Luna v. Campbell et al
Plaintiff: |
Pascual Luna |
Defendant: |
Matthew Campbell, Officer Hamilton, Rishi Gupta, Annie Dookhan, Kate Corbett and Daniel Rencykowski |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv11477 |
Filed: |
March 30, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Massachusetts |
Office: |
Boston Office |
County: |
Suffolk |
Presiding Judge: |
Indira Talwani |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 17, 2016 |
Filing
48
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered re 45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel; MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply GRANTED. See attached ORDER. (MacDonald, Gail)
|
April 26, 2016 |
Filing
25
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. In order to avoid further delay in this case, the Court will grant Lunas request for assistance. It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk shall reissue summons and the Clerk shall forward the summons, complaint and t he requisite service forms to the United States Marshals Service so that service may be accomplished. The time limit for service of the summons and complaint shall be enlarged to a date 90 days after the date of this Order. The court does not anticipate granting any further extensions of time to complete service. Clerk mailed copy of this order to plaintiff at address listed on docket sheet.(PSSA, 4)
|
December 11, 2015 |
Filing
18
Judge Indira Talwani: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. The filing fee obligation owed by plaintiff is assessed with an initial, partial filing fee of $20.72, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1)(B). The remainder of the fee, $329.28, is to be assessed and collected in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). If Luna did not receive the summons, or if he received the summons and failed to arrange for service by the U.S. Marshals Service, he should promptly advise the court and seek an extension of time for service. The Clerk mailed copies of this Procedural Order to Luna and to the Treasurers Office at FCI Berlin.(PSSA, 4)
|
June 15, 2015 |
Filing
6
Judge Indira Talwani: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis but the assessment of the filing fee pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1915(b) is DEFERRED; denying without prejudice 3 Motion to Appoint Coun sel. Plaintiff shall, within 28 days of the date of this order, file with the Court (A) an Application bearing his original signature, and (B) a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six-month period preceding the filing of the comp laint. The Clerk shall issue summonses and the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the summonses, complaint, and this order upon the defendants as directed by plaintiff with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. The cler k mailed copies this Order to plaintiff Luna as well as to the Treasurer's Office at USP McCreary in order to facilitate any request by Luna for his certified prison account statement. Failure by Luna to comply with the directive to submit a signed Application and a certified prison account statement may result in a dismissal of this action without prejudice. (PSSA, 4)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?