Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. v. President and Fellows of Harvard College et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. alleged that Defendant Harvard College employed and are employing racially and ethnically discriminatory policies and procedures in administering the undergraduate admissions program at Harvard College in violation of Title VI of the Civil Rights Act of 1964. As the result of such policies and procedures, plaintiff contended that Harvard holds Asian Americans to a far higher standard than other students, while also capping admissions of Asian Americans to a predetermined racial balance.

Plaintiff: Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.
Defendant: President and Fellows of Harvard College and The Honorable and Reverend The Board of Overseers
Case Number: 1:2014cv14176
Filed: November 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Denise J. Casper
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 676 USCA Case Number 19-2005 for 674 Notice of Appeal filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Paine, Matthew)
October 7, 2019 Filing 675 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 674 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 674 NOTICE OF APPEAL 672 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW 673 JUDGMENT by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-7910565 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/24/2019. (Consovoy, William) (Modified on 10/4/2019 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Document Link - Appealed Orders) (Paine, Matthew).
September 30, 2019 Filing 673 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. Judgment for the Defendant President and Fellows of Harvard College (Harvard Corporation).(McDonagh, Christina)
September 30, 2019 Filing 672 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (McDonagh, Christina)
August 27, 2019 Filing 670 USCA Judgment In Re: Lawrence L. Crawford. Appeal No. 18-8022. The petition is DISMISSED for want of jurisdiction. All pending motions are DENIED. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 22, 2019 Filing 671 Letter. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 16, 2019 Filing 669 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Andrew R. Varcoe (Varcoe, Andrew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 668 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Daniel Winik (Winik, Daniel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 667 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 1, 2019 Filing 666 Transcript of Closing Arguments held on February 13, 2019, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 7/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 10, 2019 Filing 665 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 663 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher Lapinig. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
June 10, 2019 Filing 664 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 662 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Laboni Hoq. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 663 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher Lapinig Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7721517 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth.(Sellstrom, Oren)
June 7, 2019 Filing 662 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Laboni Hoq Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7721447 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth.(Sellstrom, Oren)
June 4, 2019 Filing 661 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Lawrence Culleen on behalf of Nicole K. Ochi (Culleen, Lawrence)
May 16, 2019 Filing 660 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Lawrence Culleen on behalf of Brenda Shum (Culleen, Lawrence)
May 14, 2019 Filing 659 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Michael H. Park (Park, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 658 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 657 SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Fifteen held on November 2, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information:Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 656 Transcript of Bench Trial Day Fifteen (Closing Arguments) held on November 2, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information:Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 655 SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Fourteen held on November 1, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 654 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Fourteen held on November 1, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 653 SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Thirteen held on October 31, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 652 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Thirteen held on October 31, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 651 SEALED Transcript of Jury Trial - Day Twelve held on October 30, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 650 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Twelve held on October 30, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 649 SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Eleven held on October 29, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 648 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Eleven held on October 29, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 647 SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Ten held on October 26, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 646 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Ten held on October 26, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 645 SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Nine held on October 25, 2018, before First. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 644 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Nine held on October 25, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 643 SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Eight held on October 24, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 642 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Eight held on October 24, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 641 SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Seven held on October 23, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 640 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Seven held on October 23, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 639 SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Six held on October 22, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 638 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Six held on October 22, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 637 SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Five held on October 19, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 636 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Five held on October 19, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 4/18/2019 (Scalfani, Deborah).
April 18, 2019 Filing 635 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Four held on October 18, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 634 SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Three held on October 17, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 633 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Three held on October 17, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019.(Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 632 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Two held on October 16, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 631 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day One held on October 15, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 13, 2019 Filing 630 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Hearing re on arguments in support of proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law held on 2/13/2019. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
January 31, 2019 Filing 629 Hearing of arguments in support of proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law is rescheduled for February 13, 2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 17. This is a TIME change only. SFFA and Harvard may each have up to 60 minutes for argument. Amici groups "Students" and "Organizations" will each be allowed up to 15 minutes. See ECF No. 575 .(McDonagh, Christina)
January 23, 2019 Filing 628 Response by President and Fellows of Harvard College to 620 Proposed Findings of Fact . (Waxman, Seth)
January 23, 2019 Filing 627 Proposed Findings of Fact by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William)
January 9, 2019 Filing 626 Proposed Findings of Fact by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Culleen, Lawrence)
January 9, 2019 Filing 625 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae the Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al. in Support of Defendant. (Rodriguez, Madeleine)
January 9, 2019 Filing 624 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae Economists Michael Keane et al., in Support of Students for Fair Admissions . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Randall)
January 9, 2019 Filing 623 Proposed Findings of Fact by 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. (Lee, Jin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 622 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Asian American Coalition for Education AMICI CURIAE BRIEF OF THE ASIAN AMERICAN COALITION FOR EDUCATION AND THE ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL FOUNDATION, IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.. (Fauth, Gordon)
December 20, 2018 Filing 621 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 618 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
December 19, 2018 Filing 620 Proposed Findings of Fact by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2018: # 2 Unredacted Version, # 3 Appendix Unredacted Version) (McDonagh, Christina).
December 19, 2018 Filing 619 Proposed Findings of Fact by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Selected Exhibits)(Waxman, Seth)
December 18, 2018 Filing 618 Consent MOTION to Seal by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Consovoy, William)
November 14, 2018 Filing 617 NOTICE by President and Fellows of Harvard College Corrected Admitted Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 01)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
November 14, 2018 Filing 616 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 615 Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order (Folan, Karen)
November 13, 2018 Filing 615 Joint MOTION Entry of Scheduling Order by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Consovoy, William)
November 6, 2018 Filing 612 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Hearing on Arguments in support of proposed findings set for 2/13/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
November 5, 2018 Filing 611 NOTICE by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. Admitted Exhibit List (Mortara, Adam)
November 5, 2018 Filing 610 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Adam K Mortara (Mortara, Adam)
November 2, 2018 Filing 614 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 15 completed on 11/2/2018. Closing arguments by the parties. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
November 1, 2018 Filing 613 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 14 held on 11/1/2018. Testimony of David Card resumes. Marlyn McGrath sworn and testifies. Plaintiff rests. Drew Faust sworn and testifies. Deposition testimony read into the record. Defense rests. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
October 31, 2018 Filing 608 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 13 held on 10/31/2018. Testimony of David Card resumes. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
October 30, 2018 Filing 607 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 12 held on 10/30/2018. Ruth Simmons and David Card sworn and testify. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
October 30, 2018 Filing 605 Reply in Support of Admission of P438 and P588 by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. (Mortara, Adam) Modified on 11/1/2018 (McDonagh, Christina).
October 30, 2018 Filing 604 Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard in Response to Dkt. 602. (Waxman, Seth)
October 30, 2018 Filing 603 NOTICE by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. Offer of Proof of Deposition Designations (Mortara, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2018: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Filed under Seal), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal)) (McDonagh, Christina).
October 30, 2018 Filing 602 NOTICE by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. Bench Brief Regarding Exhibits D669 Through D730 (Mortara, Adam)
October 29, 2018 Filing 606 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 11 held on 10/29/2018. Margaret Chin, Sarah Cole, Catherine Ho, Cecelia Nunez, Thang Diep, Madison Trice, and Sally Chen all sworn and testify. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
October 29, 2018 Filing 598 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 596 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
October 27, 2018 Filing 597 NOTICE by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. of Deposition Designations Played in Court (Attachments: # 1 Script report)(Hacker, Katherine)
October 27, 2018 Filing 596 Assented to MOTION to Seal by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Hacker, Katherine)
October 26, 2018 Filing 609 Opposition to SFFA's Oral Motion to Admit P438 and P588 by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Folan, Karen)
October 26, 2018 Filing 601 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 10 held on 10/26/2018. Testimony of Peter Arcidiacono resumes. Deposition testimony read into the record. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
October 25, 2018 Filing 600 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 9 held on 10/25/2018. Peter Arcidiacono sworn and testifies. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
October 25, 2018 Filing 595 AFFIDAVIT of Lawrence Crawford re 591 Letter/request (non-motion) by Lawrence Crawford. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 24, 2018 Filing 599 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 8 held on 10/24/2018. Mark Hansen, Roger Banks, Charlene Kim, and Tia Ray sworn and testify. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
October 24, 2018 Filing 593 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot 588 Motion to Admit Exhibit P9 (Folan, Karen)
October 23, 2018 Filing 594 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 7 held on 10/23/2018. Rakesh Khurana, Michael Smith, and Elizabeth Yong sworn and testify. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
October 22, 2018 Filing 592 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 6 held on 10/22/2018. Richard Kahlenberg sworn and testifies. Marlyn McGrath testimony resumes. Rakesh Khurana sworn and testifies. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
October 22, 2018 Filing 591 Letter/request (non-motion) from Jahjah Al Mahdi. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 21, 2018 Filing 588 MOTION Admit Exhibit P9 by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Mortara, Adam)
October 19, 2018 Filing 590 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 5 held on 10/19/2018. Erica Bever testimony continues. Erin Driver-Linn and Marlyn McGrath sworn and testify. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
October 18, 2018 Filing 589 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 4 held on 10/18/2018. Dean Fitzsimmons testimony continues. Christopher Looby and Erica Bever sworn and testify. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
October 17, 2018 Filing 587 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 3 held on 10/17/2018. Testimony of William Fitzsimmons resumes. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
October 16, 2018 Filing 586 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 2 held on 10/16/2018. Testimony of William Fitzsimmons resumes. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
October 16, 2018 Filing 584 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 16, 2018 Filing 583 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Two held on October 16, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 11/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 16, 2018 Filing 582 Transcript of Bench Trial - Day One held on October 15, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 11/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 15, 2018 Filing 585 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 1 held on 10/15/2018. Opening statements by the parties. Dean William Fitzsimmons sworn and testifies. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
October 12, 2018 Filing 581 NOTICE by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth re 575 Memorandum & ORDER REGARDING TRIAL WITNESSES, REQUEST FOR DATE CERTAIN FOR STUDENT TESTIMONY, AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PRESENT ORAL OPENING STATEMENT (Culleen, Lawrence)
October 11, 2018 Filing 580 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Mueller on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Mueller, Joseph)
October 10, 2018 Filing 579 NOTICE by 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College re 575 Memorandum & ORDER Regarding Witnesses and Opening Statement (Thayer, Kenneth)
October 8, 2018 Filing 577 Request for Judicial Notice by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DX-13, # 2 Exhibit DX-40, # 3 Exhibit P500)(Mortara, Adam)
October 5, 2018 Filing 578 AFFIDAVIT of Lawrence Crawford re 576 Exhibit, by Lawrence Crawford. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4) *Note this is envelop 1 of 2.(McDonagh, Christina)
October 3, 2018 Filing 576 EXHIBIT 1 by Lawrence Crawford. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6) *Note that the envelop of this filing states that it is being made as 2 of 2 but Clerk's Office never received envelop 1 of 2 so there is no motion to link this to on the docket*(McDonagh, Christina)
October 3, 2018 Filing 575 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER(McDonagh, Christina)
October 3, 2018 Filing 574 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. As was more fully set forth during the October 3, 2018 pretrial conference, the parties motions in limine (MIL), see [ECF Nos. 546 , 547 ], are resolved as follows:SFFAs MIL No. 1 which sought to preclude Harvard from calling Edward Blum as a witness is denied as moot, see [ECF No. 571 ].SFFAs MIL No. 2 which sought to preclude evidence or argument regarding portions of application files relevant to personal ratings is denied with leave to renew or object at trial.SFFAs MIL No. 3 concerning the expected testimony of Dean Khurana is resolved as follows: Dean Khurana was not noticed as an expert and, therefore, may not be called as an expert witness. He may, however, testify as a percipient witness and based on his personal knowledge.Harvards MIL No.1 to exclude evidence concerning its early twentieth-century discrimination against Jewish applicants is granted in part and denied in part. In the interests of developing a complete factual record, but also recognizing the somewhat attenuated relevance, the Court will allow a very limited presentation of this topic including through exhibits, stipulations and direct and cross examination.Harvards MIL No. 2 to preclude evidence regarding Harvards invocation of the attorney-client privilege is denied with leave to renew or object at trial in recognition of the fact that there are proper and improper uses for the documents at issue. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 3, 2018 Filing 573 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/3/2018. Colloquy re: pending motions, trial schedule and logistics. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Folan, Karen)
October 2, 2018 Filing 572 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Final Pretrial Conference reset for 10/3/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. NOTICE IS FOR TIME CHANGE ONLY.(Folan, Karen)
October 1, 2018 Filing 571 Opposition re 546 MOTION in Limine filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Waxman, Seth)
October 1, 2018 Filing 570 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Mortara, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2018: # 8 Exhibit A1 (Filed Under Seal)) (McDonagh, Christina).
