Christensen et al v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Three individuals, on behalf of themselves and a class of individuals similarly situated, filed a lawsuit against Apple for improperly collecting personal information from customers wishing to buy Apple products. The complaint alleges that Apple requires customers to provide personal information along with their credit card in order to make purchases in their stores, in violation of Massachusetts state law. It alleges further that Apple sells the personal information to third parties for profit. The plaintiffs seek certification of the class, statutory and punitive damages, and an injunction against Apple.

Plaintiff: Adam Christensen, Jeffrey Scolnick and William Farrell
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv10100
Filed: January 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Douglas P. Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2014 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Adam Christensen, William Farrell, Jeffrey Scolnick. (Siprut, Joseph)
May 29, 2014 Filing 17 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. 30 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Lovett, Jarrett)
May 19, 2014 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Dates and Deadlines and Notice of Resolution of Action by Adam Christensen, William Farrell, Jeffrey Scolnick.(Siprut, Joseph)
April 2, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ORDER FOR JOINT STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATIONS, AND ORDER FOR ELECTRONIC FILING: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
March 14, 2014 Filing 14 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 10 , 11 , 12 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added David M. Walsh, Purvi G. Patel and Adam M. Sevell for Apple, Inc. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lovett, Jarrett)
March 13, 2014 Filing 13 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Apple Inc..(Hecker, Dustin)
March 13, 2014 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adam M. Sevell Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4907745 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hecker, Dustin)
March 13, 2014 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Purvi G. Patel Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4907727 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hecker, Dustin)
March 13, 2014 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David M. Walsh Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4907692 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hecker, Dustin)
March 13, 2014 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apple Inc.. (Hecker, Dustin)
March 13, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam L. Littman on behalf of Apple Inc. (Littman, Adam)
March 13, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin F. Hecker on behalf of Apple Inc. (Hecker, Dustin)
January 21, 2014 Filing 6 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph J. Siprut by Adam Christensen, William Farrell, Jeffrey Scolnick. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lovett, Jarrett)
January 17, 2014 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph J. Siprut, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4822097 by Adam Christensen, William Farrell, Jeffrey Scolnick. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Shapoval, Alexander)
January 16, 2014 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Abaid, Kimberly)
January 16, 2014 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Abaid, Kimberly)
January 15, 2014 Filing 2 MOTION to Certify Class by Adam Christensen, William Farrell, Jeffrey Scolnick.(Shapoval, Alexander)
January 15, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-4816787 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Adam Christensen, William Farrell, Jeffrey Scolnick. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form, # 3 Exhibit)(Shapoval, Alexander) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/16/2014) (Abaid, Kimberly). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/16/2014) (Abaid, Kimberly).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christensen et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Christensen
Represented By: Alexander Ilya Shapoval
Represented By: Joseph J. Siprut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Scolnick
Represented By: Alexander Ilya Shapoval
Represented By: Joseph J. Siprut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Farrell
Represented By: Alexander Ilya Shapoval
Represented By: Joseph J. Siprut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?