In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION
Plaintiff: Sherryln Dolan, AMY E. KELLER, James Dolan, Jean C Wilcox, Charles C. Grillo, Christopher & Renee Jerram and Consolidated Plaintiffs
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation, EMC Mortgage LLC and The Bear Stearns Companies LLC
Not Yet Classified: Linda Larkin, Bernard Karnes, Delano Cureton, Scott Keller, Vera Shourds, Fred Shourds and Lloyd Clapham
In Re: In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION
Other: Laura A Cecere
Case Number: 1:2011md02290
Filed: October 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Filing 555 USCA Case Number 17-1953 for #553 Notice of Appeal filed by Charles C. Grillo. (Paine, Matthew)
September 27, 2017 Filing 554 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #553 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
September 26, 2017 Filing 553 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 547 Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment, 552 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Charles C. Grillo Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-6813905 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/16/2017. (Traft, Michael)
September 7, 2017 Filing 552 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #548 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #548 Motion to enjoin state court proceedings. The Settlement Agreement speaks for itself. Nothing is asserted by plaintiff Charles Grillo that is not derivative of that Agreement and Judgment. (Zierk, Marsha)
September 6, 2017 Filing 551 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #549 Motion to Enforce Judgment, noting also that there is no opposition to this motion. (RGS, int2)
August 18, 2017 Filing 550 RESPONSE to Motion re #548 MOTION for Reconsideration re 547 Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment and Enjoin State Court Proceedings MOTION enter findings re 547 Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment and Enjoin State Court Proceedings filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (George, Wayne)
August 14, 2017 Filing 549 MOTION to Enforce Judgment and Enjoin State Court Proceedings by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G, #2 Proposed Order)(George, Wayne)
August 7, 2017 Filing 548 MOTION for Reconsideration re 547 Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment and Enjoin State Court Proceedings, MOTION enter findings re 547 Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment and Enjoin State Court Proceedings ( Responses due by 8/21/2017) by Charles C. Grillo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of counsel on reconsideration with documents)(Traft, Michael)
July 11, 2017 Filing 547 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #543 Motion to Enforce Judgment and enjoin state court proceeding in Denver, Colorado. (mkz)
May 24, 2017 Filing 546 RESPONSE to Motion re #543 MOTION to Enforce Judgment and Enjoin State Court Proceedings with Certificate of Service filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (George, Wayne)
May 10, 2017 Filing 545 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Traft on behalf of Charles C. Grillo (Traft, Michael)
May 10, 2017 Filing 544 MEMORANDUM in Support re #543 MOTION to Enforce Judgment and Enjoin State Court Proceedings filed by Charles C. Grillo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charles Grillo)(Traft, Michael)
May 10, 2017 Filing 543 MOTION to Enforce Judgment and Enjoin State Court Proceedings by Charles C. Grillo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Traft, Michael)
January 5, 2016 Filing 542 Letter/request (non-motion) from C. Grillo to the Court, FILED. (Flaherty, Elaine)
April 29, 2015 Filing 541 MANDATE of USCA as to #512 Notice of Appeal filed by Sherryln Dolan, James Dolan. Appeal #512 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
April 29, 2015 Filing 540 USCA Judgment as to #512 Notice of Appeal filed by Sherryln Dolan, James Dolan (Paine, Matthew)
March 31, 2015 Filing 539 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL BY GREGORY P. DRESSER (Agoglia, Michael)
March 26, 2015 Filing 538 MANDATE of USCA as to #485 Notice of Appeal filed by Sherryln Dolan, James Dolan. Appeal #485 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
March 24, 2015 Filing 537 BILL OF COSTS, ISSUED. (Flaherty, Elaine)
March 24, 2015 Filing 536 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #535 Motion for Bill of Costs (Flaherty, Elaine)
March 16, 2015 Filing 535 MOTION for Bill of Costs by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
March 11, 2015 Filing 534 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #504 Motion for Attorney Fees. On May 7, 2014 I delegated to co-lead class counsel (CLC), as being in the best position to evaluate the relative contributions of the various plaintiffs' attorneys, the authority to distribute the reimbursement of attorneys' fees and costs. CLC did so and while 23 law firms have accepted the result, one, Lanza & Smith (LS), contests its allocation. In essence, LS argues that rather than be paid based on the value of its contribution to advancing the MDL (the approach taken by CLC) it should be paid a set portion of its lodestar. CLC rejected such an approach on grounds that it would reward firms that padded their lodestar at the expense of firms that worked more efficiently. Indeed, an examination of LS's submitted bills supports CLC's position. LS ultimately represented at most a single settling plaintiff and can point to precious little work product that helped advance the overall MDL. I see no reason to unsettle the allocation proposed by CLC. Consequently, LS's motion is denied (the court will entertain a motion from CLC for reimbursement of reasonable costs associated with defending this motion to be taken out of LS's allocation prior to disbursement). (RGS, law1)
March 5, 2015 Filing 533 Response by Consolidated Plaintiffs Response of Co-Lead Class Counsel to Counter-Declaration of Anthony Lanza in Support of Motion for Allocation of Attorney's Fee Award. (Klein, Gary)
March 5, 2015 Filing 532 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #530 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law1)
March 4, 2015 Filing 531 USCA Judgment as to #485 Notice of Appeal filed by Sherryln Dolan, James Dolan. AFFIRMED... (Paine, Matthew)
March 4, 2015 Filing 530 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Assented to Motion for Leave to File Response to Counter-Declaration of Anthony Lanza in Support of Motion for Allocation of Attorney Fee Award by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Response of Co-Lead Class Counsel to Counter-Declaration of Anthony Lanza in Support of Motion for Allocation of Attorney's Fee Award)(Klein, Gary)
February 27, 2015 Filing 529 DECLARATION re 528 Order [COUNTER-DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY ANTHONY LANZA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ALLOCATION OF ATTORNEY FEE AWARD] by In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION. (Lanza, Anthony)
February 25, 2015 Filing 528 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Lanza & Smith may file a Counter Declaration in Support of their Motion for Allocation of Attorney Fee Award but it must be received by February 27, 2015. (RGS, law1)
February 24, 2015 Filing 527 REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE COUNTER DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ALLOCATION OF ATTORNEY FEE AWARD Letter/request (non-motion) from Lanza & Smith . (Lanza, Anthony)
February 23, 2015 Filing 526 AFFIDAVIT of Co-Lead Class Counsel in Opposition re #504 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Lanza & Smith's Motion for Allocation of Attorney Fee Award) Joint Declaration of Co-Lead Class Counsel in Opposition to Lanza & Smith's Motion for Allocation of Attorney Fee Award filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Klein, Gary)
February 23, 2015 Filing 525 Opposition re #504 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Lanza & Smith's Motion for Allocation of Attorney Fee Award) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Lanza & Smith's Motion for Allocation of Attorney Fee Award filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
February 3, 2015 Filing 524 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The court ruled on the Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt #519) without having benefit of the Memorandum in Support of the Motion (Dkt #521). The court will therefore treat the Memorandum itself as a Motion for Reconsideration of the court's order (Dkt #520), which it denies. Chase makes two arguments in support of its motion. First, it argues that ordering the parties to proceed with the settlement violates the terms of the Supplemental Settlement, which states that if there is an appeal the Effective Date of that Settlement will be suspended until 5 days after the appeal is disposed of. Implicit in the terms of the Supplemental Settlement, however, is the legitimacy of the appeal. As Chase itself states, the Dolans' appeal is "frivolous" because the Dolans "were never in fact members of the Supplemental Settlement Class." Mem. at 1. As the court stated in its order to the Dolans to post a bond, the Dolans are attempting to appeal orders that are "manifestly unappealable," by them. Dkt #495 at 4 (quoting United States v. Ferris, 751 F.2d 436, 440 (1st Cir. 1984)). To hold differently would allow any stranger to a class settlement to pay a filing fee and sabotage the relief due to members of the class. Chase's second argument is that the authorities relied upon by this court in retaining jurisdiction during the pendency of the appeal "all involved interlocutory appeals in criminal cases with trials pending." Mem. at 7. The court finds this distinction between criminal and civil cases meaningless, particularly in cases such as this where the equities run strongly in favor of the district court retaining jurisdiction so that the members of the Supplemental Settlement Class may receive vital relief (retaining ownership of their homes) in a timely manner. (RGS, law1)
February 2, 2015 Filing 523 E-Mail Notice re 522 originally issued on 1/30/15 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Sharon T Hritz. Attorney's email address removed from CM/ECF database to prevent the return of additional email notices. (Hurley, Virginia)
January 30, 2015 Filing 522 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #519 MOTION for Reconsideration re #495 Order on Motion for Bond filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Agoglia, Michael)
January 30, 2015 Filing 521 MEMORANDUM in Support re #519 MOTION for Reconsideration re #495 Order on Motion for Bond filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Agoglia, Michael)
January 30, 2015 Filing 520 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #519 Motion for Reconsideration. The court's view is that the appeal is meritless and should not impede the agreed upon settlement. See United States v. Brooks, 145 F.3d 446, 456 (1st Cir. 1998)("Thus, a district court can proceed, notwithstanding the filing of an appeal, if the notice of appeal is defective in some substantial and easily discernible way (if, for example, it is based on an unappealable order) or if it otherwise constitutes a transparently frivolous attempt to impede the progress of the case."). (RGS, law1)
January 30, 2015 Filing 519 MOTION for Reconsideration re #495 Order on Motion for Bond by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
January 29, 2015 Filing 518 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #516 Motion to Rescind Emmanuel Tamen's Opt Out of Class, subject to the conditions outlined in the Joint Non-Opposition to Emmanuel Tamen's Motion to Rescind Opt Out (Dkt. #517). (RGS, law1)
January 28, 2015 Filing 517 Joint RESPONSE to Motion re #516 MOTION of Emmanuel Tamen to Rescind Opt Out Filed filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Flannery, Michael)
January 28, 2015 Filing 516 MOTION of Emmanuel Tamen to Rescind Opt Out Filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Flannery, Michael)
January 8, 2015 Filing 515 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 1BST047432 re #512 Notice of Appeal,filed by Laura A Cecere (Caruso, Stephanie) (Modified on 3/27/2015 to Correct Docket Text As The Receipt Information Was Linked to the Wrong Notice of Appeal) (Paine, Matthew).
January 7, 2015 Filing 514 USCA Case Number 15-1058 for #512 Notice of Appeal filed by Sherryln Dolan, James Dolan. (Paine, Matthew)
January 7, 2015 Filing 513 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #512 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
January 6, 2015 Filing 511 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #510 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' response to the Motion for Attorney Fees (Dkt #504) is due on February 23, 2015. (RGS, law1)
January 6, 2015 Filing 510 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 23, 2015 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Lanza & Smith's Motion for Allocation of Attorney Fee Award by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
January 5, 2015 Filing 512 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #495 Order on Motion for Bond, 503 Order on Motion for Clarification, by James Dolan, Sherryln Dolan NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 1/26/2015. (Flaherty, Elaine)
January 5, 2015 Filing 509 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Matthew A. Kane on behalf of defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Kane, Matthew)
December 29, 2014 Filing 508 MOTION for Attorney Fees (EXHIBIT 2; EXHIBIT 3; EXHIBIT 4 to DECLARATION OF ANTHONY LANZA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ALLOCATION OF ATTORNEY FEE AWARD by In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4)(Lanza, Anthony)
December 29, 2014 Filing 507 MOTION for Attorney Fees (EXHIBIT 1 TO DECLARATION OF ANTHONY LANZA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ALLOCATION OF ATTORNEY FEE AWARD) by In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 2))(Lanza, Anthony)
December 29, 2014 Filing 506 MOTION for Attorney Fees (DECLARATION OF ANTHONY LANZA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ALLOCATION OF ATTORNEY FEE AWARD) by In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION.(Lanza, Anthony)
December 29, 2014 Filing 505 MEMORANDUM in Support re #504 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Lanza & Smith's Motion for Allocation of Attorney Fee Award) filed by In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION. (Lanza, Anthony)
December 29, 2014 Filing 504 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Lanza & Smith's Motion for Allocation of Attorney Fee Award) by In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION.(Lanza, Anthony)
December 29, 2014 Filing 503 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #502 Motion for Clarification. The court sets a deadline of January 2, 2015 for payment of the appeal bond (Dkt #495). Contact this session's courtroom clerk, Terry Seelye, at (617)748-9162 to arrange payment regarding the bond. (RGS, law1) Modified on 12/29/2014 (Flaherty, Elaine).
