Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. et al v. Zoll Medical Corporation
Plaintiff: Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. and Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Defendant: Zoll Medical Corporation
Case Number: 1:2010cv11041
Filed: June 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Essex
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered Accordingly, 1) plaintiffs assented-to motion to seal its opposition to defendants motions in limine and supporting exhibits (Docket No. 1015) is DENIED, 2) defendants assented-to motion to seal its opposition to plaintiffs motions in limine (Docket No. 1035) is DENIED and 3) defendants motion to seal Exhibit 2 to its witness and exhibit list (Docket No. 1040) is DENIED.For the reasons set forth above, the parties motions in limine (Docket Nos. 991, 992, 993, 994, 996, 999, 1000, 1004, 1005, 1006, 1008, 1009, 1010 and 1011) and supporting exhibits (Docket Nos. 1001 and 1007) are hereby UNSEALED.So ordered. (Caruso, Stephanie)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER 1) defendants motion for summary judgment of no willful infringement (Docket No. 921) is ALLOWED;2) plaintiffs motion for summary judgment that defendant cannot col lect damages on certain foreign sales (Docket No. 929) is DENIED and3) plaintiffs motion for summary judgment Preclude defendant from collecting damages (Docket No. 935) is, with respect to damages between June 1, 2006 and November, 16, 2006, DENIED.So ordered.(Caruso, Stephanie)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER 1) Defendants motion to exclude portions of the testimony of Mr. John C Jarosz (Docket No. 924) is DENIED and2) Defendants motion to exclude in part the testimony of Dr. John P. Freese (Docket No. 926) is DENIED.(Caruso, Stephanie)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 940 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 939 Joint MOTION to Amend Stipulated Protective Order by Koninklijke Philips, N.V., Philips Electronics North America Corporation."Subject to the caveat added in page 20 of the amended protective order, motion allowed." (Caruso, Stephanie)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 912 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, denying 892 MOTION TO SET DEADLINES FOR PHILIPS TO SEEK LEAVE TO FILE ANY AMENDED OR NEW DAMAGES EXPERT REPORTS filed by Zoll Medical Corporation, and denying 876 MOTION to Stay Trial Pending Reexamination with attached Certificate of Service filed by Zoll Medical Corporation.(Lima, Christine)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 909 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered granting 879 Motion to Seal Document 878 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 877 Redacted Document "Subject, specifically, to the provision of Local Rule 7.2, motion allowed." (Caruso, Stephanie)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 860 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: "For the foregoing reasons, defendant's motion to stay is ALLOWED in part, and DENIED, in part. Trial relating to damages in Civil Action No. 10-11041-NMG is stayed pending ju dgment in the cross-appeals to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals. All issues in Civil Action No. 12-12255-NMG are ready for trial, which will commence as previously scheduled on Monday, March 2, 2015 at 9:00 A.M. So ordered." Please see order for further details. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-11041-NMG, 1:12-cv-12255-NMG(Moore, Kellyann)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 597 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: "For the foregoing reasons, the Court concludes that it is inappropriate to bar claims of infringement of United States Patent Nos. 5,749,905, 6,047,212 and 5,836,978 based upon the doctrine of obviousness-type double patenting and therefore such claims are not barred.So ordered."(Moore, Kellyann)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 465 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: "Accordingly, as previously ruled in the Order of this Court entered on November 6, 2013 (Docket No. 447 ): 1) Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment that (1) the '187 Patent Claims are Invalid as Anticipated, or, in the Alternative, (2) Philips's Accused Products Do Not Infringe the '187 Patent (Docket No. 219 ) is DENIED; 2) Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Asserted Claims of the '526 Patent (Docket No. 223 ) is DENIED; 3) Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct (Docket No. 227 ) is DENIED; 4) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Laches (Docket No. 231 ) is DEN IED; 5) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment that (1) No Asserted Claim is Entitled to a Priority Date Before May 10, 1994; (2) Asserted Claims 25, 41, 42, 43, 67-72 of the '374 Patent and Claims 1-7 of the '460 Patent are Invalid for Anticipation; and (3) Asserted Claims 66 and 73 are not Infringed (Docket No. 232 ) is DENIED; 6) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Waveform Patents ('879, '905, '978, and '454 Patents) (Do cket No. 236 ) is DENIED;7) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Lack of Written Description of Certain Claims of the '212 and '454 Patents (Docket No. 237 ) is DENIED; 8) Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Pre clude ZOLL's Reliance on Documents Not Produced as Required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) (Docket No. 272 ) is DENIED AS MOOT; 9) The Joint Motion to Dismiss Remaining Claims with Prejudice (Docket No. 369 ) is ALLOWED. So ordered."(Moore, Kellyann)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered re: 171 Motion for Protective Order. The Motion is DENIED. Within seven days, the parties shall confer and agree to a definite date for the relevant deposition. See attached Order. (Robinson, Amy)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered re: 137 Motion to Compel. The Motion is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. ZOLL shall produce information regarding the dates, parameters, and results of tests it performed on Philips's accus ed products, as referenced in the preliminary infringement contentions for the '526 patent, by March 14, 2013. Philips may supplement its invalidity contentions within 7 days of receiving the testing information. The deadlines for expert reports are extended to March 28, 2013 and April 18, 2013. See attached Order. (Robinson, Amy)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER(Moore, Kellyann)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. et al v. Zoll Medical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Represented By: Denise W. DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Represented By: Denise W. DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoll Medical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?