Brigham and Women's Hospital, Inc. et al v. Perrigo Company et al
Plaintiff: Brigham and Women's Hospital, Inc. and Investors Bio-Tech, L.P.
Defendant: Perrigo Company, L. Perrigo Company and CVS Caremark Corp.
Case Number: 1:2013cv11640
Filed: July 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Rya W. Zobel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 386 Motion Disallowance of Defendant's Bill of Costs. See Order for more details. (Urso, Lisa)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Judge Rya W. Zobel: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying 300 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying as moot 303 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 306 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying as moot 344 Motion to Alter Judgment. Proposed judgment 12/4/17 (Urso, Lisa)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered finding as moot 308 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 309 Motion for Reconsideration ; finding as moot 311 Motion to Strike; The court hereby vacates its previous judgment #227, and enters a separate, fi nal judgment that reflects resolution of liability and damages as detailed in the 12/14/16 jury verdict and the court's 4/24/17 memo and order #325; plaintiff's opposition by 8/15/17; reply of no more than 5 pages by 8/22/17. (Urso, Lisa) Modified on 8/2/2017 (Urso, Lisa).
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Judge Rya W. Zobel: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying 239 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 244 Motion ; denying 247 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 249 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 252 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 255 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 268 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 273 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Urso, Lisa)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Judge Rya W. Zobel: Memorandum of Decision entered denying 46 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 54 Motion to Amend; finding as moot 61 Motion for Leave to File Document ; finding as moot 63 Motion for Leave to File Document ; denying 27 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Urso, Lisa)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brigham and Women's Hospital, Inc. et al v. Perrigo Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigham and Women's Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Ladow
Represented By: Barbara L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Investors Bio-Tech, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Ladow
Represented By: Barbara L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Perrigo Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Caremark Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?