California Association of Realtors, Inc. v PDFfiller, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: California Association of Realtors, Inc.
Defendant: Boris Shakhnovich and Vadim Yasinovsky
Counter Defendant: Real Estate Business Services, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC and RE FormsNet LLC doing business as zipLogix, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: PDFfiller, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Judge Jennifer C. Boal
Case Number: 1:2016cv11021
Filed: June 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Referring Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2018 Filing 296 STIPULATION of Dismissal by California Association of Realtors, Inc.(California Association of Realtors, Inc.), PDFfiller, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc.. (Bigelow, Brandon)
May 21, 2018 Filing 295 At the request of counsel, ELECTRONIC NOTICE Cancelling 5/22/2018 Motions Hearing. Should the parties wish to reschedule, they may contact Deputy Clerk. (Putnam, Harold)
May 7, 2018 Filing 294 At the request of counsel, ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #182 MOTION to Quash , #283 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery, #274 MOTION to Compel Discovery On AN Expedited Basis : Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
May 1, 2018 Filing 293 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #182 MOTION to Quash , #283 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery, #274 MOTION to Compel Discovery On AN Expedited Basis : Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2018 11:30 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
April 30, 2018 Filing 292 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #182 MOTION to Quash: Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2018 02:45 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
April 23, 2018 Filing 291 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #283 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery, #274 MOTION to Compel Discovery On AN Expedited Basis : Motion Hearing reset for 5/1/2018 02:45 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. Previous entry setting hearing for 5/21/2018 WAS ENTERED IN ERROR. Hearing is SET FOR 5/1/2018 at 2:45 PM.(Putnam, Harold)
April 23, 2018 Filing 290 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #283 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery, #274 MOTION to Compel Discovery On AN Expedited Basis : Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
April 20, 2018 Filing 289 Opposition re #283 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery Defendant And Counter Claim/Third-Party Plaintiff PDFfiller, Inc.'s Response In Opposition To Plaintiff And Counterclaim Defendant California Association Of Realtors, Inc.'s Cross Motion To Compel Discovery filed by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Strapp, Michael)
April 13, 2018 Filing 288 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Strapp, Michael)
April 9, 2018 Filing 287 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #283 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery, #274 MOTION to Compel Discovery On AN Expedited Basis : Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2018 02:45 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
April 9, 2018 Filing 286 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #279 Motion for Modification (Putnam, Harold)
April 6, 2018 Filing 285 AFFIDAVIT of Caleb J. Schillinger in Support re #283 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Schillinger, Caleb)
April 6, 2018 Filing 284 MEMORANDUM in Support re #283 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
April 6, 2018 Filing 283 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Schillinger, Caleb)
April 6, 2018 Filing 282 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #274 MOTION to Compel Discovery On AN Expedited Basis filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
April 2, 2018 Filing 281 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Michael G. Strapp for Peter J. Couto (Strapp, Michael)
March 30, 2018 Filing 280 Defendants' ANSWER to #270 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM s against California Association of Realtors, Inc.(California Association of Realtors, Inc.), Real Estate Business Services, Inc. by Vadim Yasinovsky, PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich.(Strapp, Michael)
March 30, 2018 Filing 279 Joint MOTION to Modify Sequence of Expert Disclosures by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Schillinger, Caleb)
March 28, 2018 Filing 277 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #273 Motion to Seal Document (Putnam, Harold)
March 23, 2018 Filing 276 DECLARATION re #275 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #274 MOTION to Compel Discovery On AN Expedited Basis Of Megan M. Michaels by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Strapp, Michael)
March 23, 2018 Filing 275 MEMORANDUM in Support re #274 MOTION to Compel Discovery On AN Expedited Basis filed by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Strapp, Michael)
March 23, 2018 Filing 274 MOTION to Compel Discovery On AN Expedited Basis by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Strapp, Michael)
March 23, 2018 Filing 273 MOTION to Seal Document by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Strapp, Michael)
March 20, 2018 Filing 272 NOTICE by PDFfiller, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Subpoena (Realty Publications, Inc. d/b/a first tuesday) (Strapp, Michael)
March 19, 2018 Filing 271 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered ACCEPTING and ADOPTING #263 Report and Recommendation; DENYING #121 Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint of PDFFiller, Inc.; DENYING Defendants' #141 Partial Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (DaSilva, Carolina)
March 16, 2018 Filing 270 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Haines, Lisa)
March 16, 2018 Filing 269 ANSWER to Counterclaim by California Association of Realtors, Inc.(California Association of Realtors, Inc.).(Haines, Lisa)
March 16, 2018 Filing 268 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by RE FormsNet LLC.(Haines, Lisa)
March 16, 2018 Filing 267 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Real Estate Business Services, Inc..(Haines, Lisa)
March 14, 2018 Filing 266 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 3/14/2018. Court and counsel discuss matters presented by #265 letter to court. Court extends scheduling deadlines set forth in #177 by 90 days. No further extensions to be granted. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Berkowitz, Bigelow, Strapp) (Putnam, Harold)
March 13, 2018 Filing 265 Joint Letter/request (non-motion) from Lisa Haines and Michael Strapp . (Haines, Lisa)
March 2, 2018 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #248 Motion to Amend. Pleading alternative theories of a section nine versus a section 11 Massachusetts General Laws chapter 93A claim is permissible. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(d)(2); Limone v. U.S., 579 F.3d 79, 93 (1st Cir. 2009) (plaintiffs had the right to plead alternative theories of liability). A section nine plaintiff is any person, other than a person entitled to bring an action under section eleven, Mass. Gen. Laws ch. 93A, 9, and section 1(a) defines a person to include a corporation such as California Association of Realtors, Inc. (CAR). Mass. Gen. Laws ch. 93A, 1(a). Further, if CAR did not engage in trade or commerce, meaning acting in a business context, In re Pharm. Indus. Average Wholesale Price Litig., 582 F.3d 156, 191 (1st Cir. 2009), it is not a section 11 plaintiff. See Linkage Corp. v. Tr. Of Boston Univ., 679 N.E.2d 191, 206-07 (Mass. 1997). [A]ny transaction in which the plaintiff is motivated by business considerations gives rise to a section 11 claim. Frullo v. Landenberger, 814 N.E.2d 1105, 1112 (Mass. App. Ct. 2004). The proposed section nine claim is not futile inasmuch as CAR is a nonprofit trade association serving its members and provides members access to the CAR Library through zipForm as a member benefit. (Docket Entry # 248-1, p. 5). The proposed amended complaint does not disclose whether CAR profits from such membership fees, although it does charge nonmembers annual fees between $799 and $999 to access the CAR Library. Defendants argument that the demand letter is deficient because it does not refer to a violation of CARs rights as a consumer is not convincing because such a reference is only one of six factors and an adequate letter need only mention one factor. See Costello v. Bank of Am., N.A., 13-CV-11424-DJC, 2014 WL 293665, at *4 (D. Mass. Jan. 27, 2014) (paraphrasing and quoting Cassano v. Gogos, 480 N.E.2d 649, 651 (Mass. App. Ct. 2014)); see generally Akar v. Fed. Nat. Mortg. Assen, 845 F. Supp. 2d 381, 404 (D. Mass. 2012). Finally, in light of the similarity between the facts in the existing section 11 claim and the proposed section nine claim, this court finds no undue prejudice particularly given the unlikelihood of a need for additional discovery. CAR filed the motion prior to the deadline for adding new claims and there is no protracted delay. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on March 2, 2018 in the caption of the document. (Bowler, Marianne)