December 23, 2014 Filing 502 MOTION for Clarification Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification of Date for Granted Appeal Bond to be Paid by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
December 16, 2014 Filing 501 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #499 Motion to Vacate. The motion is DENIED. Petitioners were not members of the Supplemental Class. The Supplemental Class was composed of a discrete group of borrowers who were deliberately not included in the Original Class and were therefore never sent notice of the Original Settlement. Petitioners were members of the Original Class and they were sent notice in the manner specified in the Original Settlement. See Mullane v. Central Hanover Bank & Trust Co., 339 U.S. 306, 314-315 (1950) (due process does not require proof of actual notice, but rather notice that is reasonably calculated to apprise interested parties of the pendency of the action and afford them an opportunity to present their objections). (RGS, law1)
December 15, 2014 Filing 500 First MEMORANDUM in Support re #499 First MOTION to Vacate filed by James Dolan, Sherryln Dolan. (Heggie, James)
December 15, 2014 Filing 499 First MOTION to Vacate by James Dolan, Sherryln Dolan.(Heggie, James)
December 4, 2014 Filing 498 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 4, 2014 Filing 497 Transcript of Final Settlement Hearing held on October 8, 2014, before Judge Richard G. Stearns. COA Case No. 14-2111. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com Redaction Request due 12/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 4, 2014 Filing 496 Transcript of Fairness Hearing held on May 7, 2014, before Judge Richard G. Stearns. COA Case No. 14-2111. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com Redaction Request due 12/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 3, 2014 Filing 495 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #489 Motion for Bond (RGS, law1)
December 1, 2014 Filing 494 First Opposition re #489 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond to Secure Costs Incurred During Pendency of Appeal filed by James Dolan, Sherryln Dolan. (Heggie, James)
December 1, 2014 Filing 493 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT FORM received from USCA and addressed to James Gibbons re #485 Notice of Appeal,,, Transcript order form filed in USCA on December 1, 2014. Transcripts ordered: 5/7/14 Hearing and 10/8/14 Final Hearing. Transcript due by 1/30/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 20, 2014 Filing 492 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re #482 MOTION to rescind opt out is GRANTED(RGS, law1)
November 17, 2014 Filing 491 DECLARATION re #489 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond to Secure Costs Incurred During Pendency of Appeal Declaration of Gary Klein to Support Motion for Appeal Bond by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
November 17, 2014 Filing 490 MEMORANDUM in Support re #489 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond to Secure Costs Incurred During Pendency of Appeal filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Klein, Gary)
November 17, 2014 Filing 489 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond to Secure Costs Incurred During Pendency of Appeal by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
November 4, 2014 Filing 488 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) as to Individual Claims Only of Plaintiff Basilisa Pacheco by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Cappio, Gretchen)
October 23, 2014 Filing 487 USCA Case Number 14-2111 for #485 Notice of Appeal filed by Sherryln Dolan, James Dolan. (Paine, Matthew)
October 23, 2014 Filing 486 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #485 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
October 21, 2014 Filing 485 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 479 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, by James Dolan, Sherryln Dolan NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 11/10/2014. (Flaherty, Elaine)
October 21, 2014 Filing 484 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 1BST046134 re #485 Notice of Appeal filed by James Dolan, Sherryln Dolan (Diaz, Carmen) (Modified on 12/15/2014 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Document Link. The Filing Fee Paid and Receipt Were Linked to the Incorrect Notice of Appeal.) (Paine, Matthew).
October 20, 2014 Filing 483 RESPONSE to Motion re #482 MOTION rescind opt out Joint Non-Opposition to Charles C. Grillo's Motion to Rescind Opt Out filed by EMC Mortgage LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., The Bear Stearns Companies LLC. (Agoglia, Michael)
October 15, 2014 Filing 482 MOTION of Charles Grillo rescind opt out, FILED..(Flaherty, Elaine)
October 10, 2014 Filing 481 Judge Richard G. Stearns: Final Approval ORDER, Final Judgment, and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, entered. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS et al.(Flaherty, Elaine)
October 10, 2014 Filing 480 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re #473 Notice (Other) filed by Sherryln Dolan, James Dolan. This will be treated as a Motion to Object to Settlement and is denied. The Dolans have no standing to object and the court will not entertain the motion.(RGS, law1)
October 10, 2014 Filing 479 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #469 Motion To be Excluded From Class. This motion can only refer to the settlement class as defined by the Preliminary Approval Order entered by this court on December 6, 2013. That Order set a deadline of March 18, 2014 for class members to exclude themselves from the settlement and the court sees no basis for an equitable exemption. With regard to notice, the court has previously found that due process has been met. See Mullane v. Central Hanovr Bank & Trust Co., 339 U.S. 306, 314-315 (1950) (notice requirement is not proof of actual notice but notice that is reasonably calculated to apprise interested parties of the pendency of the action and afford them an opportunity to present their objections.). (RGS, law1)
October 9, 2014 Filing 478 DECLARATION re #477 Opposition to Motion DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. AGOGLIA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO JAMES AND SHERRILYN DOLAN'S MOTION TO BE EXCLUDED FROM SETTLEMENT CLASS by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Agoglia, Michael)
October 9, 2014 Filing 477 Opposition re #469 First MOTION To be Excluded From Class DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO JAMES AND SHERRILYN DOLAN'S MOTION TO BE EXCLUDED FROM SETTLEMENT CLASS filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
October 8, 2014 Filing 476 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns: Motion Hearing held on 10/8/2014 re #463 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Supplemental Class Action Settlement filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. After hearing, the motion was taken UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com.)(Attorneys present: Corinne Reed and Gary Klein for supplemental plaintiff class; Donn Randall and Michael Agoglia for JP Morgan) (RGS, law1)
October 7, 2014 Filing 475 DECLARATION OF ANDY MORRISON REGARDING CLASS NOTICE TO JAMES AND SHERRILYN DOLAN by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Agoglia, Michael)
October 7, 2014 Filing 474 Joint Response to Dolans Notice of Objection Response by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to #473 Notice (Other) . (Agoglia, Michael)
October 7, 2014 Filing 473 James and Sherrilyn Dolans Notice of Objection to the Proposed Settlement (Heggie, James) Modified on 10/24/2014 (Flaherty, Elaine).
October 3, 2014 Filing 472 NOTICE by Consolidated Plaintiffs re #463 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Supplemental Class Action Settlement Notice of Filing of [Proposed] Final Approval Order, Final Judgment, and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice (Attachments: #1 [Proposed Agreed Form of] Final Approval Order, Final Judgment, and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, #2 Exhibit 1 to [Proposed] Final Approval Order (Opt-Out List))(Klein, Gary)
September 29, 2014 Filing 471 RESPONSE to Motion re #469 First MOTION To be Excluded From Class Plaintiffs' Response to James and Sherrilyn Dolans' Motion to be Excluded from Settlement Class filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
September 25, 2014 Filing 470 First MEMORANDUM in Support re #469 First MOTION To be Excluded From Class with Exhibits 1-5 filed by James Dolan, Sherryln Dolan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Heggie, James)
September 25, 2014 Filing 469 First MOTION To be Excluded From Class by James Dolan, Sherryln Dolan.(Heggie, James)
September 25, 2014 Filing 468 NOTICE of Appearance by James Heggie on behalf of James Dolan, Sherryln Dolan (Heggie, James)
September 10, 2014 Filing 467 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Consolidated Plaintiffs re #463 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Supplemental Class Action Settlement . (Klein, Gary)
September 10, 2014 Filing 466 DECLARATION re #463 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Supplemental Class Action Settlement Declaration of Corinne Reed Regarding Supplemental Settlement Class Member Correspondence by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
September 10, 2014 Filing 465 DECLARATION re #463 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Supplemental Class Action Settlement Joint Declaration of Co-Lead Class Counsel in Support of Final Approval of Supplemental Class Action Settlement by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
September 10, 2014 Filing 464 MEMORANDUM in Support re #463 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Supplemental Class Action Settlement filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
September 10, 2014 Filing 463 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Supplemental Class Action Settlement by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
September 10, 2014 Filing 462 DECLARATION of Andy Morrison Regarding Class Notice and Administration by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - English Class Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Spanish Class Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Opt Out List)(Klein, Gary)
September 10, 2014 Filing 461 DECLARATION of Gregory P. Dresser (Demonstrating Compliance with CAFA) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
September 5, 2014 Filing 460 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Remand Order in MDL Case 2290 received from District of the mdl panel. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS, 1:11-cv-11818-RGS(Jones, Sherry)
September 5, 2014 Filing 459 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Remand Order in MDL Case 2290 received from the mdl panel. (Jones, Sherry)
September 5, 2014 Filing 458 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order in MDL Case 2290 received from the mdl panel. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS, 1:11-cv-11812-RGS(Jones, Sherry)
August 20, 2014 Filing 457 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER-Suggestion of Remand, entered. (Flaherty, Elaine)
August 19, 2014 Filing 456 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Consolidated Plaintiffs. Document received: Proposed Suggestion of Remand. (Schaffer, Charles)
August 8, 2014 Filing 455 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Consolidated Plaintiffs re #452 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Representative Plaintiffs' Service Payments in Supplemental Class Action Settlement . (Klein, Gary)
August 8, 2014 Filing 454 DECLARATION re #452 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Representative Plaintiffs' Service Payments in Supplemental Class Action Settlement Declaration of Gary Klein in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses in Supplemental Class Action Settlement by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - KKC Lodestar Chart, #2 Exhibit 2 - KR Lodestar Chart, #3 Exhibit 3 - CGL Lodestar Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - LFSB Lodestar Chart)(Klein, Gary)
August 8, 2014 Filing 453 MEMORANDUM in Support re #452 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Representative Plaintiffs' Service Payments in Supplemental Class Action Settlement filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
August 8, 2014 Filing 452 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Representative Plaintiffs' Service Payments in Supplemental Class Action Settlement by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
August 5, 2014 Filing 451 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for 135 Day Extension Pursuant to Paragraph 8 of the Settlement Agreement for Plaintiff Basilisa Pacheco Only by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Obrist, Gretchen)
July 7, 2014 Filing 450 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) as to Individual Claims Only of Plaintiff Kathy Kurtzner by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Cappio, Gretchen)
June 23, 2014 Filing 449 MANDATE of USCA as to #444 Notice of Appeal filed by Laura A Cecere. Appeal #444 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
June 23, 2014 Filing 448 USCA Judgment as to #444 Notice of Appeal filed by Laura A Cecere (Paine, Matthew)
June 6, 2014 Filing 447 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Granting #441 Request for Suggestion of Remand, filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs.Counsel is directed to submit a proposed suggestion of remand. (RGS, law1)
June 3, 2014 Filing 446 USCA Case Number 14-1602 for #444 Notice of Appeal filed by Laura A Cecere. (Paine, Matthew)
June 3, 2014 Filing 445 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #444 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
June 2, 2014 Filing 444 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #433 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Settlement,, by Laura A Cecere Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-5036144 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 6/23/2014. (Pentz, John)
June 2, 2014 Filing 443 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Pentz on behalf of Laura A Cecere (Pentz, John)
May 28, 2014 Filing 442 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered in case 1:10-cv-10380-RGS; granting (439) Motion for Preliminary Approval of Supplemental Class Action Settlement in case 1:11-md-02290-RGS. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS et al.(RGS, law1)
May 16, 2014 Filing 441 NOTICE by Consolidated Plaintiffs Notice of Request for Suggestion of Remand (Unopposed) Pursuant to Paragraph 8 of the Primary Settlement Agreement for Plaintiffs Dianna Montez, Thomas and Felicia Minerva, and Robert and Michelle Hood Only (Klein, Gary)
May 16, 2014 Filing 440 MEMORANDUM in Support re #439 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Supplemental Class Action Settlement and Other Relief filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
May 16, 2014 Filing 439 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Supplemental Class Action Settlement and Other Relief by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Preliminary Approval Order)(Klein, Gary)
May 16, 2014 Filing 438 NOTICE of Settlement Notice of Filing of Supplemental Settlement Agreement by Consolidated Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Counsel List, #3 Exhibit 2 - Class Notice, #4 Exhibit 3 - [Proposed] Final Approval Order, #5 Exhibit 4 - [Proposed] Preliminary Approval Order)(Klein, Gary)
May 16, 2014 Filing 437 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. FINAL APPROVAL Hearing set for 10/8/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri)
May 15, 2014 Filing 436 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #435 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on 5/15/14 - in the caption of the document. (RGS, law1)
May 14, 2014 Filing 435 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
May 9, 2014 Filing 434 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for 90 Day Extension Pursuant to Paragraph 8 of the Settlement Agreement for Plaintiff Basilisa Pacheco Only by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Obrist, Gretchen)
May 7, 2014 Filing 433 Judge Richard G. Stearns: FINAL APPROVAL ORDER, FINAL JUDGMENT, AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE entered in case 1:10-cv-10380-RGS; granting (414) Motion for Settlement; granting (406) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:11-md-02290-RGS (Attachments: EXHIBIT #1 - Opt-Outs List). Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS et al. (RGS, law1)
May 7, 2014 Filing 432 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns: Fairness Hearing held on 5/7/2014. Settlement approved; Parties shall submit, within 10 days, the Remand Requests and a proposed Preliminary Approval Order re: Supplemental Settlement. Parties shall contact the Courtroom Clerk for a date for the Final Fairness Hearing for the Supplemental Settlement. (Court Reporter: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com)(Attorneys present: Gary Klein, Flannery, Obrist, Cappio, Reed, Shaffer; Agoglia, Randall) (Seelye, Terri)