October 1, 2018 Filing 569 Opposition re 547 MOTION in Limine filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Mortara, Adam) (Attachment 6 replaced on 10/1/2018) (McDonagh, Christina). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2018: # 17 Unredacted Memorandum in Opposition (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 18 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal)) (McDonagh, Christina).
September 28, 2018 Filing 568 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 565 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
September 28, 2018 Filing 567 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Courts Summary Judgment Memorandum and Order ("Opinion") cites to several paragraphs in the parties submissions that were filed with redactions. The Court has concluded that two of these paragraphs must be filed without redactions. SFFA shall email the Court's docket clerk an updated version of its Statement of Material Fact [ECF No. 414 -2] with the redaction in 130 removed, and an updated version of its Counter Statement of Material Facts [ECF No. 452 ] with the redaction in its response to 73 removed. The Court finds "good cause" to maintain under seal the remaining redacted statements cited by the Opinion, which consist primarily of individuals' names and other personally identifiable information. Bradford & Bigelow, Inc. v. Richardson, 109 F. Supp. 3d 445, 447 (D. Mass. 2015). The parties disagree about whether there is sufficient cause to maintain partial or complete sealing of approximately 100 exhibits and numerous statements in the parties' submissions. See [ECF No. 422 at 21-24]. Given that the court has not relied on these materials in its Opinion and some of this information may become public during trial, the Court will defer deciding the issues raised by the parties' memoranda on sealing [ECF Nos. 422 , 427 ] until the conclusion of trial.(McDonagh, Christina)
September 28, 2018 Filing 566 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Accordingly, the cross-motions for summary judgment [ECF Nos. 412 , 417 ] are denied without prejudice. Consistent with this order, the parties may renew their arguments at trial. SO ORDERED. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 28, 2018 Filing 565 Consent MOTION to Seal by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
September 27, 2018 Filing 564 REPLY to Response to 532 MOTION To Participate In Trial filed by 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. (Holmes, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 563 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 562 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
September 27, 2018 Filing 562 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply by 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Reply)(Holmes, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 561 Response by President and Fellows of Harvard College to 497 Amicus brief filed, by the United States. (Waxman, Seth)
September 27, 2018 Filing 560 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 559 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
September 26, 2018 Filing 559 MOTION for Leave to File Response to the United States' Statement of Interest by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Response)(Waxman, Seth)
September 26, 2018 Filing 558 REPLY to Response to 518 MOTION Participate in Trial Proceedings filed by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Culleen, Lawrence)
September 26, 2018 Filing 555 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 551 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
September 21, 2018 Filing 551 Unopposed Motion for leave to File a Reply in regards to 518 MOTION Participate in Trial Proceedings filed by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Culleen, Lawrence) Modified on 9/25/2018 (McDonagh, Christina).
September 21, 2018 Filing 550 Opposition re 532 MOTION To Participate In Trial filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Hughes, John)
September 17, 2018 Filing 547 MOTION in Limine by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
September 17, 2018 Filing 546 MOTION in Limine by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Hughes, John)
September 17, 2018 Filing 545 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 539 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John J. Park Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 14, 2018 Filing 544 Letter/request (non-motion) from Jahjah T. Jishbite. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 14, 2018 Filing 543 Opposition re 518 MOTION Participate in Trial Proceedings filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Hughes, John)
September 14, 2018 Filing 542 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 540 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
September 14, 2018 Filing 541 RESPONSE to Motion re 518 MOTION Participate in Trial Proceedings , 532 MOTION To Participate In Trial filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth)
September 14, 2018 Filing 540 Assented to MOTION to Seal Portions of Pre-Trial Motions by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
September 13, 2018 Filing 539 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John J. Park, Jr. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7318306 by Center for Equal Opportunity, Reason Foundation, Southeastern Legal Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John J. Park, Jr.)(Lawrence, Douglass)
September 12, 2018 Filing 538 NOTICE of Appearance by Ara B. Gershengorn on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Gershengorn, Ara)
September 11, 2018 Filing 537 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 536 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Danielle Conley and Brittany Amadi. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 10, 2018 Filing 536 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Danielle Conley and Brittany Amadi Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7312062 by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Conley Certification in Support of Motion, # 2 Amadi Certification in Support of Motion)(Ellsworth, Felicia) Modified on 9/11/2018 (McDonagh, Christina).
September 10, 2018 Filing 535 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Frazier on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Frazier, Sarah)
September 10, 2018 Filing 534 NOTICE of Appearance by Earl A. Kirkland, III on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Kirkland, Earl)
September 10, 2018 Filing 533 NOTICE of Appearance by Janai S. Nelson on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Nelson, Janai)
September 7, 2018 Filing 532 MOTION To Participate In Trial by 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College.(Turnage Young, Michaele)
September 6, 2018 Filing 531 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Amici Curiae Professors of Economics Susan Dynarski, et al., in Support of Defendant. Amendment to 499 Amicus brief filed Amended Brief of Professors of Economics As Amici Curiae In Support of Defendant. (Ho, Derek)
September 6, 2018 Filing 530 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 527 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
September 6, 2018 Filing 529 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 528 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added J. Scott McBride, Katherine L.I. Hacker, Meg E. Fasulo, and Krista J. Perry. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 5, 2018 Filing 528 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Meg E. Fasulo, Katherine L.I. Hacker, J. Scott McBride, and Krista J. Perry Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7305513 by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Fasulo Certification, # 2 Hacker Certificaton, # 3 McBride Certification, # 4 Perry Certification, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Strawbridge, Patrick)
September 5, 2018 Filing 527 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Amicus Brief by Amici Curiae Professors of Economics Susan Dynarski, et al., in Support of Defendant. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Brief)(Ho, Derek)
September 4, 2018 Filing 526 NOTICE of Appearance by Cara McClellan on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (McClellan, Cara)
September 4, 2018 Filing 525 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Holmes on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Holmes, Jennifer)
September 4, 2018 Filing 524 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaele N. Turnage Young on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Turnage Young, Michaele)
September 4, 2018 Filing 523 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel M. Kleinman on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Kleinman, Rachel)
September 4, 2018 Filing 522 NOTICE of Appearance by Jin Hee Lee on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Lee, Jin)
September 4, 2018 Filing 521 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Spital on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Spital, Samuel)
September 4, 2018 Filing 520 NOTICE of Appearance by Sherrilyn A. Ifill on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Ifill, Sherrilyn)
September 4, 2018 Filing 519 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Sarah E. Harrington on behalf of Social Scientists and Scholars. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: List of Amici)(Harrington, Sarah)
August 31, 2018 Filing 518 MOTION Participate in Trial Proceedings by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth.(Culleen, Lawrence)
August 31, 2018 Filing 517 AMICUS BRIEF filed by 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Declaration)(Thayer, Kenneth)
August 31, 2018 Filing 516 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 503 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
August 31, 2018 Filing 515 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 507 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sarah Hinger. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 30, 2018 Filing 514 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Center for Equal Opportunity, Reason Foundation, Southeastern Legal Foundation in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. (Lawrence, Douglass)
August 30, 2018 Filing 513 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglass C. Lawrence on behalf of Southeastern Legal Foundation, Center for Equal Opportunity, Reason Foundation (Lawrence, Douglass)
August 30, 2018 Filing 512 DECLARATION re 510 Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 286, # 2 Exhibit 287)(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: # 3 Exhibit 286 (Unredacted Version FILED UNDER SEAL), # 4 Exhibit 287 (UNREDACTED VERSION FILED UNDER SEAL)) (McDonagh, Christina). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: # 5 Unredacted Declaration of Michael Connolly) (McDonagh, Christina).
August 30, 2018 Filing 511 Counter Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: # 1 Unredacted Response to Statement of Material Facts) (McDonagh, Christina).
August 30, 2018 Filing 510 REPLY to Response to 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: # 1 Unredacted Memorandum) (McDonagh, Christina).
August 30, 2018 Filing 509 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Student Record)(Culleen, Lawrence)
August 30, 2018 Filing 508 BRIEF by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Massachusetts, Inc. in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Judgment. (Segal, Matthew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 507 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sarah Hinger Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7298403 by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sarah Hinger in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Segal, Matthew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 506 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 501 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kenneth Kimerling. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 30, 2018 Filing 505 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 496 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
August 30, 2018 Filing 504 AMICUS BRIEF filed by 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Thayer, Kenneth)
August 30, 2018 Filing 503 MOTION for Leave to File to Participate as Amici Curiae by Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Association of Black Harvard Women, 21 Colorful Crimson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Declaration)(Thayer, Kenneth)
August 30, 2018 Filing 502 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae the Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al. in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Rodriguez, Madeleine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 501 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kenneth Kimerling Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7297870 by Amici Curiae the Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kenneth Kimerling)(Rodriguez, Madeleine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 500 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeleine K. Rodriguez on behalf of Amici Curiae the Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al. (Rodriguez, Madeleine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 499 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae Professors of Economics Susan Dynarski, et al., in Support of Defendant . (Ho, Derek)
August 30, 2018 Filing 498 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Tam Ho on behalf of Amici Curiae Professors of Economics Susan Dynarski, et al., in Support of Defendant (Ho, Derek)
August 30, 2018 Filing 497 AMICUS BRIEF filed by United States in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 417 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fitzsimmons Dep., # 2 Exhibit Ortiz Dep., # 3 Exhibit Smith (2nd) Dep.)(Donnelly, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: # 4 Unredacted Version of United States' Statement of Interest Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment) (McDonagh, Christina).
August 30, 2018 Filing 496 Assented to MOTION to Seal Statement of Interest by United States.(Donnelly, Matthew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 495 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 493 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Earl A. Kirkland III. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 30, 2018 Filing 494 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Social Scientists and Scholars in Support of Defendant. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix List of Amici)(Rosensweig, Richard)
August 29, 2018 Filing 493 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Earl A. Kirkland III Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7296869 by Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of Attorney Kirkland)(Thayer, Kenneth)
August 29, 2018 Filing 492 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 485 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
August 29, 2018 Filing 491 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 490 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sarah E. Harrington. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 29, 2018 Filing 490 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sarah E. Harrington Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7295782 by Social Scientists and Scholars. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, # 2 Exhibit List of Amici Curiae)(Rosensweig, Richard)
August 29, 2018 Filing 489 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Rosensweig on behalf of Social Scientists and Scholars (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rosensweig, Richard)
August 29, 2018 Filing 488 NOTICE of Appearance filed in error. Please see docket entry ECF 489
August 28, 2018 Filing 487 DECLARATION of Felicia H. Ellsworth ISO Defendant's Reply ISO Its Motion for Summary Judgment by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 159, # 2 Exhibit 160, # 3 Exhibit 161, # 4 Exhibit 162, # 5 Exhibit 163, # 6 Exhibit 164, # 7 Exhibit 165, # 8 Exhibit 166)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2018: # 9 Unredacted Memorandum, # 10 Exhibit 160 Unredacted Version (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 11 Exhibit 161 Unredacted Version (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 12 Exhibit 162 Unredacted Version (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 13 Exhibit 163 Unredacted Version (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 14 Exhibit 164 Unredacted Version (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 15 Exhibit 165 Unredacted Version (FILED UNDER SEAL)) (McDonagh, Christina).