March 2, 2018 Filing 264 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 3/14/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
March 2, 2018 Filing 263 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #141 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) filed by Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky, PDFfiller, Inc., #121 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As to Amended Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 100) and Amended Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 101) filed by RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc., California Association of Realtors, Inc. Recommendation: This court RECOMMENDS that CAR's motion to dismiss the amended counterclaims and the third-party complaint (Docket Entry #121 ) and defendants' partial motion for judgment on the pleadings (Docket Entry #141 ) be DENIED. This court will conduct a status conference on March 14, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. to address the discovery schedule for the antitrust claims. Objections to R&R due by 3/16/2018(Putnam, Harold)
February 16, 2018 Filing 262 NOTICE by PDFfiller, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Subpoena (Cameron Platt) (Strapp, Michael)
February 16, 2018 Filing 261 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #257 Motion for Extension of Time. In the event this court recommends denying the California Association of Realtors' motion to dismiss the antitrust claims, either party may file a motion to address the discovery for such claims in light of this court's July 2017 allowance of a motion to stay discovery (Docket Entry # 154) on these claims. (Putnam, Harold)
February 12, 2018 Filing 260 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. #202 Motion for Protective Order DENIED without prejudice in open court on Jan. 10, 2018; #224 Motion to Seal WITHDRAWN in open court on Jan. 10, 2018. (Putnam, Harold)
February 8, 2018 Filing 259 RESPONSE to Motion re #257 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 23, 2018 (from current deadline of January 26, 2018) to Serve Written Discovery filed by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Strapp, Michael)
January 25, 2018 Filing 258 MEMORANDUM in Support re #257 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 23, 2018 (from current deadline of January 26, 2018) to Serve Written Discovery filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
January 25, 2018 Filing 257 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 23, 2018 (from current deadline of January 26, 2018) to Serve Written Discovery by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Schillinger, Caleb)
January 24, 2018 Filing 256 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 24, 2018 Filing 255 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on January 10, 2018, before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. The Transcript may be purchased through Judy Bond at judy@bondcourtreporting.com, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: No Reporter Used Redaction Request due 2/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 10, 2018 Filing 254 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion Hearing held on 1/10/2018 re #224 MOTION to Seal filed by PDFfiller, Inc., #141 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) filed by Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky, PDFfiller, Inc., #121 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As to Amended Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 100) and Amended Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 101) filed by RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc., California Association of Realtors, Inc., #248 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc., #202 MOTION for Protective Order filed by PDFfiller, Inc. Court hears arguments on motions, takes matters under advisement. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Berkowitz, Schillinger, Strapp, Morante) (Putnam, Harold)
January 3, 2018 Filing 253 Due to anticipated inclement weather on 1/4/2018: ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #224 MOTION to Seal, #248 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, #141 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial), #121 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As to Amended Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 100) and Amended Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 101), #202 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
November 30, 2017 Filing 252 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #224 MOTION to Seal, #248 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, #141 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial), #121 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As to Amended Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 100) and Amended Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 101), #202 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
November 22, 2017 Filing 251 DECLARATION re #250 Opposition to Motion Declaration of Michael Strapp by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Strapp, Michael)
November 22, 2017 Filing 250 Opposition re #248 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Strapp, Michael)
November 9, 2017 Filing 249 MEMORANDUM in Support re #248 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Bigelow, Brandon)
November 9, 2017 Filing 248 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint)(Bigelow, Brandon)
November 2, 2017 Filing 247 NOTICE by PDFfiller, Inc. - Defendant's Notice of Subpoena ( Watkins Realty Group) (Strapp, Michael)
November 2, 2017 Filing 246 NOTICE by PDFfiller, Inc. - Defendant's Notice of Subpoena (Tuscany Real Estate Services) (Strapp, Michael)
November 2, 2017 Filing 245 NOTICE by PDFfiller, Inc. - Defendant's Notice of Subpoena ( Rose Group Real Estate Professionals) (Strapp, Michael)
November 2, 2017 Filing 244 NOTICE by PDFfiller, Inc. - Defendant's Notice of Subpoena (Armando Ramos & Associates, Inc.) (Strapp, Michael)
November 2, 2017 Filing 243 NOTICE by PDFfiller, Inc. - Defendant's Notice of Subpoena (Prestige Properties & Finance) (Strapp, Michael)
November 2, 2017 Filing 242 NOTICE by PDFfiller, Inc. - Defendant's Notice of Subpoena (David Brauner Insurance Services/Organization of Real Estate Professionals) (Strapp, Michael)
November 2, 2017 Filing 241 NOTICE by PDFfiller, Inc. - Defendant's Notice of Subpoena (Maurice Rizzuto) (Strapp, Michael)
November 2, 2017 Filing 240 NOTICE by PDFfiller, Inc. - Defendant's Notice of Subpoena (Gil's Real Estate) (Strapp, Michael)
November 2, 2017 Filing 239 NOTICE by PDFfiller, Inc. - Defendant's Notice of Subpoena (ELIM Investment Company) (Strapp, Michael)
November 2, 2017 Filing 238 NOTICE by PDFfiller, Inc. - Defendant's Notice of Subpoena (Americorp Business Brokers) (Strapp, Michael)
October 24, 2017 Filing 237 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #224 MOTION to Seal the entire Transcript of the Deposition of Boris Shakhnovich filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
October 24, 2017 Filing 236 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #224 MOTION to Seal the entire Transcript of the Deposition of Boris Shakhnovich filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
October 13, 2017 Filing 235 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 13, 2017 Filing 234 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on October 10, 2017, before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. The Transcript may be purchased through Judy Bond at judy@bondcourtreporting.com, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter: No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Judy Bond. Redaction Request due 11/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 11, 2017 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #192 Motion for Protective Order after hearing and granting #195 Motion to Compel to the extent set forth on the record in open court on October 10, 2017. (Bowler, Marianne)
