Stote v. UMass Correctional Health Care et al

Plaintiff: John E. Stote
Defendant: UMass Correctional Health Care, UMass Medical School, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Massachusetts Department of Correction & All Members, Duval Patrick, Thomas Groblewski, Rebecca Lubelczyk, Maureen Atkins, Herbert Dungo, Linda Booth, Catherine Burke, Gary Roden, Cynthia Sumner and Luis Spencer
Case Number: 1:2013cv10267
Filed: February 12, 2013
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M. Gorton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to pay the filing fee. (PSSA, 3)
June 10, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. The window of time for complying with the Courts March 30, 2015 order 39 has closed without any response from Stote. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to pay the filing fee. (PSSA, 3)
December 1, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered denying 32 Motion to Stay to the extent that plaintiff John E. Stote asks that the individual cases of the plaintiff who signed the complaint in this action 13 be stayed pending his appeal of the Courts June 26, 2014 order 20 severing the claims of each plaintiff. (PSSA, 3)
June 25, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. The Clerk shall terminate all plaintiffs except Stote as parties to this action.(2)The Clerk shall open separate, individual civil actions for each plaintiff other than Stote and shall docket the complaint i n this action in all of the individual cases. The cases shall be randomly assigned to the Judges of this Court. The case filing date for each of these new cases shall be the date of this order, although for statute of limitations purposes the plain tiffs may rely on the dates on which documents were filed in this action. (3)Each plaintiff, including Stote, must, within sixty (60) days of the date of this order (1) pay the $400 filing fee; or (2) seek leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by filing an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and a certified six-month prison account statement. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(2). Failure to pay the fee or seek leave to proceed without p repayment of the fee may result in dismissal of an individual action without prejudice. (4)Each plaintiff who desires to file an amended complaint must do so within sixty (60) days of the date of this order. (5) The Clerk shall send to every plainti ff who signed the complaint: (1) a copy of this order; and (2) an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (6)The Clerk shall send a courtesy copy of this order to counsel for Massachusetts Department of Correction. (PSSA, 3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stote v. UMass Correctional Health Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Stote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMass Correctional Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMass Medical School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Department of Correction & All Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duval Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Groblewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Lubelczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Dungo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Roden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?