May 7, 2014 Filing 431 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #425 Motion to Amend. The Parties' Amendment to the Agreement dated May 1, 2014 is approved and the court's Preliminary Approval Order (Dkt. #396) is hereby modified to exclude the Omitted Accounts. (RGS, law1)
May 6, 2014 Filing 430 NOTICE by Consolidated Plaintiffs re #414 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Notice of Filing of [Proposed] Final Approval Order, Final Judgment, and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice (Attachments: #1 [Proposed Agreed Form of] Final Approval Order, Final Judgment, and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, #2 Exhibit 1 to [Proposed] Final Approval Order (Opt-Out List))(Klein, Gary)
May 6, 2014 Filing 429 DECLARATION re #414 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Supplemental Declaration of Corinne Reed Regarding Class Member Correspondence by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (McNeills' Email), #2 Exhibit 2 (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ramos-Arrizon's Motion))(Reed, Corinne)
May 5, 2014 Filing 428 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #427 Motion for miscellaneous relief. The court acknowledges the opposition of Blaine White and Virlynn Atikinson-White and grants the request to opt-out of the settlement class if the settlement is indeed approved. (RGS, law1)
May 5, 2014 Filing 427 Response dated 4/21/14 of plaintiffs, Blaine A. White and Virlynn D. Atkinson-White in Opposition to motion for final approval of class action settlement/MOTION to opt out, FILED. (Flaherty, Elaine)
May 2, 2014 Filing 426 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint in the Durmic Action Pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amendment to Third Amended Complaint)(Klein, Gary)
May 2, 2014 Filing 425 Joint MOTION to Amend #385 Notice of Settlement, For Approval of Amendment to Class Action Settlement and for Modification of the Preliminary Approval Order Nunc Pro Tunc by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amendment to Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - [Proposed] Order Approving Amendment to Settlement Agreement And Modifying Preliminary Approval Order Nunc Pro Tunc)(Klein, Gary)
May 1, 2014 Filing 424 NOTICE of Appearance by Corinne Reed on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Reed, Corinne)
April 29, 2014 Filing 423 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) as to Individual Claims Only of Plaintiffs Michael and Audra Schmierer by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Schaffer, Charles)
April 11, 2014 Filing 422 SEALED Version of exhibits to docket no. 417. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) FILED UNDER SEAL (doc. 417-4,6,11,14 and 18) FILED UNDER SEAL(Flaherty, Elaine)
April 10, 2014 Filing 421 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Consolidated Plaintiffs re #412 Declaration, #414 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, #416 Declaration, #415 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #417 Declaration,,, #413 Declaration, . (Klein, Gary)
April 10, 2014 Filing 420 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) as to Individual Claims Only of Plaintiff Thomas Leopold by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Obrist, Gretchen)
April 10, 2014 Filing 419 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) as to Individual Claims Only of Plaintiffs Sandra and Frank Fischer by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Obrist, Gretchen)
April 10, 2014 Filing 418 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) as to Individual Claims Only of Plaintiff Michael Sabouhi by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Obrist, Gretchen)
April 9, 2014 Filing 417 DECLARATION re #414 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Declaration of Corinne Reed Regarding Class Member Correspondence by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Atulomah), #2 Exhibit 2 (Cecere), #3 Exhibit 3-A (Gomez), #4 Exhibit 3-B (Gomez Documents Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 4-A (Greco), #6 Exhibit 4-B (Greco Documents Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 5 (Hickman), #8 Exhibit 6 (Karim), #9 Exhibit 7 (Ochei), #10 Exhibit 8-A (Richardson), #11 Exhibit 8-B (Richardson Documents Filed Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 9 (Umholtz), #13 Exhibit 10-A (White), #14 Exhibit 10-B (White Documents Filed Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 11 (Clark), #16 Exhibit 12 (Ramos-Arrizon), #17 Exhibit 13-A (Rosario), #18 Exhibit 13-B (Rosario Documents Filed Under Seal), #19 Exhibit 14 (Duncker), #20 Exhibit 15 (Gibson), #21 Exhibit 16 (McNeill))(Klein, Gary)
April 9, 2014 Filing 416 DECLARATION re #414 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Joint Declaration of Co-Lead Class Counsel in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Invitation Letter)(Klein, Gary)
April 9, 2014 Filing 415 MEMORANDUM in Support re #414 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
April 9, 2014 Filing 414 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
April 9, 2014 Filing 413 DECLARATION of Andy Morrison Regarding Class Notice and Administration by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - English Class Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Spanish Class Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Opt Out List)(Klein, Gary)
April 9, 2014 Filing 412 DECLARATION of Gregory P. Dresser (Demonstrating Compliance with CAFA) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
April 8, 2014 Filing 411 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #409 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting #410 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law1)
April 7, 2014 Filing 410 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Certain Documents Under Seal by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
April 7, 2014 Filing 409 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
February 14, 2014 Filing 408 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Consolidated Plaintiffs re #405 Notice (Other),,,, #407 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #406 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Award of Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Representative Plaintiffs' Service Payments), #402 Declaration . (Klein, Gary)
February 14, 2014 Filing 407 MEMORANDUM in Support re #406 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Award of Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Representative Plaintiffs' Service Payments) filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
February 14, 2014 Filing 406 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Award of Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Representative Plaintiffs' Service Payments) by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
February 14, 2014 Filing 405 NOTICE by Consolidated Plaintiffs of Filing of Class Counsel Declarations in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Representative Plaintiffs' Service Payments (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. 1 - Klein, #2 Affidavit Ex. 2 - Sarko, #3 Affidavit Ex. 3 - Cuneo, #4 Affidavit Ex. 4 - Schaffer, #5 Affidavit Ex. 5 - Ellis, #6 Affidavit Ex. 6 - Delbaum, #7 Affidavit Ex. 7 - Holland, #8 Affidavit Ex. 8 - Carroll, #9 Affidavit Ex. 9 - Raabe, #10 Affidavit Ex. 10 - Lanza, #11 Affidavit Ex. 11 - Shelquist, #12 Affidavit Ex. 12 - Mauriello, #13 Affidavit Ex. 13 - Friscia, #14 Affidavit Ex. 14 - Braun, #15 Affidavit Ex. 15 - Jenkins, #16 Affidavit Ex. 16 - Axler, #17 Affidavit Ex. 17 - Breit, #18 Affidavit Ex. 18 - Craig, #19 Affidavit Ex. 19 - Hedlund, #20 Affidavit Ex. 20 - Greenberger, #21 Affidavit Ex. 21 - McShane, #22 Affidavit Ex. 22 - Goldberg, #23 Affidavit Ex. 23 - Grant, #24 Affidavit Ex. 24 - Dowd)(Klein, Gary)
February 14, 2014 Filing 404 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #403 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law1)
February 13, 2014 Filing 403 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
February 13, 2014 Filing 402 DECLARATION of Professor Michael S. Barr in Support of Settlement by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Klein, Gary)
January 8, 2014 Filing 401 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS et al.(Scalfani, Deborah)
January 8, 2014 Filing 400 Transcript of Motion for Preliminary Approval held on December 5, 2013, before Judge Richard G. Stearns. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com Redaction Request due 1/29/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS et al.(Scalfani, Deborah)
December 26, 2013 Filing 399 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #398 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys for Dianna Montez, only. As to Attorneys Sarko, Cappio, Obrist and McDevitt. (Flaherty, Elaine) Modified text on 12/26/2013 (Seelye, Terri).
December 23, 2013 Filing 398 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Dianna Montez by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Gretchen Freeman Cappio)(Cappio, Gretchen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 397 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Final Fairness Hearing set for 5/7/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri)
December 6, 2013 Filing 396 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered in case 1:10-cv-10380-RGS; granting preliminarily (386) Motion for Settlement in case 1:11-md-02290-RGS Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS et al.(Zierk, Marsha)
December 6, 2013 Filing 395 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #391 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Flaherty, Elaine)
December 5, 2013 Filing 394 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #392 Motion to Continue.The hearing set for December 5, 2013, at 2:00 PM is a preliminary fairness hearing. There will be opportunity for the movant to object or address his concerns detailed in his motion to continue prior to any final approval of any settlement in this case. (RGS, law1)
December 5, 2013 Filing 393 MEMORANDUM in Support re #392 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Approval Hearing to 12/18/13 filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Bennett, Leonard)
December 5, 2013 Filing 392 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Approval Hearing to 12/18/13 by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Bennett, Leonard)
December 3, 2013 Filing 391 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Anthony G. Taylor by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Christopher M. Ellis)(Ellis, Christopher)
December 3, 2013 NOTICE converting the 12/5/13 Status Conference to a Preliminary Fairness Hearing. Preliminary Fairness Hearing set for 12/5/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri)
November 27, 2013 Filing 390 NOTICE by Consolidated Plaintiffs re #386 Assented to MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Other Relief [Notice of Joint Filing Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 23(e)(3)] (Klein, Gary)
November 26, 2013 Filing 389 DECLARATION re #386 Assented to MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Other Relief (Declaration of Mediator) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
November 26, 2013 Filing 388 DECLARATION re #386 Assented to MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Other Relief (Joint Declaration of Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel in Support of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - KKC Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - LFSB Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - CGL Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - KR Firm Resume)(Klein, Gary)
November 26, 2013 Filing 387 MEMORANDUM in Support re #386 Assented to MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Other Relief [Leave to File Granted November 25, 2013] filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
November 26, 2013 Filing 386 Assented to MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Other Relief by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Preliminary Approval Order)(Klein, Gary)
November 26, 2013 Filing 385 NOTICE of Settlement (Class Action) by Consolidated Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Counsel List, #3 Exhibit 2 - Class Notice, #4 Exhibit 3 - [Proposed] Final Approval Order, #5 Exhibit 4 - [Proposed] Preliminary Approval Order)(Klein, Gary)
November 25, 2013 Filing 384 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #383 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (RGS, law1)
November 25, 2013 Filing 383 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement) by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
November 6, 2013 Filing 382 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING, at the request of the parties. Status Conference RESET for 12/5/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri)
November 5, 2013 Filing 381 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Request for Adjournment of Status Conference by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
October 18, 2013 Filing 380 NOTICE by Jean C Wilcox (DESIGNATION OF RECORD UPON REMAND) (Smith, Brodie)
October 9, 2013 Filing 379 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.A further Status Conference set for 11/7/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri)
October 8, 2013 Filing 378 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns: Status Conference held on 10/8/2013. The parties reported on the status of the litigation. A further status conference will be held on 11/7/13 at 2:00 p.m. (Court Reporter: None)(Attorneys present: Cuneo; Klein; Randall; Agoglia; by phone Cappio, Flannery) (Seelye, Terri)
October 7, 2013 Filing 377 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Cappio, Gretchen)
September 11, 2013 Filing 376 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #375 Motion to Continue and Request for Status Conference. The parties' shall file a status report on or before October 7, 2013. Furthermore, a Status Conference will be held on October 8, 2013 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns.(RGS, law2)
September 11, 2013 Filing 375 Joint MOTION to Continue Status Report to Week of October 7, 2013 by Lloyd Clapham, Delano Cureton, EMC Mortgage LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bernard Karnes, Scott Keller, Linda Larkin, Fred Shourds, Vera Shourds, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC.(Randall, Donn)
August 7, 2013 Filing 374 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #373 Motion for Joinder. Case No. 13-cv-00085 has already been joined in this matter per MDL 2290 FINAL ORDER of 4/24/2013 transferring the case to USCD-MA for proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407. (RGS, law2)
August 6, 2013 Filing 373 Assented to MOTION for Joinder to Join Consolidated Amended Complaint and Class Certification Proceedings by Christopher & Renee Jerram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint Allegations)(Craig, Christine)
July 19, 2013 Filing 372 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns: Status Conference held on 7/19/2013. In lieu of the scheduled motion hearing, the court heard the parties' report on the status of the case. The parties shall provide a further report on or before September 11, 2013. (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: For plaintiffs, Attnys Klein, Cuneo, and Costello in person, and Attnys Schaffer, Sarko, and Cappio by telephone; For defendant, Attnys Agoglia and Randall) (RGS, law2)
July 16, 2013 Filing 371 NOTICE regarding Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2013 at 2:00 PM #262 , #358 , 370 , #325 , #291 . The hearing will take place in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns as originally scheduled 344 .(Seelye, Terri)
July 8, 2013 Filing 370 NOTICE regarding Motion Hearing on #291 MOTION to Certify Class and For Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G), #258 , #262 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment and #325 MOTION to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2013 at 2:00 PM will be telephonic 344 . Lead Counsel will set up the conference call, provide the participating attorneys and the court with the call in number on or before 7/18/13. (Seelye, Terri)
July 2, 2013 Filing 369 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Peter Obstler (Now with ARNOLD & PORTER LLP, Three Embarcadero Center, 10th Floor, San Francisco CA 94111 (Obstler, Peter)
June 13, 2013 Filing 368 SEALED Defendants Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Expert Reports of Ian Ayres and Alan White, FILED UNDER SEAL (#362). (Flaherty, Elaine)
June 13, 2013 Filing 367 SEALED Exhibits 50-59 to the Declaration of Kevin Costello in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, FILED UNDER SEAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine)
June 11, 2013 Filing 366 REPLY to Response to #325 MOTION to Strike EXPERT REPORTS OF IAN AYRES AND ALAN WHITE [REDACTED - PUBLIC VERSION] filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
