Nike, Inc v. PUMA North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nike, Inc
Defendant: PUMA North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv10876
Filed: May 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 108 Reply to Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30, #2 Exhibit 31, #3 Exhibit 32, #4 Exhibit 33, #5 Exhibit 34, #6 Exhibit 35)(Rousseau, Timothy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 107 Reply to Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. O, #2 Exhibit Ex. P)(Dam, Kevin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 106 Supplemental JOINT STATEMENT of counsel OF THE NUMBER OF CLAIMS AND TERMS TO BE CONSTRUED. (Rousseau, Timothy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. The Markman Hearing currently scheduled for 10/8/2019, is reset to 10/17/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Montes, Mariliz)(Montes, Mariliz)
July 29, 2019 Filing 104 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #103 Joint Motion to Re-schedule Claim Construction Brief. The Court apologizes for this oversight. The hearing is reset to October 17, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (Montes, Mariliz) Modified on 7/29/2019 to correct date. NEF regenerated (Montes, Mariliz).
July 26, 2019 Filing 103 Joint MOTION TO RESCHEDULE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING by PUMA North America, Inc..(Rousseau, Timothy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 102 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #101 Nike, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend the Expert Claim Construction Testimony Deadline. Expert Claim Construction Testimony due by 7/23/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 5, 2019 Filing 101 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Obtain Expert Claim Construction Testimony by Nike, Inc.(Dam, Kevin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 100 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Dam, Kevin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 99 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26 Declaration of Darren J. Stefanyshyn Ph.D., P.Eng, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28 Declaration of Michael Steszyn, #29 Exhibit 29)(Rousseau, Timothy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 98 Reset Deadlines: Opening Claim Construction Briefs due by 6/28/2019; Expert Claim Construction Testimony due by 7/22/2019; Responsive Claim Construction Briefs due by 8/12/2019. (Simeone, Maria)
June 26, 2019 Filing 97 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #96 Puma's Unopposed Motion to Correct Extension of Time for Opening Claim Construction Briefs. Opening Claim Construction Brief due by 6/28/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
June 25, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Correct Extension of Time for Opening Claim Construction Briefs by PUMA North America, Inc..(Rousseau, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 95 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #94 Puma's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Claim Construction Briefing. Opening Claim Construction Briefs due by 6/27/2019; Deadline for Expert Claim Construction Testimony due by 7/19/2019; Responsive Claim Construction Briefs due by 8/9/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
June 20, 2019 Filing 94 Assented to MOTION Extension of Time for Claim Construction Briefing by PUMA North America, Inc..(Rousseau, Timothy)
June 7, 2019 Filing 93 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. PUMA's unopposed Motion for Leave to Increase Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefs (Doc. No. 90) is ALLOWED. The page limits for both parties' opening and responsive claim construction briefs is increased from 20 to 35 pages. (Montes, Mariliz)
June 7, 2019 Filing 92 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered.Last month, PUMA requested that the Patent Trial and Appeal Board ("PTAB") conduct inter partes review ("IPR") of five of the ten patents at issue in this case. PUMA represents that it intends to seek IPR of two additional patents-in-suit once it is able to do so, later this month and in mid-July of this year. Nike opposes PUMA's motion on several grounds. For example, NIKE notes that PUMA did not petition the PTAB for Post Grant Review of any of the patents, though it could have done so, and emphasizes that, to date, the PTAB has not actually instituted IPR proceedings as to any of the patents-in-suit. Accordingly, on the present record, PUMA's Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review (Doc. No. 84) is DENIED. (Montes, Mariliz)
June 7, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Aaron P. Bowling (Bowling, Aaron)
June 6, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION (Unopposed) For Leave to Increase Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefs by PUMA North America, Inc..(Rousseau, Timothy)
May 31, 2019 Filing 89 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Nike, Inc. (Dam, Kevin)
May 30, 2019 Filing 88 Opposition re #84 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dam, Kevin)
May 30, 2019 Filing 87 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #86 MOTION (UNOPPOSED) PETITION TO INCREASE THE NUMBER OF CLAIM TERMS FOR CONSTRUCTION. (Simeone, Maria)
May 28, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION (UNOPPOSED) PETITION TO INCREASE THE NUMBER OF CLAIM TERMS FOR CONSTRUCTION by PUMA North America, Inc..(Messing, Alessandra)
May 16, 2019 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM in Support re #84 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Rousseau, Timothy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by PUMA North America, Inc..(Rousseau, Timothy)
April 19, 2019 Filing 83 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Upon review of the papers filed by both parties, NIKE's motion to compel (Doc. No. 65) is ALLOWED. re #65 Motion to Compel (Simeone, Maria)
April 11, 2019 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to #65 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Nike, Inc. (Bowling, Aaron) (Main Document 82 replaced on 4/12/2019) (Montes, Mariliz). Modified on 4/12/2019 to replace with version provided by counsel with language in the caption stating: "Leave to File Granted on April 11, 2019 (ECF No. 81) in compliance with 81 Order (Montes, Mariliz).