August 28, 2018 Filing 486 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 483 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
August 28, 2018 Filing 485 Assented to MOTION to Seal by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
August 27, 2018 Filing 484 REPLY to Response to 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth)
August 27, 2018 Filing 483 MOTION to Seal Certain Information Filed in Connection with Harvard's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
August 16, 2018 Filing 482 REPLY to Response to 455 MOTION for Leave to File to Participate as Amici Curiae filed by Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. (Kleinman, Rachel)
August 16, 2018 Filing 481 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 480 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
August 16, 2018 Filing 480 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Reply to Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Amici Organizations' Motion to Participate as Amici Curiae)(Kleinman, Rachel)
August 13, 2018 Filing 479 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 455 MOTION for Leave to File to Participate as Amici Curiae filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hughes, John)
August 13, 2018 Filing 478 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Regarding the Submission of Trial Briefs. (Mortara, Adam)
August 6, 2018 Filing 477 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 474 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Emma Katherine Dinan. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for all hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 6, 2018 Filing 476 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 473 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Genevieve Bonadies Torres. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for all hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 6, 2018 Filing 475 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 472 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brenda Shum. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for all hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 6, 2018 Filing 474 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Emma Dinan Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7261880 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Cregor, Matthew)
August 6, 2018 Filing 473 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Genevieve Bonadies Torres Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7261863 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Cregor, Matthew)
August 6, 2018 Filing 472 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brenda Shum Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7261415 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # 1 Shum Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Cregor, Matthew)
August 3, 2018 Filing 471 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 3 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 4 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 5 Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 6 Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 7 Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 8 Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 9 Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 10 Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 11 Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 12 Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 13 Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 14 Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 15 Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 16 Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 17 Declaration)(Thayer, Kenneth)
August 1, 2018 Filing 470 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon M. Fauth, Jr on behalf of Asian American Coalition for Education, Asian American Legal Foundation (Fauth, Gordon)
August 1, 2018 Filing 469 NOTICE by Asian American Legal Foundation NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF LEE C. CHENG AS COUNSEL FOR AMICUS CURIAE THE ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL FOUNDATION (Fauth, Gordon)
July 31, 2018 Filing 468 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 457 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sherrilyn A. Ifill, Janai S. Nelson, Samuel Spital, Jin Hee Lee, Rachel M. Kleinman, Michaele N. Turnage Young, Jennifer A. Holmes, and Cara McClellan. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 31, 2018 Filing 467 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Asian American Coalition for Education, Asian American Legal Foundation . (Randazza, Marc)
July 31, 2018 Filing 466 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 461 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
July 31, 2018 Filing 465 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 455 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
July 31, 2018 Filing 464 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES by Amicus Parties Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0101-7253315. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Thayer, Kenneth)
July 31, 2018 Filing 463 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to 457 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sherrilyn A. Ifill, Janai S. Nelson, Samuel Spital, Jin Hee Lee, Rachel M. Kleinman, Michaele N. Turnage Young, Jennifer A. Holmes, and Cara McClellan by Amicus Parties Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0101-7253250. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Thayer, Kenneth)
July 31, 2018 Filing 462 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 459 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Gordon M. Fauth Jr. and Lee Cheng. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 30, 2018 Filing 461 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae 460 Out of Time by Asian American Coalition for Education, Asian American Legal Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randazza, Marc)
July 30, 2018 Filing 460 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Asian American Coalition for Education, Asian American Legal Foundation . (Randazza, Marc)
July 30, 2018 Filing 459 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gordon M. Fauth, Jr. and Lee Cheng Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7252337 by Asian American Legal Foundation, Asian American Coalition for Education. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cheng Certification, # 2 Exhibit Fauth Certification, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Randazza, Marc)
July 30, 2018 Filing 458 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Rebecca Cook on behalf of Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Cook, Kathryn)
July 30, 2018 Filing 457 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sherrilyn A. Ifill, Janai S. Nelson, Samuel Spital, Jin Hee Lee, Rachel M. Kleinman, Michaele N. Turnage Young, Jennifer A. Holmes, and Cara McClellan by Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Attorney Ifill, # 2 Certification of Attorney Nelson, # 3 Certification of Attorney Spital, # 4 Certification of Attorney Lee, # 5 Certification of Attorney Kleinman, # 6 Certification of Attorney Turnage Young, # 7 Certification of Attorney Holmes, # 8 Certification of Attorney McClellan)(Thayer, Kenneth)
July 30, 2018 Filing 456 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth N. Thayer on behalf of Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Thayer, Kenneth)
July 30, 2018 Filing 455 MOTION for Leave to File to Participate as Amici Curiae by Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Native Americans At Harvard College, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard Islamic Society, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief by Harvard Student and Alumni Organizations in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Declaration, # 15 Exhibit Declaration, # 16 Exhibit Declaration, # 17 Exhibit Declaration)(Thayer, Kenneth)
July 30, 2018 Filing 454 DECLARATION of Michael Connolly in Support of SFFA's Opposition to Harvard's Motion for Summary Judgment by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 262, # 2 Exhibit 263, # 3 Exhibit 264, # 4 Exhibit 265, # 5 Exhibit 266, # 6 Exhibit 267, # 7 Exhibit 268, # 8 Exhibit 269, # 9 Exhibit 270, # 10 Exhibit 271, # 11 Exhibit 272, # 12 Exhibit 273, # 13 Exhibit 274, # 14 Exhibit 275, # 15 Exhibit 276, # 16 Exhibit 277, # 17 Exhibit 278, # 18 Exhibit 279, # 19 Exhibit 280, # 20 Exhibit 281, # 21 Exhibit 282, # 22 Exhibit 283, # 23 Exhibit 284, # 24 Exhibit 285)(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2018: # 25 Unredacted DECLARATION of Michael Connolly in Support of SFFA's Opposition to Harvard's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filed Under Seal), # 26 Exhibit 262 (Filed Under Seal), # 27 Exhibit 263 (Filed Under Seal), # 28 Exhibit 264 (Filed Under Seal), # 29 Exhibit 265 (Filed Under Seal), # 30 Exhibit 266 (Filed Under Seal), # 31 Exhibit 267 (Filed Under Seal), # 32 Exhibit 268 (Filed Under Seal), # 33 Exhibit 269 (Filed Under Seal), # 34 Exhibit 270 (Filed Under Seal), # 35 Exhibit 271 (Filed Under Seal), # 36 Exhibit 272 (Filed Under Seal), # 37 Exhibit 273 (Filed Under Seal), # 38 Exhibit 274 (Filed Under Seal), # 39 Exhibit 275 (Filed Under Seal), # 40 Exhibit 276 (Filed Under Seal), # 41 Exhibit 277 (Filed Under Seal), # 42 Exhibit 278 (Filed Under Seal), # 43 Exhibit 279 (Filed Under Seal), # 44 Exhibit 280 (Filed Under Seal), # 45 Exhibit 281 (Filed Under Seal), # 46 Exhibit 282 (Filed Under Seal), # 47 Exhibit 283 (Filed Under Seal), # 48 Exhibit 284 (Filed Under Seal), # 49 Exhibit 285 (Filed Under Seal)) (McDonagh, Christina).
July 30, 2018 Filing 453 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 451 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James R. Conde, Adam R.F. Gustafson, C. Boyden Gray, Andrew R. Varcoe. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 30, 2018 Filing 452 Counter Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2018: # 1 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts (Filed under Seal)) (McDonagh, Christina).
July 30, 2018 Filing 451 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of C. Boyden Gray, Andrew R. Varcoe, Adam R.F. Gustafson, James R. Conde Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7251970 by Amici Curiae Economists Michael Keane et al., in Support of Students for Fair Admissions.(Clark, Randall)
July 30, 2018 Filing 450 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae Economists Michael Keane et al., in Support of Students for Fair Admissions . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Clark, Randall)
July 30, 2018 Filing 449 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2018: # 1 Memorandum of Reasons in Opposition to Harvard's Motion For Summary Judgment (Unredacted and Sealed)) (McDonagh, Christina).
July 30, 2018 Filing 448 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Randall B. Clark on behalf of Amici Curiae Economists Michael Keane et al., in Support of Students for Fair Admissions. (Clark, Randall) Modified to correct docket text on 7/30/2018 (McDonagh, Christina).
July 30, 2018 Filing 447 BRIEF by Walter Dellinger (Brief For Walter Dellinger As Amicus Curiae In Support Of Defendant On The Issue Of Standing). (Wisner, Joanne)
July 30, 2018 Filing 446 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 444 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Matthew S. Hellman. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 30, 2018 Filing 445 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Brown University, Case Western Reserve University, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, John Hopkins University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University in Support of Defendants. (Orkand, Seth)
July 30, 2018 Filing 444 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew S. Hellman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7251217 by Brown University, Case Western Reserve University, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, John Hopkins University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Matthew S. Hellman)(Orkand, Seth)
July 30, 2018 Filing 443 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Seth B. Orkand on behalf of Brown University, Case Western Reserve University, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, John Hopkins University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University. (Orkand, Seth)
July 30, 2018 Filing 442 AMICUS BRIEF filed by American Council on Education and 36 Other Higher Education Organizations in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Tidwell, Natashia)
July 30, 2018 Filing 441 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Natashia Tidwell on behalf of American Council on Education. (Tidwell, Natashia)
July 30, 2018 Filing 440 MEMORANDUM in Support re 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Student Declarations)(Culleen, Lawrence)
July 30, 2018 Filing 439 AMICUS BRIEF filed by National Association of Scholars . (Duncan, Dwight)
July 27, 2018 Filing 438 DECLARATION Declaration of Felicia H. Ellsworth ISO Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 98, # 2 Exhibit 99, # 3 Exhibit 100, # 4 Exhibit 101, # 5 Exhibit 102, # 6 Exhibit 103, # 7 Exhibit 104, # 8 Exhibit 105, # 9 Exhibit 106, # 10 Exhibit 107, # 11 Exhibit 108, # 12 Exhibit 109, # 13 Exhibit 110, # 14 Exhibit 111, # 15 Exhibit 112, # 16 Exhibit 113, # 17 Exhibit 114, # 18 Exhibit 115, # 19 Exhibit 116, # 20 Exhibit 117, # 21 Exhibit 118, # 22 Exhibit 119, # 23 Exhibit 120, # 24 Exhibit 121, # 25 Exhibit 122, # 26 Exhibit 123, # 27 Exhibit 124, # 28 Exhibit 125, # 29 Exhibit 126, # 30 Exhibit 127, # 31 Exhibit 128, # 32 Exhibit 129, # 33 Exhibit 130, # 34 Exhibit 131, # 35 Exhibit 132, # 36 Exhibit 133, # 37 Exhibit 134, # 38 Exhibit 135, # 39 Exhibit 136, # 40 Exhibit 137, # 41 Exhibit 138, # 42 Exhibit 139, # 43 Exhibit 140, # 44 Exhibit 141, # 45 Exhibit 142, # 46 Exhibit 143, # 47 Exhibit 144, # 48 Exhibit 145, # 49 Exhibit 146, # 50 Exhibit 147, # 51 Exhibit 148, # 52 Exhibit 149, # 53 Exhibit 150, # 54 Exhibit 151, # 55 Exhibit 152, # 56 Exhibit 153, # 57 Exhibit 154, # 58 Exhibit 155, # 59 Exhibit 156, # 60 Exhibit 157, # 61 Exhibit 158)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2018: # 62 SEALED Declaration of Felicia H. Ellsworth in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 63 Exhibit 98 Unredacted Version, # 64 Exhibit 101 Unredacted Version, # 65 Exhibit 102 Unredacted Version) (McDonagh, Christina). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2018: # 66 Exhibit 105 Unredacted Version, # 67 Exhibit 119 Unredacted Version, # 68 Exhibit 128 Unredacted Version, # 69 Exhibit 151 Unredacted Version, # 70 Exhibit 158 Unredacted Version) (McDonagh, Christina).