June 10, 2013 Filing 365 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Gretchen F. Cappio Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Sharon Hritz (Cappio, Gretchen)
June 7, 2013 Filing 364 REPLY to Response to #325 MOTION to Strike EXPERT REPORTS OF IAN AYRES AND ALAN WHITE [UNDER SEAL] filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
June 5, 2013 Filing 363 SEALED Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Doc. 292), FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine)
June 4, 2013 Filing 362 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #359 Motion for Leave to File Document ; granting in part and denying in part #360 Motion for Leave to File Document. Defendant is permitted to file a reply memorandum in support of its motion to strike. The reply shall not, however, exceed 10 pages in length, and must be limited to the topics proposed in defendant's motion for leave to file. Defendant will file a redacted version of the reply on the public docket within one week of this order. (RGS, law2)
June 3, 2013 Filing 361 Opposition re #359 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM UNDER SEAL Plaintiffs' Partial Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Cappio, Gretchen)
June 3, 2013 Filing 360 MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM UNDER SEAL #359 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
June 3, 2013 Filing 359 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM UNDER SEAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
May 31, 2013 Filing 358 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #291 MOTION to Certify Class and For Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G) (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Klein, Gary)
May 31, 2013 Filing 357 Opposition re #325 MOTION to Strike EXPERT REPORTS OF IAN AYRES AND ALAN WHITE [REDACTED-PUBLIC VERSION] filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
May 31, 2013 Filing 356 REPLY to Response to #291 MOTION to Certify Class and For Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G) [REDACTED-PUBLIC VERSION] filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
May 30, 2013 Filing 355 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits to the Declaration of Gary Klein, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine)
May 30, 2013 Filing 354 SEALED Version of Document #351, Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Class Certification, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine)
May 30, 2013 Filing 353 SEALED DOCUMENT Version of Document 350, FILED UNDER SEAL.(Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike the Expert Reports of Ayres and White) (Flaherty, Elaine)
May 24, 2013 Filing 352 DECLARATION re #350 Opposition to Motion to Strike Expert Reports and #351 REPLY in Support of Class Certification by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibits 4 - 25 (Filed Under Seal)(Klein, Gary)
May 24, 2013 Filing 351 REPLY to Response to #291 MOTION to Certify Class and For Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G) (Filed Provisionally Under Seal) filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
May 24, 2013 Filing 350 Opposition re #325 MOTION to Strike EXPERT REPORTS OF IAN AYRES AND ALAN WHITE (Filed Provisionally Under Seal) filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
May 24, 2013 Filing 349 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #348 Motion to Seal Document (RGS, law2)
May 24, 2013 Filing 348 MOTION to Seal Document (Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To File Certain Documents Temporarily Under Seal Pending Parties Meet And Confer) by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
May 23, 2013 Filing 347 Supplemental Opposition re #291 MOTION to Certify Class and For Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G) filed by EMC Mortgage LLC, In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Houghton, Leah)
May 23, 2013 Filing 346 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #320 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added McKeon. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Flaherty, Elaine)
May 23, 2013 Filing 345 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #343 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law2)
May 23, 2013 Filing 344 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on #291 MOTION to Certify Class and For Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G), #258 , #262 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment and #325 MOTION to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri)
May 23, 2013 Filing 343 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by EMC Mortgage LLC, In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC.(Houghton, Leah)
May 14, 2013 Filing 342 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #325 MOTION to Strike EXPERT REPORTS OF IAN AYRES AND ALAN WHITE. Responses due by 5/24/2013. Plaintiff reply brief in support of motion for class certification due by 5/24/13. (Flaherty, Elaine)
May 10, 2013 Filing 341 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #334 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' reply brief in support of their motion for class certification and opposition to defendants' motion to strike are due on or before May 24, 2013. Plaintiffs' reply brief shall not exceed 25 pages. (RGS, law2)
May 10, 2013 Filing 340 MOTION to Strike EXPERT REPORTS OF IAN AYRES AND ALAN WHITE REDACTED - PUBLIC VERSION by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
May 10, 2013 Filing 339 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #258 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN REDACTED - PUBLIC VERSION filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 10, 2013 Filing 338 REPLY to Response to #258 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN REDACTED - PUBLIC VERSION filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 10, 2013 Filing 337 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF REDACTED - PUBLIC VERSION filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 10, 2013 Filing 336 REPLY to Response to #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF REDACTED - PUBLIC VERSION filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 10, 2013 Filing 335 Opposition re #291 MOTION to Certify Class and For Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G) Redacted - Public Version filed by EMC Mortgage LLC, In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC. (Houghton, Leah)
May 9, 2013 Filing 334 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and Extension of Deadline to File Reply on Motion for Class Certification and Opposition to Motion to Strike Expert Reports of Ian Ayers and Alan White by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Cappio, Gretchen)
May 9, 2013 Filing 333 SEALED Chase's Reply in Support of Concise Statement of Material Facts regarding Summary Judgment Motion on Claims of Natalie Layman(Local Rule 56.1), FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine)
May 9, 2013 Filing 332 SEALED Chase's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Named Plaintiff Natalie Layman, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine)
May 9, 2013 Filing 331 SEALED Chase's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Named Plaintiffs John and Kathleen Hanf, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine)
May 9, 2013 Filing 330 SEALED Exhibits to the Declaration of Gregory P. Dresser in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Reports of Ian Ayres and Alan White, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine)
May 9, 2013 Filing 329 SEALED Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Expert Reports of Ian Ayres and Alan White, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine)
May 3, 2013 Filing 328 Opposition re #291 MOTION to Certify Class and For Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G) filed by EMC Mortgage LLC, In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Leah M. Houghton in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77, #79 Exhibit 78, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Exhibit 82, #84 Exhibit 83, #85 Exhibit 84, #86 Exhibit 85, #87 Exhibit 86, #88 Exhibit 87, #89 Exhibit 88, #90 Exhibit 89, #91 Exhibit 90, #92 Exhibit 91, #93 Exhibit 92, #94 Exhibit 93, #95 Exhibit 94, #96 Exhibit 95, #97 Exhibit 96, #98 Exhibit 97, #99 Exhibit 98, #100 Exhibit 99, #101 Exhibit 100, #102 Exhibit 101, #103 Exhibit 102, #104 Exhibit 103, #105 Exhibit 104, #106 Exhibit 105, #107 Exhibit 106, #108 Exhibit 107, #109 Exhibit 108, #110 Exhibit 109, #111 Exhibit 110, #112 Exhibit 111, #113 Exhibit 112, #114 Exhibit 113, #115 Exhibit 114, #116 Exhibit 115, #117 Exhibit 116, #118 Exhibit 117, #119 Exhibit 118, #120 Exhibit 119, #121 Exhibit 120, #122 Exhibit 121, #123 Exhibit 122, #124 Exhibit 123, #125 Exhibit 124, #126 Exhibit 125, #127 Exhibit 126, #128 Exhibit 127, #129 Exhibit 128)(Houghton, Leah)
May 3, 2013 Filing 327 AFFIDAVIT of GREGORY P. DRESSER in Support re #325 MOTION to Strike EXPERT REPORTS OF IAN AYRES AND ALAN WHITE filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 [SEALED], #5 Exhibit 5 [SEALED], #6 Exhibit 6 [SEALED], #7 Exhibit 7)(Agoglia, Michael)
May 3, 2013 Filing 326 MEMORANDUM in Support re #325 MOTION to Strike EXPERT REPORTS OF IAN AYRES AND ALAN WHITE [FILED UNDER SEAL] filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 3, 2013 Filing 325 MOTION to Strike EXPERT REPORTS OF IAN AYRES AND ALAN WHITE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
May 3, 2013 Filing 324 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #258 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN CHASE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION ON CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN - FILED UNDER SEAL filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 3, 2013 Filing 323 REPLY to Response to #258 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN FILED UNDER SEAL filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 3, 2013 Filing 322 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF CHASE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS REGARDING THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFFS JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF - FILED UNDER SEAL filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 3, 2013 Filing 321 REPLY to Response to #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF FILED UNDER SEAL filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 3, 2013 Filing 320 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jami Wintz McKeon Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4439415 by EMC Mortgage LLC, In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jami Wintz McKeon)(Houghton, Leah)
May 3, 2013 Filing 319 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah M. Houghton on behalf of EMC Mortgage LLC, In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC (Houghton, Leah)
May 3, 2013 Filing 318 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #317 Motion to Seal. Defendants shall file redacted versions of the relevant documents on the public docket within one week of this order. (RGS, law2)
May 2, 2013 Filing 317 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Memoranda and Documents Submitted in Support of its (1) Opposition to Class Certification; (2) Motions for Summary Judgment; and (3) Motion to Strike Expert Reports by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
May 2, 2013 Filing 316 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #315 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law2)
May 2, 2013 Filing 315 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
April 22, 2013 Filing 312 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #258 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN [REDACTED-PUBLIC VERSION] filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Costello, Kevin)
April 22, 2013 Filing 311 Opposition re #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF [REDACTED-PUBLIC VERSION] filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Costello, Kevin)
April 16, 2013 Filing 310 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #250 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot #254 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot #266 Motion for Summary Judgment. In light of the parties' joint stipulation for voluntary dismissal with prejudice as to the individual claims of these plaintiffs, the motions are moot. (RGS, law2)
April 15, 2013 Filing 309 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Consolidated Plaintiffs . (Costello, Kevin)
April 15, 2013 Filing 308 DECLARATION re #303 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Benjamin Winterhalter In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Natalie Layman) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exs. A-G filed provisionally under seal)(Costello, Kevin)
April 15, 2013 Filing 307 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) as to Individual Claims Only of Plaintiffs Julie Karnes and Bernard Karnes by Bernard Karnes. (Cappio, Gretchen)
April 15, 2013 Filing 306 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) as to Individual Claims Only of Plaintiffs Janet Cureton and Delano Cureton by Delano Cureton. (Cappio, Gretchen)
April 15, 2013 Filing 305 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) as to Individual Claims Only of Plaintiff Kiersten Hajnal, Fred Shourds, and Vera Shourds by Fred Shourds, Vera Shourds. (Cappio, Gretchen)
April 15, 2013 Filing 304 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #258 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN (Statement of Disputed Facts in Opposition) filed provisionally under seal filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Costello, Kevin)
April 15, 2013 Filing 303 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #258 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN Filed Provisionally Under Seal filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Costello, Kevin)
April 15, 2013 Filing 302 DECLARATION re #300 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Noah Axler In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of John and Kathleen Hanf) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exs. A-L Filed Provisionally Under Seal)(Costello, Kevin)
April 15, 2013 Filing 301 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF (Statement of Disputed Facts in Opposition) filed provisionally under seal filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Costello, Kevin)
April 15, 2013 Filing 300 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF Filed Provisionally Under Seal filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Costello, Kevin)
April 15, 2013 Filing 299 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #298 Motion to Seal Document. Plaintiffs shall file redacted versions of the memoranda on the public docket within one week of this order. (RGS, law2)
April 15, 2013 Filing 298 MOTION to Seal Document by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Costello, Kevin)
April 11, 2013 Filing 297 MEMORANDUM in Support re #291 MOTION to Certify Class and For Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G) (Redacted per [D294] Judge Stearns' Order) filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
April 8, 2013 Filing 296 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: 4/8/13 electronic order corrected because: to insert/correct dates (Flaherty, Elaine)
April 8, 2013 Filing 295 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER, entered. "Responses to Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/15/13. Replies 5/6/13. The court is not inclined to grant any further extensions."(Flaherty, Elaine) Modified on 4/8/2013 (Flaherty, Elaine).
April 8, 2013 Filing 294 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #290 Motion to Seal. The parties are directed to meet and confer for the purpose of agreeing on a redacted version of the memorandum to be filed on the public docket within one week of this order. (RGS, law2)
April 5, 2013 Filing 293 DECLARATION re #291 MOTION to Certify Class and For Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G) of Kevin Costello In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10, #2 Exhibits 11-20, #3 Exhibits 21-28 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 29, #5 Exhibits 30-37 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 38-41, #7 Exhibits 42-46 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 47, #9 Exhibit 48 (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 49, #11 Exhibits 50-116 (Filed Under Seal), #12 Exhibits 117-118, #13 Exhibits 119-125 (Filed Under Seal))(Klein, Gary)
April 5, 2013 Filing 292 MEMORANDUM in Support re #291 MOTION to Certify Class and For Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G) Filed Provisionally Under Seal filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
April 5, 2013 Filing 291 MOTION to Certify Class and For Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G) by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary) (Main Document 291 replaced on 4/8/2013) (Flaherty, Elaine).
