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Chester W Day for Google Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (York, Steve)
February 3, 2010 41 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Elizabeth B. Austern Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002768450. by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Magee, David)
February 3, 2010 40 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Chester W. Day Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002768420. by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Magee, David)
February 2, 2010 39 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 2, 2010 38 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on January 19, 2010, before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Brenda K. Hancock at 617/439-3214. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 2/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2010. (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 20, 2010 37 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (York, Steve)
January 19, 2010 36 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Google Inc.. Document received: Stipulated Protective Order. (Magee, David)
January 19, 2010 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Motion Hearing held on 1/19/2010 re 31 Emergency MOTION to Compel Depositions or in the Alternative Strike Depositions of Yoram Salinger and Stephen Edwards and/or Preclude Reply Briefing by Google Inc., 35 Joint MOTION for Protective Order: Oral arguments heard; Court GRANTS AND DENIES IN PART 31 Emergency MOTION to Compel Depositions or in the Alternative Strike Depositions of Yoram Salinger and Stephen Edwards and/or Preclude Reply Briefing by Google Inc., to the extent that the pltff's deposition shall be completed by the second week of February; deft's opposition is due by 2/26/10; the deft's depositions shall be completed by the week of 3/8/10; pltff's supplemental brief is due by 3/24/10; 35 Joint Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED AND DENIED IN PART as stated on the record; the parties shall file a proposed Protective Order reflecting the directions of the Court at today's hearing; the Motion Hearing re 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is rescheduled for 4/14/10 at 2:00 PM in courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock)(Attorneys present: Cloherty & Scheinfeld for the pltff's; S. Manning & Magee for the deft) (Lovett, Jarrett) Modified text and regenerated NEF on 1/19/2010 (Lovett, Jarrett).
January 15, 2010 35 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Ruling on Outstanding Issues by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Correspondence, # 3 Exhibit C)(Magee, David)
January 13, 2010 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 31 Emergency MOTION to Compel Depositions or in the Alternative Strike Depositions of Yoram Salinger and Stephen Edwards and/or Preclude Reply Briefing by Google Inc : Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
January 10, 2010 34 AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Opposition re 31 Emergency MOTION to Compel DEPOSITIONS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE STRIKE DELARATIONS OF YORAM SALINGER AND STEPHEN EDWARDS AND/OR PRECLUDE REPLY BRIEFING filed by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Tempesta, Jennifer)
January 10, 2010 33 Opposition re 31 Emergency MOTION to Compel DEPOSITIONS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE STRIKE DELARATIONS OF YORAM SALINGER AND STEPHEN EDWARDS AND/OR PRECLUDE REPLY BRIEFING filed by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Tempesta, Jennifer)
January 8, 2010 32 AFFIDAVIT of David M. Magee in Support re 31 Emergency MOTION to Compel DEPOSITIONS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE STRIKE DELARATIONS OF YORAM SALINGER AND STEPHEN EDWARDS AND/OR PRECLUDE REPLY BRIEFING filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Magee, David)
January 8, 2010 31 Emergency MOTION to Compel Depositions or in the Alternative Strike Depositions of Yoram Salinger and Stephen Edwards and/or Preclude Reply Briefing by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Magee, David)
January 6, 2010 30 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Magee on behalf of Google Inc. (Magee, David)
December 22, 2009 29 ANSWER to 28 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd..(Tempesta, Jennifer)
December 7, 2009 28 ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM and Jury Demand against all plaintiffs by Google Inc..(Albano, Jonathan)
December 3, 2009 27 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 3, 2009 26 Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on December 2, 2009, before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Debra M. Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 12/24/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2010. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 2, 2009 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status Conference held on 12/2/2009: Preliminary arguments heard as to 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Hearing on Preliminary Injunction is DENIED; 23 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Indirect Infringement is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to reassertion after a full hearing on 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction that is set for 2/17/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock; 18 Defendant's Motion for Modification of Briefing Schedule is GRANTED to the extent that opposition to the defendant's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by 1/25/10, and a reply is due by 2/5/10; rolling document production shall be completed by 12/22/09; the Court Orders the parties to file Declaration's in lieu of live testimony as to the 2/17/10 Preliminary Injunction Hearing; the Court will make a determination at said hearing if live testimony is necessary. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce)(Attorneys present: Cloherty & Scheinfeld for the pltff's; S. Manning & Willett for the deft) (Lovett, Jarrett)
December 1, 2009 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Google Inc.. (Manning, Susan)
December 1, 2009 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re 23 Interim MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Indirect Infringement Claims filed by Google Inc.. (Manning, Susan)
December 1, 2009 23 Interim MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Indirect Infringement Claims by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Indirect Infringement Claim)(Manning, Susan)
December 1, 2009 22 Reply in Support of 21 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Modification of Briefing Schedule filed by Google Inc.. (Manning, Susan) Modified on 12/2/2009 (to edit text) (York, Steve). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2010: # 1 Corrected Main Document) (York, Steve).
