Arborjet, Inc. v. Rainbow Treecare Scientific Advancements, Inc.

Plaintiff: Arborjet, Inc.
Defendant: Rainbow Treecare Scientific Advancements, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv14129
Filed: November 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M. Gorton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 203 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation (Caruso, Stephanie)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED MEMORANDUM & ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 185 Motion for Permanent Injunction; denying 193 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Caruso, Stephanie)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Exhibit List, Witness List, Proposed Jury Instructions and Proposed Voir Dire due by 10/26/2015. Objections to Exhibit and Witness Lists and Proposed Voir Dire due by 10/28/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2015 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton.(Danieli, Chris)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: MEMORANDUM & ORDER entered denying 122 Motion Emergency MOTION TO ADVANCE MATTER FOR TRIAL AND FOR AN IMMEDIATE STATUS CONFERENCE TO MITIGATE THE PREJUDICE TO DEFENDANT CAUSED BY THE UNANTICIPATED DELAY FROM THE COURT'S RESCHEDULING OF THE TRIAL DATE by Rainbow Treecare Scientific Advancements, Inc. (Danieli, Chris)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: "For the foregoing reasons, the Court concludes that the plaintiff is entitled to injunctive relief as more fully described in the preliminary injunction attached hereto and plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (Docket No. 1 ) is therefore ALLOWED. So ordered."(Moore, Kellyann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arborjet, Inc. v. Rainbow Treecare Scientific Advancements, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow Treecare Scientific Advancements, Inc.
Represented By: Norman M. Abramson
Represented By: Matthew P. Horvitz
Represented By: Kelly W. Hoversten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arborjet, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Day
Represented By: Kristen S. Scammon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?