LoConte et al v. Forest Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marlene T LoConte and Delana S Kiossovski
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv13848
Filed: October 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M. Gorton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: "For the foregoing reasons, plaintiffs objection to theruling by Magistrate Judge Bowler on plaintiffs motion tocompel (Docket No. 176) is OVERRULED and that ruling isAFFIRMED."Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02067-NMG, 1:14-cv-13848-NMG(Lima, Christine)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 218 Motion to Seal Document and to file two briefs with excess pages 221 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 225 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion &q uot;Motion to file document under seal is allowed; motion to file briefs in excess pages is allowed, in part, and denied, in part; plaintiff's oppositions to defendant's Daubert and summary judgment motions shall be limited to 30 pages each." (Caruso, Stephanie)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDERFor the foregoing reasons, plaintiffs motion to certify a class (Docket No. 137) is DENIED. So ordered. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02067-NMG, 1:14-cv-13848-NMG(Caruso, Stephanie) Modified on 8/15/2017 (Caruso, Stephanie).
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 65 for Protective Order, MOTION for Extension of Time of Fact Discovery Deadline ( Responses due by 7/1/2016) by Forest Laboratories, LLC, Forest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Caruso, Stephanie)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 72 Motion Modify Class Briefing Schedule by Delana S Kiossovski, Renee Ramirez. See Attached Order. (Caruso, Stephanie)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED MEMORANDUM & ORDER entered denying 53 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Caruso, Stephanie)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: MEMORANDUM & ORDER entered. The defendants 8 request for judicial notice is ALLOWED; and the defendants 11 motion to dismiss plaintiffs complaint is, with respect to Counts I, II, III and V as to plaintiff LoConte (the RICO, Chapter 93A and unjust enrichment claims as to plaintiff LoConte), ALLOWED, but is otherwise DENIED. Counts I, II, IV and V as to plaintiff Kiossovski survive defendants motion. (Danieli, Chris)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LoConte et al v. Forest Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene T LoConte
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delana S Kiossovski
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?