City of Chelsea et al v. Trump, President of the United States et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: City of Chelsea and City of Lawrence
Defendant: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, United States of America, John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security, Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States and Does 1-100
Case Number: 1:2017cv10214
Filed: February 8, 2017
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: George A. OToole
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2017 30 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 21 In light of the stay entered in this case at the unopposed request of the plaintiffs (dkt. nos. 25 & 26), this action shall be administratively closed. The parties should notify the Court in the event they wish to restore the case to the Court's active docket. The pending motion to dismiss ( dkt. no. 21) is denied without prejudice to renewal if the case is reopened. (adminn, )
October 3, 2017 29 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Scott Simpson on behalf of Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, United States of America, Jeff Sessions, Elaine C. Duke (Simpson, W.)
August 15, 2017 28 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Friedman-Boyce, Inez)
June 30, 2017 27 STATUS REPORT submitted jointly by all parties by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence. (Friedman-Boyce, Inez)
May 4, 2017 26 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered granting 25 Motion to Stay (Halley, Taylor)
May 2, 2017 25 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Unopposed) by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence.(Friedman-Boyce, Inez)
April 20, 2017 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States, Does 1-100, John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security, Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, United States of America (Sady, Michael)
April 19, 2017 23 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File to May 8, 2017 to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to file excess pages (Halley, Taylor)
April 18, 2017 22 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 8, 2017 to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to file excess pages by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence.(Friedman-Boyce, Inez)
April 10, 2017 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States, John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security, Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Buckingham, Stephen)
April 6, 2017 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Buckingham on behalf of Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States, John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security, Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, United States of America (Buckingham, Stephen)
March 31, 2017 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed Donald J. Trump, President of the United States served on 2/13/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Friedman-Boyce, Inez)
March 31, 2017 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security served on 2/13/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Friedman-Boyce, Inez)
March 31, 2017 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States served on 2/13/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Friedman-Boyce, Inez)
March 31, 2017 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence. Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States served on 2/8/2017, answer due 4/10/2017; John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security served on 2/8/2017, answer due 4/10/2017; Donald J. Trump, President of the United States served on 2/8/2017, answer due 4/10/2017; United States of America served on 2/8/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Friedman-Boyce, Inez)
February 10, 2017 15 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Elizabeth J. Holland, Brian T. Burgess, David J. Zimmer, and Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
February 8, 2017 14 EXHIBIT re 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Elizabeth J. Holland, Brian T. Burgess, David J. Zimmer, and Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6487863 Exhibit D - Executed Declaration of Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence. (Friedman-Boyce, Inez)
February 8, 2017 13 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
February 8, 2017 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly)
February 8, 2017 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophia L. Hall on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Hall, Sophia)
February 8, 2017 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Oren M. Sellstrom on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Sellstrom, Oren)
February 8, 2017 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Sohn on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Sohn, Michelle)
February 8, 2017 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis L. Lobel on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Lobel, Louis)
February 8, 2017 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Lu on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Lu, Alexandra)
February 8, 2017 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J. Fischer on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Fischer, Sarah)
February 8, 2017 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer B. Luz on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Luz, Jennifer)
February 8, 2017 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elaine Herrmann Blais on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Blais, Elaine)
February 8, 2017 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daryl L. Wiesen on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Wiesen, Daryl)
February 8, 2017 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Elizabeth J. Holland, Brian T. Burgess, David J. Zimmer, and Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6487863 by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Friedman-Boyce, Inez)
February 8, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6487845 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Civil Category Sheet)(Friedman-Boyce, Inez)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Chelsea et al v. Trump, President of the United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Chelsea
Represented By: Elaine Herrmann Blais
Represented By: Brian T. Burgess
Represented By: Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal
Represented By: Sarah J. Fischer
Represented By: Inez H. Friedman-Boyce
Represented By: Sophia L. Hall
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Holland
Represented By: Louis L. Lobel
Represented By: Alexandra Lu
Represented By: Jennifer B. Luz
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Michelle Sohn
Represented By: Daryl L. Wiesen
Represented By: David J. Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Lawrence
Represented By: Elaine Herrmann Blais
Represented By: Brian T. Burgess
Represented By: Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal
Represented By: Sarah J. Fischer
Represented By: Inez H. Friedman-Boyce
Represented By: Sophia L. Hall
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Holland
Represented By: Louis L. Lobel
Represented By: Alexandra Lu
Represented By: Jennifer B. Luz
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Michelle Sohn
Represented By: Daryl L. Wiesen
Represented By: David J. Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?