Gould et al v. O'Leary et al

Plaintiff: Gould, Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, Sarah Zesch, Irwin Cruz, Danny Weng, Markus Vallaster and John R Stanton
Defendant: O'Leary, Daniel C. O'Leary, David A. Provencher and William B. Evans
Intervenor Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Amicus Curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety
Case Number: 1:2016cv10181
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 103 USCA Judgment as to #94 Notice of Appeal filed by Sarah Zesch, Christopher Hart, Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Michael Gould. AFFIRMED... (Paine, Matthew)
November 2, 2018 102 OPINION of USCA as to #94 Notice of Appeal filed by Sarah Zesch, Christopher Hart, Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Michael Gould. (Paine, Matthew)
December 26, 2017 101 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 26, 2017 100 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on November 8, 2017, before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. COA Case No. 17-2202. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com Redaction Request due 1/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/26/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 26, 2017 99 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on March 3, 2017, before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. COA Case No. 17-2202. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com Redaction Request due 1/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/26/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 19, 2017 98 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT FORM received from USCA and addressed to Valerie OHara re #94 Notice of Appeal,,,, Transcript order form filed in USCA on December 19, 2017. Transcripts ordered: 3/3/17 and 11/8/17 Motion Hearings. Transcripts due by 2/20/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 13, 2017 97 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch for proceedings held on March 3, 2017; November 8, 2017 Judge Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jensen, David)
December 8, 2017 96 USCA Case Number 17-2202 for #94 Notice of Appeal filed by Sarah Zesch, Christopher Hart, Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Michael Gould. (Paine, Matthew)
December 8, 2017 95 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #94 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
December 7, 2017 94 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #93 Judgment, #92 Memorandum & ORDER by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-6919346 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 12/27/2017. (Jensen, David)
December 5, 2017 93 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT (Halley, Taylor)
December 5, 2017 92 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment #56 is DENIED. Defendants' motions for summary judgment #70 #73 are GRANTED.(FDS, law1)
December 5, 2017 91 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Docket entry #74 was edited to correctly categorize the document as a memorandum in support. It was originally docketed as a motion. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
November 17, 2017 90 STIPULATION re #58 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,, #78 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, #64 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould. (Jensen, David)
November 8, 2017 89 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2017 re #70 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William B. Evans, #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum in Support filed by Daniel C. O'Leary, #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel C. O'Leary, #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sarah Zesch, Christopher Hart, Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Michael Gould. Court heard argument on the motion. Court took the matter UNDER ADVISEMENT. Court directed parties to file stipulation as to certain factual issues. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Jensen, Groulx, Buchheit, Geraghty, McGarry, Casey) (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
October 31, 2017 88 REPLY to Response to #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel C. O'Leary. (Buchheit, John)
October 31, 2017 87 REPLY to Response to #70 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William B. Evans. (McGarry, Matthew)
October 24, 2017 86 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response to #75 Defendant O'Leary's Statement of Material Facts filed by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould. (Jensen, David)
October 24, 2017 85 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #70 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Response to #69 Statement of Material Facts by Defendant William Evans filed by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch. (Jensen, David)
October 24, 2017 84 Opposition re #70 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Reply filed by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch. (Jensen, David)
October 24, 2017 83 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Everytown for Gun Safety in Support of Defendants. (Ortiz, Nicholas)
October 18, 2017 82 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #80 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 24 & 31, 2017 to File Opposition and Reply Briefs. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
October 18, 2017 81 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #79 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
October 17, 2017 80 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 24 & 31, 2017 to File Opposition and Reply Briefs by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch.(Jensen, David)
October 13, 2017 79 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Everytown for Gun Safety. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Amicus Brief)(Ortiz, Nicholas)
October 6, 2017 78 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response to Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 Statement filed by Daniel C. O'Leary. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Ints. served on O'Leary)(Buchheit, John)
October 6, 2017 77 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel C. O'Leary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence, #2 Exhibit Correspondence, #3 Exhibit Email Correspondence)(Buchheit, John)
October 6, 2017 76 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel C. O'Leary. (Buchheit, John)
October 6, 2017 75 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel C. O'Leary. (Buchheit, John)
October 6, 2017 74 Memorandum in Support of #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Daniel C. O'Leary.(Buchheit, John) Modified on 12/5/2017 to correctly name document (Pezzarossi, Lisa).