October 10, 2017 Filing 230 DECLARATION re #229 Reply to Response to Motion by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Strapp, Michael)
October 10, 2017 Filing 229 REPLY to Response to #202 MOTION for Protective Order filed by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Strapp, Michael)
October 10, 2017 Filing 228 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #219 Motion to Seal Document. (Putnam, Harold)
October 10, 2017 Filing 227 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #223 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Putnam, Harold)
October 10, 2017 Filing 226 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2017 re #192 MOTION for Protective Order filed by PDFfiller, Inc., #195 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Provide Accurate Document Responses and Comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(E)(i) filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc. Rulings to issue. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Schillinger, Strapp) (Putnam, Harold)
October 10, 2017 Filing 225 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #224 MOTION To Impound The Transcript of The Deposition of Boris Shakhnovich filed by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Strapp, Michael)
October 10, 2017 Filing 224 MOTION To Impound The Transcript of The Deposition of Boris Shakhnovich by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Strapp, Michael)
October 10, 2017 Filing 223 MOTION for Leave to File a reply brief and supplemental declaration in Support of Motion For Protective Order by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order, #2 Declaration of Michael Strapp)(Strapp, Michael)
September 29, 2017 Filing 222 AFFIDAVIT of Jason H. Eaddy in Opposition re #202 MOTION for Protective Order filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
September 29, 2017 Filing 221 AFFIDAVIT of Caleb J. Schillinger in Opposition re #202 MOTION for Protective Order filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Schillinger, Caleb)
September 29, 2017 Filing 220 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #202 MOTION for Protective Order filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
September 29, 2017 Filing 219 MOTION to Seal Document Pending Showing of Good Cause by Defendants by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Schillinger, Caleb)
September 27, 2017 Filing 218 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #195 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Provide Accurate Document Responses and Comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(E)(i), #192 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2017 02:45 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY.(Putnam, Harold)
September 27, 2017 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #217 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (Bowler, Marianne)
September 22, 2017 Filing 217 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 29, 2017 to File Response/Reply as to #202 MOTION for Protective Order (WITH NO OPPOSITION) by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Schillinger, Caleb)
September 21, 2017 Filing 216 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #195 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Provide Accurate Document Responses and Comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(E)(i), and #192 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. In the meantime, counsel to contact the clerk to schedule hearing dates for dispositive motions (docs. # 121 & 141). (Putnam, Harold)
September 20, 2017 Filing 215 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #213 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; ALLOWING #214 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Added John Nading & Megan Michaels Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
September 19, 2017 Filing 214 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Megan Michaels Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6801959 by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B)(Strapp, Michael)
September 19, 2017 Filing 213 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Nading Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6801929 by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Strapp, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/20/2017 with signed version ) (DaSilva, Carolina).
September 19, 2017 Filing 212 NOTICE by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky Notice of Subpoena to DotLoop LLC (Strapp, Michael)
September 14, 2017 Filing 210 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
September 14, 2017 Filing 209 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on September 11, 2017, before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. The Transcript may be purchased through Judy Bond at judy@bondcourtreporting.com viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Judy Bond. Redaction Request due 10/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah)
September 14, 2017 Filing 208 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER of Impoundment entered re #206 MOTION to Correct #199 MOTION to Seal Document - Declaration of Boris Shakhnovich filed by PDFfiller, Inc. (Putnam, Harold)
September 13, 2017 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #205 Motion for Leave to File Document and granting #206 Motion to Correct. (Bowler, Marianne)
September 13, 2017 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #199 Motion to Seal Document. (Bowler, Marianne)
September 13, 2017 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re: Docket Entry # 182, Motion to Quash. In light of plaintiffs suggestion (Docket Entry # 207), this court will hold the motion to quash (Docket Entry # 182) in abeyance for 30 days during which time the parties shall meet and confer in an effort to resolve the motion. (Bowler, Marianne)
September 12, 2017 Filing 207 RESPONSE to Motion re #205 MOTION for Leave to File and Proposal to Hold Motion to Quash in Abeyance Pending Discovery Conference Concerning PDFfiller's Production of Google Data filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Bigelow, Brandon)
September 11, 2017 Filing 211 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 9/11/2017. Court hears argument on motions # 182 and 206. Docket entry # 206 granted; # 182 taken under advisement and held in abeyance. After the 30 day abeyance period, parties to alert the deputy clerk as to result of meet and confer. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Bigelow, Schillinger, Strapp, Couto) (Putnam, Harold)
September 8, 2017 Filing 206 MOTION to Correct #199 MOTION to Seal Document - Declaration of Boris Shakhnovich by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Strapp, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2017: #3 SEALED Declaration of Boris Shakhnovich) (Putnam, Harold).
September 8, 2017 Filing 205 MOTION for Leave to File by PDFfiller, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC.(Strapp, Michael)
September 8, 2017 Filing 204 DECLARATION of Peter J. Cuto In Opposition to #195 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Provide Accurate Document Responses and Comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(E)(i) by PDFfiller, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strapp, Michael) Modified text and docket entry relationship on 9/11/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
September 8, 2017 Filing 203 Opposition re #195 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Provide Accurate Document Responses and Comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(E)(i) filed by PDFfiller, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC. (Strapp, Michael)
September 8, 2017 Filing 202 MOTION for Protective Order by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration Filed under Seal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3- Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4- Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5- Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6- Filed Under Seal)(Strapp, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2017: #8 SEALED Motion for Protective Order by PDFfiller, Inc.) (Putnam, Harold).
