Integrated Communications & Technologies, Inc. et al v. Hewlett-Packard Financial Services Company et al
Plaintiff: Integrated Communications & Technologies, Inc., Jade Cheng, Jason Yuyi and Cathy Yu
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Financial Services Company and Hewlett-Packard Financial Services (India) Private Limited
Case Number: 1:2016cv10386
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Leo T. Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 490 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered.Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. No. 486) is DENIED. (Montes, Mariliz)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 484 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. The Motion for Remote Rule 35 Medical Examinations (Doc. No. 451 ) is DENIED. (Currie, Haley)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered.Order on Pending Motions (Doc. Nos. 315, 318, 334, 339).The Court DENIES Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 315); ALLOWS IN PART Defendants' motion to exclude Plaintiffs 9; counterfeiting expert (Doc. No. 318); DENIES Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 334); DENIES Plaintiffs' motion to exclude Defendants' expert (Doc. No. 334); and DENIES Defendants' motion to strike (Doc. No. 339).The parties shall file a status report within 14 days presenting their respective positions as to the further discovery and motion practice required in advance of the trial scheduled in this case. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS entered denying 109 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 110 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 111 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Montes, Mariliz)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. For the foregoing reasons, the Court: (1) ALLOWS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART,WITHOUT PREJUDICE, Defendant HPFS's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 46); (2) DENIESWITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendant HPFS India's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 57); and (3)DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 68). Plaintiffs have until February 8,2017, to file a motion for leave to amend and a proposed amended complaint, if they wish. Defendants may file a ny opposition to the motion within 14 days of the motion's filing. Alternatively, if Plaintiffs do not file a motion for leave to amend within 14 days, Defendants may renew any arguments from the instant Motions to Dismiss that have not been decided. (Montes, Mariliz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integrated Communications & Technologies, Inc. et al v. Hewlett-Packard Financial Services Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Financial Services Company
Represented By: Anthony P. Callaghan
Represented By: Michael R Dube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Financial Services (India) Private Limited
Represented By: Michael R Dube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrated Communications & Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Dimitry Joffe
Represented By: Lester E. Riordan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jade Cheng
Represented By: Dimitry Joffe
Represented By: Lester E. Riordan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Yuyi
Represented By: Dimitry Joffe
Represented By: Lester E. Riordan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Yu
Represented By: Dimitry Joffe
Represented By: Lester E. Riordan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?