Stevenson v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Janice Stevenson |
Defendant: |
Amazon.com, Inc. and Security Industry Specialists, Inc |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv13505 |
Filed: |
October 6, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Massachusetts |
Office: |
Boston Office |
County: |
Suffolk |
Presiding Judge: |
F. Dennis Saylor |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 27, 2017 |
Filing
79
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. (Schultz, Allison)
|
May 13, 2016 |
Filing
48
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 26 Motion Certify Questions of State Law to Supreme Judicial Court. (Cox, Spencer)
|
February 22, 2016 |
Filing
21
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM ANDORDER entered: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion for access to CM/ECF is GRANTED provided that plaintiff complies with the Court's require ments for training and for setting up a CM/ECF and PACER account. All claims against defendant Amazon.com, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED. All claims against Security Industry Specialists, Inc., that purport to arise under the United States Constitution a re hereby DISMISSED.Plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion in limine is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion to take judicial notice is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for an order of ex pungement is DENIED without prejudice. Defendants' motion for an extension of time to March 15, 2016 to respond to plaintiffs remaining motions is GRANTED. (PSSA, 1)[Remark: plaintiff was sent the District Court's "Information on Access to Electronic Filing by Pro Se Litigants" which explains the procedures required, along with a copy of the Memorandum and Order].
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?