Fertik et al v. Stevenson, et al
Plaintiff: William Fertik and Greta Fertik
Defendant: William Stevenson, Melanie E Maytin, Abott Vascular, Inc. and Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv10795
Filed: May 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Norfolk
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Collings
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered as to 257 MOTION for Reconsideration.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered. The Court ALLOWS Abbott's motion to strike the June 27, 2016 Supplemental Report of Dr. Medlin (Docket No. 242 ). The plaintiff's motion for a protective order and to quash the defendant's deposition subpoena (Docket No. 247 ) is now MOOT. Finally, Abbott' s motion in limine to exclude the testimony of Dr. Medlin (Docket No. 179 ) is ALLOWED in part in accordance with this order.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM and ORDER. This Court DENIES the defendant's motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 173 ). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 98 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 37 (c) (1) Against Abbott Laboratories, Inc. and Abbott Vascular, Inc. by William Fertik. Please see order for details. (Moore, Kellyann)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fertik et al v. Stevenson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Fertik
Represented By: Michael D. Lurie
Represented By: Alex H. MacDonald
Represented By: Rebecca A.G. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greta Fertik
Represented By: Michael D. Lurie
Represented By: Alex H. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stevenson
Represented By: Sarah Ann Bandomer
Represented By: Edward F. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie E Maytin
Represented By: Sarah Ann Bandomer
Represented By: Edward F. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abott Vascular, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?