Ahmed v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Naeem Ahmed
Defendant: Apple, Inc. and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2013cv13130
Filed: December 10, 2013
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Rya W. Zobel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2014 33 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT entered dismissing the case with prejudice. (Urso, Lisa)
June 12, 2014 32 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered granting 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (DiBlasi, Lily)
June 11, 2014 31 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel added. Judge Indira Talwani no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to Judge Talwani in error. Reassigned to Judge Zobel. (Abaid, Kimberly)
June 5, 2014 30 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Indira Talwani added. Judge Rya W. Zobel no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly)
May 16, 2014 29 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (RENEWED) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (RENEWED) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Decision in the related case Ahmed v.Twitter, Inc., Civ. No. 14-10025-RGS)(Keller, Bruce)
April 25, 2014 28 AFFIDAVIT of /Declaration of Steven S. Michaels in Support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss (Leave to file granted on 4/24/14) in Support re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (RENEWED) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (RENEWED) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 25, # 2 Exhibit 26, # 3 Exhibit 27, # 4 Exhibit 28, # 5 Exhibit 29, # 6 Exhibit 30, # 7 Exhibit 31, # 8 Exhibit 32, # 9 Exhibit 33, # 10 Exhibit 34, # 11 Exhibit 35, # 12 Exhibit 36, # 13 Exhibit 37, # 14 Exhibit 38, # 15 Exhibit 39, # 16 Exhibit 40, # 17 Exhibit 41, # 18 Exhibit 42)(Keller, Bruce)
April 25, 2014 27 REPLY to Response to 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (RENEWED) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (RENEWED) /Reply in Support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss (Leave to file granted on 4/24/14) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Keller, Bruce)
April 24, 2014 26 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 24 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting 25 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Urso, Lisa)
April 17, 2014 25 MOTION for Leave to File / Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Its Renewed Motion to Dismiss by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Keller, Bruce)
March 26, 2014 24 MOTION for Leave to File / Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Its Renewed Motion to Dismiss by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Reply in Support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Steven S. Michaels, # 3 Exhibit B - Exhibit 25 to Michaels Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B - Exhibit 26 to Michaels Declaration, # 5 Exhibit B - Exhibit 27 to Michaels Declaration, # 6 Exhibit B - Exhibit 28 to Michaels Declaration, # 7 Exhibit B - Exhibit 29 to Michaels Declaration, # 8 Exhibit B - Exhibit 30 to Michaels Declaration, # 9 Exhibit B - Exhibit 31 to Michaels Declaration, # 10 Exhibit B - Exhibit 32 to Michaels Declaration, # 11 Exhibit B - Exhibit 33 to Michaels Declaration, # 12 Exhibit B - Exhibit 34 to Michaels Declaration, # 13 Exhibit B - Exhibit 35 to Michaels Declaration, # 14 Exhibit B - Exhibit 36 to Michaels Declaration, # 15 Exhibit B - Exhibit 37 to Michaels Declaration, # 16 Exhibit B - Exhibit 38 to Michaels Declaration, # 17 Exhibit B - Exhibit 39 to Michaels Declaration, # 18 Exhibit B - Exhibit 40 to Michaels Declaration, # 19 Exhibit B - Exhibit 41 to Michaels Declaration, # 20 Exhibit B - Exhibit 42 to Michaels Declaration)(Keller, Bruce)
March 18, 2014 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (RENEWED) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (RENEWED) filed by Naeem Ahmed. (Urso, Lisa)
March 4, 2014 22 AFFIDAVIT of /Declaration of Steven S. Michaels in Support re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (RENEWED) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (RENEWED) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 23, # 2 Exhibit 24)(Keller, Bruce)
March 4, 2014 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (RENEWED) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (RENEWED) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Keller, Bruce)
March 4, 2014 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (RENEWED) ( Responses due by 3/18/2014), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (RENEWED) by Apple, Inc..(Keller, Bruce)
February 20, 2014 19 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Naeem Ahmed re 17 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Johnson, Jay)
February 4, 2014 18 REPLY to Response to 9 MOTION to Dismiss / Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement [Leave to file granted on February 3, 2014] filed by Apple, Inc.. (Keller, Bruce)
February 3, 2014 17 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss; granting 12 Motion for Order; granting 15 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Urso, Lisa)
January 21, 2014 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 15 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement filed by Naeem Ahmed. (Johnson, Jay)
January 17, 2014 15 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Keller, Bruce)
January 10, 2014 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Naeem Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Jay)
January 9, 2014 14 Proof of Service. Apple, Inc. served on 12/10/2013, answer due 12/31/2013. (Danieli, Chris)
January 7, 2014 12 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Naeem Ahmed.(Danieli, Chris)
December 31, 2013 11 AFFIDAVIT of /Declaration of Steven S. Michaels in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20)(Keller, Bruce)
December 31, 2013 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple, Inc.. (Keller, Bruce)
December 31, 2013 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Apple, Inc..(Keller, Bruce)
December 31, 2013 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apple, Inc.. (Keller, Bruce)
December 31, 2013 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce P. Keller on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Keller, Bruce)
December 11, 2013 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel added. Judge George A. OToole, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly)
December 11, 2013 5 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 455(b)(4), I recuse myself from participation in this matter and direct the Clerk forthwith to reassign the case randomly to another District Judge.(Lyness, Paul)
December 10, 2013 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 10, 2013 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Abaid, Kimberly)
December 10, 2013 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 10, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. et.al, filed by Naeem Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet, # 2 Exhibits)(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmed v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce P. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naeem Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?