September 7, 2017 Filing 201 Proposed Document(s) submitted by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. Document received: Proposed Order of Impoundment. (Strapp, Michael)
September 7, 2017 Filing 200 DECLARATION re #199 MOTION to Seal Document - Declaration of Boris Shakhnovich - Declaration of Michael Strapp by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Strapp, Michael)
September 7, 2017 Filing 199 MOTION to Seal Document - Declaration of Boris Shakhnovich by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky.(Strapp, Michael)
September 5, 2017 Filing 198 Opposition re #192 MOTION for Protective Order filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
August 25, 2017 Filing 197 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #195 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Provide Accurate Document Responses and Comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(E)(i) filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PDFfiller's June 8, 2017 Amended Responses to C.A.R.'s First Request for Documents)(Bigelow, Brandon)
August 25, 2017 Filing 196 MEMORANDUM in Support re #195 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Provide Accurate Document Responses and Comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(E)(i) filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Bigelow, Brandon)
August 25, 2017 Filing 195 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Provide Accurate Document Responses and Comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(E)(i) by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Bigelow, Brandon)
August 22, 2017 Filing 194 DECLARATION re #192 MOTION for Protective Order , #193 Memorandum in Support of Motion Declaration of Peter J. Couto by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strapp, Michael)
August 22, 2017 Filing 193 MEMORANDUM in Support re #192 MOTION for Protective Order filed by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Strapp, Michael)
August 22, 2017 Filing 192 MOTION for Protective Order by PDFfiller, Inc..(Strapp, Michael)
August 18, 2017 Filing 191 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 18, 2017 Filing 190 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on August 17, 2017, before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. The Transcript may be purchased through Judy bond at judy@bondcourtreporting.com, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Judy Bond. Redaction Request due 9/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 17, 2017 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #168 Motion to Compel to the extent set forth on the record in open court on August 17, 2017. (Bowler, Marianne)
August 17, 2017 Filing 189 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #182 MOTION to Quash : Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
August 17, 2017 Filing 188 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion Hearing held on 8/17/2017 re #168 MOTION to Compel Amended And Supplemental Interrogatory Responses filed by PDFfiller, Inc. Court hears argument on motion. Defense offers five demonstrative exhibits. Court's ruling to issue. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Bigelow, Schillinger, Strapp) (Putnam, Harold)
August 16, 2017 Filing 187 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #182 MOTION to Quash : Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
August 16, 2017 Filing 186 Response by California Association of Realtors, Inc. to #181 Letter/request (non-motion) . (Bigelow, Brandon)
August 16, 2017 Filing 185 AFFIDAVIT of Caleb J. Schillinger in Opposition re #182 MOTION to Quash filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schillinger, Caleb)
August 16, 2017 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #182 MOTION to Quash filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
August 10, 2017 Filing 183 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #182 MOTION to Quash . Counsel who filed the document are requested to submit a courtesy copy to the Clerk's Office by August 14, 2017. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy, contain appropriate (number/letter) tabs, reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and be placed in a 3-ring binder. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 9, 2017 Filing 182 MOTION to Quash by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Strapp, Michael)
August 8, 2017 Filing 181 Letter/request (non-motion) from Michael Strapp . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Strapp, Michael)
July 27, 2017 Filing 180 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #168 MOTION to Compel Amended And Supplemental Interrogatory Responses : Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
July 26, 2017 Filing 179 AFFIDAVIT of Caleb J. Schillinger in Opposition re #168 MOTION to Compel Amended And Supplemental Interrogatory Responses filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schillinger, Caleb)
July 26, 2017 Filing 178 Opposition re #168 MOTION to Compel Amended And Supplemental Interrogatory Responses filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
July 25, 2017 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #130 Motion to Compel to the extent set forth on the record in open court on July 19, 2017. The remaining portion of the motion is denied without prejudice. (Bowler, Marianne)
July 25, 2017 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER of correction to the previous docket entry. The reference should be to Docket Entry # 130. The motion [Docket Entry # 164] is moot in light of the ruling on Docket Entry # 130.(Bowler, Marianne)
July 25, 2017 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #164 Motion to Compel in light of the ruling on Docket Entry # 138. (Bowler, Marianne)
July 25, 2017 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #154 Motion for Protective Order as to the requests for production and allowed as to the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition as to the testimony on the antitrust claims and related defenses. (Bowler, Marianne)
July 25, 2017 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #171 Motion for Leave to File Document. (Bowler, Marianne)
July 25, 2017 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #138 Motion to Compel without prejudice as to category (1)(i). Defendant may renew the request in the event of a ruling denying all or part of the pending motion to dismiss. The motion is otherwise ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part to the extent set forth on the record in open court on July 19, 2017. (Bowler, Marianne)
July 24, 2017 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #177 Motion for Modification. the court specifically adopts the new deadlines as set forth in paragraph 5 of Docket Entry # 177. (Bowler, Marianne)
July 21, 2017 Filing 177 Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Deadlines by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Schillinger, Caleb)
July 21, 2017 Filing 176 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 21, 2017 Filing 175 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on July 19, 2017, before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. The Transcript may be purchased through Judy Bond at judy@bondcourtreporting.com, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Judy Bond. Redaction Request due 8/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 19, 2017 Filing 174 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion Hearing held on 7/19/2017 re #138 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by PDFfiller, Inc., #154 Cross MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Concerning Antitrust Claims and Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc., #164 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Answer to Interrogatory No. 10 filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc., #130 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Other Discovery filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc., #171 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel, filed by PDFfiller, Inc. Court hears argument on motions; issues rulings. Parties to file proposed joint schedule, to be amended in the future as needed. (Status Conference set for 9/11/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler.). (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Berkowitz, Schillinger, Strapp, Couto) (Putnam, Harold)
July 17, 2017 Filing 173 Opposition re #164 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Answer to Interrogatory No. 10 filed by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Strapp, Michael)
July 17, 2017 Filing 172 Opposition re #171 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel, filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
July 14, 2017 Filing 171 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel, by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel, #2 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Peter J. Couto, #3 Exhibit A to Supplemental Declaration of Peter J. Couto, #4 Exhibit Ex B Supplemental Declaration of Peter J. Couto, #5 Exhibit Ex C Supplemental Declaration of Peter J. Couto, #6 Exhibit Ex D Supplemental Declaration of Peter J. Couto)(Strapp, Michael)
July 12, 2017 Filing 170 DECLARATION re #169 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #168 MOTION to Compel Amended And Supplemental Interrogatory Responses - Declaration of Peter J. Couto by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Strapp, Michael)
July 12, 2017 Filing 169 MEMORANDUM in Support re #168 MOTION to Compel Amended And Supplemental Interrogatory Responses filed by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Strapp, Michael)
July 12, 2017 Filing 168 MOTION to Compel Amended And Supplemental Interrogatory Responses by PDFfiller, Inc..(Strapp, Michael)
July 7, 2017 Filing 167 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #164 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Answer to Interrogatory No. 10 : Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. This motion will be heard along with the other motions already set for hearing on 7/19/2017.(Putnam, Harold)
July 3, 2017 Filing 166 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #164 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Answer to Interrogatory No. 10 filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.(California Association of Realtors, Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C.A.R.'s Interrogatory No. 10, #2 Exhibit B - PDFfillers Response to Interrogatory No. 10)(Bigelow, Brandon)
July 3, 2017 Filing 165 MEMORANDUM in Support re #164 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Answer to Interrogatory No. 10 filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.(California Association of Realtors, Inc.). (Bigelow, Brandon)
July 3, 2017 Filing 164 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Answer to Interrogatory No. 10 by California Association of Realtors, Inc.(California Association of Realtors, Inc.).(Bigelow, Brandon)
June 30, 2017 Filing 163 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Status Conference and Setting Hearing on Motion #138 MOTION to Compel Discovery, #154 Cross MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Concerning Antitrust Claims and Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition, #130 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Other Discovery : Conference and Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
June 28, 2017 Filing 162 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #130 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Other Discovery (Supplemental Declaration of Caleb J. Schillinger) filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schillinger, Caleb)
June 28, 2017 Filing 161 REPLY to Response to #130 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Other Discovery filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
June 28, 2017 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #159 Motion for Leave to File Document; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Bowler, Marianne)
June 28, 2017 Filing 160 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler, full pretrial, dispositive motions. (MacDonald, Gail) Motions referred to Marianne B. Bowler.
