Louhghalam et al v. Trump, et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs associate professors at the University of Massachusetts-Dartmouth are Iranian nationals and lawful permanent residents of the United States. They were detained by U.S. Customs and Border Protection at Logan Airport when they returned to the United States from an academic conference pursuant to President Trump's Executive Order entitled Protecting the Nation From Foreign Terrorist Entry Into the United States. Plaintiffs filed a writ for habeas corpus and a complaint for declaratory and injunctive relief alleging that the Order violated their Fifth Amendment procedural and substantive due process rights, the First Amendment Establishment Clause, immigration statutes, the Administrative Procedure Act and Religious Freedom Restoration Act.

Plaintiff: Arghavan Louhghalam, Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni, Zahrasadat Mirrazi Renani, Leily Amirsardary, Oxfam America Inc, Ali Sanie, Fatemeh Yaghoubi Moghadam and Babak Yaghoubi Moghadam
Respondent: Donald J. Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, William Mohalley and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Amicus: Amici Curiae Massachusetts Universities
Case Number: 1:2017cv10154
Filed: January 28, 2017
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M. Gorton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2017 69 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the forgoing reasons, the Court declines to impose any injunctive relief and will not renew the temporary restraining order that was entered on January 29, 2017 (Docket No. 6).So ordered.(Lima, Christine)
February 3, 2017 68 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae Massachusetts Universities in Support of Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. (Rose, Alan)
February 3, 2017 67 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 62 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Caruso, Stephanie)
February 3, 2017 66 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 61 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sarah G. Boyce. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Caruso, Stephanie)
February 3, 2017 65 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 59 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael R. Doyen. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Caruso, Stephanie)
February 3, 2017 64 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 58 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Chad Golder. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Caruso, Stephanie)
February 3, 2017 63 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Status Conference held on 2/3/2017 as to whether the TRO currently in place should or should not be allowed to expire. Court hears arguments of counsel and takes the matter under advisement. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Catherine Handel at hhcatherine2@yahoo.com.)(Attorneys present: Dewar, Nadeau, Miller, Segal, Church, Rossman, Shinners, Farquhar, Press) (Lima, Christine)
February 3, 2017 62 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Amici Curiae Massachusetts Universities. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief on Behalf of Amici Curiae Massachusetts Universities)(Rose, Alan)
February 3, 2017 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sarah G. Boyce Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6482268 by Amici Curiae Massachusetts Universities. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Rule 83.5.3 Certification of Sarah G. Boyce, Esq. in Support of Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rose, Alan)
February 3, 2017 60 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 57 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brad D. Brian. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Caruso, Stephanie)
February 3, 2017 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael R. Doyen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6482254 by Amici Curiae Massachusetts Universities. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Rule 83.5.3 Certification of Michael R. Doyen, Esq. in Support of Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rose, Alan)
February 3, 2017 58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Chad Golder Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6482238 by Amici Curiae Massachusetts Universities. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Rule 83.5.3 Certification of Chad Golder, Esq. in Support of Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rose, Alan)
February 3, 2017 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brad D. Brian Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6482230 by Amici Curiae Massachusetts Universities. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Rule 83.5.3 Certification of Brad D. Brian, Esq. in Support of Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rose, Alan)
February 3, 2017 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan D. Rose, Sr on behalf of Amici Curiae Massachusetts Universities (Rose, Alan)
February 3, 2017 55 Response by Leily Amirsardary, Arghavan Louhghalam, Babak Yaghoubi Moghadam, Fatemeh Yaghoubi Moghadam, Oxfam America Inc, Zahrasadat Mirrazi Renani, Ali Sanie, Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni in Support of Continuation of Temporary Restraining Order and to Set Briefing Schedule for Expedited Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Gardener, Michael)
February 3, 2017 54 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 53 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Caruso, Stephanie)
February 3, 2017 53 MOTION for Leave to File Response in Support of Continuation of Temporary Restraining Order and to Set Briefing Schedule for Expedited Preliminary Injunction by Leily Amirsardary, Arghavan Louhghalam, Babak Yaghoubi Moghadam, Fatemeh Yaghoubi Moghadam, Oxfam America Inc, Zahrasadat Mirrazi Renani, Ali Sanie, Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni. (Attachments: # 1 {Proposed} Response in Support of Continuation of Temporary Restraining Order and to Set Briefing Schedule for Expedited Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Gardener, Michael)
February 2, 2017 52 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, University of Massachuestts. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit, # 6 Affidavit, # 7 Affidavit, # 8 Affidavit, # 9 Affidavit)(Nadeau, Genevieve) (Attachment 9 replaced on 2/3/2017) (Lima, Christine).