April 11, 2019 Filing 81 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #80 Nike's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Reply to #79 Puma's Memorandum in Opposition to #65 Nike's Motion to Compel ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 10, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to File [UNOPPOSED] NIKE's Reply to PUMA's Memorandum in Opposition of NIKE's Motion to Compel by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - NIKE's Proposed Reply)(Bowling, Aaron)
April 3, 2019 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #65 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Rousseau, Timothy)
April 2, 2019 Filing 78 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #77 Nike's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Nike's L.R. 16.6(d)(1)(A) Preliminary Infringement Claim Charts for U.S. Patent No. 10,051,917 and Puma's Ignite Speed Netfit; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 2, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to File (Unopposed) Amended L.R. 16.6(d)(1)(A) Preliminary Infringement Claim Charts by Nike, Inc.(Bowling, Aaron)
March 29, 2019 Filing 76 Reset Deadlines as to #65 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Responses due by 4/3/2019 (Simeone, Maria)
March 29, 2019 Filing 75 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #74 Motion for Extension of Time to 4/3/19 to respond to #65 Motion to compel (Simeone, Maria)
March 28, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to APRIL 3, 2019 to TO SUBMIT A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF NIKE, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL (D. I. 65) by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rousseau, Timothy)
March 22, 2019 Filing 73 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court has reviewed the joint status report (#71) and, having considered the parties' positions expressed therein, finds no good cause to seal all or part of NIKE's memorandum supporting its motion to compel. Accordingly, the Clerk is hereby directed to UNSEAL the memorandum (#66) and the exhibits thereto, except for those that were sealed upon filing pursuant to prior motions by NIKE allowed by the Court. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 22, 2019 Filing 72 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #70 Joint Motion to Seal the Parties' Joint Status Report. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 21, 2019 Filing 71 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Regarding Order No. 67. (Bowling, Aaron) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2019: #1 unredacted version) (Montes, Mariliz).
March 21, 2019 Filing 70 Joint MOTION to Seal the Parties' Joint Status Report by Nike, Inc.(Bowling, Aaron)
March 19, 2019 Filing 69 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alessandra C. Messing. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 19, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alessandra C. Messing Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7591427 by PUMA North America, Inc..(Dennison, Wayne)
March 18, 2019 Filing 67 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On March 15, 2019, NIKE filed a motion to compel with its memorandum (#66) filed as a public document. Since then, counsel for both parties have communicated with the Court's Deputy Clerk, disputing whether the memorandum contains confidential business information requiring redaction and sealing (PUMA claims it does; NIKE disagrees). The Clerk shall SEAL the document(s) in question, and the parties shall file a joint status report, not to exceed five pages, setting forth their separate or joint positions as to what, if anything, within the document(s) in question ought be sealed and why. This joint status report is due by Thursday, March 21, 2019 at 12:00 PM.( Status Report due by 3/21/2019)(Montes, Mariliz)
March 15, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Nike, Inc.(Bowling, Aaron)
March 15, 2019 Filing 64 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #63 Motion to Seal Exhibits to NIKE's Forthcoming Memorandum In Support of NIKE's Motion to Compel by Nike, Inc (Simeone, Maria)
March 15, 2019 Filing 63 Second MOTION to Seal Exhibits to NIKE's Forthcoming Memorandum In Support of NIKE's Motion to Compel by Nike, Inc.(Bowling, Aaron)
March 15, 2019 Filing 62 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #61 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Impound Puma's Confidential Information Contained in Exhibits to Nike's Memorandum in Support of Nike's Motion to Compel Discovery. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 14, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to NIKE's Forthcoming Memorandum In Support of NIKE's Motion to Compel by Nike, Inc.(Bowling, Aaron)
March 5, 2019 Filing 60 PUMA North America's ANSWER to #58 Amended Complaint,, For Patent Infringement by PUMA North America, Inc..(Rousseau, Timothy)
February 25, 2019 Filing 59 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL PRELIMINARY DISCLOSURES (DOC. NO. 50) entered. Accordingly, PUMAs motion to compel (Doc. No. 50) is DENIED. re #50 Motion to Compel (Simeone, Maria)
February 19, 2019 Filing 58 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PUMA North America, Inc., filed by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit AB, #29 Exhibit AC)(Dam, Kevin)
February 19, 2019 Filing 57 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact discovery by 4/10/20. Dispositive motions by 7/21/20. A Markman Hearing has been set for 10/8/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13. A Status Conference has also been set for 4/13/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria) (Main Document 57 replaced on 2/22/2019) (Montes, Mariliz). Modified on 2/22/2019 to correct date of status conference on the order. NEF Regenerated. (Montes, Mariliz).
