Johansen v. Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Plaintiff: Ken Johansen
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Inc. and SPANISH QUOTES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2015cv12920
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Allison D. Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Liberty Mutual's motion to correct the Court's October Order, [ECF No. 219 ], is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Liberty Mutual's motion for summary judgment [ECF No. 195 ] is GRANTED in part, insofar as the Court finds that Digitas and Spanish Quotes violated their contractual duties to indemnify Liberty Mutual, and DENIED in part, insofar as its claim of negligence was premised upon a finding that it was liable to Mr. Johansen for violating the TCPA. Likewise, Digitas' motion for summary judgment [ECF No. 191 ] is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. SO ORDERED. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Accordingly, Liberty Mutual's Motion for Leave to Amend its Third-Party Complaint to add claims under Chapter 93A is DENIED. Liberty Mutual's motion is GRANTED inso far as it seeks leave to file an Amended Cross-Claim and Third-Party Complaint without the Chapter 93A claims. Precise Leads' motion for an award of costs and expenses is DENIED. The Court expects that discovery required for summary j udgment has been substantially completed given that the Chapter 93A claims will not be added. The parties shall file a proposed summary judgment briefing schedule by January 18, 2019 and shall also report on their efforts to resolve this action. SO ORDERED.(McDonagh, Christina)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. 168 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. 172 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery is ALLOWED. ( Fact Discovery to be completed by 1/26/2018) (Montes, Mariliz)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered 124 Digitas, Inc's Motion for Certificate of Appealability and to Stay the Proceedings is DENIED. (Montes, Mariliz)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. "...The Court concludes that Johansens claims against Liberty Mutual are not mooted by the settlement offer and that the Court retains subject matter jurisdiction over those claim s. The Court also finds that Digitas appears to have had the requisite opportunity to take full control of the defense, the indemnity claim is not premature, and the economic loss doctrine does not preclude Liberty Mutuals negligence claim. Digitas Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 68] is therefore DENIED. SO ORDERED."(Folan, Karen)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johansen v. Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Represented By: Anthony A. Froio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPANISH QUOTES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Johansen
Represented By: Edward A. Broderick
Represented By: Matthew P. McCue
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Represented By: Mary Reiten
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?