ACQIS, LLC v. EMC Corporation
Plaintiff: ACQIS, LLC
Defendant: EMC Corporation
Case Number: 1:2014cv13560
Filed: September 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 389 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. (Montes, Mariliz)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re. 200 214 204 (Montes, Mariliz)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. "...In sum, the totality of the circumstances do not support extending the stay pending EMCs appeal of the IPR decisions. The Federal Circuit decision is unlikely to simplify this action to the extent the IPRs already have, and an additional delay of unknown duration will inflict greater harm on ACQIS than did the brief and fixed delay caused by the original stay. Accordingly, the stay is lifted and the parties should proceed with discovery. A scheduling conference has been set for August 18, 2016 at 2:00. The parties should submit a joint proposed schedule prior to the conference. So Ordered." (Folan, Karen)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered 80 EMCs Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review is GRANTED. This action is hereby stayed in its entirety until a decision is rendered in the IPRs. The parties shall promptly notify the Court of that occurrence, and the Court will set a conference to address the schedule going forward. (See attached Memorandum and Order) (Montes, Mariliz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACQIS, LLC v. EMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACQIS, LLC
Represented By: James P. Brogan
Represented By: George Edmond Chandler
Represented By: Thomas J Friel, Jr
Represented By: Michael Kirk Mathis
Represented By: Peter J. Sauer
Represented By: Wayne Odis Stacy
Represented By: W. Perry Zivley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Corporation
Represented By: Thomas A. Brown
Represented By: William R. Clark
Represented By: Nathan R. Curtis
Represented By: Nicholas Rylan Fung
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Greenbaum
Represented By: Krishnendu Gupta
Represented By: Benjamin Hershkowitz
Represented By: Josh A. Krevitt
Represented By: Matthew D. McGill
Represented By: Blair A. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?