Jacks v. Spencer et al
Plaintiff: James Jacks
Defendant: Luis Spencer, Thomas Dickhaut, James Saba, Carol Lawton and Denise McDonough
Case Number: 1:2014cv13072
Filed: July 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Norfolk
Presiding Judge: Marianne B. Bowler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: Plaintiff's Motion to File Nunc Pro Tunc His Notice of Appeal and to File a Reconsideration Motion of the Court's May 6, 2016 Order on Defendants' Motion t o Dismiss (Docket Entry # 40 ); Plaintiff's Motion for Release from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(B)(1), (6) and Reconsideration Rights or Alternatively to Nunc Pro Tunc His Rights to Appeal and Reconsideration [sic] Motion (Docket Entry # 43 ) . The remaining portion of the nunc pro tunc motion that requests an opportunity to file a motion to reconsider the May 2016 decision and "make appropriate filings nunc pro tunc" (Docket Entry # 40 ) as well as the motion for release from judgment under Rule 60(b)(1) and 60(b)(6) (Docket Entry # 43 ) are DENIED. REMARK: Docket Entry 49 mailed to Plaintiff on this date. (Patton, Christine)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Motion to File Nunc Pro Tunc His Notice of Appeal and to File a Reconsideration Motion of The Court's May 6, 2016 Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry # 40 ) PROCEDURAL ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Release from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(1), (6) and Reconsideration Rights or Alternatively to Nunc Pro Tunc His Rights to Appeal and Reconsideration [sic] Motion (Docket Entry # 43 ). The "motion to nunc pro-tunc his notice of appeal" (Docket Entry # 40 ), construed as a motion to reopen the time to file an appeal, is ALLOWED to the extent that plaintiff will have 14 days after the date this Orde r is entered to file a notice of appeal. With respect to the motion for release (Docket Entry # 43 ) and the remaining portion of the nunc pro tunc motion (Docket Entry # 40 ), defendants are ORDERED to file the above noted affidavit on or before December 5, 2016. (Patton, Christine)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT. The issues having been duly heard and decisions rendered by this court, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that plaintiff James Jacks take nothing and that this action be dismissed on the merits. (Patton, Christine)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER Re: Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry # 33 ). This court will convert the motion to a summary judgment motion under Rule 56. The parties are afforded up to and including March 31, 2016, to file any additional evidentiary material pertinent to the motion. (Patton, Christine)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacks v. Spencer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dickhaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Saba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?