Butler v. Balolia
Plaintiff: David Butler
Defendant: Shiraz Balolia
Case Number: 1:2012cv11054
Filed: June 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: Joseph L. Tauro
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered denying 196 Plaintiff's Motion For Mistrial and For a New Trial Under F.R.C.P. 59. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion for Summary Judgment (Quinn, Thomas)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 72 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count IV of the Second Amended Complaint. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (Bartlett, Timothy)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Docket No. 41) is DENIED. 2. The operative complaint in this case shall be the First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 39). 3. Pursuant to the May 27, 2014 Order, the defendant shall respond to the First Amended Complaint by October 3, 2014.(Hohler, Daniel)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM and ORDER (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Balolia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Butler
Represented By: Michael J. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiraz Balolia
Represented By: Laura L. Carroll
Represented By: Joseph F. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?