DAHHAN v. OvaScience, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: FADI DAHHAN
Defendant: OvaScience, Inc., Michelle Dipp and Jeffrey E. Young
Case Number: 1:2017cv10511
Filed: March 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 30 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. (DaSilva, Carolina)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Freedman Family's Motion to Consolidate Related Action, Westmoreland v. OvaScience, Inc., No. 17-cv-12312-IT, with the Instant Action, ECF No. [#37], Dahhan, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJU DICE , and the Motion of Freedman Family Investments LLC to Intervene, Strike Notice, and Consolidate Actions, ECF No. [#9], Westmoreland, is DENIED as to intervention and striking notice, and DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to consolidation. See Attached Order. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-10511-IT, 1:17-cv-12312-IT(DaSilva, Carolina)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. See attached Joint Scheduling Order (MacDonald, Gail)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SEE attached MEMORANDUM AND ORDER(MacDonald, Gail)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAHHAN v. OvaScience, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FADI DAHHAN
Represented By: Mitchell J. Matorin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OvaScience, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Dipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey E. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?