February 19, 2019 Filing 56 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #54 Motion to Amend Scheduling order. (Simeone, Maria)
February 19, 2019 Filing 55 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #53 Motion for Leave to File NIKE's Second Amended Complaint; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Simeone, Maria)
February 15, 2019 Filing 54 Joint MOTION to Amend the Scheduling Order by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Dam, Kevin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 53 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File NIKE's Second Amended Complaint by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NIKE's Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - NIKE's Second Amended Complaint (redline))(Dam, Kevin)
February 7, 2019 Filing 52 Opposition re #50 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF NIKE, INC. TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE PRELIMINARY DISCLOSURES filed by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Comparison of Puma's Dec. 27 Letter and Motion, #2 Exhibit B - ConnecTel Infringement Contentions)(Bowling, Aaron)
January 24, 2019 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Support re #50 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF NIKE, INC. TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE PRELIMINARY DISCLOSURES filed by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Rousseau, Timothy)
January 24, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF NIKE, INC. TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE PRELIMINARY DISCLOSURES by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Rousseau, Timothy)
November 23, 2018 Filing 49 ANSWER to #46 Amended Complaint,, by PUMA North America, Inc..(Rousseau, Timothy)
October 26, 2018 Filing 48 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #47 Puma's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #46 Amended Complaint. PUMA North America, Inc. answer due 11/23/2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 25, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/23/2018 to File Answer To Nike's First Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement by PUMA North America, Inc..(Rousseau, Timothy)
October 23, 2018 Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PUMA North America, Inc., filed by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit AB)(Dam, Kevin)
October 23, 2018 Filing 45 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #40 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Simeone, Maria)
October 23, 2018 Filing 44 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ENDORSED E-DISCOVERY ORDER entered. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 23, 2018 Filing 43 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ENDORSED ORDER entered. STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER.(Montes, Mariliz)
October 23, 2018 Filing 42 Set Deadlines: Joint Statement re. claim construction due by 3/18/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 23, 2018 Filing 41 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Disclosures to be completed by 11/19/2018; amended pleadings may be filed after due by 11/14/2018; fact discovery to be completed by 1/29/2020; dispositive motions due by 5/12/2020; oppositions due by 6/11/2020. A Status Conference is set for 10/29/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.Re. Claim Constructions Proceedings: Joint Statement due by 3/18/2019; claim construction briefs due by 4/8/2019; responsive briefs due by 5/20/2019. The hearing on claim construction is set for 6/26/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 23, 2018 Filing 40 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File NIKE's First Amended Complaint (Unopposed) by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NIKE's First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit NIKE's First Amended Complaint (redline))(Bowling, Aaron)
October 23, 2018 Filing 39 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court ADOPTS the schedule jointly proposed by the parties at docket number [36-1] as an Order of the Court with the following additions and modifications. The Court will hold a hearing on claim construction on June 26, 2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. As suggested by the parties, the Court finds an in-person Rule 16 conference unnecessary, thus the conference scheduled for October 29, 2018 is CANCELLED. The Court will hold a Status Conference on October 29, 2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. The Court will schedule an initial pretrial conference in its ruling on any dispositive motions. If, upon the close of fact and expert discovery, neither party intends to file a dispositive motion, the parties shall file a joint motion to schedule an initial pretrial conference. The Court further endorses the parties' jointly proposed protective order (docket number 36-2) and order to govern e-discovery (docket number 36-3).(Montes, Mariliz)
October 22, 2018 Filing 38 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) by Nike, Inc.(Bowling, Aaron)
October 22, 2018 Filing 37 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) by Puma North America, Inc.. (Rousseau, Timothy)
October 22, 2018 Filing 36 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order, #3 Exhibit Proposed E-Discovery Order)(Bowling, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/29/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Order Sample, #2 Standing Order on Motions for Summary Judgment)(Montes, Mariliz)
October 10, 2018 Filing 34 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered denying #24 Puma's Motion to Dismiss.The Court will hold an initial scheduling conference in this matter on October 29, 2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 13. A separate notice of that conference will issue forthwith. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 17, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Erik S. Maurer (Maurer, Erik)
August 13, 2018 Filing 32 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nike, Inc. (Bowling, Aaron)
August 13, 2018 Filing 31 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #30 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to #24 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. No further briefing on this motion without express request from the Court. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 10, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Puma's Motion to Dismiss by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NIKE's Proposed Sur-Reply)(Bowling, Aaron)
August 7, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rousseau, Timothy)
August 7, 2018 Filing 28 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of #24 Motion to Dismiss ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 6, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss #24 by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Rousseau, Timothy)
July 27, 2018 Filing 26 Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nike, Inc. (Dam, Kevin)
July 13, 2018 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support of #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 13, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy Rousseau, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Rousseau, Timothy) Modified on 7/16/2018 to detach memorandum in support and re-docket as a separate entry(Montes, Mariliz).
