Minor v. Ryan
Petitioner: Marvin Minor
Respondent: Ryan Kelly
Case Number: 1:2014cv12293
Filed: May 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered ACCEPTING and ADOPTING re: 57 Report and Recommendations. Petitioner Marvin Minor's 1 Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. (DaSilva, Carolina)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Petitioner shall file a memorandum in support of his petition no later than May 11, 2015. Respondent shall file a memorandum in opposition of the petition no later than July 10, 2015. See attached Order. (MacDonald, Gail)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; denying 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Petitioner shall inform the court within 30 days of this order whether he voluntarily dismisses grounds (2) and (3) for relief. SEE FULL ORDER ATTACHED. (Bartlett, Timothy)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minor v. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvin Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ryan Kelly
Represented By: Christopher S. Hurld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?