June 27, 2017 Filing 159 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery (Dkt. 130) by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 (Reply Brief), #2 Attachment 2 (Supplemental Schillinger Declaration))(Schillinger, Caleb)
June 26, 2017 Filing 158 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #154 Cross MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Concerning Antitrust Claims and Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Strapp, Michael)
June 12, 2017 Filing 157 AFFIDAVIT of Caleb Schillinger in Opposition re #138 MOTION to Compel Discovery and in Support of Cross-Motion for Protective Order filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Production Chart, #2 Exhibit B - Interogatory Responses, #3 Exhibit C - Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice)(Schillinger, Caleb)
June 12, 2017 Filing 156 AFFIDAVIT of Shuan Lue in Opposition re #138 MOTION to Compel Discovery and in Support of Cross-Motion for Protective Order filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb)
June 12, 2017 Filing 155 Opposition re #138 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Protective Order filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Schillinger, Caleb) (Main Document 155 replaced on 6/13/2017 to correct filing) (DaSilva, Carolina).
June 12, 2017 Filing 154 Cross MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Concerning Antitrust Claims and Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Schillinger, Caleb)
June 12, 2017 Filing 153 Opposition re #141 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Bigelow, Brandon)
June 9, 2017 Filing 152 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #149 Opposition to Motion, #150 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #151 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion. Counsel who filed the document are requested to submit a courtesy copy to the Clerk's Office by June 13, 2017. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy, contain appropriate (number/letter) tabs, reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and be placed in a 3-ring binder. (DaSilva, Carolina)
June 8, 2017 Filing 151 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #130 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Other Discovery filed by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Strapp, Michael)
June 8, 2017 Filing 150 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #130 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Other Discovery filed by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Strapp, Michael)
June 8, 2017 Filing 149 Opposition re #130 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Other Discovery filed by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Strapp, Michael)
June 6, 2017 Filing 148 Reset Deadlines as to #138 MOTION to Compel Discovery, #141 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial). Responses due by 6/12/2017. (DaSilva, Carolina)
June 5, 2017 Filing 147 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #146 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (MacDonald, Gail)
June 2, 2017 Filing 146 MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/12/17 to File Response/Reply to PDFfiller's Motion to Compel Discovery and Partial Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Bigelow, Brandon)
May 31, 2017 Filing 145 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for: #138 MOTION to Compel Discovery, #139 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #140 Affidavit in Support of Motion. #141 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial), #142 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #143 Affidavit in Support of Motion. Counsel who filed the document are requested to submit a courtesy copy to the Clerk's Office by June 2, 2017. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy, contain appropriate (number/letter) tabs, reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and be placed in a 3-ring binder. (DaSilva, Carolina)
May 26, 2017 Filing 143 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #141 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) filed by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Strapp, Michael)
May 26, 2017 Filing 142 MEMORANDUM in Support re #141 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) filed by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Strapp, Michael)
May 26, 2017 Filing 141 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky.(Strapp, Michael)
May 26, 2017 Filing 140 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #138 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Strapp, Michael)
May 26, 2017 Filing 139 MEMORANDUM in Support re #138 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Strapp, Michael)
May 26, 2017 Filing 138 MOTION to Compel Discovery by PDFfiller, Inc..(Strapp, Michael)
May 26, 2017 Filing 137 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 26, 2017 Filing 136 Transcript of Telephone Conference held on May 19,2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com Redaction Request due 6/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 19, 2017 Filing 144 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Telephone Conference held on 5/19/2017. Parties have a one week extension to respond to the Motion to Compel filed 5/18/17. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Schillinger, Strapp, Couto) (MacDonald, Gail)
May 18, 2017 Filing 135 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 5/19/2017 02:30 PM before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel appearing telephonically are instructed to call 888-808-6929 and enter code 8523158# five minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. (MacDonald, Gail)
May 18, 2017 Filing 134 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #121 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As to Amended Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 100) and Amended Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 101) filed by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Strapp, Michael)
May 18, 2017 Filing 133 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #130 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Other Discovery (Declaration of Sean M. Tuttle) filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schillinger, Caleb)
May 18, 2017 Filing 132 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #130 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Other Discovery (Declaration of Caleb J. Schillinger) filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Schillinger, Caleb)
May 18, 2017 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM in Support re #130 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Other Discovery filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Schillinger, Caleb)
May 18, 2017 Filing 130 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Other Discovery by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Schillinger, Caleb)
May 18, 2017 Filing 129 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #128 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief In Opposition To Motion To Dismiss Amended Counterclaims And Amended Third-Party Complaint ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (DaSilva, Carolina)
May 17, 2017 Filing 128 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief In Opposition To Motion To Dismiss Amended Counterclaims And Amended Third-Party Complaint by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strapp, Michael)
May 12, 2017 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to #121 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As to Amended Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 100) and Amended Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 101) filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.(California Association of Realtors, Inc.), RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc.. (Berkowitz, William)
May 12, 2017 Filing 126 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #125 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss (ECF 121) (Unopposed) ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (DaSilva, Carolina)
May 11, 2017 Filing 125 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss (ECF 121) (Unopposed) by California Association of Realtors, Inc.(California Association of Realtors, Inc.), RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Reply Brief))(Berkowitz, William)
May 2, 2017 Filing 124 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/23/2017. Discovery to be completed by 9/24/2017. Motions due by 11/22/2017. The parties shall promptly advise the court of their respective positions as to whether the deadlines should apply to liability only. (DaSilva, Carolina)
April 24, 2017 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #121 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As to Amended Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 100) and Amended Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 101) filed by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Strapp, Michael)
April 10, 2017 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM in Support re #121 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As to Amended Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 100) and Amended Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 101) filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.(California Association of Realtors, Inc.), RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc.. (Berkowitz, William)
April 10, 2017 Filing 121 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As to Amended Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 100) and Amended Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 101) by California Association of Realtors, Inc.(California Association of Realtors, Inc.), RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc..(Berkowitz, William)
