Chesterton Capital LLC v. Holley et al
Plaintiff: Chesterton Capital LLC
Defendant: Byron L. Holley, John C. Loudon and Legacy Point Capital LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv10848
Filed: May 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Leo T. Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 330 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered.The Court ADOPTS the Recommendation and Report to the extent that that it concludes that the Court does not have general personal jurisdiction over Cicero.Chesterton shall by no later than Februa ry 26, 2020, file a supplemental status report. By March 11, 2020, Cicero shall respond to Chesterton's filing. If Defendants Loudon and Holly wish to respond to Chesterton's filing, they must do so by no later than March 11, 2020 (Montes, Mariliz)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW entered. (Simeone, Maria)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 128 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sorokin, Leo)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered.Order on Motions to Dismiss 24 26 and Motion to Strike and to Seal Exhibits 29 .The Court DENIES 24 Holley's Motion to Dismiss, 26 Loudon's Motion to Dismiss and 29 Holley's Motion to Strike and to Seal Exhibits 1, 2 3 and 4 to Plaintiff's Opposition. The Clerk shall schedule a Rule 16 Conference with the parties. (Montes, Mariliz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chesterton Capital LLC v. Holley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chesterton Capital LLC
Represented By: Amy B. Hackett
Represented By: William A. Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron L. Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Loudon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Point Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?