Roberts et al v. St. Amand et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Roberts and Patrick Nerette
Defendant: Peter St. Amand and Thomas N Neville
Case Number: 1:2011cv10760
Filed: May 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Norfolk
Presiding Judge: Mark L. Wolf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 65 Motion ; denying 66 Motion for Discovery; granting 82 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 80 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 5/30/2017) (Halley, Taylor)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion to Alter Judgment (Halley, Taylor)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered. The Court will grant the plaintiff an additional twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order in which to respond to the defendant's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment. Failure to respond will result in the denial of the plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment as to Neville and the dismissal will stand. Response due 8/12/2016.(Halley, Taylor)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Halley, Taylor)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC OPINION AND ORDER entered granting 32 Motion to Dismiss (Danieli, Chris)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts et al v. St. Amand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Nerette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter St. Amand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas N Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?