Securities & Exchange Commission v. Esposito et al
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Defendant: Christopher Esposito, Anthony Jay Pignatello, James Gondolfe, Renee Galizio, Lionshare Ventures LLC and Cannabiz Mobile, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv10960
Filed: May 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Allison D. Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT as to defendant Christopher R. Esposito. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered denying 83 SEC'S Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses from Defendant, Renee Galizio. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Lionshare Ventures, LLC (Montes, Mariliz)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. For the reasons setforth in this Order, the SEC's Motion for Default Judgment against Gondolfe and Cannabiz [ECF No. 39] is GRANTED IN PART. (Montes, Mariliz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities & Exchange Commission v. Esposito et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Esposito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Jay Pignatello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gondolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Galizio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lionshare Ventures LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cannabiz Mobile, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Represented By: Martin F Healey
Represented By: David H. London
Represented By: J. Lauchlan Wash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?