Hebert et al v. Vantage Travel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Ronald Hebert and Aime Denault |
Defendant: |
Vantage Travel Service, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv10922 |
Filed: |
May 19, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Massachusetts |
Office: |
Boston Office |
County: |
Suffolk |
Presiding Judge: |
Denise J. Casper |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 24, 2021 |
Filing
280
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM OF DECISION - After consideration of the evidence presented at trial and in light of the aforementioned findings of fact and conclusions of law, and in light of the earlier Memorandum and Order on the other claims, D. 147 , this Court will enter judgment in favor of Vantage Travel. (Currie, Haley)
|
June 18, 2021 |
Filing
192
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Court DENIES the motion to reconsider, D. 165, ALLOWS the motion for a bench trial, D. 167, and DENIES the motion to limit the class, D. 169.(Hourihan, Lisa)
|
March 12, 2020 |
Filing
147
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' partial motion for summary judgment as to liability as to all Counts. D. 100. The Court ALLOWS Defendants' motion as to Counts I (breach of contra ct), Count II (breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing), Count III (unjust enrichment), Count IV (breach of common law warranties) and Count V (negligent misrepresentation). D. 104. The Court further ALLOWS Defendants' mo tion as to Count VII (claims under Chapter 93A) in part, except insofar as it relates to whether Defendants provided all services purchased by Plaintiffs for the purpose of Plaintiffs' claim that Defendants violated 940 C.M.R. § 15.06 and, thus, violated Chapter 93A. The Court also DENIES Plaintiffs' motion to estop Vantage Travel from disclaiming ownership of the MS River Voyager. D. 115.(Hourihan, Lisa)
|
June 18, 2019 |
Filing
109
Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER on 82 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
|
April 1, 2019 |
Filing
75
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Court ALLOWS Named Plaintiffs' motion for class certification as to Class 1 and DENIES the motion as to Class 2. D. 39. The Court DENIES Named Plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint, D. 55, and DENIES the motion to strike or, in the alternative, for summary judgment, D. 46, without prejudice.(Hourihan, Lisa)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?