October 6, 2017 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Daniel C. O'Leary.(Buchheit, John)
October 6, 2017 72 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #70 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William B. Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(McGarry, Matthew)
October 6, 2017 71 MEMORANDUM in Support re #70 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William B. Evans. (McGarry, Matthew)
October 6, 2017 70 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by William B. Evans.(McGarry, Matthew)
October 6, 2017 69 Response by William B. Evans to #58 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(McGarry, Matthew)
October 6, 2017 68 Opposition re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL. (Casey, Timothy)
September 25, 2017 67 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time to October 6, 2017 to File Dispositive Motions (Maynard, Timothy)
September 21, 2017 66 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to October 6, 2017 to File Dispositive Motions by Daniel C. O'Leary.(Buchheit, John)
August 31, 2017 65 AFFIDAVIT of Michaela Dunne in Support re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LTC Data, #2 Certificate of Service)(Jensen, David)
August 31, 2017 64 AFFIDAVIT of Brent Carlton in Support re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LTC Summary 2015, #2 Exhibit 2 - Boston LTC Data--by Restriction, #3 Exhibit 3 - Brookline LTC Data--by Restriction, #4 Exhibit 4 - Boston LTC Data--by Occupation, #5 Exhibit 5 - Brookline LTC Data--by Occupation, #6 Certificate of Service)(Jensen, David)
August 31, 2017 63 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Gould in Support re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LTC, #2 Exhibit 2 - LTC (prior), #3 Exhibit 3 - MIRCS Application, #4 Exhibit 4 - Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 5 - Correspondence, #6 Exhibit 6 - Correspondence, #7 Exhibit 7 - Acknowledgement Forms, #8 Certificate of Service)(Jensen, David)
August 31, 2017 62 AFFIDAVIT of John Stanton in Support re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LTC, #2 Exhibit 2 - Worksheet Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - MIRCS Application, #4 Exhibit 4 - Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 5 - Correspondence, #6 Exhibit 6 - Correspondence, #7 Exhibit 7 - Correspondence, #8 Certificate of Service)(Jensen, David)
August 31, 2017 61 AFFIDAVIT of Sarah Zesch in Support re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LTC, #2 Exhibit 2 - Worksheet Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - MIRCS Application, #4 Exhibit 4 - Correspondence, #5 Certificate of Service)(Jensen, David)
August 31, 2017 60 AFFIDAVIT of Chris Hart in Support re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LTC, #2 Exhibit 2 - Worksheet Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - Correspondence, #4 Exhibit 4 - MIRCS Application, #5 Certificate of Service)(Jensen, David)
August 31, 2017 59 AFFIDAVIT of Danny Weng in Support re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LTC, #2 Exhibit 2 - Worksheet Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - MIRS Application, #4 Exhibit 4 - Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 5 - Correspondence, #6 Exhibit 6 - Correspondence, #7 Certificate of Service)(Jensen, David)
August 31, 2017 58 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Boston Interrogatory Responses & incorporated document, #2 Exhibit 2 - Brookline Interrogatory Responses, #3 Exhibit 3 - Brookline Supplemental Interrogatory Responses, #4 Exhibit 4 - J. McDonough Deposition Transcript (select pages), #5 Exhibit 5 - A. Coleman Deposition Transcript (selected pages))(Jensen, David)
August 31, 2017 57 MEMORANDUM in Support re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch. (Jensen, David)
August 30, 2017 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch.(Jensen, David)
August 28, 2017 55 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #54 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 30, 2017 to File Summary Judgment Moving Papers. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
August 25, 2017 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 30, 2017 to File Summary Judgment Moving Papers by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Markus Vallaster, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch.(Jensen, David)
August 8, 2017 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy James Casey on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL (Casey, Timothy)
July 19, 2017 52 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
July 19, 2017 51 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 7/19/2017. Case called. Counsel report on remaining discovery requests. Court extended fact discovery to 7/28/2017. Dispositive motions to be filed by 8/25/2017, responses and cross motions by 9/22/2017, responses to cross motions by 10/20/2017, and any final replies by 10/27/2017. Court set matter for hearing on the motions for 11/8/2017 at 2:30 p.m. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Jensen, Groulx, Buchheit, Geraghty, McGarry, Marks) (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
June 12, 2017 50 NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Status Conference set for 7/19/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
June 12, 2017 49 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #48 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Discovery to be completed by 7/19/2017 Motions due by 8/25/2017. The status conference set for Status Conference reset for 6/13/2017 02:10 PM is CANCELED. Hearing to be reset. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