April 6, 2017 Filing 120 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #119 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Peter John Couto. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
April 5, 2017 Filing 119 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Peter Couto Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6569644 by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Michael Strapp in Support), #2 Exhibit B (Affidavit of Peter Couto, in Support))(Strapp, Michael)
March 22, 2017 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa E. Kirby on behalf of California Association of Realtors, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc. (Kirby, Lisa)
March 22, 2017 Filing 117 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by William F. Benson (Benson, William)
March 22, 2017 Filing 116 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Daniel J. Pasquarello (Pasquarello, Daniel)
March 20, 2017 Filing 115 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #113 and #114 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Paolo Morante & Adam Steene. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
March 17, 2017 Filing 114 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adam Steene Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6538737 by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Michael Strapp), #2 Exhibit B (Affidavit of Adam Steene))(Strapp, Michael)
March 17, 2017 Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paolo Morante Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6538661 by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Michael Strapp), #2 Exhibit B (Affidavit of Paolo Morante))(Strapp, Michael)
March 16, 2017 Filing 112 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #111 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #111 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 10, 2017 to File Response/Reply as to #101 Third Party Complaint, #100 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (WITH NO OPPOSITION) Responses due by 4/10/2017 (MacDonald, Gail)
March 16, 2017 Filing 111 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 10, 2017 to File Response/Reply as to #101 Third Party Complaint, #100 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (WITH NO OPPOSITION) by California Association of Realtors, Inc.(California Association of Realtors, Inc.), RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc..(Schillinger, Caleb)
March 13, 2017 Filing 110 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING #55 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify DLA Piper LLP Based upon Conflict of Interest. See Attached Order. Stay is lifted. (DaSilva, Carolina)
March 3, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Maya Prakash Choksi (Choksi, Maya)
February 15, 2017 Filing 108 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 15, 2017 Filing 107 Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Stay held on February 7, 2017, before Judge Indira Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Stay held on February 7, 2017 before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 3/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 2/15/2017 (Scalfani, Deborah).
February 14, 2017 Filing 106 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #55 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Pasquarello, Daniel)
February 14, 2017 Filing 105 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #55 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel DLA Piper LLP filed by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit of Peter D. Lindau in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify DLA Piper LLP)(Falby, Bruce)
February 7, 2017 Filing 104 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2017 re #94 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Resolution of Disqualification Motion filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc. Case called. Court hears argument from counsel. Initial Disclosures to be supplemented by Defendant. Plaintiffs will have 28 days from the lifting of the stay to respond to defendants discovery requests. The Motion to Dismiss #74 is moot. The case remains stayed. Motion to Disqualify #55 taken under advisement. Short additional briefing containing less than 5 pages will be accepted and is due by 2/14/17. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Berkowitz, Pasquarello, Strapp, Choksi) (MacDonald, Gail)
February 6, 2017 Filing 103 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #101 Third Party Complaint, #102 Opposition to Motion, #100 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. Counsel who filed these documents is requested to submit a courtesy copy to the Clerk's Office by TODAY at 2:00 PM. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and be placed in a tabbed binder. (MacDonald, Gail)
February 3, 2017 Filing 102 Opposition re #94 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Resolution of Disqualification Motion filed by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Strapp, Michael)
February 3, 2017 Filing 101 Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Real Estate Business Services, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC, filed by PDFfiller, Inc..(Strapp, Michael)
February 3, 2017 Filing 100 Second Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against California Association of Realtors, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc. by PDFfiller, Inc..(Strapp, Michael)
January 25, 2017 Filing 99 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Document 98 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2017 03:15 PM WAS FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. (MacDonald, Gail)
January 25, 2017 Filing 98 NOTICE FILED IN ERROR. (MacDonald, Gail).
January 25, 2017 Filing 97 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #94 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Resolution of Disqualification Motion : Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2017 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. PLEASE NOTE CHANGE IN TIME ONLY. (MacDonald, Gail)
January 23, 2017 Filing 96 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #94 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Resolution of Disqualification Motion : Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Indira Talwani. The court's prior stay of proceedings including discovery remains in effect pending further court order. (MacDonald, Gail)
January 20, 2017 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM in Support re #94 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Resolution of Disqualification Motion filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Benson, William)
January 20, 2017 Filing 94 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Resolution of Disqualification Motion by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Benson, William)
January 17, 2017 Filing 93 REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider: Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal reports that this case did not settle and further efforts to settle this case at this time are, in my judgment, unlikely to be productive. This case should be restored to your trial list. (York, Steve)
January 17, 2017 Filing 92 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Telephone Conference held on 1/17/2017. The Court held a phone conference with the parties and inquired as to their desire to proceed with a further mediation hearing. The parties decline a further session and requested to have the matter proceed before the District Judge assigned. (Court Reporter: SEALED Digital Recording) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, The parties should first seek leave of the Court. If approved, please then go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Attorneys present: Bigelow & Schillinger for the plaintiffs; Strapp & Choksi for the defendants;) (York, Steve)
January 11, 2017 Filing 91 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered ALLOWING IN PART and DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART #90 Joint MOTION for Protective Order of Confidentiality. See Attached Order. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 6, 2017 Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Protective Order of Confidentiality by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order)(Schillinger, Caleb)
November 23, 2016 Filing 89 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #88 Motion to Stay All Deadlines for Sixty Days (until January 23, 2017). (MacDonald, Gail)
November 23, 2016 Filing 88 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines for Sixty Days (until January 23, 2017) by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky.(Strapp, Michael)
November 21, 2016 Filing 85 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #80 Motion to Seal Portions of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify DLA Piper LLP and Affidavit of Jeffrey Shohet. (MacDonald, Gail)
November 17, 2016 Filing 84 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/17/2017 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (York, Steve)
November 17, 2016 Filing 83 REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider: Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal reports this case did not settle but progress was made. A further telephone conference to be scheduled January 17, 2016 at 12:00 noon.(York, Steve)