December 1, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 21 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of 18 Emergency Motion for Modification of Briefing Schedule by Google Inc; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lovett, Jarrett)
November 30, 2009 21 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of 18 Opposition to 10 Motion to Expedite Hearing and Emergency Motion for Modification of Briefing Schedule by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Albano, Jonathan) Modified on 12/1/2009 (to correct text to this entry) (York, Steve). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2010: # 2 Corrected Main Document) (York, Steve).
November 27, 2009 20 DECLARATION of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Modification of the Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter, # 2 Exhibit Letter, # 3 Exhibit Letter)(Cloherty, Daniel)
November 27, 2009 19 Response by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd. to 18 Opposition to 10 MOTION to Expedite Hearing & Emergency Motion of Google Inc. for Modification of the Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Yoram Salinger)(Cloherty, Daniel) Modified on 12/1/2009 (to correct text) (York, Steve).
November 25, 2009 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing : regarding request for Status Conference. Hearing set for 12/2/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (York, Steve)
November 24, 2009 18 Opposition re 10 MOTION to Expedite Hearing and Emergency Motions of Google to Modify Briefing Schedule and for Status Conference filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Albano, Jonathan)
November 24, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Baker Manning for Google Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (York, Steve)
November 24, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Robert C Bertin for Google Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (York, Steve)
November 24, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Williams F Abrams for Google Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (York, Steve)
November 24, 2009 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Robert C Scheinfeld for Red Bend Software, Inc. and Red Bend, Ltd., Eliot D Williams for Red Bend Software, Inc. and Red Bend, Ltd., Jennifer C Tempesta for Red Bend Software, Inc. and Red Bend, Ltd.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (York, Steve)
November 23, 2009 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Susan Baker Manning Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002677581. by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in support of pro hac vice motion)(Albano, Jonathan)
November 23, 2009 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert C. Bertin Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002677559. by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in support of pro hac vice motion)(Albano, Jonathan)
November 23, 2009 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William F. Abrams Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002677540. by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in support of pro hac vice motion)(Albano, Jonathan)
November 23, 2009 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES by Plaintiffs Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 01010000000002677255. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Cloherty, Daniel)
November 23, 2009 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert C. Scheinfeld, Eliot D. Williams and Jennifer C. Tempesta by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cloherty, Daniel)
November 23, 2009 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Albano on behalf of Google Inc. (Albano, Jonathan)
November 18, 2009 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Google Inc. served on 11/17/2009, answer due 12/7/2009. (Cloherty, Daniel)
November 17, 2009 10 MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd..(Cloherty, Daniel)
November 17, 2009 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining Google's Infringement filed by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Tempesta (Part 1), # 2 Declaration of Jennifer Tempesta (Part 2), # 3 Declaration of Yoram Salinger, # 4 Declaration of Stephen Edwards)(Cloherty, Daniel)
November 17, 2009 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd..(Cloherty, Daniel)
November 5, 2009 7 Summons Issued as to Google Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (York, Steve)
November 5, 2009 6 (RE-DOCKETED) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc., filed by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Notice to Counsel, incorrect event used, event Amended Complaint should have been selected ) (York, Steve) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2009: # 2 Signed Amemded Complaint, # 3 Exhibit) (York, Steve).
October 26, 2009 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. Amendment to 1 Complaint,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cloherty, Daniel)
October 26, 2009 4 Summons Issued as to Google Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cummings, Mary)
October 26, 2009 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Cummings, Mary)
October 26, 2009 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein (Cummings, Mary)
October 26, 2009 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Cloherty, Daniel)
October 26, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against Google Inc., Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd. Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 01010000000002639553, filed by Red Bend Software, Inc., Red Bend, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Sheet, # 3 Form AO 120)(Cloherty, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Bend Software, Inc. et al v. Google
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Bend Software, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Cloherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Bend, Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel J. Cloherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?