June 28, 2018 Filing 23 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to 7/13 to answer or respond. (Simeone, Maria)
June 27, 2018 Filing 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/13/2018 to respond to Plaintiff Nike, Inc. (Nike)s Complaint for Patent Infringement (Complaint, D.I. 1) by PUMA North America, Inc..(Rousseau, Timothy)
May 30, 2018 Filing 21 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lawrence C. Drucker, Enrique W. Iturralde, and Vincent J. Rubino, III. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
May 30, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lawrence C. Druker, Enrique W. Iturralde, Vincent J. Rubino, III Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-7161422 by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Lawrence C. Druker, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Enrique W. Iturralde, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Vincent J. Rubino, III)(Dennison, Wayne)
May 29, 2018 Filing 19 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Puma's Corrected Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. PUMA North America, Inc.'s answer due 6/29/2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
May 29, 2018 Filing 18 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Nike's Complaint is TERMINATED AS MOOT in light of #17 Puma's Corrected Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. (Montes, Mariliz)
May 25, 2018 Filing 17 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to June 29, 2018 to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, PUMA's Corrected Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Nike's Complaint by PUMA North America, Inc..(Dennison, Wayne)
May 25, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Rousseau on behalf of PUMA North America, Inc. (Rousseau, Timothy)
May 25, 2018 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 28, 2018 to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by PUMA North America, Inc..(Dennison, Wayne)
May 25, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Dennison, Wayne)
May 25, 2018 Filing 13 Document removed. Notice of Appearance filed in error using password from different counsel. Correct filing has been filed at #16 .
May 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne F. Dennison on behalf of PUMA North America, Inc. (Dennison, Wayne)
May 9, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed PUMA North America, Inc. served on 5/7/2018, answer due 5/29/2018. (Iwanicki, John)
May 4, 2018 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund re #1 Complaint,,, for $400.00 paid on 05/03/2018, receipt number 0101-7123534. (Adam, Lucien)
May 4, 2018 Filing 10 Set Deadlines: Complete Service by 8/1/2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
May 4, 2018 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher J. Renk, Erik S. Maurer, Michael J. Harris, Aaron P. Bowling, Kimberly S. Devine, Kevin Dam, and Novaira T. Paul. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
May 4, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to PUMA North America, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 4, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher J. Renk, Erik S. Maurer, Michael J. Harris, Aaron P. Bowling, Kimberly S. Devine, Kevin Dam, and Novaira T. Paul Filing fee: $ 600, receipt number 0101-7123673 by Plaintiff Nike, Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-7123715. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Iwanicki, John)
May 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher J. Renk, Erik S. Maurer, Michael J. Harris, Aaron P. Bowling, Kimberly S. Devine, Kevin Dam, and Novaira T. Paul Filing fee: $ 600, receipt number 0101-7123673 by Nike, Inc.(Iwanicki, John) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/4/2018) (Pacho, Arnold). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2018: #2 Renk Declaration, #3 Maurer Declaration, #4 Harris Declaration, #5 Bowling Declaration, #6 Devine Declaration, #7 Dam Declaration, #8 Paul Declaration) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 5/4/2018 to separate exhibits from motion. Attorney declarations added as attachments (Pacho, Arnold).
May 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Iwanicki on behalf of Nike, Inc (Iwanicki, John)
May 3, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING/TERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Iwanicki, John)
May 3, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nike, Inc. (Iwanicki, John)
May 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PUMA North America, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7123444 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Civil Cover Sheet, #25 Category Sheet)(Iwanicki, John) Modified on 5/4/2018 to correct receipt number(Adam, Lucien).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nike, Inc v. PUMA North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUMA North America, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence C. Drucker
Represented By: Timothy J. Rousseau
Represented By: Wayne F. Dennison
Represented By: Enrique W. Iturralde
Represented By: Vincent J. Rubino, III
Represented By: Alessandra C. Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nike, Inc
Represented By: John P. Iwanicki
Represented By: Kimberly S. Devine
Represented By: Michael J. Harris
Represented By: Aaron P. Bowling
Represented By: Kevin Dam
Represented By: Novaira T. Paul
Represented By: Erik S. Maurer
Represented By: Christopher J. Renk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?