Exergen Corporation v. KAZ USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Exergen Corporation
Defendant: KAZ USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv10628
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Stearns
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2016 395 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 381 Motion for Judgment of Invalidity under 35 U.S.C. § 101. "For the foregoing reasons, Kaz's motion for judgment of invalidity under 35 U.S.C. § 101 is DENIED. The Clerk will now enter judgment for Exergen." (RGS, int2)
December 7, 2015 295 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 274 Motion for Summary Judgment. "For the foregoing reasons, Kaz's motion for summary judgment of issue preclusion is ALLOWED IN PART with respect to claims 27 , 29, 37, and 56 of the '938 patent, and DENIED IN PART with respect to claims 17, 24, 33, 39, 40, 46, 49, 60, and 66 of the'938 patent, and claims 7, 14, and 17 of the '685 patent. The jury trial will commence at 9 a.m., January 11, 2016, in Courtroom 21 of the Moakley Federal Courthouse, as previously scheduled." (RGS, int2)
September 3, 2015 253 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 140 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 239 Motion to Strike. "For the foregoing reasons, Kaz's motion for summary judgment of noninfringement is DENIED. Exergen's motion to stri ke the Ho and Frick declarations is DENIED. The parties will have at the election of wither until October 2, 2015, to depose Ho and Frick for the limited purpose of authenticating and establishing the admissibility of the Microlife exhibits. The Clerk will schedule this matter for a jury trial commencing at 9 a.m., January 11, 2016, in Courtroom 21 of the Moakley Federal Courthouse." (RGS, int2)
August 20, 2015 251 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 141 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 143 Motion for Summary Judgment. "For the foregoing reasons, Kaz's motion for summary judgment of invalidity because of obviousness is DENIED. Kaz's motion for summary judgment of no willful infringement is ALLOWED." (RGS, int2)
August 10, 2015 246 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 137 Motion for Summary Judgment. "For the foregoing reasons, Exergen's motion for summary judgment on the inequitable conduct defense is ALLOWED." (RGS, int2)
July 24, 2015 230 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 135 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 142 Motion for Summary Judgment. "For the foregoing reasons, Kaz's motion for summary judgment on the license defense is DENIED. Exergen's cross-motion is ALLOWED." (RGS, int2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exergen Corporation v. KAZ USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exergen Corporation
Represented By: Meredith L. Ainbinder
Represented By: Robert M. Asher
Represented By: Kerry L. Timbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAZ USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?