CardiAQ Valve Technologies, Inc. v. Neovasc Inc. et al

Plaintiff: CardiAQ Valve Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Neovasc Inc. and Neovasc Tiara Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv12405
Filed: June 6, 2014
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M. Gorton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2016 583 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered.For the reasons stated herein:1. CardiAQs motion for enhanced damages [ECF No. 513] is GRANTED IN PART and Neovasc is ordered to pay $21,000,000 in enhanced damages;2. CardiAQs motion for injunctive relief [ECF No. 516] is GRANTED IN PART and the Court orders that:a. Within 7 days of this Order, Neovasc must destroy all information that CardiAQ sent to Neovasc between June 2009 and April 2010, including ema ils and attachments thereto, CAD files, engineering drawings, animal test results, design history information, as well as any work product that Neovasc generated that incorporates information contained in the foregoing, including the contents of any physical or electronic file that Neovasc may keep regarding CardiAQ, including the electronic CardiAQ folder referenced during trial (see Tr. Day 9 (Marko), 105:1-20; Ex. 1486 at 106:14-19). Neovasc must certify in writing that it has complied with t his paragraph of the Order.b. Within 7 days of this Order, Neovasc must return to CardiAQ any CardiAQ prototypes, or portions thereof, that CardiAQ provided to Neovasc and that Neovasc still has in its possession, custody, or control, includin g but not limited to prototypes fabricated by Neovasc to test any CardiAQ prototype design.3. Neovascs motion for a new trial on damages [ECF No. 522] is DENIED;4. Neovascs motion for a new trial on trade secrets 4-6 [ECF No. 521] is DE NIED;5. CardiAQ has shown by clear and convincing evidence that Dr. Quadri and Mr. Ratz contributed to the conception of U.S. Patent No. 8,579,964 and the Court therefore orders that Dr. Quadri and Mr. Ratz be added as inventors of U.S. Patent No. 8,579,964; and6. Neovascs motions for the Pro Hac Vice admission of new attorneys [ECF Nos. 571-573] are DENIED as MOOT.So Ordered. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 28, 2016 529 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered 511 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and 520 Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law are DENIED. 474 Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and 478 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law are terminated. (See attached Order) (Montes, Mariliz)
April 25, 2016 418 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Omnibus Memorandum and Order Resolving Motions to Exclude and Motions in Limine [ECF Nos. 340, 344, 345, 349, 351, 352, 354, 358]. (Folan, Karen)
November 6, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Accordingly, defendants' motion to dismiss (Docket No. 38 ) is, with respect to plaintiff's claim for correction of inventorship, ALLOWED, but is, with respect to plaintiff's claims for fraud and unfair and deceptive trade practices, DENIED. So ordered."(Moore, Kellyann)
October 3, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: "Accordingly, defendants' motion to transfer venue (Docket No. 19 ) is DENIED. So ordered."(Moore, Kellyann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CardiAQ Valve Technologies, Inc. v. Neovasc Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CardiAQ Valve Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Randall T. Weeks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neovasc Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neovasc Tiara Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?