July 27, 2018 Filing 437 Counter Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2018: # 1 SEALED Response to Statement of Material Facts) (McDonagh, Christina).
July 27, 2018 Filing 436 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Dwight G. Duncan on behalf of National Association of Scholars. (Duncan, Dwight)
July 27, 2018 Filing 435 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2018: # 1 SEALED Oppostion to Motion for Summary Judgment) (McDonagh, Christina).
July 26, 2018 Filing 434 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 433 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
July 26, 2018 Filing 433 Assented to MOTION to Seal by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
July 24, 2018 Filing 432 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In response to the parties' joint statement regarding the submission of amicus briefs [ECF No. 429], the Court hereby grants leave for any interested party to file an amicus brief on the pending dispositive motions, in accordance with the deadlines set forth in the Court's order dated May 23, 2018 [ECF No. 404]. (Folan, Karen)
July 24, 2018 Filing 431 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 430 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
July 24, 2018 Filing 430 MOTION to Seal Certain Information Filed in Connection with Harvard's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 24, 2018 Filing 429 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Regarding the Submission of Amicus Briefs. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
July 2, 2018 Filing 428 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 425 Motion to Unseal Document (Folan, Karen)
June 29, 2018 Filing 427 Opposition re 410 Joint MOTION to Seal Certain Information Filed in Connection with the Parties' Summary Judgment Motions filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: # 1 SEALED Memorandum of Law (unredacted)) (McDonagh, Christina).
June 29, 2018 Filing 426 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 424 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
June 28, 2018 Filing 425 MOTION to Unseal Document by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
June 27, 2018 Filing 424 Assented to MOTION to Seal Portions of SFFA's Opposition to Harvard's Motion to Seal by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
June 27, 2018 Filing 423 Letter/request (non-motion) from Sean D. Reyes Utah Attorney General. (McDonagh, Christina)
June 22, 2018 Filing 422 MEMORANDUM in Support re 410 Joint MOTION to Seal Certain Information Filed in Connection with the Parties' Summary Judgment Motions filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robin Worth)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
June 15, 2018 Filing 421 DECLARATION re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit 66, # 67 Exhibit 67, # 68 Exhibit 68, # 69 Exhibit 69, # 70 Exhibit 70, # 71 Exhibit 71, # 72 Exhibit 72, # 73 Exhibit 73, # 74 Exhibit 74, # 75 Exhibit 75, # 76 Exhibit 76, # 77 Exhibit 77, # 78 Exhibit 78, # 79 Exhibit 79, # 80 Exhibit 80, # 81 Exhibit 81, # 82 Exhibit 82, # 83 Exhibit 83, # 84 Exhibit 84, # 85 Exhibit 85, # 86 Exhibit 86, # 87 Exhibit 87, # 88 Exhibit 88, # 89 Exhibit 89, # 90 Exhibit 90, # 91 Exhibit 91, # 92 Exhibit 92, # 93 Exhibit 93, # 94 Exhibit 94, # 95 Exhibit 95, # 96 Exhibit 96, # 97 Exhibit 97, # 98 Exhibit 98, # 99 Exhibit 99, # 100 Exhibit 100, # 101 Exhibit 101, # 102 Exhibit 102, # 103 Exhibit 103, # 104 Exhibit 104, # 105 Exhibit 105, # 106 Exhibit 106, # 107 Exhibit 107, # 108 Exhibit 108, # 109 Exhibit 109, # 110 Exhibit 110, # 111 Exhibit 111, # 112 Exhibit 112, # 113 Exhibit 113, # 114 Exhibit 114, # 115 Exhibit 115, # 116 Exhibit 116, # 117 Exhibit 117, # 118 Exhibit 118, # 119 Exhibit 119, # 120 Exhibit 120, # 121 Exhibit 121, # 122 Exhibit 122, # 123 Exhibit 123, # 124 Exhibit 124, # 125 Exhibit 125, # 126 Exhibit 126, # 127 Exhibit 127, # 128 Exhibit 128, # 129 Exhibit 129, # 130 Exhibit 130, # 131 Exhibit 131, # 132 Exhibit 132, # 133 Exhibit 133, # 134 Exhibit 134, # 135 Exhibit 135, # 136 Exhibit 136, # 137 Exhibit 137, # 138 Exhibit 138, # 139 Exhibit 139, # 140 Exhibit 140, # 141 Exhibit 141, # 142 Exhibit 142, # 143 Exhibit 143, # 144 Exhibit 144, # 145 Exhibit 145, # 146 Exhibit 146, # 147 Exhibit 147, # 148 Exhibit 148, # 149 Exhibit 149, # 150 Exhibit 150, # 151 Exhibit 151, # 152 Exhibit 152, # 153 Exhibit 153, # 154 Exhibit 154, # 155 Exhibit 155, # 156 Exhibit 156, # 157 Exhibit 157, # 158 Exhibit 158, # 159 Exhibit 159, # 160 Exhibit 160, # 161 Exhibit 161, # 162 Exhibit 162, # 163 Exhibit 163, # 164 Exhibit 164, # 165 Exhibit 165, # 166 Exhibit 166, # 167 Exhibit 167, # 168 Exhibit 168, # 169 Exhibit 169, # 170 Exhibit 170, # 171 Exhibit 171, # 172 Exhibit 172, # 173 Exhibit 173, # 174 Exhibit 174, # 175 Exhibit 175, # 176 Exhibit 176, # 177 Exhibit 177, # 178 Exhibit 178, # 179 Exhibit 179, # 180 Exhibit 180, # 181 Exhibit 181, # 182 Exhibit 182, # 183 Exhibit 183, # 184 Exhibit 184, # 185 Exhibit 185, # 186 Exhibit 186, # 187 Exhibit 187, # 188 Exhibit 188, # 189 Exhibit 189, # 190 Exhibit 190, # 191 Exhibit 191, # 192 Exhibit 192, # 193 Exhibit 193, # 194 Exhibit 194, # 195 Exhibit 195, # 196 Exhibit 196, # 197 Exhibit 197, # 198 Exhibit 198, # 199 Exhibit 199, # 200 Exhibit 200, # 201 Exhibit 201, # 202 Exhibit 202, # 203 Exhibit 203, # 204 Exhibit 204, # 205 Exhibit 205, # 206 Exhibit 206, # 207 Exhibit 207, # 208 Exhibit 208, # 209 Exhibit 209, # 210 Exhibit 210, # 211 Exhibit 211, # 212 Exhibit 212, # 213 Exhibit 213, # 214 Exhibit 214, # 215 Exhibit 215, # 216 Exhibit 216, # 217 Exhibit 217, # 218 Exhibit 218, # 219 Exhibit 219, # 220 Exhibit 220, # 221 Exhibit 221, # 222 Exhibit 222, # 223 Exhibit 223, # 224 Exhibit 224, # 225 Exhibit 225, # 226 Exhibit 226, # 227 Exhibit 227, # 228 Exhibit 228, # 229 Exhibit 229, # 230 Exhibit 230, # 231 Exhibit 231, # 232 Exhibit 232, # 233 Exhibit 233, # 234 Exhibit 234, # 235 Exhibit 235, # 236 Exhibit 236, # 237 Exhibit 237, # 238 Exhibit 238, # 239 Exhibit 239, # 240 Exhibit 240, # 241 Exhibit 241, # 242 Exhibit 242, # 243 Exhibit 243, # 244 Exhibit 244, # 245 Exhibit 245, # 246 Exhibit 246, # 247 Exhibit 247, # 248 Exhibit 248, # 249 Exhibit 249, # 250 Exhibit 250, # 251 Exhibit 251, # 252 Exhibit 252, # 253 Exhibit 253, # 254 Exhibit 254, # 255 Exhibit 255, # 256 Exhibit 256, # 257 Exhibit 257, # 258 Exhibit 258, # 259 Exhibit 259, # 260 Exhibit 260, # 261 Exhibit 261)(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2018: # 262 Unredacted version of Declaration, # 263 Exhibit 1 (filed under seal), # 264 Exhibit 2 (filed under seal), # 265 Exhibit 5 (filed under seal), # 266 Exhibit 6 (filed under seal), # 267 Exhibit 7 (filed under seal), # 268 Exhibit 8 (filed under seal), # 269 Exhibit 9 (filed under seal), # 270 Exhibit 10 (filed under seal)) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2018: # 271 Exhibit 11 (filed under seal), # 272 Exhibit 12(filed under seal), # 273 Exhibit 13 (filed under seal), # 274 Exhibit 14 (filed under seal), # 275 Exhibit 16 (filed under seal), # 276 Exhibit 17(filed under seal), # 277 Exhibit 18(filed under seal), # 278 Exhibit 19 (filed under seal), # 279 Exhibit 20 (filed under seal), # 280 Exhibit 22 (filed under seal), # 281 Exhibit 23 (filed under seal), # 282 Exhibit 24 (filed under seal), # 283 Exhibit 25(filed under seal), # 284 Exhibit 26 (filed under seal), # 285 Exhibit 28 (filed under seal), # 286 Exhibit 29 (filed under seal), # 287 Exhibit 31 (filed under seal), # 288 Exhibit 32 (filed under seal), # 289 Exhibit 33 (filed under seal), # 290 Exhibit 35 (filed under seal), # 291 Exhibit 36 (filed under seal), # 292 Exhibit 37 (filed under seal), # 293 Exhibit 38(filed under seal), # 294 Exhibit 39 (filed under seal), # 295 Exhibit 40 (filed under seal), # 296 Exhibit 41, # 297 Exhibit 42 (filed under seal), # 298 Exhibit 43 (filed under seal), # 299 Exhibit 44(filed under seal), # 300 Exhibit 45 (filed under seal), # 301 Exhibit 46 (filed under seal), # 302 Exhibit 47 (filed under seal), # 303 Exhibit 48 (filed under seal), # 304 Exhibit 51 (filed under seal)) (Montes, Mariliz).
June 15, 2018 Filing 420 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth)
June 15, 2018 Filing 419 DECLARATION re 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit 66, # 67 Exhibit 67, # 68 Exhibit 68, # 69 Exhibit 69, # 70 Exhibit 70, # 71 Exhibit 71, # 72 Exhibit 72, # 73 Exhibit 73, # 74 Exhibit 74, # 75 Exhibit 75, # 76 Exhibit 76, # 77 Exhibit 77, # 78 Exhibit 78, # 79 Exhibit 79, # 80 Exhibit 80, # 81 Exhibit 81, # 82 Exhibit 82, # 83 Exhibit 83, # 84 Exhibit 84, # 85 Exhibit 85, # 86 Exhibit 86, # 87 Exhibit 87, # 88 Exhibit 88, # 89 Exhibit 89, # 90 Exhibit 90, # 91 Exhibit 91, # 92 Exhibit 92, # 93 Exhibit 93, # 94 Exhibit 94, # 95 Exhibit 95, # 96 Exhibit 96, # 97 Exhibit 97)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
June 15, 2018 Filing 418 MEMORANDUM in Support re 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth)
June 15, 2018 Filing 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
June 15, 2018 Filing 416 DECLARATION re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Expert Report, # 2 Exhibit Rebuttal Expert Report, # 3 Exhibit Supplemental Report)(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2018: # 5 Exhibit A- unredacted version) (Montes, Mariliz).
