Ayyadurai v. Floor64, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Shiva Ayyadurai
Defendant: Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick, Leigh Beadon and Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2017cv10011
Filed: January 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: F. Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2017 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS, 14 MOTION to Strike (Special) Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law, 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 26 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint,, Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law (Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply) filed by Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick. (Bertsche, Robert)
May 1, 2017 Filing 46 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Docket #45 was edited to include the leave granted on date. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
May 1, 2017 Filing 45 SUR-REPLY to Motion re 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS, 14 MOTION to Strike (Special) Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law, 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 26 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint,, Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law filed by Shiva Ayyadurai. (LEAVE GRANTED ON 5/1/2017) (Cornell, Timothy) Modified on 5/1/2017 (Pezzarossi, Lisa).
May 1, 2017 Filing 44 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 40 Motion for Leave to File SUR-REPLY to Motion re 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS, 14 MOTION to Strike (Special) Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law, 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. Defendants' may file a response to the Plaintiff's Sur-reply by 5/8/2017. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
April 28, 2017 Filing 43 Opposition re 40 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick. (Bertsche, Robert)
April 27, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 27, 2017 Filing 41 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on April 20, 2017, before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 27, 2017 Filing 40 Motion for Leave to File SUR-REPLY to Motion re 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS, 14 MOTION to Strike (Special) Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law, 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Shiva Ayyadurai. (Attachments: # 1 Surreply, # 2 Exhibit A)(Cornell, Timothy) Modified on 4/28/2017 (Maynard, Timothy).
April 20, 2017 Filing 39 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Motion Hearing held on 4/20/2017 re 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick, 14 MOTION to Strike (Special) Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law filed by Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick, 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Leigh Beadon, 26 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint, Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law filed by Leigh Beadon. Case called. Court heard argument on the motions. Court took the matter UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Pyle, Sutcliffe, Bertsche, Mirell Cornell) (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
April 14, 2017 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS, 14 MOTION to Strike (Special) Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law, 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 26 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint,, Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law filed by Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick. (Bertsche, Robert)
April 14, 2017 Filing 37 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 36 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motions to Dismiss and to Strike; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
April 13, 2017 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motions to Dismiss and to Strike (Unopposed) by Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bertsche, Robert)
March 31, 2017 Filing 35 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 26 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint,, Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law, 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.(Pezzarossi, Lisa)
March 28, 2017 Filing 34 Opposition re 26 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint,, Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law filed by Shiva Ayyadurai. (Mirell, Douglas)
March 28, 2017 Filing 33 Opposition re 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Shiva Ayyadurai. (Mirell, Douglas)
March 20, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE by Shiva Ayyadurai re 31 Opposition to Motion, Substitute Exhibit A-13 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-13 to Ayyadurai Declaration)(Cornell, Timothy)
March 17, 2017 Filing 31 Opposition re 14 MOTION to Strike (Special) Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law filed by Shiva Ayyadurai. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Shiva Ayyadurai, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Ryan J. Stonerock, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Leslie P. Michelson, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Deborah J. Nightingale)(Harder, Charles)
March 17, 2017 Filing 30 Opposition re 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by Shiva Ayyadurai. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven Frackman)(Harder, Charles)
March 15, 2017 Filing 29 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Charles J. Harder, Douglas Mirell and Ryan Stonerock. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy)
March 14, 2017 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Leigh Beadon. (Bertsche, Robert)
March 14, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Leigh Beadon.(Bertsche, Robert)
March 14, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint,, Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law by Leigh Beadon.(Bertsche, Robert)
March 13, 2017 Filing 25 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
March 9, 2017 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Shiva Ayyadurai.(Cornell, Timothy)
March 9, 2017 Filing 23 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Charles Harder, Douglas E. Mirell, Ryan Stonerock Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-6528399 by Shiva Ayyadurai. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Harder Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Mirell Declaration, # 3 Affidavit Stonerock Declaration)(Cornell, Timothy)
March 9, 2017 Filing 22 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS : Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.(Pezzarossi, Lisa)
March 9, 2017 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC NOTICE POSTPONING HEARING: The scheduling conference set for 4/5/2017 will be postponed to allow for hearing on the motion to dismiss. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
March 1, 2017 Filing 20 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to March 17, 2017 to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS, 14 MOTION to Strike (Special) Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
February 27, 2017 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS, 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bertsche, Robert)
February 27, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 17, 2017 to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS, 14 MOTION to Strike (Special) Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law by Shiva Ayyadurai.(Cornell, Timothy)
February 27, 2017 Filing 17 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
February 17, 2017 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS, 14 MOTION to Strike (Special) Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law of Defendant Michael Masnick. (Bertsche, Robert)
February 17, 2017 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re 14 MOTION to Strike (Special) Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law filed by Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick. (Bertsche, Robert)
February 17, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike (Special) Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Law by Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick.(Bertsche, Robert)
February 17, 2017 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS, 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bertsche, Robert)
February 17, 2017 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick.(Bertsche, Robert)
February 17, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS by Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick.(Bertsche, Robert)
February 8, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 4/5/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pezzarossi, Lisa)
January 27, 2017 Filing 9 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response (Unopposed). Response due by 2/17/2017. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
January 24, 2017 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Shiva Ayyadurai. Floor64, Inc. served on 1/8/2017, answer due 1/30/2017; Michael David Massnick served on 1/9/2017, answer due 1/30/2017. Acknowledgement filed by Shiva Ayyadurai. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(Cornell, Timothy)
January 21, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Bertsche on behalf of Floor64, Inc., Michael David Massnick (Bertsche, Robert)
January 20, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Floor64, Inc., Michael David Massnick.(Pyle, Jeffrey)
January 20, 2017 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Floor64, Inc.. (Pyle, Jeffrey)
January 20, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Jackson Pyle on behalf of Floor64, Inc., Michael David Massnick (Pyle, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
January 4, 2017 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 4, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6439091 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Shiva Ayyadurai. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit)(Cornell, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayyadurai v. Floor64, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiva Ayyadurai
Represented By: Timothy M. Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floor64, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Bertsche
Represented By: Jeffrey Jackson Pyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael David Masnick
Represented By: Robert A. Bertsche
Represented By: Jeffrey Jackson Pyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Beadon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?