November 16, 2016 Filing 81 Opposition re #55 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel DLA Piper LLP (Redacted) filed by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Boris Shakhnovich, #2 Affidavit Michael Strapp, #3 Affidavit Maya P. Choksi, #4 Affidavit Peter Lindau, #5 Affidavit Tamar Duvdevani, #6 Affidavit Paolo Morante, #7 Affidavit Adam Steene, #8 Affidavit Jeffrey Shohet (Redacted), #9 Affidavit Amanda Fitzsimmons)(Falby, Bruce)
November 16, 2016 Filing 80 Assented to MOTION to Seal Portions of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify DLA Piper LLP and Affidavit of Jeffrey Shohet by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky.(Falby, Bruce)
November 16, 2016 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce E. Falby on behalf of PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky (Falby, Bruce)
November 14, 2016 Filing 78 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Telephone Conference held on 11/14/2016. The Court reviewed preliminary matters with the parties prior to the upcoming mediation. (Court Reporter: SEALED Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs the parties should first seek leave of the Court. If the request is granted, the parties should then contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Attorneys present: Berkowitz, Bigelow & Schillinger for the plaintiffs; Strapp & Choksi for the defendants;) (York, Steve)
November 14, 2016 Filing 77 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #76 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #74 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As To Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 32) and Third Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 31) Responses due by 12/7/2016 (MacDonald, Gail)
November 14, 2016 Filing 76 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 7, 2016 to File Response/Reply as to #74 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As To Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 32) and Third Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 31) by PDFfiller, Inc..(Strapp, Michael)
November 2, 2016 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM in Support re #74 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As To Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 32) and Third Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 31) filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc.. (Berkowitz, William)
November 2, 2016 Filing 74 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As To Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 32) and Third Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 31) by California Association of Realtors, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc..(Berkowitz, William)
October 19, 2016 Filing 73 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #71 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William M. Gantz; Tony K. Lu; Gaspare J. Bono and Stephen M. Chippendale terminated. (MacDonald, Gail)
October 18, 2016 Filing 72 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #70 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for answering or otherwise responding to the Third Party Complaint and to theAmended Answer and Counterclaims is extended to November 2, 2016. (MacDonald, Gail)
October 18, 2016 Filing 71 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance of Dentons US LLP by California Association of Realtors, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc..(Gantz, William)
October 18, 2016 Filing 70 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 2, 2016 to File Response/Reply as to #32 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, #31 Third Party Complaint by California Association of Realtors, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc..(Schillinger, Caleb)
October 18, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb J. Schillinger on behalf of California Association of Realtors, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc. (Schillinger, Caleb)
October 18, 2016 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Benson on behalf of California Association of Realtors, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc. (Benson, William)
October 18, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon L. Bigelow on behalf of California Association of Realtors, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc. (Bigelow, Brandon)
October 18, 2016 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by William N. Berkowitz on behalf of California Association of Realtors, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc. (Berkowitz, William)
October 12, 2016 Filing 65 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #61 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. California Association of Realtors, Inc. answer or response due 10/19/2016. (Talwani, Indira)
October 12, 2016 Filing 63 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #62 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #31 Third Party Complaint. RE FormsNet LLC answer due 10/19/2016; Real Estate Business Services, Inc. answer due 10/19/2016. (DaSilva, Carolina)
October 11, 2016 Filing 62 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to October 19, 2016 to File Answer re #31 Third Party Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Third Party Complaint by RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc..(Gantz, William)
October 11, 2016 Filing 61 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaims by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Gantz, William)
October 11, 2016 Filing 60 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #59 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re: #55 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel. Response due by 11/16/2016 (DaSilva, Carolina)
October 10, 2016 Filing 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to November 16, 2016 to File Response/Reply as to #55 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (Unopposed) by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky.(Strapp, Michael)
October 7, 2016 Filing 58 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #57 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (DaSilva, Carolina)
October 6, 2016 Filing 57 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Pasquarello, Daniel)
October 3, 2016 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Support re #55 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration, #2 Exhibit B: letter, #3 Exhibit C: letter, #4 Exhibit D: agreement, #5 Exhibit E: letter, #6 Exhibit F: invoices, #7 Exhibit G: letter, #8 Exhibit H: correspondence)(Pasquarello, Daniel)
October 3, 2016 Filing 55 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Pasquarello, Daniel)
September 27, 2016 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Pasquarello on behalf of California Association of Realtors, Inc. (Pasquarello, Daniel)
September 19, 2016 Filing 53 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #31 Third Party Complaint All Defendants. (MacDonald, Gail)
September 19, 2016 Filing 52 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Stephen M. Chippendale. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
September 19, 2016 Filing 51 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Gaspare J. Bono. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
September 16, 2016 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 12, 2016 to File Answer re #31 Third Party Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Third Party Complaint by RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc..(Gantz, William)
September 16, 2016 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RE FormsNet LLC. (Gantz, William)
September 16, 2016 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Real Estate Business Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent California Association of Realtors, Inc. for Real Estate Business Services, Inc... (Gantz, William)
September 16, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Gantz on behalf of RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc. (Gantz, William)
September 16, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Tony K. Lu on behalf of RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc. (Lu, Tony)
September 16, 2016 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Stephen M. Chippendale Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6294482 by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Stephen M. Chippendale)(Lu, Tony)
September 16, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gaspare J. Bono Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6294462 by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Gaspare J. Bono)(Lu, Tony)
September 12, 2016 Filing 43 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #32 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, California Association of Realtors, Inc. answer due 10/12/2016. (MacDonald, Gail)
September 9, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 12, 2016 to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaims by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Lu, Tony)
September 9, 2016 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed RE FormsNet LLC served on 8/29/2016, answer due 9/19/2016. (Strapp, Michael)
September 9, 2016 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed Real Estate Business Services, Inc. served on 8/29/2016, answer due 9/19/2016. (Strapp, Michael)
August 29, 2016 Filing 39 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing has been rescheduled for 11/17/2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The Telephone Conference has been reset for 11/14/2016 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Please review the earlier notice regarding rules and submissions prior to the mediation. (York, Steve)