June 15, 2018 Filing 415 DECLARATION re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Expert Report, # 2 Exhibit Rebuttal Expert Report, # 3 Errata Errata)(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2018: # 4 Unredacted version of Declaration of P. Arcidiacono, # 5 Exhibit A- unredacted version, # 6 Exhibit B-unredacted version) (Montes, Mariliz).
June 15, 2018 Filing 414 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2018: # 1 Unredacted version of Statement of Material Facts) (Montes, Mariliz).
June 15, 2018 Filing 413 MEMORANDUM in Support re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2018: # 1 Unredacted version of Memorandum in Support) (Montes, Mariliz).
June 15, 2018 Filing 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Consovoy, William)
June 14, 2018 Filing 411 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 410 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
June 13, 2018 Filing 410 Joint MOTION to Seal Certain Information Filed in Connection with the Parties' Summary Judgment Motions by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
June 12, 2018 Filing 409 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 408 JOINT scheduling motion. (Folan, Karen)
June 12, 2018 Filing 408 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Ellsworth, Felicia)
June 11, 2018 Filing 407 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 406 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Parties are nonetheless encouraged to adhere to the limits set forth in Local Rule 7.1(b)(4) to the extent possible and to limit repetition between the various briefs. Further, given the potential volume of the submissions and the impending trial date, the court further orders as follows: a summary judgment motion shall include a separately filed Statement of Undisputed Facts which details, in numbered paragraphs, the material facts that the moving party contends are undisputed and entitle the movant to judgment as a matter of law. Only those facts which bear on dispositive material issues shall be included in this statement. Oppositions shall include a separate filing of a statement of material facts, responding to each numbered paragraph in the movants Statement of Undisputed Facts, which the respondent contends present genuine issues for trial. The responding party shall also set forth, in separate numbered paragraphs, any additional facts which the respondent contends preclude the entry of summary judgment. Statements of material facts in support of or in opposition to a motion for summary judgment shall include specific references to the parts of the record that support each stated fact. Each stated fact shall cite the source relied upon, including the page of any document or line and page number of any deposition to which reference is made. If both parties are moving for summary judgment, the parties may also submit one joint Statement of Undisputed Facts or include a separate joint submission of facts that are truly undisputed to the extent that that may make sense. In light of the number of pages that are likely to be submitted and the scheduled trial date, the parties are encouraged to work together to find ways in which the information, particularly undisputed facts, can be presented to the court as efficiently as possible. (Folan, Karen)
June 8, 2018 Filing 406 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
May 23, 2018 Filing 405 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Bench Trial set for 10/15/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs.(McDonagh, Christina)
May 23, 2018 Filing 404 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. As discussed at the hearing held on April 10, 2018 ECF No. 402 , the Court orders the following:1. The deadlines for amicus briefing on dispositive motions ECF No. 387 are amended as follows. Amicus briefs in support of a dispositive motion shall be filed by July 30, 2018. Amicus briefs in opposition to a dispositive motion shall be filed by August 30, 2018. 2. Prior to June 15, 2018, the parties shall meet and confer and propose a procedure for the Court to determine whether any dispositive motion briefing and/or exhibits filed under seal should remain sealed.(McDonagh, Christina)
April 12, 2018 Filing 403 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 12, 2018 Filing 402 Transcript of Status Conference held on April 10, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 5/3/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 12, 2018 Filing 401 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 400 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Adam K. Mortara & John M. Hughes. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
April 11, 2018 Filing 400 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adam K. Mortara and John M. Hughes Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7090675 by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Cert. of Attorney Mortara, # 2 Cert. of Attorney Hughes, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Strawbridge, Patrick)
April 10, 2018 Filing 399 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Benjamin C. Caldwell (Caldwell, Benjamin)
April 9, 2018 Filing 398 Letter/request (non-motion) from Students, Amici Curiae Regarding Confidential Materials. (Greenbaum, Jon)
April 9, 2018 Filing 397 Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard Regarding Confidential Materials. (Lee, William)
April 6, 2018 Filing 396 Response by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. to 389 Letter/request (non-motion) . (Consovoy, William)
April 6, 2018 Filing 395 NOTICE by United States of Interest in Public Access to Summary Judgment Briefing and Materials (Donnelly, Matthew)
April 6, 2018 Filing 394 Leave to file granted on April 6, 2018 Letter/request (non-motion) from Amici Curiae . (Schutz, Sigmund)
April 6, 2018 Filing 393 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 391 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
April 6, 2018 Filing 392 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G. Penley on behalf of New England First Amendment Coalition; Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press; Massachusetts Newspaper Publishers Association; GateHouse Media, LLC (Penley, Eric)
April 6, 2018 Filing 391 MOTION for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae by New England First Amendment Coalition; Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press; Massachusetts Newspaper Publishers Association; GateHouse Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter Brief)(Schutz, Sigmund)
April 6, 2018 Filing 390 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Sigmund David Schutz on behalf of New England First Amendment Coalition; Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press; Massachusetts Newspaper Publishers Association; GateHouse Media, LLC. (Schutz, Sigmund)
March 30, 2018 Filing 389 Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard Regarding Confidential Materials. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
March 30, 2018 Filing 388 Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA re: Treatment of Materials Marked Confidential . (Consovoy, William)
March 14, 2018 Filing 387 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Upon review of the parties' joint status report filed on March 9, 2018 ECF No. 386 , the Court orders the following: 1. Dispositive motions shall be filed and briefed in accordance with the operative scheduling order ECF No. 363 . 2. Amicus briefs in support of a dispositive motion shall be filed by July 13, 2018. Amicus briefs in opposition to a dispositive motion shall be filed by August 17, 2018.3. The parties shall meet and confer regarding the treatment of confidential materials to narrow the areas of dispute. The parties shall file letter briefs on the outstanding issues by March 30, 2018, and a hearing is scheduled for April 10, 2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs.4. By the agreement of the parties, the Court will bifurcate the issues of liability and remedies. Remedies will be addressed after the disposition of dispositive motions and/or trial on liability. 5. The Court is considering scheduling trial for four weeks beginning the week of January 2, 2019. The parties may address the trial schedule at the hearing on April 10, 2018.(McDonagh, Christina)
March 9, 2018 Filing 386 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report on behalf of all parties) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William)
February 21, 2018 Filing 385 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 21, 2018 Filing 384 Transcript of Hearing held on February 7, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 3/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 7, 2018 Filing 382 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Hearing held on 2/7/2018. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
January 29, 2018 Filing 380 Receipt of Defendant's unredacted documents for in camera review, pursuant to 377 Order. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 25, 2018 Filing 379 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 378 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
January 25, 2018 Filing 378 Assented to MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of SFFA's Motion to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
January 24, 2018 Filing 377 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Motion Hearing on Motion to compel set for 2/7/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Defendant to provide the court with unredacted copies of all documents at issue noting the proposed redactions 7 days prior to hearing.(Folan, Karen)
January 23, 2018 Filing 376 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 375 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
January 23, 2018 Filing 375 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of SFFA's Motion to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
January 17, 2018 Filing 372 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 371 Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
January 17, 2018 Filing 371 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Opposition to SFFA's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld or Redacted by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
December 28, 2017 Filing 370 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT APPROVING 369 Stipulation to extend time to file opposition to motion to compel filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College (Folan, Karen)
December 27, 2017 Filing 369 STIPULATION to Enlarge Time to file an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
December 22, 2017 Filing 366 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 365 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
December 21, 2017 Filing 365 Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Motion to Compel Regarding Harvard's Privilege Log by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
September 22, 2017 Filing 364 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 363 Motion to Amend scheduling order (Folan, Karen)
September 20, 2017 Filing 363 Joint MOTION to Amend 335 Order on Motion to Amend,,, Scheduling Order by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
August 31, 2017 Filing 360 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court is in receipt of letters from both parties. [ECF Nos. 355, 359]. Despite the fact that discovery had closed and SFFA had used all of its allotted party depositions, the Court allowed one additional deposition to go forward with the understanding that SFFA would bear all of the reasonable associated expenses, including Harvard's attorneys' fees. [ECF No. 351]. SFFA has not presented compelling grounds to reconsider that decision. The estimate provided by Harvard is not unreasonable on its face. SFFA may challenge the reasonableness of the fees and costs after they have accrued or forego the deposition, which again appears to seek information that is marginal, duplicative, and disproportionate.(Montes, Mariliz)
August 31, 2017 Filing 359 Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard in Response to Aug. 23, 2017 Letter from SFFA . (Ellsworth, Felicia)
August 28, 2017 Filing 358 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 357 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
August 25, 2017 Filing 357 Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Reply in Support of its Letter Motion Regarding Summary Sheets by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
August 23, 2017 Filing 355 Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA . (Strawbridge, Patrick)
August 11, 2017 Filing 354 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 353 Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
August 11, 2017 Filing 353 MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Response to SFFA's Letter Motion regarding Summary Sheets by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
August 7, 2017 Filing 351 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court is very reluctant to allow SFFA the additional deposition that it now seeks. [ECF No. 344]. The discovery period has ended. Further, the potential deponent clearly qualifies as a party, and SFFA has used all of its allotted party depositions. The testimony sought seems largely duplicative of information already obtained and of marginal utility. The Court would be well within its bounds to decline the request for the above reasons as well as other reasons set forth by Harvard in its opposition [ECF No. 347]. That being said, the Court is equally reluctant to force this case to go forward without a fully developed factual record, particularly where there is only one additional deposition sought and where Harvard arguably should have disclosed the name of the deponent earlier. Out of an abundance of caution and trying to fairly balance the interests of the parties, the Court will allow the deposition to go forward under the following conditions: the deposition will be limited to two (2) hours and will take place at a location and time convenient for the deponent and Harvard, with SFFA to bear all the costs of the deposition, including reasonable attorneys fees and costs incurred by Harvard. See San Francisco Health Plan v. McKesson Corp., 264 F.R.D. 20, 21 (D. Mass. 2010) (ordering party seeking additional depositions to pay associated costs because a balance must be struck between upholding the limitations of the rule and the reasons for those limitations on the one hand and counsel's judgment as to the needs of his or her case on the other). Alternatively, the parties can agree on a different format, including allowing the deponent to respond to written questions. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 7, 2017 Filing 350 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 349 Plaintiff's Assented-To Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Letter Motion Regarding Summary Sheets (Montes, Mariliz)
August 7, 2017 Filing 349 Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Letter Motion Regarding Summary Sheets by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
August 3, 2017 Filing 346 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 345 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
August 3, 2017 Filing 345 Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Reply in Support of its August 1, 2017 Request for Judicial Intervention and Relief by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
August 2, 2017 Filing 343 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 342 Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
August 2, 2017 Filing 342 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Response to SFFA's August 1, 2017 Letter by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
August 2, 2017 Filing 341 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 340 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
August 1, 2017 Filing 340 Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Request for Judicial Intervention and Relief by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
July 11, 2017 Filing 339 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On July 7, 2017, SFFA requested that the Court order certain witness depositions to be taken on a weekend or, alternatively, that those depositions be quashed. [ECF No. 338]. Although the Court strongly urges the parties to work to accommodate witness schedules, the Court will not require that depositions be taken on a weekend over the objection of either party. Further, an unwillingness to take depositions over a weekend does not justify quashing the depositions in their entirety.(Folan, Karen)
July 7, 2017 Filing 338 Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA to Judge Burroughs (Emergency Request for Judicial Intervention and Relief re: scheduling dispute) . (Strawbridge, Patrick)
June 28, 2017 Filing 336 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Fact Discovery to be completed by 8/4/2017, Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2018, Oppositions due by 7/30/2018, Replies due by 8/30/2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
June 27, 2017 Filing 335 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 334 Motion to Amend. In light of the Court's extension of the fact discovery deadline until August 4, 2017 [ECF No. 326], the September 1, 2016 Scheduling Order [ECF No. 180] is amended as follows. Plaintiffs experts shall be designated and the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) shall be disclosed by October 3, 2017. Defendants experts shall be designated and the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) shall be disclosed by December 2, 2017. Plaintiffs rebuttal expert reports shall be disclosed by January 16, 2018. Defendants rebuttal expert reports shall be disclosed by February 26, 2018. All expert discovery, including expert depositions, shall be completed by May 1, 2018. All dispositive motions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 shall be filed by June 15, 2018. Opposition briefs shall be filed by July 30, 2018. Reply briefs shall be filed by August 30, 2018. (Folan, Karen)
June 27, 2017 Filing 334 Joint MOTION to Amend September 1, 2016 Amended Scheduling Order by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
June 21, 2017 Filing 332 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 331 Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
June 21, 2017 Filing 331 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Letter to the Court regarding June 6, 2017 Discovery Order by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
June 16, 2017 Filing 329 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 327 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
June 16, 2017 Filing 327 Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Reply Letter in support of its Letter Motion regarding Performance Reports by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
June 2, 2017 Filing 325 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. "...Accordingly, Harvards motion for partial judgment on the pleadings as to Count IV and VI [ECF No. 185] is GRANTED. SO ORDERED."(Folan, Karen)
June 2, 2017 Filing 324 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. "...Accordingly, Harvards motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction [ECF No. 187] is DENIED. SO ORDERED."(Folan, Karen)