June 9, 2017 48 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 19, 2017 to Complete Discovery and to extend the time for filing summary judgment motions to August 25, 2017 by Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Markus Vallaster, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch.(Jensen, David)
May 2, 2017 47 NOTICE RESETTING Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery to be completed by 6/9/2017. Dispositive motions due by 7/14/2017. NOTICE OF RESETTING HEARING: Status Conference reset for 6/13/2017 02:10 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (The 5/4/2017 status conference is OFF.)(Pezzarossi, Lisa)
May 2, 2017 46 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #45 Joint MOTION to Amend 23 Scheduling Order. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
April 27, 2017 45 Joint MOTION to Amend #23 Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs and Defendants Evans and O'Leary by William B. Evans.(McGarry, Matthew)
April 4, 2017 44 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #42 Motion to Intervene as of Right to Defend the Constitutionality of a State Statute (Maynard, Timothy)
March 13, 2017 43 Intervenor's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL.(Porter, William)
March 13, 2017 42 MOTION to Intervene as of Right to Defend the Constitutionality of a State Statute by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL.(Porter, William)
March 13, 2017 41 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Porter on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL (Porter, William)
March 6, 2017 40 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Based on a review of the pleadings, it appears that the amended complaint plausibly states a claim for relief. Furthermore, and in any event, it appears that the amended complaint raises factual issues that are more properly resolved upon review of a factual record concerning plaintiffs individual circumstances and the policies and procedures of the relevant city and town. Accordingly, the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #27 is DENIED. (Zaleski, Christine)
March 3, 2017 39 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Motion Hearing held on 3/3/2017 re #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by William B. Evans. Court heard argument on the motion. Court took the matter UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Jensen, Buchheit, and McGarry) (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
February 27, 2017 38 REPLY to Response to #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by William B. Evans. (McGarry, Matthew)
February 21, 2017 37 AFFIDAVIT of David Jensen, esq. in Opposition re #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Markus Vallaster, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sponsors' press release, #2 Exhibit Massachusetts House Executive Bill Summary, #3 Exhibit Summary Memorandum from EOPS, #4 Exhibit Glidden & Robbins, Firearms Licensing Problem Areas)(Jensen, David)
February 21, 2017 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Markus Vallaster, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch. (Jensen, David)
February 17, 2017 35 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Motion Hearing held on 2/17/2017 re #29 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Judgment on Pleadings filed by William B. Evans ; issue of Court's recusal in connection with attorney John J. Buchheit addressed; without objection, the Court declined to recuse itself; Court apprized of outstanding discovery in the form of depositions document production; oral argument given re #29 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Judgment on Pleadings; said motion granted and denied in part subject to provisions ordered by the Court on the record including but no limited to written discovery going forward and deposition limitations as to certain defendants (3 as to the City of Boston); an Order shall issue re this aspect; response re #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings due by 2/20/2017 and reply due by 2/27/2017; hearing on said motion remains scheduled for 3/3/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Court Reporter: Valerie O'Hara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Groulx, and Jensen for the pltffs; Buchheit, Geraghty, and McGarry for the defts) (Lovett, Jarrett)
February 14, 2017 34 REPLY to Response to #29 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Judgment on Pleadings filed by William B. Evans. (McGarry, Matthew)
February 13, 2017 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Judgment on Pleadings filed by Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R Stanton, Markus Vallaster, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch. (Jensen, David)
February 10, 2017 32 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #29 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Judgment on Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2017 03:15 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.(Pezzarossi, Lisa)
February 1, 2017 31 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #29 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Judgment on Pleadings : Motion Hearing/Status Conference set for 3/3/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.(Pezzarossi, Lisa)
February 1, 2017 30 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling 2/15/2017 status conference. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
January 30, 2017 29 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Judgment on Pleadings by William B. Evans.(McGarry, Matthew)
January 27, 2017 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by William B. Evans. (McGarry, Matthew)
January 27, 2017 27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by William B. Evans.(McGarry, Matthew)
