Blakeslee v. PHC, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Peter Blakeslee |
Defendant: |
PHC, Inc., Bruce A. Shear, Donald E. Robar, Douglas J. Smith, Howard W. Phillips, William F. Grieco, David E. Dangerfield, Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. and Acadia Merger Sub, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv11049 |
Filed: |
June 13, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Massachusetts |
Office: |
Boston Office |
County: |
Essex |
Presiding Judge: |
George A. OToole |
Nature of Suit: |
Stockholders Suits |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 13, 2017 |
Filing
450
Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered. The Court ALLOWS in part the motion for judgment as a matter of law (Docket No. 423 ) to the extent that $2,964,396 plus interest is disgorged from Shear to the certified class. The Court otherwise DENIES the motion. The Court DENIES the motion for a new trial (Docket No. 426 ). The parties shall submit a proposed form of judgment within fourteen days. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
|
November 21, 2016 |
Filing
302
Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered. This Court ALLOWS in part and DENIES in part the defendants' motion for partial reconsideration of the order on summary judgment (Docket No. 285 ). This Court DENIES MAZ's motion to modify the order on class certification (Docket No. 271 ). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
|
September 15, 2016 |
Filing
273
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered. For the reasons stated, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Limited Discovery 240 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
|
September 1, 2016 |
Filing
258
Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered. The Court ALLOWS in part and DENIES in part the plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (Docket No. 182 ) and the defendants' motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 181 ). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
|
January 14, 2016 |
Filing
234
Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: For the reasons set forth in the attached MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the plaintiffs motion to certify a class of all Class Ashareholders 161 is DENIED without prejudice. However, the Court ALLOWS the motion to certify a class of all Class A shareholders who voted against the merger or abstained. (Molloy, Maryellen)
|
September 30, 2013 |
Filing
121
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: OPINION AND ORDER entered granting (97) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:11-cv-11049-GAO Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-11049-GAO, 1:11-cv-11099-GAO(Danieli, Chris)
|
March 30, 2012 |
Filing
51
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: OPINION AND ORDER entered. The motions to dismiss filed by PHC and the individual defendants are GRANTED only to the extent that the claims against the corporation itself are dismissed and is otherwise DENIED. The 35 Moti on to Dismiss the Blakeslee Complaint (11-11049) is GRANTED as to Count I and DENIED as to Counts II and III. The 33 Motion to Dismiss the MAZ Complaint (11-11099) is DENIED.Acadias 33 Motion to Dismiss the Blakeslee Complaint (11-11049) and its 39 Motion to Dismiss the MAZ Compliant (11-11099) are both DENIED. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-11049-GAO, 1:11-cv-11099-GAO(Danieli, Chris)
|
August 17, 2011 |
Filing
24
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered granting in part 16 Motion for Discovery (Lyness, Paul)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?