May 31, 2017 Filing 323 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 322 Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
May 31, 2017 Filing 322 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Response Letter to SFFA's Letter Motion regarding Performance Reports by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 30, 2017 Filing 321 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered re 320 Stipulation, filed by Boston Public Schools, Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. (Folan, Karen)
May 26, 2017 Filing 320 STIPULATION re 307 Order on Motion to Quash,,,,, (Joint Stipulation between SFFA and Boston Latin School re: SFFA's Subpoena for Documents and Testimony) by Boston Public Schools, Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Benjamin)
May 24, 2017 Filing 319 Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA in response to Harvard's letter of May 23 regarding stay of discovery deadlines. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
May 23, 2017 Filing 318 Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard in Response to the May 19, 2017 Letter 315 from SFFA. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 22, 2017 Filing 316 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 314 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
May 19, 2017 Filing 315 Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA requesting stay of discovery deadlines. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
May 19, 2017 Filing 314 Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA'S Letter Motion Requesting Production of Performance Reports by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
May 11, 2017 Filing 312 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 311 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
May 10, 2017 Filing 311 Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Reply in Support of its Letter Motion Regarding Depositions and Custodians by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
May 9, 2017 Filing 307 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Boston Latin's motion to quash SFFA's subpoena to BLS [ECF No. 272] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. BLS will not be required to produce documents or information that were prepared by or shared with Harvard. However, BLS is hereby ordered to produce the following: (1) documents from the Relevant Period prepared by BLS concerning the racial composition of applicants, admitted persons, or enrollees to Harvard, excluding documents that merely aggregate statistical information; (2) all internal communications from the Relevant Period by or among BLS employees or agents regarding Harvard's use of race in the admissions process; (3) any documents from the Relevant Period that describe any alleged discrimination by Harvard against persons of Asian descent in the college admissions process; and (4) all non-privileged communications during the Relevant Period concerning SFFA or this litigation. Furthermore, SFFA may depose a BLS representative. The motion to quash is otherwise granted. This is meant to minimize the burden on non-party BLS, while also ensuring the availability of information and the integrity of the discovery process. (Montes, Mariliz) Modified on 5/9/2017 NEF Regenerated.(Montes, Mariliz).
May 5, 2017 Filing 306 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying as moot 304 Motion to Seal. (Folan, Karen)
May 5, 2017 Filing 305 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. SFFAs motions to quash certain subpoenas [ECF Nos. 255, 260] are DENIED. SFFA failed to meet its burden under Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(d)(3). Because of the broad understanding of what constitutes relevant discovery, it is very unusual for a court to prohibit the taking of a deposition altogether. Green v. Cosby, 152 F. Supp. 3d 31, 35 (D. Mass. 2015), modified on reconsideration on other grounds, 160 F. Supp. 3d 431 (D. Mass. 2016) (quoting E.E.O.C. v. FreudenbergNOK Gen. P'ship, No. 07 Civ. 406, 2009 WL 909571, at *3 (D.N.H. Apr. 3, 2009)). Moreover, at this stage, the Court will not unduly fetter the parties ability to develop a complete factual record. (Folan, Karen)
May 5, 2017 Filing 304 Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Emergency Application by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
May 2, 2017 Filing 303 Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA to Judge Burroughs Requesting Status Conference This Week to Address Urgent Discovery Matters . (Strawbridge, Patrick)
May 1, 2017 Filing 302 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 300 Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
April 28, 2017 Filing 301 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 299 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
April 28, 2017 Filing 300 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Response Letter to SFFA's April 12, 2017 Letter Motion re Depositions and Custodians by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
April 27, 2017 Filing 299 Assented to MOTION to Seal Reply Memoranda in Support of SFFA's Two Pending Motions to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
April 27, 2017 Filing 298 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 295 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
April 26, 2017 Filing 295 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memoranda in Support of SFFA's Two Pending Motions to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
April 20, 2017 Filing 294 Opposition re 272 First MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena to BLS filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Subpoena to Boston Latin School, # 2 Notice of Subpoena to Thomas Jefferson High School for Science and Technology, # 3 Notice of Subpoena to Stuyvesant High School, # 4 Notice of Subpoena to Monta Vista High School)(Strawbridge, Patrick)
April 19, 2017 Filing 293 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 292 Harvard's Assented- Motion to File Under Seal Harvard's Oppositions to SFFA's Motions to Compel (Montes, Mariliz)
April 18, 2017 Filing 292 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Oppositions to SFFA's Motions to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents and Application Files by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
April 14, 2017 Filing 291 Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard in Response to Letter from SFFA (Dkt. 288). (Ellsworth, Felicia)
April 12, 2017 Filing 288 Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA to Judge Burroughs Requesting Conference. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
April 11, 2017 Filing 283 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 282 Plaintiff's Assented-To Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Letter Motion Regarding Depositions and Custodians. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 11, 2017 Filing 282 Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Letter Motion Regarding Depositions and Custodians by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
April 10, 2017 Filing 281 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 280 Plaintiff's Assented-to Motion to File Under Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for a Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notices (Montes, Mariliz)
April 10, 2017 Filing 280 Assented to MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of SFFA's Motion for a Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notices by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
April 10, 2017 Filing 279 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 275 Assented-To Motion to Under Seal Two Motions to Compel; granting 278 Plaintiff's Assented-To Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for a Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notices ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 10, 2017 Filing 278 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of SFFA's Motion for a Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notices by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
April 10, 2017 Filing 277 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket 272 corrected by detaching memorandum and it's exhibit and re-docketing as a separate docket entry. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 7, 2017 Filing 275 Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Motions to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
April 6, 2017 Filing 276 MEMORANDUM in Support of 272 First MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena to BLS filed by Boston Public Schools. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Montes, Mariliz)
April 6, 2017 Filing 272 First MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena to BLS by Boston Public Schools.(Seich, Jennifer) (Main Document 272 replaced on 4/10/2017) (Montes, Mariliz).
April 3, 2017 Filing 271 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 270 Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
April 3, 2017 Filing 270 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document SFFA's Reply in Support of its Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Deposition Notices or for a Protective Order by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
April 3, 2017 Filing 269 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 268 Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
April 3, 2017 Filing 268 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Opposition to SFFA's Motion for a Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notices by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
April 3, 2017 Filing 267 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 265 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
March 31, 2017 Filing 265 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of SFFA's Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Deposition Notices or for a Protective Order by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
March 29, 2017 Filing 264 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 263 Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
March 28, 2017 Filing 263 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Opposition to SFFA's Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Deposition Notices or For a Protective Order by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
March 21, 2017 Filing 259 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 258 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
March 21, 2017 Filing 258 Assented to MOTION to Seal Motion for a Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notices by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
March 15, 2017 Filing 254 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 253 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
March 13, 2017 Filing 253 Assented to MOTION to Seal Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Deposition Notices or for a Protective Order by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
March 13, 2017 Filing 252 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered granting 251 Motion for Order. (Folan, Karen)
March 13, 2017 Filing 251 Assented to MOTION for Order to Produce Applicant Files by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Application Files)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
February 8, 2017 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth C. Mooney on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Mooney, Elizabeth)
February 8, 2017 Filing 249 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Dulberg on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Dulberg, Andrew)
February 3, 2017 Filing 246 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 245 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
February 2, 2017 Filing 245 Joint MOTION to Seal Letters Regarding Production Of Reviewer Comments by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
January 18, 2017 Filing 244 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered 230 Motion for Leave to Participate As Amici Curiae is GRANTED. The students J.F. and M.A. are allowed to participate in this matter as amici curiae alongside the current amici curiae and under the same terms and conditions. [ECF No. 52]. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 5, 2017 Filing 240 Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA regarding discovery matters. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
January 3, 2017 Filing 239 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 238 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
January 3, 2017 Filing 238 Assented to MOTION to Seal Reply Memoranda in Support of SFFA's Two Pending Motions to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
December 22, 2016 Filing 237 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 236 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
December 22, 2016 Filing 236 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memoranda in Support of SFFA's Two Pending Motions to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
December 19, 2016 Filing 232 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 231 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
December 19, 2016 Filing 231 MOTION to Seal Oppositions to SFFA's Motions to Compel by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
December 12, 2016 Filing 230 MOTION for Leave to File to Participate as Amici Curiae by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Culleen, Lawrence)
December 12, 2016 Filing 229 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 228 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Nicole K. Ochi. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (Montes, Mariliz)
December 12, 2016 Filing 228 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nicole Gon Ochi Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6410623 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Declaration)(Cregor, Matthew)
December 5, 2016 Filing 223 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 222 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
December 1, 2016 Filing 222 Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Motions to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
November 8, 2016 Filing 220 REPLY to Response to 187 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Redacted) filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2016: # 1 Sealed Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Montes, Mariliz).
November 4, 2016 Filing 219 DECLARATION re Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2016: # 6 Exhibit A (sealed)) (Montes, Mariliz).
November 4, 2016 Filing 218 REPLY to Response to 185 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Counts IV and VI filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth)
November 3, 2016 Filing 217 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 213 Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
November 3, 2016 Filing 216 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 212 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
November 3, 2016 Filing 215 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 211 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
November 3, 2016 Filing 213 MOTION to Seal Document Reply Memorandum and Exhibit in Support of Motion to Dismiss by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
November 3, 2016 Filing 212 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
November 3, 2016 Filing 211 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
November 1, 2016 Filing 210 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 209 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
November 1, 2016 Filing 209 Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Unredacted Letter to J. Burroughs and accompanying documents by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
October 24, 2016 Filing 206 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 201 Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
October 21, 2016 Filing 205 DECLARATION re 204 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Redacted) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit B (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit C (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit D (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit E (Redacated), # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J (Redacted), # 11 Exhibit K (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit L (Redacted), # 13 Exhibit M (Redacted), # 14 Exhibit N (Redacted), # 15 Exhibit O (Redacted), # 16 Exhibit P (Redacted), # 17 Exhibit Q (Redacted), # 18 Exhibit R (Redacted), # 19 Exhibit S (Redacted), # 20 Exhibit T (Redacted), # 21 Exhibit U)(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2016: # 22 Sealed Version: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, # 23 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit A to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # 24 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit B to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # 25 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit C to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # 26 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit D to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # 27 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit E to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # 28 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit F to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # 29 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit G to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # 30 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit H to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # 31 Sealed Exhibit I to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # 32 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit J to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # 33 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit K to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # 34 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit L to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # 35 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit M to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # 36 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit N to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # 37 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit O to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # 38 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit P to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # 39 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit Q to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # 40 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit R to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # 41 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit S to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # 42 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit T to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # 43 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit U to Declaration of W. S. Convoy) (Montes, Mariliz).