February 2, 2017 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan B. Miller on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts, University of Massachuestts (Miller, Jonathan)
February 2, 2017 50 Opposition re 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to 12:00 a.m., 2/3/17 to File Response/Reply as to 6 Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, William Mohalley, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Press, Joshua)
February 2, 2017 49 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 39 Motion for ORDER PERMITTING REMOTE ACCESS TO ELECTRONIC COURT FILINGS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 5.2(c) OR TO PERMIT THE PUBLIC TO PRINT AND/OR COPY UNSEALED COURT RECORDS by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. " Motion allowed." (Caruso, Stephanie)
February 2, 2017 48 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 38 Motion to Intervene by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. "Motion allowed." (Caruso, Stephanie)
February 2, 2017 47 Letter/request (non-motion) from Milton Valencia. (Caruso, Stephanie)
February 2, 2017 46 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Extension of Time to 12:00 a.m., 2/3/17 to File Response/Reply as to 6 Temporary Restraining Order"Motion for extension of time allowed, in part, and denied, in part; the government shall have until 5:00 p.m. on Thurs., Feb. 2, 2017 to file its opposition, if any." (Caruso, Stephanie)
February 2, 2017 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to 12:00 a.m., 2/3/17 to File Response/Reply as to 6 Temporary Restraining Order by John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, William Mohalley, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security.(Shinners, Katherine)
February 2, 2017 44 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 25 Motion to Intervene (Lima, Christine)
February 2, 2017 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Genevieve C. Nadeau on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts, University of Massachuestts (Nadeau, Genevieve)
February 2, 2017 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Albano on behalf of Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC (Albano, Jonathan)
February 2, 2017 41 AFFIDAVIT of Milton J. Valencia in Support re 39 MOTION ORDER PERMITTING REMOTE ACCESS TO ELECTRONIC COURT FILINGS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 5.2(c) OR TO PERMIT THE PUBLIC TO PRINT AND/OR COPY UNSEALED COURT RECORDS filed by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. (Hall, Emma)
February 2, 2017 40 MEMORANDUM in Support re 39 MOTION ORDER PERMITTING REMOTE ACCESS TO ELECTRONIC COURT FILINGS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 5.2(c) OR TO PERMIT THE PUBLIC TO PRINT AND/OR COPY UNSEALED COURT RECORDS filed by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. (Hall, Emma)
February 2, 2017 39 MOTION ORDER PERMITTING REMOTE ACCESS TO ELECTRONIC COURT FILINGS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 5.2(c) OR TO PERMIT THE PUBLIC TO PRINT AND/OR COPY UNSEALED COURT RECORDS by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC.(Hall, Emma)
February 2, 2017 38 MOTION to Intervene by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC.(Hall, Emma)
February 2, 2017 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma D. Hall on behalf of Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC (Hall, Emma)
February 1, 2017 36 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In light of the hearing scheduled for Friday, February 3, 2017, at 11:00 A.M., defendants are directed, if they intend to oppose the continuation of the temporary restraining order (Docket No. 6), to file a written response on or before 12:00 noon, Thursday, February 2, 2017.(Caruso, Stephanie)
February 1, 2017 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana Lafaille on behalf of Leily Amirsardary, Arghavan Louhghalam, Babak Yaghoubi Moghadam, Fatemeh Yaghoubi Moghadam, Oxfam America Inc, Zahrasadat Mirrazi Renani, Ali Sanie, Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni (Lafaille, Adriana)
February 1, 2017 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan J. Cohen on behalf of Leily Amirsardary, Arghavan Louhghalam, Babak Yaghoubi Moghadam, Fatemeh Yaghoubi Moghadam, Oxfam America Inc, Zahrasadat Mirrazi Renani, Ali Sanie, Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni (Cohen, Susan)
February 1, 2017 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Nathanson on behalf of Leily Amirsardary, Arghavan Louhghalam, Babak Yaghoubi Moghadam, Fatemeh Yaghoubi Moghadam, Oxfam America Inc, Zahrasadat Mirrazi Renani, Ali Sanie, Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni (Nathanson, Andrew)
