Meijer, Inc. et al v. Ranbaxy Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Meijer, Inc. and Meijer Distribution, Inc.
Defendant: Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy U.S.A. Inc., Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited and Ranbaxy Labortories Ltd
Case Number: 1:2015cv11828
Filed: May 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M. Gorton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Please see attached Memorandum and Order. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02878-NMG et al. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered. "Plaintiffs motion for leave to file a proposed amended complaint under seal (Docket No. 129 ) and plaintiffs motion for leave to file a proposed amended complaint (Docket No. 130 ) are DENIED as moot and without prejudice. Plaintiffs will be permitted to file revised motions after the stay is lifted."Case Stayed. See attached Order.(Caruso, Stephanie)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER"For the foregoing reasons, defendants motion (Docket No. 103) to certify this Courts September 7, 2016 Order for interlocutory appeal (Docket No. 80) is ALLOWED."(Caruso, Stephanie)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 110 Joint MOTION for Protective Order --- [Proposed] Amended Confidentiality Protective Order (Caruso, Stephanie)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER ESTABLISHING PROTOCOL ON ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION entered. (Caruso, Stephanie)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered "Motion denied without prejudice." 55 Motion to Appoint Counsel (Caruso, Stephanie)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meijer, Inc. et al v. Ranbaxy Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meijer, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Bjork
Represented By: David P. Germaine
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: John D. Radice
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Joseph M. Vanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meijer Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Bjork
Represented By: David P. Germaine
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: John D. Radice
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Joseph M. Vanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranbaxy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranbaxy U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranbaxy Labortories Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?