Janssen Biotech, Inc. et al v. Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Janssen Biotech, Inc. and New York University
Defendant: Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd., Celltrion, Inc. and Hospira Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv10698
Filed: March 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Mark L. Wolf
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 476 Judge Mark L. Wolf: AMENDED ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER(Franklin, Yvonne)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered granting 176 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Hohler, Daniel)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER(Hohler, Daniel)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDERAssociated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Hohler, Daniel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janssen Biotech, Inc. et al v. Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janssen Biotech, Inc.
Represented By: Allison C. Casey
Represented By: Dianne B. Elderkin
Represented By: Barbara L. Mullin
Represented By: Heather B. Repicky
Represented By: Angela Verrecchio
Represented By: Jason Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York University
Represented By: Allison C. Casey
Represented By: Dianne B. Elderkin
Represented By: Barbara L. Mullin
Represented By: Heather B. Repicky
Represented By: Angela Verrecchio
Represented By: Jason Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Dennis J. Kelly
Represented By: Andrea L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celltrion, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis J. Kelly
Represented By: Andrea L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Inc.
Represented By: Dennis J. Kelly
Represented By: Andrea L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?