August 29, 2016 Filing 38 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #37 Motion To Reschedule Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing to November 17, 2016 (Unopposed) (York, Steve)
August 26, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION To Reschedule Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing to November 17, 2016 (Unopposed) by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Lu, Tony)
August 25, 2016 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing has been rescheduled for 11/10/2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The Telephone Conference is reset for 11/7/2016 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Please review the earlier notice regarding rules and submissions prior to the mediation. (York, Steve)
August 25, 2016 Filing 35 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #34 Motion To Postpone and Reschedule Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing of September 1, 2016 (Unopposed). (York, Steve)
August 24, 2016 Filing 34 MOTION To Postpone and Reschedule Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing of September 1, 2016 (Unopposed) by California Association of Realtors, Inc..(Lu, Tony)
August 23, 2016 Filing 33 Summons Issued as to RE FormsNet LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 22, 2016 Filing 32 First Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM (Counterclaim brought by PDFfiller, Inc.) against California Association of Realtors, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC d/b/a zipLogix, LLC, Real Estate Business Services, Inc. by Vadim Yasinovsky, PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich.(Strapp, Michael)
August 22, 2016 Filing 31 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT for Antitrust Violations of Sections 1 & 2 of the Sherman Act and the Cartwright Act against Real Estate Business Services, Inc., RE FormsNet LLC d/b/a zipLogix, LLC, filed by PDFfiller, Inc..(Strapp, Michael)
August 8, 2016 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Defenses by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky.(Strapp, Michael)
August 2, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 2, 2016 Filing 28 Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on July 21, 2016, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 8/23/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 1, 2016 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is set for 9/1/2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. Each party must submit a brief (no more than 5 pages) mediation memorandum that includes a discussion of (1) the merits of the case (both strengths and weaknesses); (2) damages or other relief sought by the parties; (3) the status of discovery; and (4) the status of the parties' settlement discussions. The memoranda should be submitted BY HAND, E-MAIL to (steve_york@mad.uscourts.gov), OR MAIL WITH THE COURT no later than five (5) business days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing." In the event that any party believes that the case is not ripe for mediation, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and call the deputy clerk at 617-748-9238 as soon as possible. Prior to the mediation, there will be a Telephone Conference set for 8/29/2016 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The clerk will provide the call in information to all parties by email, one day prior to the upcoming telephone conference. (York, Steve)
August 1, 2016 Filing 26 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Jennifer C. Boal appointed.(Garvin, Brendan)
July 26, 2016 Filing 25 REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(MacDonald, Gail)
July 22, 2016 Filing 23 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, All Defendants' answers due 8/8/16. (MacDonald, Gail)
July 22, 2016 Filing 22 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 8, 2016 to File Answer by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky.(Strapp, Michael)
July 21, 2016 Filing 24 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Scheduling Conference held on 7/21/2016. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel. Initial disclosures submitted. Defendant to file assented-to motion to extend time to answer complaint. Parties agree to ADR; Order to issue. Discovery stayed pending ADR report. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Gantz, Lu, Strapp, Choksi) (MacDonald, Gail)
July 14, 2016 Filing 21 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Lu, Tony)
July 14, 2016 Filing 20 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1. (Lu, Tony)
July 14, 2016 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of Defendants. (Strapp, Michael)
June 23, 2016 Filing 18 Set/Reset Deadlines as to All Defendants: Answer to Complaint due 7/25/16. (MacDonald, Gail)
June 23, 2016 Filing 17 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. No opposition having been filed by 5:00 p.m. 6/23/16, the Motion for Extension of Time to answer or respond is GRANTED #13 . Answer due July 25, 2016. (MacDonald, Gail)
June 23, 2016 Filing 16 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 25, 2016 to answer or otherwise respond to complaint. Plaintiff shall file any opposition to Defendant's Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint [#13] by close of business today 6/23/2016. (MacDonald, Gail)
June 22, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Maya Prakash Choksi on behalf of PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky (Choksi, Maya)
June 22, 2016 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PDFfiller, Inc.. (Strapp, Michael)
June 22, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 25, 2016 to answer or otherwise respond to complaint by PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strapp, Michael)
June 22, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Strapp on behalf of PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky (Strapp, Michael)
June 14, 2016 Filing 11 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Lu, Tony)
June 14, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2016 02:45 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring thatall parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. SEE attached Notice. (MacDonald, Gail)
June 13, 2016 Filing 9 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Executed Summons at docket entry 6 corrected because: to correct the party name to PDFfiller, Inc. (MacDonald, Gail)
June 13, 2016 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Vadim Yasinovsky served on 6/6/2016, answer due 6/27/2016. (Lu, Tony)
June 13, 2016 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Boris Shakhnovich served on 6/3/2016, answer due 6/24/2016. (Lu, Tony)
June 13, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed PDFfiller, Inc. served on 6/3/2016, answer due 6/24/2016. (Lu, Tony) Modified on 6/13/2016, to correct party name (MacDonald, Gail).
June 3, 2016 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Lu, Tony)
June 3, 2016 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Franklin, Yvonne)
June 3, 2016 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly)
June 2, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tony K. Lu on behalf of California Association of Realtors, Inc. (Lu, Tony)
June 2, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT And Jury Demand against PDFfiller, Inc., Boris Shakhnovich, Vadim Yasinovsky Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6139791 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by California Association of Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Gantz, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Association of Realtors, Inc. v PDFfiller, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Real Estate Business Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon L. Bigelow
Represented By: Tony K. Lu
Represented By: William M. Gantz
Represented By: Caleb J. Schillinger
Represented By: William F. Benson
Represented By: William N. Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: RE FormsNet LLC
Represented By: Brandon L. Bigelow
Represented By: Caleb J. Schillinger
Represented By: William F. Benson
Represented By: William N. Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: RE FormsNet LLC doing business as zipLogix, LLC
Represented By: Brandon L. Bigelow
Represented By: Caleb J. Schillinger
Represented By: William F. Benson
Represented By: William N. Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boris Shakhnovich
Represented By: Maya Prakash Choksi
Represented By: Peter John Couto
Represented By: Megan Michaels
Represented By: John M. Nading
Represented By: Bruce E. Falby
Represented By: Paolo Morante
Represented By: Michael G. Strapp
Represented By: Adam I. Steene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vadim Yasinovsky
Represented By: Maya Prakash Choksi
Represented By: Peter John Couto
Represented By: Megan Michaels
Represented By: John M. Nading
Represented By: Bruce E. Falby
Represented By: Paolo Morante
Represented By: Michael G. Strapp
Represented By: Adam I. Steene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Association of Realtors, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon L. Bigelow
Represented By: Tony K. Lu
Represented By: Stephen M. Chippendale
Represented By: Lisa K. Haines
Represented By: William M. Gantz
Represented By: Daniel J. Pasquarello
Represented By: Gaspare J. Bono
Represented By: Caleb J. Schillinger
Represented By: William F. Benson
Represented By: William N. Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: PDFfiller, Inc.
Represented By: Maya Prakash Choksi
Represented By: Bruce E. Falby
Represented By: Michael G. Strapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Judge Jennifer C. Boal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?