December 16, 2016 26 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
December 16, 2016 25 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #24 Joint Motion for Protective Order. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
December 15, 2016 24 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by William B. Evans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order)(McGarry, Matthew)
November 7, 2016 23 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARINGS: Status Conferences set for 2/15/2017 02:10 PM and for 5/4/2017 03:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
November 3, 2016 22 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Scheduling Conference held on 11/3/2016. Case called. The Court reviewed the Joint Statement. The Court ORDERED following deadlines: Initial disclosures shall be due by 11/17/2016. Amendments to pleadings shall be due by 3/3/2017. Written requests for discovery shall be served by 1/13/2017. Depositions, other than expert depositions, and fact discovery to be completed by 4/28/2017. Parties shall notify the Court by 4/14/2017 if experts will be called. Dispositive Motions shall be due by 6/9/2017. Commonwealth to file a motion to intervene by 3/17/2017. Status conferences set for 2/15/2017 at 2:20 p.m. and 5/4/2017 at 3:30 p.m. Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Jensen, Groulx, Bouchheit, McGarry, Geraghty) (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
November 2, 2016 21 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Buchheit, John)
November 1, 2016 20 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant William B. Evans. (McGarry, Matthew)
October 27, 2016 19 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (McGarry, Matthew)
October 12, 2016 18 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2016 03:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pezzarossi, Lisa)
June 30, 2016 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Geraghty on behalf of William B. Evans (Geraghty, Peter)
June 30, 2016 16 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Daniel C. O'Leary.(Buchheit, John)
June 30, 2016 15 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by William B. Evans.(McGarry, Matthew)
June 28, 2016 14 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Matthew M. McGarry for Lisa Skehill Maki (McGarry, Matthew)
June 28, 2016 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. McGarry on behalf of William B. Evans (McGarry, Matthew)
May 18, 2016 12 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. (Stearns, Ian)
May 18, 2016 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 30, 2016 to Respond to the Complaint by William B. Evans, Daniel C. O'Leary.(Maki, Lisa)
May 18, 2016 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Buchheit on behalf of Daniel C. O'Leary (Buchheit, John)
May 12, 2016 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed William B. Evans served on 4/28/2016, answer due 5/19/2016; Daniel C. O'Leary served on 4/28/2016, answer due 5/19/2016. (Groulx, Patrick)
May 4, 2016 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Skehill Maki on behalf of William B. Evans (Maki, Lisa)
April 14, 2016 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against William B. Evans, Daniel C. O'Leary, filed by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, Danny Weng, Markus Vallaster, Sarah Zesch, John R Stanton.(Jensen, David)
March 31, 2016 6 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David D. Jensen. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy)
March 16, 2016 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David D. Jensen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6023265 by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Irwin Cruz, Michael Gould, Christopher Hart. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Jensen)(Groulx, Patrick)
February 4, 2016 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
February 4, 2016 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Abaid, Kimberly)
February 4, 2016 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc.. (Groulx, Patrick)
February 4, 2016 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5961891 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Irwin Cruz, Michael Gould, Christopher Hart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Groulx, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gould et al v. O'Leary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel C. O'Leary
Represented By: John J. Buchheit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Provencher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Evans
Represented By: Peter M. Geraghty
Represented By: Matthew M. McGarry
Represented By: Lisa Skehill Maki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc.
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Represented By: Patrick M. Groulx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gould
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Represented By: Patrick M. Groulx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hart
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Represented By: Patrick M. Groulx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Zesch
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irwin Cruz
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Represented By: Patrick M. Groulx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Weng
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markus Vallaster
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R Stanton
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: William W. Porter
Represented By: Timothy James Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety
Represented By: Nicholas F. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?