Asgari v. Trump et al Featured Case

Plaintiff, an Iranian national, holds a doctorate degree from Ecole Polytechnique Federale de Lausanne in Switzerland and is an expert in genomics, infectious diseases, and computational biology. She was recruited by Dr. Soumya Raychaudhuri of Brigham and Women’s Hospital in Boston to join a world-renowned human genomics laboratory for postdoctoral training on a project with particular focus on tuberculosis progression. Plaintiff was issued a J-1 work-and-study-based exchange visitor visa but was denied boarding on account of President Trump's Executive Order entitled Protecting the Nation From Foreign Terrorist Entry Into the United States despite the temporary restraining order issued in Tootkaboni v. Trump. Plaintiff seeks an order from defendants that instructs the relevant airline to permit plaintiff to travel to Boston.

Plaintiff: Samira Asgari
Defendant: Donald Trump, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan and William Mohalley
Case Number: 1:2017cv10182
Filed: February 1, 2017
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Allison D. Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2017 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Samira Asgari (Kaufman, Noah)
March 31, 2017 14 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 13 Motion to Stay (Folan, Karen)
March 31, 2017 13 Joint MOTION to Stay by Samira Asgari.(Kaufman, Noah)
February 8, 2017 12 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot 5 Motion for TRO. (Folan, Karen)
February 3, 2017 11 NOTICE by Samira Asgari Regarding Cancellation of Emergency Hearing (Kaufman, Noah)
February 3, 2017 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing: The Motion hearing on 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, currently scheduled for 2/6/2017 at 10:00 AM has been cancelled. (Montes, Mariliz)
February 3, 2017 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Nazarov on behalf of John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, William Mohalley, Donald Trump (Folan, Karen)
February 3, 2017 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah J. Kaufman on behalf of Samira Asgari (Kaufman, Noah)
February 3, 2017 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel P. Bruhn on behalf of Samira Asgari (Bruhn, Nathaniel)
February 2, 2017 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Counsel for plaintiff shall inform defendants of the scheduled hearing. (Folan, Karen)
February 2, 2017 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Samira Asgari.(Willett, Peter)
February 2, 2017 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
February 2, 2017 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (McDonagh, Christina)
February 2, 2017 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Pacho, Arnold)
February 1, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6479440 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Samira Asgari. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form, # 3 Exhibit 1. Asgari Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2. Jan. 29, 2017 Order, # 5 Exhibit 3. Kaufman Declaration)(Willett, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/2/2017) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/2/2017) (McDonagh, Christina). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2017: # 6 Exhibit A) Restricted due to personal identifiers. (Pacho, Arnold). (Attachment 5 replaced on 2/2/2017) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 2/2/2017 (Pacho, Arnold). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2017: # 8 Exhibit A RE: Exhibit 1. Asgari Declaration) (adminn, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/2/2017) (adminn, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asgari v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Represented By: Ari Nazarov(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kelly
Represented By: Ari Nazarov(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Ari Nazarov(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Mohalley
Represented By: Ari Nazarov(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samira Asgari
Represented By: Nathaniel P. Bruhn
Represented By: Noah J. Kaufman
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?