Tibbs v. Samuels et al
Plaintiff: |
Jerome Tibbs |
Defendant: |
Rebekah E. Samuels, Robert E. Stork, William H. Roach, James Saba, MCI Cedar Junction, Luis S. Spencer and John Doe I |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv11095 |
Filed: |
May 2, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Massachusetts |
Office: |
Boston Office |
County: |
Norfolk |
Presiding Judge: |
Denise J. Casper |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 28, 2017 |
Filing
145
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - the Court ALLOWS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Defendants' motion for summary judgment, D. 124, as follows: a. ALLOWS the motion as to Count One (§ 1983 retaliation claim) against Rego and Mack but DENIES the motion as to Count One against the remaining Defendants. b. DENIES the motion as to Counts Three and Four (§ 1983 excessive force claims). c. ALLOWS the motion as to Count Five (§ 1983 failure to protect claim) against Stork, but DENIES the motion as to Count Five against the remaining Defendants. d. ALLOWS the motion as to Count Ten (§ 1983 claim) against Spencer and Saba. e. ALLOWS the motion as to Count Eleven (§ 1983 conspiracy claim) against Rego and Mack but DENIES the motion as to Count Eleven against the remaining Defendants. f. ALLOWS the motion as to Count Twelve (procedural due process claim). g. DENIES the motion as to Count Thirteen (MCRA claim).(Hourihan, Lisa)
|
January 17, 2014 |
Filing
54
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered re letter 49 about filing fee payment. The Court hereby requests that the treasurer of the institution having custody of the plaintiff inform the Court, within 21 days of the date of this order, whether the t ransmission of the $82.00 (which the Court received on December 26, 2013) or any portion thereof was in excess of what is required under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). The Court also asks the treasurer to provide a prison account statement for the plaintiff for the period beginning August 19, 2013 through the present. [Copy of order sent to treasurer of MCI Cedar Junction on 1/21/14](PSSA, 3)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?