February 1, 2017 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Finegan on behalf of Leily Amirsardary, Arghavan Louhghalam, Babak Yaghoubi Moghadam, Fatemeh Yaghoubi Moghadam, Oxfam America Inc, Zahrasadat Mirrazi Renani, Ali Sanie, Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni (Finegan, Susan)
February 1, 2017 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Biagetti on behalf of Leily Amirsardary, Arghavan Louhghalam, Babak Yaghoubi Moghadam, Fatemeh Yaghoubi Moghadam, Oxfam America Inc, Zahrasadat Mirrazi Renani, Ali Sanie, Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni (Biagetti, Peter)
February 1, 2017 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth B. Burnett on behalf of Leily Amirsardary, Arghavan Louhghalam, Babak Yaghoubi Moghadam, Fatemeh Yaghoubi Moghadam, Oxfam America Inc, Zahrasadat Mirrazi Renani, Ali Sanie, Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni (Burnett, Elizabeth)
February 1, 2017 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Gardener on behalf of Leily Amirsardary, Arghavan Louhghalam, Babak Yaghoubi Moghadam, Fatemeh Yaghoubi Moghadam, Oxfam America Inc, Zahrasadat Mirrazi Renani, Ali Sanie, Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni (Gardener, Michael)
February 1, 2017 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, William Mohalley, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Zahrasadat Mirrazi Renani, Leily Amirsardary, Oxfam America Inc, Ali Sanie, Fatemeh Yaghoubi Moghadam, Babak Yaghoubi Moghadam, filed by Arghavan Louhghalam, Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni, Zahrasadat Mirrazi Renani, Leily Amirsardary, Oxfam America Inc, Ali Sanie, Fatemeh Yaghoubi Moghadam, Babak Yaghoubi Moghadam.(Segal, Matthew)
January 31, 2017 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessie J. Rossman on behalf of Arghavan Louhghalam, Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni (Rossman, Jessie)
January 31, 2017 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re 25 MOTION to Intervene filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS. (Dewar, Elizabeth)
January 31, 2017 25 MOTION to Intervene by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Complaint)(Dewar, Elizabeth)
January 31, 2017 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Wunsch on behalf of on behalf of Leily Amirsardary, Arghavan Louhghalam, Babak Yaghoubi Moghadam, Fatemeh Yaghoubi Moghadam, Oxfam America Inc, Zahrasadat Mirrazi Renani, Ali Sanie, Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni (Wunsch, Sarah) Modified on 2/1/2017 (Caruso, Stephanie).
January 31, 2017 23 NOTICE by John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, William Mohalley, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Authority)(Shinners, Katherine)
January 31, 2017 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Yountz on behalf of Arghavan Louhghalam, Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni (Yountz, Heather)
January 31, 2017 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Press on behalf of John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, William Mohalley, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Press, Joshua)
January 31, 2017 20 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered denying 14 Motion to Permit Electronic Access to Case Filings. See attached Order. (Caruso, Stephanie)
January 31, 2017 19 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered. re 6 Temporary Restraining Order."Pursuant to the Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO", Docket No. 6) entered by United States District Judge Allison D. Burroughs and United States Magistrate Judge Judith Gail Dein on January 29, 2017, a hearing on the status of the TRO will be held in Courtroom 4 on Friday, February 3, 2017, at 11:00 A.M.. So Ordered."(Caruso, Stephanie) Modified text on 1/31/2017 (adminn, ).
January 31, 2017 18 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 31, 2017 17 Transcript of Hearing Regarding Temporary Restraining Order held on January 28-29, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein and Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through Judy Bond at bond.court.reporting@gmail.com, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter: No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Judy Bond. Redaction Request due 2/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Main Document 17 replaced on 2/1/2017) (Scalfani, Deborah).
