United States of America et al v. Coloplast A/S et al
Plaintiff: United States of America, Kimberly Herman, Amy Lestage, Kevin Roseff and Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Defendant: Coloplast Corp., CCS Medical Supplies, Inc., Liberator Medical Supply, Inc. and Shield Medical, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Coloplast Corp.
Counter_defendant: Amy Lestage
Case Number: 1:2011cv12131
Filed: December 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: Rya W. Zobel
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered denying 459 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 462 Motion for New Trial (Urso, Lisa)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 403 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 365 Motion in Limine; granting 368 Motion in Limine; resolved 373 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 376 Motion in Limine (Urso, Lisa)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. Motion for Summary Judgment 301 is denied. Its Motion to Strike 317 is denied as moot consistent with the court's rulings herein. (DiBlasi, Lily)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Judge Rya W. Zobel: Memorandum of Decision entered denying 271 Motion for Summary Judgment, entered. (Urso, Lisa)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Coloplast A/S et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kriss Basil
Represented By: Joanna B. Bowers
Represented By: George B. Henderson, II
Represented By: George B. Henderson, III
Represented By: Taylor R. Neff
Represented By: Paul W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Herman
Represented By: Joanna B. Bowers
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Marcus
Represented By: Taylor R. Neff
Represented By: Paul W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Lestage
Represented By: Joanna B. Bowers
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Marcus
Represented By: Taylor R. Neff
Represented By: Paul W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Roseff
Represented By: Joanna B. Bowers
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Marcus
Represented By: Taylor R. Neff
Represented By: Paul W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Handwerker
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coloplast Corp.
Represented By: Terran Chambers
Represented By: Brian P. Dunphy
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Mrachek
Represented By: Nicole A. Truso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCS Medical Supplies, Inc.
Represented By: Paul R. Cirel
Represented By: Lauren A. Graber
Represented By: Ingrid S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberator Medical Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Hannigan Bryan
Represented By: Jamie Gottlieb Furia
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Greene
Represented By: Scott B. McBride
Represented By: Maureen A. Ruane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shield Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Patric Hooper
Represented By: Joseph R. LaMagna
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Represented By: David S. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Coloplast Corp.
Represented By: Brian P. Dunphy
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Mrachek
Represented By: Nicole A. Truso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Amy Lestage
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Marcus
Represented By: Taylor R. Neff
Represented By: Paul W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?