October 21, 2016 Filing 204 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 187 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Redacted) filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2016: # 1 Sealed MEMORANDUM in Opposition 187 MOTION to Dismiss) (Montes, Mariliz).
October 21, 2016 Filing 203 DECLARATION re 202 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Redacted))(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2016: # 2 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit to the Declaration of William S. Consovoy) (Montes, Mariliz).
October 21, 2016 Filing 202 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 185 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Counts IV and VI (Redacted) filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2016: # 1 Sealed- Memorandum in Opposition for Judgment on the Pleadings) (Montes, Mariliz).
October 20, 2016 Filing 201 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document (Opposition Memorandums and Supporting Materials) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
October 20, 2016 Filing 200 Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard regarding document production. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
October 19, 2016 Filing 199 MEMORANDUM in Support re 185 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Counts IV and VI filed by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Culleen, Lawrence)
October 6, 2016 Filing 197 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT APPROVING 196 Stipulation to Enlarge Time to File an Opposition, filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. (Folan, Karen)
October 5, 2016 Filing 196 STIPULATION re 187 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 185 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Counts IV and VI (Stipulation to Enlarge Time to File an Opposition) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Caldwell, Benjamin)
October 3, 2016 Filing 194 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 3, 2016 Filing 193 Transcript of Status Conference held on September 6, 2016, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com Redaction Request due 10/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah)
September 30, 2016 Filing 192 Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA in Response to Harvard's Letter of September 29, 2016. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
September 29, 2016 Filing 191 Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard in response to SFFA's letter/request (Dkt. 189). (Waxman, Seth)
September 26, 2016 Filing 190 MEMORANDUM in Support re 187 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Redacted) filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2016: # 1 (Unredacted) Memorandum in Supp.) (Montes, Mariliz).
September 26, 2016 Filing 189 Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA in response to motions filed by Harvard. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
September 23, 2016 Filing 188 DECLARATION re 187 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2016: # 10 Exhibit A (unredacted), # 11 Exhibit B (unredacted), # 12 Exhibit C (unredacted), # 13 Exhibit E (unredcted), # 14 Exhibit F (unredacted), # 15 Exhibit G (unredacted)) (Montes, Mariliz).
September 23, 2016 Filing 187 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
September 23, 2016 Filing 186 MEMORANDUM in Support re 185 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Counts IV and VI filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth)
September 23, 2016 Filing 185 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Counts IV and VI by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
September 23, 2016 Filing 184 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 183 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
September 22, 2016 Filing 183 Assented to MOTION to Seal Memorandum and Supporting Materials in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
September 7, 2016 Filing 181 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER on Various Discovery Disputes entered. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 6, 2016 Filing 182 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 9/6/2016. Colloquy re: pending motion, discovery issues, depositions, confidentiality designations. (Court Reporter: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Folan, Karen)
September 1, 2016 Filing 180 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2016; Fact Discovery to be completed by 6/20/2017 Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 1, 2016 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Oren M. Sellstrom on behalf of M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth (Sellstrom, Oren)
August 31, 2016 Filing 178 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 177 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Daniel Winik. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 30, 2016 Filing 177 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel Winik Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6270154 by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
August 29, 2016 Filing 176 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 9/6/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Status Conference to address disputed issues with respect to Harvard's production of various databases.(Folan, Karen)
August 11, 2016 Filing 175 Letter/request (non-motion) from Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. . (Strawbridge, Patrick)
August 4, 2016 Filing 174 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 4, 2016 Filing 173 Transcript of Status Conference held on July 20, 2016, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com Redaction Request due 8/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 28, 2016 Filing 172 Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA to Judge Burroughs responding to Harvard's 7.27.16 Letter . (Strawbridge, Patrick)
July 27, 2016 Filing 171 Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard regarding Scope of Discovery. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 20, 2016 Filing 170 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 7/20/2016. Colloquy re: discovery. (Court Reporter: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com.)(Attorneys present: Consovoy, Ellsworth, Waxman, Strawbridge, Cregor) (Folan, Karen)
July 20, 2016 Filing 167 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 166 Motion to Seal SFFA's Unredacted Letter to J. Burroughs by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 20, 2016 Filing 166 MOTION to Seal SFFA's Unredacted Letter to J. Burroughs by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
July 19, 2016 Filing 165 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 164 Motion to Seal. (Folan, Karen)
July 19, 2016 Filing 164 Assented to MOTION to Seal Unredacted Letter by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 11, 2016 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Cregor on behalf of M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth (Cregor, Matthew)
July 8, 2016 Filing 160 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 159 Motion to Seal Document. (Folan, Karen)
July 8, 2016 Filing 159 MOTION to Seal Document (SFFA's letter to Judge Burroughs dated 7.8.16) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
July 8, 2016 Filing 158 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 157 Defendant's Motion to File Under Seal Defendant's Unredacted Letter Regarding Implication of Fisher II for this Litigation. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 8, 2016 Filing 157 MOTION to Seal Letter by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
June 27, 2016 Filing 156 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 7/20/2016 03:15 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
June 17, 2016 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Lee on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Lee, William)
May 18, 2016 Filing 154 Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard Regarding Discovery of SFFA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Yoga Source v. Choudhury, # 2 Exhibit SFFA Articles of Incorporation and Bylaws)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 10, 2016 Filing 153 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 10, 2016 Filing 152 Transcript of Status Conference held on April 29, 2016, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 5/31/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 29, 2016 Filing 151 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 4/29/2016. Parties will have two weeks after Fisher to file a letter to the court. Colloquy re: discovery dispute. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: various) (Folan, Karen)
April 29, 2016 Filing 150 Letter/request (non-motion) from Students for Fair Admissions . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ex A, # 2 Exhibit Ex B, # 3 Affidavit Ex C, # 4 Affidavit Ex D, # 5 Affidavit Ex E)(Consovoy, William)
April 22, 2016 Filing 149 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 148 Motion to Continue Status Conference set for 4/29/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
April 21, 2016 Filing 148 MOTION to Continue Status Conference of April 25, 2016 to April 29, 2016 (UNOPPOSED) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
April 15, 2016 Filing 147 Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard Regarding Discovery of SFFA . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
March 11, 2016 Filing 146 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: STAY ORDER entered. ( Status Conference set for 4/25/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs.)(Folan, Karen)
March 4, 2016 Filing 144 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
March 4, 2016 Filing 143 Transcript of Status Conference held on February 25, 2016, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com Redaction Request due 3/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
March 3, 2016 Filing 142 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 141 Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
March 2, 2016 Filing 141 MOTION to Seal Document (SFFA's Reply to Harvard's February 29, 2016 Letter) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
March 1, 2016 Filing 139 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 138 Defendant's Motion to File Under Seal Harvard's February 29, 2016 letter (Montes, Mariliz)
February 29, 2016 Filing 138 MOTION to Seal Document Feb. 29, 2016 Letter to Court regarding Database Fields by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
February 25, 2016 Filing 137 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 2/25/2016. Colloquy re: production of documents, protective order. (Further Status Conference set for 3/30/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs.). (Court Reporter: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com.)(Attorneys present: Park, Caldwell, Strawbridge, Ellsworth, Fox) (Folan, Karen)
February 22, 2016 Filing 136 Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard regarding SFFA's February 1, 2016 Letter . (Ellsworth, Felicia)
February 10, 2016 Filing 135 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 134 Motion to Seal Document. (Folan, Karen)
February 10, 2016 Filing 134 MOTION to Seal Document (SFFA's Reply to Harvard's February 5, 2016 Letter) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2016: # 1 Exhibit) (Folan, Karen).
February 9, 2016 Filing 132 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Dockets 65 , 118 and 124 corrected: documents were replaced by counsel with identical documents, as he noticed the redacted material (from the original documents), was compromised as a result of hidden metadata. (Montes, Mariliz)
February 8, 2016 Filing 131 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 130 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
February 5, 2016 Filing 130 MOTION to Seal Response to SFFA's Jan. 27, 2016 Letter by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
February 3, 2016 Filing 129 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 3, 2016 Filing 128 Transcript of Status Conference held on January 28, 2016, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com Redaction Request due 2/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 2, 2016 Filing 126 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 125 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Document (Montes, Mariliz)
February 1, 2016 Filing 125 MOTION to Seal Document (SFFA's letter to Judge Burroughs dated 2.1.16) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
February 1, 2016 Filing 124 Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA to Judge Burroughs . (Caldwell, Benjamin) (Main Document 124 replaced on 2/9/2016) (Montes, Mariliz).
January 28, 2016 Filing 123 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 1/28/2016. Colloquy re: discovery. ( Further Status Conference set for 2/25/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs.). (Court Reporter: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com.)(Attorneys present: Park, Caldwell, Strawbridge, Waxman, Ellsworth) (Folan, Karen)
January 27, 2016 Filing 121 Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard In Response to Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA . (Ellsworth, Felicia)
January 27, 2016 Filing 120 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 119 Motion to Seal Document. (Folan, Karen)
January 27, 2016 Filing 119 MOTION to Seal Document (SFFA's Letter to Judge Burroughs) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
January 27, 2016 Filing 118 Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA to Judge Burroughs . (Caldwell, Benjamin)
January 7, 2016 Filing 117 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 1/28/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
December 31, 2015 Filing 116 MANDATE of USCA as to 60 Notice of Appeal filed by G. E., K. C., R. S., Keyanna Wigglesworth, Sarah Cole, Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Fadhal Moore, M. B., Y. D., Arjini Kumari Nawal, I. G., R. H., A. G., J. L.. Appeal 60 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
December 9, 2015 Filing 115 USCA Judgment as to 60 Notice of Appeal filed by G. E., K. C., R. S., Keyanna Wigglesworth, Sarah Cole, Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Fadhal Moore, M. B., Y. D., Arjini Kumari Nawal, I. G., R. H., A. G., J. L. AFFIRMED. (Paine, Matthew)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 OPINION of USCA as to 60 Notice of Appeal filed by G. E., K. C., R. S., Keyanna Wigglesworth, Sarah Cole, Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Fadhal Moore, M. B., Y. D., Arjini Kumari Nawal, I. G., R. H., A. G., J. L.. (Paine, Matthew)
October 30, 2015 Filing 113 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production (ECF No. 64) is DENIED as MOOT with leave to renew. The issue of whether a sample of alumni interviewers should be identified and/or deposed will be addressed at a status conference to be held shortly following the First Circuit's decision regarding intervention. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 23, 2015 Filing 112 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. re 110 Order on Motion to Stay,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,, . (Strawbridge, Patrick)
October 23, 2015 Filing 111 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by President and Fellows of Harvard College Regarding The Proposed Scope Of Discovery During A Stay Pending Resolution Of Fisher II. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
October 9, 2015 Filing 110 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered The Proposed Defendant-Intervenors Motion to Stay [ECF No. 90] is ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and Harvards Motion to Stay [ECF No. 58] is also ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as set forth in the accompanying Order. And in light of the Court's ruling, Harvards Emergency Motion for a Protective Order and a Temporary Stay of Depositions [ECF No. 104] is DENIED AS MOOT. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 7, 2015 Filing 109 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 103 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael H. Park. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (Folan, Karen)
October 1, 2015 Filing 108 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket 104 corrected by detaching Memorandum and re-filing it as a separate docket entry. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 1, 2015 Filing 106 DECLARATION re 105 Opposition to Motion for Protective Order by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Strawbridge, Patrick)
October 1, 2015 Filing 105 Opposition re 104 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
September 30, 2015 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM in Support re 104 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 30, 2015 Filing 104 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Ellsworth Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Ellsworth Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Ellsworth Declaration)(Ellsworth, Felicia) Modified on 10/1/2015 (Montes, Mariliz).