April 5, 2013 Filing 290 MOTION to Seal (Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To File Certain Documents Temporarily Under Seal Pending Parties Meet And Confer) by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
April 5, 2013 Filing 289 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel . (Klein, Gary)
March 18, 2013 Filing 288 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion for class certification due by 4/5/2013; opposition by 5/3/13; reply 5/17/13. Status Report due by 4/5/2013 (Flaherty, Elaine)
March 18, 2013 Filing 287 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #250 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JANET AND DELANO CURETON, #258 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN, #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF, #254 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS KIERSTEN HAJNAL, FRED JEFFREY SHOURDS, AND VERA KAREN SHOURDS, #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JULIE AND BERNARD KARNES. Responses due by 4/8/2013 (Flaherty, Elaine)
March 18, 2013 Filing 286 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #285 Motion to Abate Pending Deadlines for Three Weeks. The parties' request to abate the pending deadlines for three weeks is granted. Accordingly, plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification is due by April 5, 2013; defendants' opposition to that motion is due by May 3, 2013; and plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due by May 17, 2013. Further, plaintiffs' oppositions to the various motions for summary judgment filed by defendants on February 21, 2013 are due by April 8, 2013. The parties will report to the court on or before April 5, 2013 regarding the status of this matter and to propose a revised case management schedule. (RGS, law2)
March 15, 2013 Filing 285 Joint MOTION to Abate Pending Deadlines for Three Weeks by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
March 8, 2013 Filing 284 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #283 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification is due on March 15, 2013; defendants' opposition is due on April 12, 2013; and plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due on April 26, 2013. (RGS, law2)
March 8, 2013 Filing 283 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time on Class Certification Briefing Schedule by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Cappio, Gretchen)
March 1, 2013 Filing 282 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #281 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification is due on March 8, 2013; defendants' opposition is due on April 5, 2013; and plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due on April 19, 2013. (RGS, law2)
March 1, 2013 Filing 281 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time On Class Certification Briefing Schedule by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Cappio, Gretchen)
February 21, 2013 Filing 280 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JULIE AND BERNARD KARNES Redacted - Public Version filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 21, 2013 Filing 279 MEMORANDUM in Support re #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JULIE AND BERNARD KARNES Redacted - Public Version filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 21, 2013 Filing 278 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #258 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN Redacted - Public Version filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 21, 2013 Filing 277 MEMORANDUM in Support re #258 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN Redacted - Public Version filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 21, 2013 Filing 276 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF Redacted - Public Version filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 21, 2013 Filing 275 MEMORANDUM in Support re #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF Redacted - Public Version filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 21, 2013 Filing 274 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #254 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS KIERSTEN HAJNAL, FRED JEFFREY SHOURDS, AND VERA KAREN SHOURDS Redacted - Public Version filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 21, 2013 Filing 273 MEMORANDUM in Support re #254 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS KIERSTEN HAJNAL, FRED JEFFREY SHOURDS, AND VERA KAREN SHOURDS Redacted - Public Version filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 21, 2013 Filing 272 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #250 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JANET AND DELANO CURETON Redacted - Public Version filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 21, 2013 Filing 271 MEMORANDUM in Support re #250 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JANET AND DELANO CURETON Redacted - Public Version filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 19, 2013 Filing 270 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #249 Motion to Seal. Chase's motion to seal is granted with respect to exhibits to its motions for summary judgment. With respect to Chase's memoranda in support of its motions for summary judgment, however, the motion is denied as overly broad in light of the public's presumptive right of access to judicial documents. To the extent that the memoranda discuss in detail material designated confidential pursuant to the protective order, counsel are directed to meet and confer to determine appropriate redactions. Chase shall then file the redacted documents on the public docket while submitting the unredacted versions under seal. (RGS, law2)
February 15, 2013 Filing 269 AFFIDAVIT of BARBARA BARATH in Support re #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JULIE AND BERNARD KARNES filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 268 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JULIE AND BERNARD KARNES filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 267 MEMORANDUM in Support re #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JULIE AND BERNARD KARNES filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 266 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JULIE AND BERNARD KARNES by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 265 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 264 AFFIDAVIT of BARBARA BARATH in Support re #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 263 MEMORANDUM in Support re #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 262 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF JOHN AND KATHLEEN HANF by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 261 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #258 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 260 AFFIDAVIT of BARBARA BARATH in Support re #258 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 259 MEMORANDUM in Support re #258 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 258 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFF NATALIE LAYMAN by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 257 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #254 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS KIERSTEN HAJNAL, FRED JEFFREY SHOURDS, AND VERA KAREN SHOURDS filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 256 AFFIDAVIT of BARBARA BARATH in Support re #254 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS KIERSTEN HAJNAL, FRED JEFFREY SHOURDS, AND VERA KAREN SHOURDS filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 255 MEMORANDUM in Support re #254 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS KIERSTEN HAJNAL, FRED JEFFREY SHOURDS, AND VERA KAREN SHOURDS filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS KIERSTEN HAJNAL, FRED JEFFREY SHOURDS, AND VERA KAREN SHOURDS by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 253 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #250 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JANET AND DELANO CURETON filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 252 AFFIDAVIT of BARBARA BARATH in Support re #250 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JANET AND DELANO CURETON filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 251 MEMORANDUM in Support re #250 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JANET AND DELANO CURETON filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 250 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JANET AND DELANO CURETON by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 249 MOTION to Seal CHASE'S MEMORANDA AND DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF CHASE'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
February 15, 2013 Filing 248 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #233 Motion for Sanctions. Chase is ordered to produce within 7 days of this order all emails for which the agreed upon queries have returned fewer than 10,000 hits. The parties are ordered to meet and confer in an attempt to modify the remaining queries. Failing an agreement that returns fewer than 10,000 hits per query, the court will consider a mechanism for cost sharing. The court declines at this time to impose sanctions but reserves the right to do so should Chase continue to exhibit noncompliance with its discovery obligations. (RGS, law2)
February 6, 2013 Filing 245 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #236 Motion to Seal Document (RGS, law2)
February 5, 2013 Filing 244 AFFIDAVIT of Michael A. Varzally in Opposition re #233 MOTION for Sanctions filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 5, 2013 Filing 243 AFFIDAVIT of Derek A. Krabill in Opposition re #233 MOTION for Sanctions filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 5, 2013 Filing 242 AFFIDAVIT of Alexandria A. Amezcua in Opposition re #233 MOTION for Sanctions Declaration of Alexandria A. Amezcua in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12 (Filed Under Seal), #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20 (Filed Under Seal), #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(Agoglia, Michael)
February 5, 2013 Filing 241 Opposition re #233 MOTION for Sanctions Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions (Filed Under Seal) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
February 5, 2013 Filing 240 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #239 Motion to Seal Document (RGS, law2)
February 5, 2013 Filing 239 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Motion to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions and Documents Submitted in Support of Opposition by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
February 5, 2013 Filing 238 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #237 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law2)
February 5, 2013 Filing 237 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
January 24, 2013 Filing 236 MOTION to Seal Document #235 Declaration,, Exhibits D, G, P, and Q to Declaration of Gary Klein in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
January 24, 2013 Filing 235 DECLARATION re #234 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Sanctions by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit D [filed under seal], #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G [filed under seal], #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit P [filed under seal], #16 Exhibit Q [filed under seal], #17 Exhibit R)(Klein, Gary)
January 24, 2013 Filing 234 MEMORANDUM in Support re #233 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
January 24, 2013 Filing 233 MOTION for Sanctions by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
January 16, 2013 Filing 232 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #231 Motion for Modification. Chase's rebuttal expert disclosures are due on or before 2/1/13. Expert discovery closes on 2/15/13, with the exception of the deposition of the rebuttal expert, which the parties represent is scheduled to take place on 2/20/13. The class certification briefing schedule is unmodified. (RGS, law2)
January 15, 2013 Filing 231 Assented to MOTION to Modify Expert Discovery Schedule by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
December 28, 2012 Filing 230 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The court has reviewed in camera the documents selected by plaintiffs and submitted by Chase pursuant to the court's order of November 27, 2012. The parties represent that in the process of preparing this submission, Chase identified inadvertent redactions of potentially relevant audit findings and has since re-produced these documents to plaintiffs with corrected redactions. The court appreciates that Chase has taken seriously its obligation to do so. Erring on the side of full disclosure, Chase shall also release line entries containing references to HAMP in the following documents: CHASE_MDL LIT_00267327-02267329 (Tab 8), CHASE_MDL LIT 02268169 (Tab 9), and CHASE_MDL LIT 00266784-00266812 (Tab 11). The court further orders the release of items similar to those herein ordered released, if any, found in the remaining audit documents. (RGS, law2)
December 19, 2012 Filing 229 Errata by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to #222 Answer to Complaint . (Agoglia, Michael)
December 19, 2012 Filing 228 SEALED Supplemental Expert Reports, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: #1 report two)(Flaherty, Elaine)
December 17, 2012 Filing 227 NOTICE by Consolidated Plaintiffs re #157 Notice (Other) of Lodging of Supplemental Expert Reports (Klein, Gary)
December 14, 2012 Filing 226 Response by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to #223 Objection to Plaintiffs Response to In Camera Submission of Redacted Audit Documents. (Agoglia, Michael)
December 14, 2012 Filing 225 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #206 Motion to Compel. Defendants are ordered to produce the WEBer "notes" data for a random sample of 500 of the 1,500 complete complaint files it has agreed to produce and to do so by the previously scheduled January 15, 2013 production date. The court notes that in the spirit of cooperative discovery, it would expect Chase to be more forthcoming regarding records as to which only it has knowledge. (RGS, law2)
December 14, 2012 Filing 224 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #213 Motion for Extension of Time "In light of the parties' submissions, the Court will extend certain case management deadlines, as follows: Defendant's rebuttal expert disclosures due 1/25/13; expert discovery closes 2/8/13; motion for class certification due 3/1/13; opposition due 3/29/13; reply in support of motion for class certification due 4/12/13." (Flaherty, Elaine)
December 13, 2012 Filing 223 Objection by Consolidated Plaintiffs to Defendant's In Camera Submission of Redacted Audit Documents. (Klein, Gary)
December 13, 2012 Filing 222 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., EMC Mortgage LLC, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC.(Agoglia, Michael) Modified on 1/9/2013 to correct filers. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia).
December 13, 2012 Filing 221 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS et al.(Scalfani, Deborah)
December 13, 2012 Filing 220 Transcript of Motion to Compel Hearing held on November 26, 2012, before Judge Richard G. Stearns. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com Redaction Request due 1/3/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2013. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS et al.(Scalfani, Deborah)
December 12, 2012 Filing 219 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #215 Motion to Seal (RGS, law2)
December 11, 2012 Filing 218 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #213 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 15, 2013 to Extend Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
December 11, 2012 Filing 217 DECLARATION re #216 Opposition to Motion [Declaration of Alexandria A. Amezcua] to Compel WebER Notes by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Agoglia, Michael)
December 11, 2012 Filing 216 Opposition re #206 MOTION to Compel Production of WEBer "Notes" Data For Each Of The 1,500 Complete Complaint Files Chase Has Agreed To Produce filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
December 11, 2012 Filing 215 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel WebER Notes and Documents Submitted in Support of Opposition by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
December 10, 2012 Filing 214 MEMORANDUM in Support re #213 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 15, 2013 to Extend Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
December 10, 2012 Filing 213 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 15, 2013 to Extend Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
December 7, 2012 Filing 211 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #209 Motion to Seal Document (RGS, law2)
December 6, 2012 Filing 210 AFFIDAVIT of Alan White in Support re #206 MOTION to Compel Production of WEBer "Notes" Data For Each Of The 1,500 Complete Complaint Files Chase Has Agreed To Produce filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Obrist, Gretchen)
December 6, 2012 Filing 209 MOTION to Seal Document #207 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #208 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Obrist, Gretchen)
December 6, 2012 Filing 208 AFFIDAVIT of Gretchen S. Obrist and Christopher M. Ellis in Support re #206 MOTION to Compel Production of WEBer "Notes" Data For Each Of The 1,500 Complete Complaint Files Chase Has Agreed To Produce filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Obrist, Gretchen)
December 6, 2012 Filing 207 MEMORANDUM in Support re #206 MOTION to Compel Production of WEBer "Notes" Data For Each Of The 1,500 Complete Complaint Files Chase Has Agreed To Produce filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Obrist, Gretchen)
December 6, 2012 Filing 206 MOTION to Compel Production of WEBer "Notes" Data For Each Of The 1,500 Complete Complaint Files Chase Has Agreed To Produce by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Obrist, Gretchen)
November 27, 2012 Filing 205 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #178 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #183 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (RGS, law2)
November 19, 2012 Filing 203 REPLY to Response to #178 MOTION to Compel (Oral Argument Requested) filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Klein, Gary)
November 19, 2012 Filing 202 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on #178 MOTION to Compel and #183 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to December 19, 2012 to Complete Discovery and To December 12, 2012 to Supplement Expert Disclosures : Motion Hearing set for 11/26/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri)
November 19, 2012 Filing 201 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #200 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law2)
November 16, 2012 Filing 204 SEALED Exhibits to Declaration of G. Dresser in opposition to plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine)
November 16, 2012 Filing 200 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Compel by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1 to Reply Memorandum)(Klein, Gary)
November 16, 2012 Filing 199 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #197 Motion to Seal Document (RGS, law2)
November 16, 2012 Filing 198 Opposition re #183 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to December 19, 2012 to Complete Discovery and To December 12, 2012 to Supplement Expert Disclosures filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
November 16, 2012 Filing 197 MOTION to Seal Document #196 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,, (Exhibits 2, 7, 10, 17, 29-32, and 35 to the Declaration of Gregory P. Dresser) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
November 16, 2012 Filing 196 AFFIDAVIT of Gregory Dresser in Opposition re #178 MOTION to Compel (Oral Argument Requested) filed by In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit)(Agoglia, Michael)
November 16, 2012 Filing 195 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Varzally in Opposition re #178 MOTION to Compel (Oral Argument Requested) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
November 16, 2012 Filing 194 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #178 MOTION to Compel (Oral Argument Requested) (Declaration of Rita Lin in Support of Defendants' Opposition) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
November 16, 2012 Filing 193 Opposition re #178 MOTION to Compel (Oral Argument Requested) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
November 13, 2012 Filing 192 SEALED DOCUMENT: Declaration of Gary Klein in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 2-5, #2 Exhibits 8-14)(Seelye, Terri)
November 13, 2012 Filing 191 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered temporarily granting #183 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The court will stay plaintiffs' deadlines for supplementing expert reports and completing fact and class certification discovery pending defendant's responses to plaintiffs' pending motions for an extension of certain deadlines and to compel. (RGS, law2)
November 13, 2012 Filing 190 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #176 Motion for Protective Order. Defendants motion for a protective order precluding the deposition of William Becker is granted. See, e.g., Objective Interface Sys., Inc. v. Vertel Corp., 2006 WL 1361227, at *1 (D. Mass. May 16, 2006) (granting motion to quash subpoena on grounds that discovery deadline ha[d] passed, no one asked for an extension, and the parties should not presume to amend court orders on their own). The court emphasizes that it expressly declined to adopt the bifurcated discovery plan plaintiffs cite as justification for their untimely deposition notice. See Dkt. # 22. (RGS, law2) Modified on 11/13/2012 (RGS, law2).
