McMann et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: |
Paul J. McMann |
Defendant: |
United States of America and Eric Holder |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv11872 |
Filed: |
October 5, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Massachusetts |
Office: |
Boston Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Patti B. Saris |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 18, 2014 |
Filing
46
Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting 42 Motion to Dismiss; denying 45 Motion to Stay. (PSSA, 4)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing
39
Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered that Plaintiff's Motion 34 Requesting an Explanation and to Receive Notice of all Entries on This Docket by the Court is granted as to plaintiffs request for copies of the docket sheet and defendants pleadings to date. The motion shall be DENIED in all other respects. The Clerk will mail a copy of this Order to plaintiff with a copy of the docket sheet and copies of the pleadings filed by defendants to date. (PSSA, 4)
|
April 22, 2013 |
Filing
25
Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered allowing 24 Motion for Clarification and the initial, partial filing fee shall be collected only when funds exist pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1).(PSSA, 4)
|
March 26, 2013 |
Filing
19
Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. The motion to use existing financial affidavit (Docket No. 17) and declaration (Docket No. 5) are construed as motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and are granted. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1), the Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $10..80. The remainder of the fee, $339.20, shall be collected in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). The motion for appointment of counsel (Docket No. 2) and motion for hearing (Docket No. 13) are denied without prejudice. The motion to correct court record (Docket No. 16) is granted. The Clerk shall issue summonses for service of the complaint on defendants Holder and the United States. The Clerk shall send the summonses, complaint, and this Order to the plaintiff, who must thereafter serve the defendants in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m).The defendants are required to respond to the complaint. (PSSA, 4)
|
December 10, 2012 |
Filing
14
Judge Patti B. Saris: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. The Court will not permit the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis at this time because he has not submitted the requisite request. Within 21 days of the date of this Procedural Order, plaintiff e ither shall (1) pay the $350.00 filing fee; or (2) submit the affidavit required under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1). The Clerk mailed the Procedural Order to plaintiff with an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs.(PSSA, 4)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?