Lexington Luminance LLC v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Lexington Luminance LLC
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv12218
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Douglas P. Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2013 Filing 39 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot 32 Motion to Continue as a conference has already been held. (Lyness, Paul)
May 20, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Barrett on behalf of Google, Inc. (Barrett, Matthew)
May 13, 2013 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 5/13/2013. The court hears argument on the Motion to Intervene and takes it under advisement. (Court Reporter: Marcia Patrisso at 617-737-8728.)(Attorneys present: For Plaintiff: David Godkin, Robert Katz ( by phone); For Defendant: Daniel Winston; For Intervenor Defendant: Patricia Rich, Jeffrey Sherwood, Charles Monterio) (Lyness, Paul)
May 13, 2013 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re 34 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of its Motion to Intervene as a Defendant [UNOPPOSED] LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED ON MAY 13, 2013 filed by Formosa Epitaxy, Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
May 13, 2013 Filing 35 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 34 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Danieli, Chris)
May 10, 2013 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of its Motion to Intervene as a Defendant [UNOPPOSED] by Formosa Epitaxy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Reply)(Rich, Patricia)
May 9, 2013 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re 32 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference Date filed by Lexington Luminance LLC. (Katz, Robert)
May 9, 2013 Filing 32 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference Date by Google, Inc..(Winston, Daniel)
May 9, 2013 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re 20 MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant filed by Lexington Luminance LLC. (Katz, Robert)
May 8, 2013 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Charles J. Monterio, Jr. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4446209 by Formosa Epitaxy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Charles J. Monterio, Jr.)(Rich, Patricia)
May 6, 2013 Filing 29 STIPULATION Regarding the Format of Document Productions by Google, Inc.. (Winston, Daniel)
May 6, 2013 Filing 28 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Google, Inc..(Winston, Daniel)
May 6, 2013 Filing 27 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Lexington Luminance LLC.(Katz, Robert)
May 6, 2013 Filing 26 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Lexington Luminance LLC.(Katz, Robert)
May 3, 2013 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Formosa Epitaxy, Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
April 30, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia R. Rich on behalf of Formosa Epitaxy, Inc. (Rich, Patricia)
April 30, 2013 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey K. Sherwood and Krista M. Carter Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-4433819 by Formosa Epitaxy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Affidavit of Jeffrey K. Sherwood, # 2 Exhibit B- Affidavit of Krista M. Carter)(Rich, Patricia)
April 30, 2013 Filing 22 DECLARATION re 20 MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant OF ALBERT CHU by Formosa Epitaxy, Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
April 30, 2013 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re 20 MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant filed by Formosa Epitaxy, Inc.. (Rich, Patricia)
April 30, 2013 Filing 20 MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant by Formosa Epitaxy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Complaint in Intervention, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rich, Patricia)
March 20, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly. (Lyness, Paul)
February 25, 2013 Filing 18 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robert Katz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Danieli, Chris)
February 22, 2013 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert Katz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4335403 by Lexington Luminance LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Robert Katz)(Godkin, David)
February 20, 2013 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr added. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly)
February 19, 2013 Filing 15 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF RECUSAL entered.(Woodlock, Douglas)
February 15, 2013 Filing 14 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Lexington Luminance LLC.(Godkin, David)
February 13, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophie F. Wang on behalf of Google, Inc. (Wang, Sophie)
February 12, 2013 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Google, Inc.. (Winston, Daniel)
February 12, 2013 Filing 11 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Lexington Luminance LLC by Google, Inc..(Winston, Daniel)
January 24, 2013 Filing 10 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 9 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to 2/12/13 to Respond re 1 Complaint. (Lovett, Jarrett)
January 23, 2013 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 2/12/13 to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Lexington Luminance LLC.(Godkin, David)
December 13, 2012 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexington Luminance LLC. Google, Inc. waiver sent on 11/30/2012, answer due 1/29/2013. (Godkin, David)
December 5, 2012 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock added. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly)
December 4, 2012 Filing 6 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Patch, Christine)
November 30, 2012 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew)
November 30, 2012 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Abaid, Kimberly)
November 29, 2012 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lexington Luminance LLC. (Godkin, David)
November 29, 2012 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Godkin, David) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/30/2012 for non-fillable form format ) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
November 29, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial against Google, Inc. Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-4222353 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lexington Luminance LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Category Form)(Godkin, David) (Attachment 2 and Attachment 3 replaced on 11/30/2012 for non-fillable form format ) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexington Luminance LLC v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Luminance LLC
Represented By: David S. Godkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?