September 28, 2015 Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5765135 by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of Michael H. Park, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Sanford, Paul)
September 1, 2015 Filing 102 Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA Requesting Telephonic Conference . (Strawbridge, Patrick)
August 18, 2015 Filing 101 SUR-REPLY to Motion re 64 MOTION to Compel Production filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
August 18, 2015 Filing 100 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 97 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
August 17, 2015 Filing 99 RESPONSE to Motion re 90 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
August 14, 2015 Filing 98 Opposition re 90 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
August 14, 2015 Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Memorandum In Opposition to SFFA's Motion to Compel by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
August 7, 2015 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. re 95 Declaration re 94 Reply to Response to Motion to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc... (Caldwell, Benjamin)
August 7, 2015 Filing 95 DECLARATION re 94 Reply to Response to Motion to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Benjamin)
August 7, 2015 Filing 94 REPLY to Response to 64 MOTION to Compel Production filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Caldwell, Benjamin)
August 7, 2015 Filing 93 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 92 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 6, 2015 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Reply Memo, # 2 Declaration of Patrick Strawbridge)(Caldwell, Benjamin)
August 5, 2015 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM in Support re 90 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Lane, Priya)
August 5, 2015 Filing 90 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth.(Lane, Priya)
July 31, 2015 Filing 89 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket 87 corrected by detaching Addendum from Declaration and re-filing it as an attachment. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 30, 2015 Filing 88 DECLARATION re 86 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel (McGrath) by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 30, 2015 Filing 87 DECLARATION re 86 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel (McCrary) by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Ellsworth, Felicia) (Main Document 87 replaced on 7/31/2015) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2015: # 1 Addendum) (Montes, Mariliz).
July 30, 2015 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 64 MOTION to Compel Production filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 30, 2015 Filing 85 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 30, 2015 Filing 84 Transcript of Status Conference held on July 21, 2015, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. COA Case No. 15-1823. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com Redaction Request due 8/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/28/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 28, 2015 Filing 83 Supplemental Opposition re 58 MOTION to Stay filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
July 28, 2015 Filing 82 NOTICE by President and Fellows of Harvard College re 58 MOTION to Stay - Supplemental Submission (Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 23, 2015 Filing 79 DECLARATION re 78 Reply to Response to Motion to Stay by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 23, 2015 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to 58 MOTION to Stay filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 21, 2015 Filing 77 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: granting 72 Motion to Seal; granting 73 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Status Conference held on 7/21/2015; (Court Reporter: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com.)(Attorneys present: Sanford, Consovoy, Strawbridge, Waxman, Ellsworth, Gershengorn) (Folan, Karen)
July 21, 2015 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Priya A. Lane on behalf of M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth (Lane, Priya)
July 21, 2015 Filing 75 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Rahsaan D. Hall (Hall, Rahsaan)
July 21, 2015 Filing 74 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Status Conference set for 7/21/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. NOTICE IS FOR COURTROOM LOCATION CHANGE ONLY.(Folan, Karen)
July 21, 2015 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Stay by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 21, 2015 Filing 72 MOTION to Seal by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 20, 2015 Filing 71 Opposition re 58 MOTION to Stay filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
July 17, 2015 Filing 70 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 67 Motion to Seal (Montes, Mariliz)
July 17, 2015 Filing 67 MOTION to Seal Exhibit and Unredacted Memorandum of Law Associated with Motion to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
July 16, 2015 Filing 66 DECLARATION re 65 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Caldwell, Benjamin)
July 16, 2015 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Support re 64 MOTION to Compel Production filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Caldwell, Benjamin)
July 16, 2015 Filing 64 MOTION to Compel Production by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
July 15, 2015 Filing 63 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The clerk's office has received a request to video record this hearing as part of the "Cameras in the Courtroom" project. Counsel are directed to the district court web site at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/general/cameras.html to determine if they wish to consent to video recording. Responses are due July 20, 2015. A RESPONSE FROM EACH PARTY IS REQUIRED. (Hurley, Virginia)
July 14, 2015 Filing 62 USCA Case Number 15-1823 for 60 Notice of Appeal filed by G. E., K. C., R. S., Keyanna Wigglesworth, Sarah Cole, Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Fadhal Moore, M. B., Y. D., Arjini Kumari Nawal, I. G., R. H., A. G., J. L.. (Paine, Matthew)
July 14, 2015 Filing 61 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 60 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
July 13, 2015 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 52 Order on Motion to Intervene, by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-5656193 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 8/3/2015. (Hall, Rahsaan)
July 6, 2015 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Support re 58 MOTION to Stay filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Waxman, Seth)
July 6, 2015 Filing 58 MOTION to Stay by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
July 1, 2015 Filing 57 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 56 Motion to Continue. Status Conference reset for 7/21/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
June 30, 2015 Filing 56 MOTION to Continue Status Conference (UNOPPOSED) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
June 25, 2015 Filing 55 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. STIPULATION PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS(Montes, Mariliz)
June 25, 2015 Filing 54 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered The parties' Joint Motion for Protective Order 53 is hereby ALLOWED, and the parties' Stipulated Protective Order is approved. However, given the lack of specificity in Paragraphs 10 and 13 regarding the use of protected documents during public proceedings, the Court reserves the right to allow, after notice to the parties, the disclosure of any document or information covered by the Protective Order or to modify the Protective Order at any time in the interests of justice and to ensure that any proceeding before this Court is fair, efficient, and consistent with the public interest. (Montes, Mariliz)
June 25, 2015 Filing 53 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
June 15, 2015 Filing 52 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER enteredMEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON PROPOSED DEFENDANT-INTERVENORS' MOTION TO INTERVENE the Proposed Intervenors Motion to Intervene 30 is DENIED; however, the Proposed Intervenors are granted leave to participate in this action as amici curiae. (Montes, Mariliz)
May 27, 2015 Filing 51 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Steven L. Mayer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (Folan, Karen)
May 27, 2015 Filing 50 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Nancy L. Perkins. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (Folan, Karen)
May 27, 2015 Filing 49 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lawrence Culleen. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (Folan, Karen)
May 26, 2015 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Steven L. Mayer Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5572070 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit)(Hall, Rahsaan)
May 26, 2015 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nancy L. Perkins Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5572061 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Af)(Hall, Rahsaan)
May 26, 2015 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lawrence Culleen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5572007 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit)(Hall, Rahsaan)
May 26, 2015 Filing 45 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jon M. Greenbaum. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (Folan, Karen)
May 19, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 19, 2015 Filing 43 Transcript of Status Conference held on April 30, 2015, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com Redaction Request due 6/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 18, 2015 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to 39 MOTION for Leave to File REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO INTERVENE filed by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Hall, Rahsaan)
May 18, 2015 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. re 36 Notice of Appearance of Patrick Strawbridge. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
May 15, 2015 Filing 40 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 39 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
May 15, 2015 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO INTERVENE by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Reply)(Hall, Rahsaan)
May 13, 2015 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re 30 MOTION to Intervene In Defense of Harvard's Admission Policy filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth)
May 13, 2015 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Intervene In Defense of Harvard's Admission Policy filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William)
May 13, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Strawbridge on behalf of Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
May 4, 2015 Filing 35 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Amended Pleadings due by 9/25/2015. Discovery to be completed by 4/1/2016 Motions due by 10/13/2016(Folan, Karen)
April 30, 2015 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Scheduling Conference held on 4/30/2015. Colloquy re: motion to intervene. Responses will be filed within 2 weeks. Colloquy re: applications. Colloquy re: discovery schedule. Scheduling order to issue. (Court Reporter: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com.)(Attorneys present: Sanford, Consovoy, Caldwell, Waxman, Ellsworth) (Folan, Karen)
April 29, 2015 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Rahsaan D. Hall on behalf of M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth (Hall, Rahsaan)
April 29, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jon M. Greenbaum Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5535156 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit)(Hall, Rahsaan)
April 29, 2015 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Support re 30 MOTION to Intervene In Defense of Harvard's Admission Policy filed by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declarations of Proposed Defendant-Intervenors, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Answer)(Hall, Rahsaan)
April 29, 2015 Filing 30 MOTION to Intervene In Defense of Harvard's Admission Policy by Sarah Cole, Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth, M. B., K. C., Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., R. S..(Hall, Rahsaan)
April 29, 2015 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference reset for 4/30/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. NOTICE IS FOR COURTROOM LOCATION CHANGE ONLY.(Folan, Karen)
April 23, 2015 Filing 28 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Sanford, Paul)
April 23, 2015 Filing 27 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3). (Ellsworth, Felicia)
April 23, 2015 Filing 26 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel pursuant to Federal Rule 26(f) and Local Rule 16.1(d). (Sanford, Paul)
March 18, 2015 Filing 25 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 24 Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference reset for 4/30/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
March 16, 2015 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION to Continue Intial Scheduling Conference to 04/30/2015 by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
March 13, 2015 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference RESET for 4/23/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
March 12, 2015 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs added. Judge Denise J. Casper no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly)
March 3, 2015 Filing 21 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 20 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
March 2, 2015 Filing 20 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference (UNOPPOSED) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
February 19, 2015 Filing 19 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
February 19, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
February 18, 2015 Filing 17 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
January 9, 2015 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant The Board of Overseers of Harvard College Only by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Sanford, Paul)
December 23, 2014 Filing 15 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Debo P. Adegbile. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy)
December 22, 2014 Filing 14 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to 2/18/15 by President and Fellows of Harvard College (Hourihan, Lisa)
December 19, 2014 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Seth P. Waxman, Paul R.Q. Wolfson, and Debo P. Adegbile Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-5332406 by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Seth P. Waxman, # 2 Certification of Paul R.Q. Wolfson, # 3 Certification of Debo P. Adegbile)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
December 19, 2014 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 18, 2015 to Respond to the Complaint by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
December 19, 2014 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
December 19, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Felicia H. Ellsworth on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Ellsworth, Felicia)
December 4, 2014 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. President and Fellows of Harvard College waiver sent on 11/20/2014, answer due 1/19/2015. (Sanford, Paul)
November 18, 2014 Filing 8 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William S. Consovoy, Thomas R. McCarthy and John Michael Connolly. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy)
November 17, 2014 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Abaid, Kimberly)
November 17, 2014 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Abaid, Kimberly)
November 17, 2014 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William S. Consovoy, Thomas R. McCarthy and J. Michael Connolly Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-5281670 by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Cert. of Attorney Consovoy, # 2 Cert. of Attorney McCarthy, # 3 Cert. of Attorney Connolly, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanford, Paul)
November 17, 2014 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Sanford, Paul)
November 17, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C. Caldwell on behalf of Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. (Caldwell, Benjamin)
November 17, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M Sanford on behalf of Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. (Sanford, Paul)
November 17, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5281571 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Category Form)(Sanford, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. v. President and Fellows of Harvard College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: John Michael Connolly
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Represented By: Thomas R. McCarthy
Represented By: Paul M Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President and Fellows of Harvard College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Honorable and Reverend The Board of Overseers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?