January 31, 2017 16 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. "Motion allowed." (Lima, Christine)
January 30, 2017 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry E. Doyle on behalf of ARGHAVAN LOUHGHALAM, MAZDAK POURABDOLLAH TOOTKABONI (Doyle, Kerry)
January 30, 2017 14 MOTION to Permit Electronic Access to Case Filings by ARGHAVAN LOUHGHALAM, MAZDAK POURABDOLLAH TOOTKABONI.(Segal, Matthew)
January 30, 2017 13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Feb. 1, 2017 to Amend 1 Complaint, by ARGHAVAN LOUHGHALAM, MAZDAK POURABDOLLAH TOOTKABONI.(Segal, Matthew)
January 30, 2017 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan B. Church on behalf of MAZDAK POURABDOLLAH TOOTKABONI (Church, Susan)
January 30, 2017 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan B. Church on behalf of ARGHAVAN LOUHGHALAM (Church, Susan)
January 30, 2017 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund re 1 Complaint,, for $400.00 paid on 01/28/2017, receipt number 0101-6472533. (Adam, Lucien)
January 30, 2017 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Abaid, Kimberly)
January 30, 2017 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine J. Shinners on behalf of John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, William Mohalley, Donald J Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Shinners, Katherine)
January 30, 2017 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, William Mohalley, Donald J Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Sady, Michael)
January 29, 2017 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of ARGHAVAN LOUHGHALAM, MAZDAK POURABDOLLAH TOOTKABONI (Segal, Matthew)
January 29, 2017 6 Judge Allison D. Burroughs and Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER(Rynne, Michelle)
January 29, 2017 5 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs and Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: Hearing held on 1/28/17. Court hears argument regarding Temporary Restraining Order. Order Issued. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Farquar,Church, Segal) (Rynne, Michelle)
January 29, 2017 4 Proposed Document(s) submitted by MAZDAK POURABDOLLAH TOOTKABONI. Document received: Proposed Order. (Demissie, Derege)
January 29, 2017 3 Proposed Document(s) submitted by ARGHAVAN LOUHGHALAM. Document received: Proposed Order. (Demissie, Derege)
January 28, 2017 2 EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint by ARGHAVAN LOUHGHALAM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D)(Demissie, Derege)
January 28, 2017 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by ARGHAVAN LOUHGHALAM, MAZDAK POURABDOLLAH TOOTKABONI. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6472534 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Demissie, Derege) Modified docket text on 1/30/2017 (adminn, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/31/2017 to reflect signatures of all counsel) (Caruso, Stephanie).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louhghalam et al v. Trump, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Represented By: Katherine J. Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Represented By: Katherine J. Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Kelly
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Represented By: Katherine J. Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Represented By: Katherine J. Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Mohalley
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Represented By: Katherine J. Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Represented By: Katherine J. Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arghavan Louhghalam
Represented By: Peter A. Biagetti
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Burnett
Represented By: Susan B. Church
Represented By: Susan J. Cohen
Represented By: Derege B. Demissie
Represented By: Kerry E. Doyle
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Michael S. Gardener
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Andrew Nathanson
Represented By: Jessie J. Rossman
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Sarah R. Wunsch
Represented By: Heather Yountz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mazdak Pourabdollah Tootkaboni
Represented By: Peter A. Biagetti
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Burnett
Represented By: Susan B. Church
Represented By: Susan J. Cohen
Represented By: Derege B. Demissie
Represented By: Kerry E. Doyle
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Michael S. Gardener
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Andrew Nathanson
Represented By: Jessie J. Rossman
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Sarah R. Wunsch
Represented By: Heather Yountz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zahrasadat Mirrazi Renani
Represented By: Peter A. Biagetti
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Burnett
Represented By: Susan J. Cohen
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Michael S. Gardener
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Andrew Nathanson
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Sarah R. Wunsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leily Amirsardary
Represented By: Peter A. Biagetti
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Burnett
Represented By: Susan J. Cohen
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Michael S. Gardener
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Andrew Nathanson
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Sarah R. Wunsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oxfam America Inc
Represented By: Peter A. Biagetti
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Burnett
Represented By: Susan J. Cohen
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Michael S. Gardener
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Andrew Nathanson
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Sarah R. Wunsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Sanie
Represented By: Peter A. Biagetti
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Burnett
Represented By: Susan J. Cohen
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Michael S. Gardener
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Andrew Nathanson
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Sarah R. Wunsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatemeh Yaghoubi Moghadam
Represented By: Peter A. Biagetti
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Burnett
Represented By: Susan J. Cohen
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Michael S. Gardener
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Andrew Nathanson
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Sarah R. Wunsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Babak Yaghoubi Moghadam
Represented By: Peter A. Biagetti
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Burnett
Represented By: Susan J. Cohen
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Michael S. Gardener
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Andrew Nathanson
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Sarah R. Wunsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Amici Curiae Massachusetts Universities
Represented By: Sarah G. Boyce
Represented By: Brad D. Brian
Represented By: Michael R. Doyen
Represented By: Chad Golder
Represented By: Alan D. Rose, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?