November 13, 2012 Filing 189 REPLY to Response to #176 MOTION for Protective Order filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
November 13, 2012 Filing 188 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #186 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law2)
November 13, 2012 Filing 187 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #180 Motion to Seal Document (RGS, law2)
November 12, 2012 Filing 186 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Reply)(Agoglia, Michael)
November 12, 2012 Filing 185 DECLARATION re #183 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to December 19, 2012 to Complete Discovery and To December 12, 2012 to Supplement Expert Disclosures of Alan White by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
November 12, 2012 Filing 184 DECLARATION re #183 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to December 19, 2012 to Complete Discovery and To December 12, 2012 to Supplement Expert Disclosures of Ian Ayres by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
November 12, 2012 Filing 183 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to December 19, 2012 to Complete Discovery and To December 12, 2012 to Supplement Expert Disclosures by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
November 12, 2012 Filing 182 Opposition re #176 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Costello, Kevin)
November 9, 2012 Filing 181 DECLARATION re #178 MOTION to Compel (Oral Argument Requested) (leave to file under seal pending) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-5 (leave to file under seal pending), #3 Exhibit 6 - Part 1, #4 Exhibit 6 - Part 2, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8-14 (leave to file under seal pending))(Klein, Gary)
November 9, 2012 Filing 180 MOTION to Seal Document Declaration of Gary Klein in Support of Motion to Compel by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
November 9, 2012 Filing 179 MEMORANDUM in Support re #178 MOTION to Compel (Oral Argument Requested) filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
November 9, 2012 Filing 178 MOTION to Compel (Oral Argument Requested) by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
November 9, 2012 Filing 177 DECLARATION re #176 MOTION for Protective Order [Declaration of Gregory P. Dresser] by In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Agoglia, Michael)
November 9, 2012 Filing 176 MOTION for Protective Order by In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation.(Agoglia, Michael)
October 31, 2012 Filing 175 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #168 Motion for Extension of Time "Persuaded that defendant's delay was not motivated by bad faith and, in light of the court's ruling on Docket #173, will not prejudice plaintiffs, the court grants defendant's motion for an extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' first set of interrogatories. See, e.g., McKissick v. Three Deer Ass'n Ltd. P'ship, 265 F.R.D. 55,57 (D. Conn. 2010). Defendant will serve its responses and objections forthwith." (Flaherty, Elaine)
October 31, 2012 Filing 174 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #173 Motion for Extension of Time for plaintiffs to supplement their expert reports to 11/12/12 and extend the discovery deadlines for plaintiffs' facts and for class certification to 11/19/12 only for purpose of completing the production of documents already agreed upon and ordered. Defendants may file its rebuttal expert report by 1/7/13 and complete their expert discovery for class certification by 1/25/13. (Flaherty, Elaine)
October 29, 2012 Filing 173 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time of Certain Case Management Deadlines by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Costello, Kevin)
October 29, 2012 Filing 172 REPLY to Response to #168 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 26, 2012 to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
October 29, 2012 Filing 171 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #170 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law2)
October 29, 2012 Filing 170 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Reply in Support Defendant's Motion for Extention of Time to Respond to Interrogatories)(Agoglia, Michael)
October 26, 2012 Filing 169 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #168 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 26, 2012 to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Cappio, Gretchen)
October 26, 2012 Filing 168 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 26, 2012 to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration in Support of Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories)(Agoglia, Michael)
October 10, 2012 Filing 167 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #165 Motion for Joinder. (RGS, law2)
October 9, 2012 Filing 166 MEMORANDUM in Support re #165 Second MOTION for Joinder of Additional Parties Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Cappio, Gretchen)
October 9, 2012 Filing 165 Second MOTION for Joinder of Additional Parties Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Cappio, Gretchen)
October 9, 2012 Filing 164 SEALED Memorandum of Plaintiff in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Errata Sheet of Gregory Johnson, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine)
October 5, 2012 Filing 161 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #155 Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs' motion to strike portions of the errata sheet of Gregory Johnson is denied, provided, however, that both the deponent's original answers and the changes to his transcript shall remain a part of the record. See, e.g., Reilly v. TXU Corp., 230 F.R.D. 486, 489 (N.D. Tex. 2005) (noting that a reading of Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(e) that permits changes to the substance of a deposition "has been characterized as the traditional or majority view"). (RGS, law2)
October 2, 2012 Filing 160 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #147 Motion for Joinder. The court grants plaintiffs' request to add as parties the eight individuals listed in its motion. Furthermore, the court has treated defendants' response as a motion to order the addition of Bryan Ellis and Scott Keller as parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 19 (or, in the alternative, to require dismissal of Christine Ellis and Amy Keller) and hereby grants that request. As grounds therefor, the court notes that Mr. Ellis remains a co-borrower on the governing note and Mr. Keller, though not a signatory to the note, enjoys by virtue of New Jersey law a right to joint possession of the marital residence, see N.J. Stat. Ann. 3B:28-3, which could be impaired depending on the relief ordered by this court or the originating court. Plaintiffs will comply with this order within seven (7) days and will also provide a complete production of documents of these individuals consistent with previously served discovery and make them available for deposition prior to the discovery cut-off date. (RGS, law2)
October 2, 2012 Filing 159 SEALED Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of Errata Sheet of Gregory Johnson, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine)
October 1, 2012 Filing 158 Opposition re #155 MOTION to Strike Portions of Errata Sheet of Gregory Johnson filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Agoglia, Michael)
September 28, 2012 Filing 157 NOTICE by Consolidated Plaintiffs of Lodging of Expert Reports (Klein, Gary)
September 27, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #154 Motion to Seal Document (RGS, law2)
September 27, 2012 Filing 156 MEMORANDUM in Support re #155 MOTION to Strike Portions of Errata Sheet of Gregory Johnson (Memorandum Filed Under Seal) filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Klein, Gary)
September 27, 2012 Filing 155 MOTION to Strike Portions of Errata Sheet of Gregory Johnson by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
September 27, 2012 Filing 154 MOTION to Seal Document (Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of Errata Sheet of Gregory Johnson) by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
September 24, 2012 Filing 153 AFFIDAVIT of Gretchen Freeman Cappio in Support re #147 MOTION for Joinder of Additional Parties Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cappio, Gretchen)
September 24, 2012 Filing 152 REPLY to Response to #147 MOTION for Joinder of Additional Parties Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Cappio, Gretchen)
September 24, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #151 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law2)
September 24, 2012 Filing 151 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Add Parties by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Cappio, Gretchen)
September 24, 2012 Filing 150 RESPONSE to Motion re #147 MOTION for Joinder of Additional Parties Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
September 21, 2012 Filing 149 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #114 Motion to Compel (RGS, law2)
September 20, 2012 Filing 147 MOTION for Joinder of Additional Parties Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Cappio, Gretchen)
September 20, 2012 Filing 146 DECLARATION re #114 MOTION to Compel (Supplemental Declaration of Gary Klein in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Klein, Gary)
September 20, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #145 Motion to Seal Document (RGS, law2)
September 20, 2012 Filing 145 MOTION to Seal Document #114 MOTION to Compel (Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel and Exhibits A-C and E-I to Supplemental Declaration of Gary Klein)) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 [Filed Under Seal], #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Klein, Gary)
September 20, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #144 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law2)
September 20, 2012 Filing 144 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 ATTACHMENT 1 [Filed Under Seal])(Klein, Gary)
September 19, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #136 Motion to Seal Document (RGS, law2)
September 19, 2012 Filing 143 DECLARATION re #137 Opposition to Motion Declaration of Margaret Dolson by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
September 19, 2012 Filing 142 DECLARATION re #137 Opposition to Motion Declaration of Matthew Short by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
September 19, 2012 Filing 141 DECLARATION re #137 Opposition to Motion Declaration of Andrew Bartz by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
September 19, 2012 Filing 140 DECLARATION re #137 Opposition to Motion Declaration of Karen M. Shine by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
September 19, 2012 Filing 139 DECLARATION re #137 Opposition to Motion Declaration of Gregory P. Dresser in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Exhibits) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit 17, #3 Exhibit 18, #4 Exhibit 19, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 22, #8 Exhibit 23, #9 Exhibit 24, #10 Exhibit 25, #11 Exhibit 26, #12 Exhibit 27, #13 Exhibit 28, #14 Exhibit 29, #15 Exhibit 30, #16 Exhibit 31, #17 Exhibit 32)(Agoglia, Michael)
September 19, 2012 Filing 138 DECLARATION re #137 Opposition to Motion Declaration of Gregory P. Dresser in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Agoglia, Michael)
September 19, 2012 Filing 137 Opposition re #114 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
September 19, 2012 Filing 136 MOTION to Seal Document #114 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Seal Documents Submitted in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
September 18, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #132 Motion for Clarification. The court's order of August 23, 2012, speaks for itself in terms of the scope of the deposition that the court will permit. To the extent that plaintiffs maintain that previously undisclosed HAMP-related documents merit examination, plaintiffs will produce the relevant documents to defendants within five days of this order. Plaintiffs are permitted six hours during which to depose the witness. Plaintiffs will continue to comply to the extent possible with the September 28, 2012, deadline for submitting expert reports and are provisionally permitted to supplement those reports as needed prior to October 29, 2012. Plaintiffs' request for appointment of a special master is denied. (RGS, law2)
September 18, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #135 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law2)
September 18, 2012 Filing 135 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
September 18, 2012 Filing 134 RESPONSE to Motion re #132 Emergency MOTION for Clarification re Order on Motion to Compel,, (Clarification of Scope of August 23, 2012 Order Governing Catherine Fetner Deposition) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit M. Agoglia, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Agoglia, Michael)
September 18, 2012 Filing 133 NOTICE by Consolidated Plaintiffs re #132 Emergency MOTION for Clarification re Order on Motion to Compel,, (Clarification of Scope of August 23, 2012 Order Governing Catherine Fetner Deposition) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Flannery, Michael)
September 17, 2012 Filing 132 Emergency MOTION for Clarification re Order on Motion to Compel,, (Clarification of Scope of August 23, 2012 Order Governing Catherine Fetner Deposition) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Klein, Gary)
September 17, 2012 Filing 131 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #99 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added McDevitt. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Flaherty, Elaine)
September 17, 2012 Filing 130 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #123 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kelly. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Flaherty, Elaine)
September 14, 2012 Filing 129 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. re #127 MOTION to Dismiss Class Claims of Plaintiff Jean Wilcox Without Prejudice and Request for Suggestion of Remand of Individual Claims by Plaintiff Jean Wilcox filed by Jean C Wilcox. Recommendation entered. (RGS, law3) (Main Document 129 replaced on 9/17/2012) (Seelye, Terri).
