Johnson et al v. Boston Public Schools et al

Plaintiff: Nicole Johnson and NS (minor)
Defendant: Boston Public Schools, Eileen Nash, Lynn Graham O'Brien, Joan Curran, Lita O'Malley, Jeremiah Ford, Marcie Goldowski, Elizabeth Drake, Rebecca Hart, Terelle Clark, Sue Gibbons, Jennifer Harris, Denise Eng, Children's Hospital, Melissa Brown, Bureau of Special Education Appeals and Thomas Chang
Case Number: 1:2015cv10026
Filed: January 7, 2015
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Allison D. Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1218
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2018 171 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Accordingly, Defendant BPSs motion to amend ECF No. 170 is GRANTED, andBPSs Second Motion to Dismiss Part Two of the Bifurcated Complaint ECF No. 158 is GRANTED. In addition, Defendants Ford and Goldowsky (or Goldowski) are dismissed asdefendants due to Plaintiffs failure to effect proper service. SO ORDERED.(McDonagh, Christina)
March 7, 2018 168 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Defendants Chang and OBriens motion to dismiss ECF No. 162 is GRANTED. The parties shall submit supplemental briefing on BPSs motion to dismiss ECF No. 158 addressing the issues identified in this opinion by March 23, 2018. Defendants Ford and Goldowsky (or Goldowski) will be dismissed as defendants if Plaintiffs do not effect proper service on them by March 23, 2018. (McDonagh, Christina)
February 1, 2017 149 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Defendant BSEA's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 138] is GRANTED, and BSEA is hereby removed as a defendant. Defendant BPS's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 140] is DENIED. BPS must file an answer or a motion to dismiss on other grounds by February 22, 2017. If Plaintiffs wish to move for an extension of time to serve the individual BPS defendants (Chang, Ford, Goldowski, and OBrien), that motion must be filed by February 22, 2017; otherwise, the individual defendants will be dismissed. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 17, 2016 132 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered granting 90 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum and Order, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 90] is ALLOWED, and judgment shall enter for the Defendants on the IDEA claims in Part I of Plaintiffs' Bifurcated Complaint [ECF No. 71]. (Folan, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Boston Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Johnson
Represented By: Michael C. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NS (minor)
Represented By: Michael C. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Public Schools
Represented By: Natasia D.H. Handy
Represented By: Andrea C. Alves Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Graham O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lita O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcie Goldowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terelle Clark
Represented By: James S. Hamrock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Gibbons
Represented By: James S. Hamrock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Harris
Represented By: James S. Hamrock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Eng
Represented By: James S. Hamrock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children's Hospital
Represented By: James S. Hamrock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Special Education Appeals
Represented By: Julia E. Kobick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?