September 14, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #127 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice and suggestion of remand. (RGS, law3)
September 14, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #124 Motion for Modification. As plaintiffs' expert states in his declaration (par. 18) that he can generally apply his methodologies to Chase even without seeing Chase's data, plaintiffs' will comply with the September 28, 2012, deadline to the extent possible. With respect to discovery that Chase has yet to produce, and is the subject of plaintiffs' pending motion to compel, plaintiffs' expert is provisionally permitted to supplement his report as needed prior to October 29, 2012, (subject to plaintiffs' pending motion to compel). (RGS, law3)
September 13, 2012 Filing 128 Opposition re #124 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order With Respect to Expert Disclosure Deadline filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
September 13, 2012 Filing 127 MOTION to Dismiss Class Claims of Plaintiff Jean Wilcox Without Prejudice and Request for Suggestion of Remand of Individual Claims by Plaintiff Jean Wilcox by Jean C Wilcox.(Klein, Gary)
September 13, 2012 Filing 126 NOTICE by Consolidated Plaintiffs re #124 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order With Respect to Expert Disclosure Deadline (Notice of Filing Supplemental Declaration of Ian Ayres) (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Klein, Gary)
September 12, 2012 Filing 125 MEMORANDUM in Support re #124 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order With Respect to Expert Disclosure Deadline filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
September 12, 2012 Filing 124 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order With Respect to Expert Disclosure Deadline by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
September 12, 2012 Filing 123 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jennifer E. Kelly Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4111051 by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Warren, Alexandra)
September 7, 2012 Filing 122 ELECTRONIC NOTICE CANCELING the Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2012 re: #114 MOTION to Compel. (Seelye, Terri)
September 7, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #120 Motion for Hearing. Defendant's opposition to plaintiffs' motion to compel will be filed with the court no later than 12:00 P.M. on September 19, 2012. Plaintiffs' reply, if any, will be filed with the court no later than close-of-business on September 20, 2012. The court will then rule on the papers. At this time, the court sees no reason to adjourn the September 28, 2012, discovery deadline. (RGS, law3)
September 6, 2012 Filing 121 Opposition re #120 MOTION for Hearing Defendants' Motion to Reschedule Hearing Date filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
September 6, 2012 Filing 120 MOTION for Hearing Defendants' Motion to Reschedule Hearing Date by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
September 6, 2012 Filing 119 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on #114 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri)
September 5, 2012 Filing 118 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Consolidated Plaintiffs re #114 MOTION to Compel (Filed Under Seal: Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel and Exhibits to Declaration of Gary Klein in Support of Motion to Compel). (Costello, Kevin)
September 5, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #115 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #117 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law3)
September 4, 2012 Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Memorandum in Support of #114 Motion to Compel) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Compel)(Klein, Gary)
September 4, 2012 Filing 116 DECLARATION re #114 MOTION to Compel by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibits C-G (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibits J-Q (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit R, #8 Exhibits S-W (Filed Under Seal))(Klein, Gary)
September 4, 2012 Filing 115 MOTION to Seal Document #114 MOTION to Compel (Memorandum In Support and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of G. Klein) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A to Klein Decl. (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exs. C-G to Klein Decl. (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exs. J-Q to Klein Decl. (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exs. S-W to Klein Decl. (Filed Under Seal), #5 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Compel (Filed Under Seal)l)(Klein, Gary)
September 4, 2012 Filing 114 MOTION to Compel by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum (Filed Under Seal))(Klein, Gary)
August 23, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #105 Motion to Compel. While plaintiffs may not revisit matters that have been the subject of testimony at the prior deposition, the court understands that questions of a comparative nature related to HAMP are unavoidable. Defendants will produce Ms. Fetner (or a substitute) for deposition as to the eight (8) topics about which defendants concede that Ms. Fetner was prepared to testify. See Defs.' Opp'n to Mot. to Compel at 11-12. No costs are assessed. (RGS, law3)
August 23, 2012 Filing 113 SEALED Exhibit 2 and 3 to Declaration of Michael J. Agoglia in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Testimony Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 30(B)(6), FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine)
August 23, 2012 Filing 112 SEALED Exhibits D and E in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Testimony, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine)
August 23, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #111 Motion to Seal (RGS, law3)
August 22, 2012 Filing 111 MOTION to Seal Documents Submitted In Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
August 22, 2012 Filing 110 DECLARATION re #108 Opposition to Motion To Compel Testimony Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) (Declaration of Gregory P. Dresser) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Agoglia, Michael)
August 22, 2012 Filing 109 DECLARATION re #108 Opposition to Motion to Compel Testimony Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Agoglia, Michael)
August 22, 2012 Filing 108 Opposition re #105 MOTION to Compel Testimony Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
August 20, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #107 Motion to Seal (RGS, law3)
August 20, 2012 Filing 107 MOTION to Seal Exhibits D and E to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Testimony Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
August 20, 2012 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM in Support re #105 MOTION to Compel Testimony Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Klein, Gary)
August 20, 2012 Filing 105 MOTION to Compel Testimony Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
August 15, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered on NEW SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Opening Disclosure Of Experts For Class Cert.: 09/28/12. Close Of Fact Discovery Regarding NamedPlaintiffs Modification Transactions And Class Certification: 11/02/12. Disclosure Of Rebuttal Experts For Class Certification: 11/09/12. Close Of Expert Discovery For Class Certification: 1/04/13. SJ Motion/Class Certification Motion: 2/15/13. Opp To SJ/Opp To Class Cert: 3/18/13. Reply to SJ/Class Cert.: 4/1/13. (RGS, law3)
August 10, 2012 Filing 104 DECLARATION re #102 Notice (Other) Joint Declaration of Gretchen Freeman Cappio and Eric D. Holland in Support of Plaintiffs' Position on Discovery Deadlines and Case Scheduling by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Klein, Gary)
August 10, 2012 Filing 103 STATEMENT OF COUNSEL of CHASE SCHEDULING STATEMENT by In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Agoglia, Michael)
August 10, 2012 Filing 102 NOTICE by Consolidated Plaintiffs of Filing (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Position on Discovery Deadlines and Case Scheduling)(Klein, Gary)
August 10, 2012 Filing 101 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Consolidated Plaintiffs (Cappio, Gretchen)
August 6, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #100 Motion for Extension of Time to File joint proposed revised case scheduling order to August 10, 2012. (RGS, law3)
August 6, 2012 Filing 100 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/10/12 to File Joint Proposed Revised Scheduling Order by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Cappio, Gretchen)
August 2, 2012 Filing 99 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ryan P. McDevitt Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4055976 by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ryan P. McDevitt)(Costello, Kevin)
July 31, 2012 Filing 98 STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Claims of the Senter Action by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
July 27, 2012 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: 7/27/12 order corrected because: to replace correct order (Flaherty, Elaine)
July 27, 2012 Filing 97 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #41 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (RGS, law3) (Main Document 97 replaced on 7/27/2012) (Flaherty, Elaine).
July 26, 2012 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 26, 2012 Filing 96 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on July 12, 2012, before Judge Richard G. Stearns. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com Redaction Request due 8/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2012. (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 20, 2012 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Flannery on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Flannery, Michael)
July 20, 2012 Filing 94 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Agoglia, Michael)
July 20, 2012 Filing 93 Opposition re #92 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
July 20, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #92 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law3)
July 19, 2012 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Agoglia, Michael)
July 19, 2012 Filing 91 NOTICE by Consolidated Plaintiffs of Filing Document: OCC Financial Remediation Framework "Frequently Asked Questions" (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1)(Klein, Gary)
July 13, 2012 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns: Hearing re motion to dismiss held on 7/12/2012. Atty Klein is permitted to submit a draft order nisi with respect to dismissal of Mr. Franco's claims. The court confirms that pending discovery deadlines remain suspended until the court issues its ruling on the motion. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: for plaintiffs, Kevin Costello, Gary Klein, and Gretchen Cappio; for defendant, Michael Agoglia, Wendy Garbers, and Angela Kleine) (RGS, law3)
July 13, 2012 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy M. Garbers on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Garbers, Wendy)
July 9, 2012 Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT of Kevin Costello for the Purpose of Submitting Supplemental Authority in Opposition re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Costello, Kevin)
July 9, 2012 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting, due to a court conflict, Hearing on #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing RESET for 7/12/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. Given the size of defense counsel's firm, the court is confident that suitable counsel can be sent to argue the motion. (Seelye, Terri)
July 5, 2012 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing RESET for 7/13/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri)
June 4, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #88 Motion for Hearing. The court declines to schedule a status conference prior to the July 9, 2012, hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss, as the issues raised in plaintiffs' motion for a status conference do not impact the July 9, 2012, hearing. The court will, however, suspend all discovery cut-off deadlines until after the July 9, 2012, motion hearing, so long as the parties continue discovery in good faith. (RGS, law3)
June 4, 2012 Filing 88 MOTION for Hearing and for Suspension of Case Management Deadlines Pending Hearing and [Proposed] Order by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Costello, Kevin)
June 1, 2012 Filing 87 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #74 Motion to Compel (RGS, law3)
May 30, 2012 Filing 86 DECLARATION re #80 Opposition to Motion DECLARATION OF RITA F. LIN IN SUPPORT OF CHASE'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Agoglia, Michael)
May 30, 2012 Filing 85 DECLARATION re #80 Opposition to Motion DECLARATION OF GREGORY S. JOHNSON by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 30, 2012 Filing 84 DECLARATION re #80 Opposition to Motion DECLARATION OF MARGARET DOLSON by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 30, 2012 Filing 83 DECLARATION re #80 Opposition to Motion DECLARATION OF MATTHEW B. SHORT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 30, 2012 Filing 82 DECLARATION re #80 Opposition to Motion DECLARATION OF MIRIAM DE LA CRUZ by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 30, 2012 Filing 81 DECLARATION re #80 Opposition to Motion DECLARATION OF JULIE A. CAIN by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 30, 2012 Filing 80 Opposition re #74 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 29, 2012 Filing 79 SEALED Affidavit of Cappio in support of motion to compel, FILED UNDER SEAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine) Modified on 5/29/2012 (Flaherty, Elaine).
May 24, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #78 Motion to Seal (RGS, law3)
May 24, 2012 Filing 78 MOTION to Seal and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Cappio, Gretchen)
May 24, 2012 Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT of Kevin Costello in Support re #74 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Cappio, Gretchen)
May 24, 2012 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT of Gretchen Freeman Cappio in Support re #74 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Cappio, Gretchen)
May 24, 2012 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM in Support re #74 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Cappio, Gretchen)
May 24, 2012 Filing 74 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Cappio, Gretchen)
May 17, 2012 Filing 73 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Jonathan W. Cuneo of Preetpal Grewal (Cuneo, Jonathan)
May 16, 2012 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by AMY E. KELLER, Scott Keller re #71 Notice of Appearance . (Carroll, Katrina)
May 16, 2012 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Katrina Carroll on behalf of Scott Keller, AMY E. KELLER (Carroll, Katrina)
May 15, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #68 Motion to Compel. The motion to compel is granted subject to the conditions in this court's Order re: plaintiffs' motion for a protective order issued on May 15, 2012. (RGS, law3)
May 15, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #63 Motion for Protective Order. All interrogatories are permitted except # 3, 7, 13, 33, and 35. The following interrogatories are permitted, with changes. #9 - the phrase "relating to the mortgage modification" shall be inserted between "any of the defendants," and "including." #14- the phrase "government or bank originated" shall be inserted between the wording "Please produce all" and "documents" AND the sentence shall end after the phrase "under HAMP or any other modification program." The phrase "Loss Mitigation Period," in the context of these interrogatories, shall be defined as the three month period prior to the alleged default up to the time of eviction (if applicable). (RGS, law3)
May 14, 2012 Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT of RITA F. LIN in Support re #68 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Agoglia, Michael)
May 14, 2012 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Support re #68 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 14, 2012 Filing 68 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
May 14, 2012 Filing 67 Opposition re #59 MOTION for Protective Order DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 14, 2012 Filing 66 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re Order, DEFENDANTS' DEFINITION OF "LOSS MITIGATION PERIOD" PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S MAY 10, 2012 ORDER. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 10, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The court cannot rule on plaintiff's motion for a protective order (Dkt # 63) until defendant provides the court with their definition of the term "Loss Mitigation Period." Defendant is to provide the court with this information no later than close of business on May 14, 2012. (RGS, law3)
May 10, 2012 Filing 65 DECLARATION re #64 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #63 MOTION for Protective Order of Eric D. Holland by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B - April 23, 2012 email)(Holland, Eric)
May 10, 2012 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Support re #63 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RFP to Burkholder)(Holland, Eric)
May 10, 2012 Filing 63 MOTION for Protective Order by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Holland, Eric)
May 4, 2012 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Reply in Support of Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 4, 2012 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation. (Agoglia, Michael)
May 4, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #59 Motion for Protective Order. Defendant may not depose the seven non-parties unless it can show that any non-party individual was a signatory to a relevant promissory note. (RGS, law3)
May 3, 2012 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT of Gretchen Freeman Cappio in Support re #59 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Lloyd Clapham, Delano Cureton, Bernard Karnes, Scott Keller, Linda Larkin, Fred Shourds, Vera Shourds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Clapham subpoenas, #2 Exhibit B: Cureton subpoenas, #3 Exhibit C: Karnes subpoenas, #4 Exhibit D: Keller subpoenas, #5 Exhibit E: Larkin subpoenas, #6 Exhibit F: Fred Shourd subpoenas, #7 Exhibit G: Vera Shourd subpoenas, #8 Exhibit H: Karnes Notice, #9 Exhibit I: email, #10 Exhibit J: letter)(Cappio, Gretchen)
May 3, 2012 Filing 59 MOTION for Protective Order by Lloyd Clapham, Delano Cureton, Bernard Karnes, Scott Keller, Linda Larkin, Fred Shourds, Vera Shourds.(Cappio, Gretchen)
April 27, 2012 Filing 58 NOTICE OF REMAND ORDER for case 11-11839 received from the MDL Panel. (Jones, Sherry)
April 20, 2012 Filing 57 Judge Richard G. Stearns: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, ENTERED.(Flaherty, Elaine)
April 16, 2012 Filing 56 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Protective Order by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
April 12, 2012 Filing 55 Judge Richard G. Stearns: Recommendation entered. re #52 MOTION to Amend (for leave to amend) the Complaint of Michelle Bourdelais MOTION to Remand (request for Suggestion of Remand) by Michelle Bourdelais filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs (RGS, law3)
April 12, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #54 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (RGS, law3)
April 12, 2012 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memoranda by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Agoglia, Michael)
April 11, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #52 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff Bourdelais's motion to amend her complaint is allowed and a suggestion of remand will be made. A plaintiff who does not wish to be a member of a class can hardly be deemed an adequate representative of that class as defined in R. 23(a). (RGS, law3)
April 9, 2012 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Schaffer on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Schaffer, Charles)
April 6, 2012 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri)
April 5, 2012 Filing 52 MOTION to Amend (for leave to amend) the Complaint of Michelle Bourdelais, MOTION to Remand (request for Suggestion of Remand) by Michelle Bourdelais ( Responses due by 4/19/2012) by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Class Complaint in 3:10cv670 (E.D.Va), #2 Exhibit Amended Class Complaint in 3:10CV670(E.D.Va.), #3 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion 3:10CV670 (E.D.Va.) Granting in Part and Denying In Part Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Motion for Leave to Amend & proposed Second Amended Complaint in 3:10CV670 (E.D.Va.), #5 Exhibit Transfer Order (MDL panel), #6 Exhibit Proposed Third Amended Complaint)(Bennett, Leonard)
April 4, 2012 Filing 51 APPENDIX/EXHIBIT re #50 Response to Motion, Summary of Claims Addressed in Motion to Dismiss with Corresponding Section of Plaintiffs' Opposition by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Klein, Gary)
April 4, 2012 Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Klein, Gary)
April 4, 2012 Filing 49 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice and Request for Judicial Notice of Additional Documents filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cappio, Gretchen)
April 4, 2012 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/1/2012; oppositions due 10/31/12. (Flaherty, Elaine)
April 2, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #48 Motion to Amend. The following deadlines from the November 28, 2011, Scheduling Order are extended by 60 days as follows: Opening disclosure of expert(s) for class certification is due June 4, 2012;Any additional dispositive motions are due July 18, 2012; Close of fact discovery regarding named plaintiffs modification transactions and classcertification occurs on July 18, 2012; Disclosure of rebuttal expert(s) for class certification is due July 18, 2012; Cut-off date for expert discovery for class certification occurs September 4, 2012; Motion(s) for Summary Judgment are due October 1, 2012; Oppositions to Motion(s) for Summary Judgment are due October 31, 2012; Replies in support of Motion(s) for Summary Judgment are due November 14, 2012; Motion for Class Certification is due October 1, 2012; Opposition to Motion for Class Certification is due October 31, 2012; Reply in support of Motion for Class Certification is due November 14, 2012; Parties will submit a joint proposal regarding further case deadlines 14 days after class certification decision. (RGS, law3)
April 2, 2012 Filing 48 MOTION to Amend #22 Order No. 2: Scheduling by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
March 14, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Responses due by 4/4/2012 (Flaherty, Elaine)
March 13, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time. The court is not inclined to grant any further extensions. Plaintiffs' response is due to the court no later than April 4, 2012. (RGS, law3)
March 13, 2012 Filing 47 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 4, 2012 to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
March 5, 2012 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT of Roberto Silva in Support re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Agoglia, Michael)
March 5, 2012 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT of Kevin Johnson in Support re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Agoglia, Michael)
March 5, 2012 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT of Edith Chandler in Support re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Agoglia, Michael)
March 5, 2012 Filing 43 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss by JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Agoglia, Michael)
March 5, 2012 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Agoglia, Michael)
March 5, 2012 Filing 41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 3/19/2012) by JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation.(Agoglia, Michael)
February 21, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #40 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time. The response to the CAC is due to the court on March 5, 2012. The reply to the CAC is due to the court on March 19, 2012. (RGS, law3)
February 21, 2012 Filing 40 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time ( Responses due by 3/6/2012) by Consolidated Plaintiffs, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Kane, Matthew)
February 14, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon T Hritz on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Hritz, Sharon)
February 14, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen S. Obrist on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Obrist, Gretchen)
February 14, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen F. Cappio on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Cappio, Gretchen)
February 14, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn Lincoln Sarko on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Sarko, Lynn)
February 9, 2012 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Seth Crompton on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Crompton, Randall)
February 9, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D Holland on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Holland, Eric)
February 6, 2012 MDL Record received from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Case number: 11-06072. Electronic file received and assigned case number 12-10216 on 2/3/12 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified transfer order number 3. (Jones, Sherry)
February 1, 2012 Filing 33 Notice re: MDL number 2290 requesting transfer of case from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, case number 11-06072 with enclosed certified copy of order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in to the District of Massachusetts dated 3.. (Jones, Sherry)
January 30, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Preetpal Grewal on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Grewal, Preetpal)
January 30, 2012 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra C. Warren on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Warren, Alexandra)
January 27, 2012 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan W. Cuneo on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Cuneo, Jonathan)
January 20, 2012 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Consolidated Plaintiffs re #28 Amended Complaint,, . (Sarko, Lynn)
January 20, 2012 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Consolidated Plaintiffs, filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23)(Sarko, Lynn)
January 12, 2012 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The CAC will be filed no later than January 20, 2012. The response will be filed no later than February 27, 2012, and the reply will be filed no later than March 12, 2012. (RGS, law3)
January 12, 2012 Filing 27 Joint MOTION and [Proposed] Order To Amend Scheduling Order re #22 Order No. 2: Scheduling by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
January 6, 2012 Filing 26 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Gary E. Klein (Klein, Gary)
December 19, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Atty Kropp, FILED. (Flaherty, Elaine)
December 7, 2011 MDL Record received from the District of Central District of California, Case number: 2:11-06727. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-12155 on 12/7/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified transfer order number 2. (Jones, Sherry)
December 7, 2011 MDL Record received from the Eastern District of Missouri, Case number: 4:11-01429. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-12154 on 12/7/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified transfer order number 2. (Jones, Sherry)
December 6, 2011 MDL Record received from the Southern District of Ohio, Case number: 1:11-00133. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-12143 on 12/6/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified transfer order number 2. (Jones, Sherry)
December 2, 2011 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Claims of Plaintiff Mindy B. Senter by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation. (Agoglia, Michael)
December 1, 2011 MDL Record received from the the Southern District of New York, Case number: 1:11-cv-05798. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-12119 on 12/1/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified transfer order number 2. (Jones, Sherry)
November 29, 2011 Filing 23 Notice re: MDL number 2290 requesting transfer of case from the Central District of California, case number 11-6727 with enclosed certified copy of order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in to the District of Massachusetts dated 11/29/11. Additional cases requested from: District of Eastern District of Missouri, Case number 11-1429 District of Southern District of New York, Case number 11-5798; District of Southern District of Ohio, Case number 11-133;. (Jones, Sherry)
November 28, 2011 Filing 22 Judge Richard G. Stearns: Scheduling ORDER entered. (RGS, law3)
November 23, 2011 Filing 21 Recommendations for Scheduling Order JOINT SCHEDULING STATEMENT. (Agoglia, Michael)
November 18, 2011 MDL Record received from the Eastern District of Michigan, Case number: 11-14797. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-12043 on 11/18/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified transfer order number 1. (Jones, Sherry)
November 17, 2011 Filing 20 Notice re: MDL number 2290 requesting transfer of case from the Eastern District of Michigan, case number 11-14797 with enclosed certified copy of order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in to the District of Massachusetts dated 11/16/11.. (Jones, Sherry)
November 15, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Kane on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Kane, Matthew)
November 15, 2011 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File (RGS, law3)
November 15, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Donn A. Randall on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Randall, Donn)
November 15, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Donn A. Randall on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation (Randall, Donn)
November 15, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Kane on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation (Kane, Matthew)
November 14, 2011 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/23/2011 to File PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation.(Agoglia, Michael)
November 4, 2011 Filing 14 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (13) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:11-md-02290-RGS Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS et al.(RGS, law3)
November 4, 2011 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to November 14, 2011 to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
November 2, 2011 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS et al.(Scalfani, Deborah)
November 2, 2011 Filing 12 Transcript of Status Conference held on October 21, 2011, before Judge Richard G. Stearns. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com Redaction Request due 11/23/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS et al.(Scalfani, Deborah)
October 21, 2011 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 1re (7 in 1:11-md-02290-RGS) MOTION By Plaintiffs For Entry of Case Management Order No. 1 filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs, (8 in 1:11-md-02290-RGS) Declaration, filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs, (9 in 1:11-md-02290-RGS) Proposed Document(s) submitted filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS et al.(RGS, law3)
October 21, 2011 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns: Status Conference held on 10/21/2011 in case 1:11-md-02290-RGS.The court will adopt plaintiffs' proposal with respect to proposed lead counsel. Parties will file a proposed scheduling order with the court within fourteen (14) days of this Order. The court will amend plaintiffs' proposed case management order No.1 (as revised by parties and submitted to the court on 10/21/2011). (Court Reporter: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com.)(Attorneys present: For various Plaintiffs: Gretchen Freeman Cappio, Charles E. Schaffer, Eric D. Holland, Jonathan W. Cuneo, Gary Klein, Kevin Costello, Charles M. Delbaum, (by phone) Michael Flannery, Thomas Mauriello, Anthony Lanza, Lynda Grant, and Leonard Bennett. For defendant: Michael Agoglia and Donn Randall.) Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02290-RGS et al.(RGS, law3) Modified on 10/21/2011 (RGS, law3). Modified on 10/21/2011 (RGS, law3).
October 20, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles M. Delbaum on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Delbaum, Charles)
October 19, 2011 Filing 9 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Consolidated Plaintiffs. Document received: Proposed Case Management Order No. 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Klein, Gary)
October 19, 2011 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #7 MOTION By Plaintiffs For Entry of Case Management Order No. 1 of Gary Klein in Support of the Motion by All Plaintiffs for Entry of Case Management Order No. 1 by Consolidated Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Klein, Gary)
October 19, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION By Plaintiffs For Entry of Case Management Order No. 1 by Consolidated Plaintiffs.(Klein, Gary)
October 19, 2011 MDL Record received from the Southern District of Florida, Case number: 11-60308. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-11841 on 10/19/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified initial transfer order. (Jones, Sherry)
October 19, 2011 MDL Record received from the Western District of Washington, Case number: 11-00669. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-11840 on 10/19/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified initial transfer order. (Jones, Sherry)
October 19, 2011 MDL Record received from the Eastern District of Virginia, Case number: 10-00670. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-11839 on 10/19/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified initial transfer order. (Jones, Sherry)
October 19, 2011 MDL Record received from the District of Minnesota, Case number: 11-1574. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-11838 on 10/19/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified initial transfer order. (Jones, Sherry)
October 19, 2011 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Consolidated Plaintiffs re Notice of Hearing. (Klein, Gary)
October 18, 2011 MDL Record received from the District of Central District of California, Case number: 10-1923. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-11831 on 10/18/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified initial transfer order. (Jones, Sherry)
October 18, 2011 MDL Record received from the Eastern District of Washington, Case number: 11-03002. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-11830 on 10/18/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified initial transfer order. (Jones, Sherry)
October 17, 2011 MDL Record received from the Central District of California, Case number: 10-1464. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-11818 on 10/17/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified initial transfer order. (Jones, Sherry)
October 17, 2011 MDL Record received from the District of New Jersey, Case number: 11-1791. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-11804 on 10/12/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified initial transfer order. (Jones, Sherry)
October 17, 2011 MDL Record received from the Southern District of California, Case number: 11-00530. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-11812 on 10/13/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified transfer order number Initial. (Jones, Sherry)
October 17, 2011 MDL Record received from the Central District of California, Case number: 11-06025. Electronic file received and assigned case number 11-11817 on 10/14/11 pursuant to MDL 2290 certified Initial transfer order. (Jones, Sherry)
October 14, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Costello on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Costello, Kevin)
October 14, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Shennan Alexandra Kavanagh on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Kavanagh, Shennan)
October 14, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary E. Klein on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Klein, Gary)
October 13, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing : Status Conference set for 10/21/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Attorney Gary Klein notified on 10/13/11 via email)(Seelye, Terri)
October 12, 2011 Filing 2 Notice re: MDL number 2290 requesting transfer of case from the Central District of California, case number 2:11-06025 with enclosed certified copy of order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in to the District of Massachusetts dated 10/11/12. Additional cases requested from: District of Central District of California, Case number 8:10-01464 District of Central District of California, Case number 8:10-01923; District of Southern District of California, Case number 3:11-00530; District of Southern District of Florida, Case number 0:11-60308; District of District of Minnesota, Case number 0:11-01574; District of New Jersey, Case number 2:11-01791; District of Eastern District of Virginia, Case number 3:10-00670; District of Eastern District of Washinton, Case number 2:11-03002; District of Western District of Washington, Case number 2:11-00669. (Jones, Sherry)
October 12, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. (Farrell, Robert)
October 12, 2011 Filing 1 Initial Transfer Order in MDL 2290 dated 10/11/11 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Richard G. Stearns for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Linda Larkin
Represented By: Gretchen F. Cappio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Bernard Karnes
Represented By: Gretchen F. Cappio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Delano Cureton
Represented By: Jami Wintz McKeon
Represented By: Gretchen F. Cappio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Scott Keller
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Gretchen F. Cappio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Vera Shourds
Represented By: Gretchen F. Cappio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Fred Shourds
Represented By: Gretchen F. Cappio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Lloyd Clapham
Represented By: Gretchen F. Cappio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherryln Dolan
Represented By: James Heggie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY E. KELLER
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dolan
Represented By: James Heggie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean C Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles C. Grillo
Represented By: Michael J. Traft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher & Renee Jerram
Represented By: Christine M. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consolidated Plaintiffs
Represented By: Randall Seth Crompton
Represented By: Ryan P. McDevitt
Represented By: Corinne Reed
Represented By: Alexandra C. Warren
Represented By: Gary E. Klein
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Eric D Holland
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Sharon T Hritz
Represented By: Gretchen F. Cappio
Represented By: Gretchen S. Obrist
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Charles M. Delbaum
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: Leonard A. Bennett
Represented By: Preetpal Grewal
Represented By: Shennan A. Kavanagh
Represented By: Kevin Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In Re: JPMORGAN CHASE MORTGAGE MODIFICATION LITIGATION
Represented By: Michael J. Agoglia
Represented By: Leah M. Houghton
Represented By: Anthony L Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Wendy M. Garbers
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: Michael J. Agoglia
Represented By: Leah M. Houghton
Represented By: Jami Wintz McKeon
Represented By: Donn A. Randall
Represented By: Matthew A. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Morgage Modification Litigation
Represented By: Michael J. Agoglia
Represented By: Leah M. Houghton
Represented By: Jami Wintz McKeon
Represented By: Donn A. Randall
Represented By: Matthew A. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Donn A. Randall
Represented By: Matthew A. Kane
Represented By: Jami Wintz McKeon
Represented By: Leah M. Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bear Stearns Companies LLC
Represented By: Donn A. Randall
Represented By: Matthew A. Kane
Represented By: Jami Wintz McKeon
Represented By: Leah M. Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Laura A Cecere
Represented By: John J. Pentz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?