Acosta v. MAT-LIND-CHRIS CORP. et al
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Defendant: JAMIES OF SCITUATE, INC. d/b/a, JAMIES OF WHITMAN, INC. d/b/a JAMIES GRILL & PUB, MAT-LIND-CHRIS CORP. d/b/a JAMIES, Ralph Constantine, MAT-LIND-CHRIS CORP, JAMIES OF SCITUATE, INC and JAMIES OF WHITMAN, INC
Case Number: 1:2018cv11525
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel C. Donoghue on behalf of Ralph Constantine, JAMIES OF SCITUATE, INC, JAMIES OF WHITMAN, INC, MAT-LIND-CHRIS CORP (Donoghue, Nathaniel)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Holland, Jr on behalf of Ralph Constantine, JAMIES OF SCITUATE, INC, JAMIES OF WHITMAN, INC, MAT-LIND-CHRIS CORP (Holland, John)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed JAMIES OF WHITMAN, INC served on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Miller, Scott) Modified on 9/13/2018 to correct answer deadline (Montes, Mariliz).
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed JAMIES OF SCITUATE, INC served on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Miller, Scott) Modified on 9/13/2018 to correct answer deadline (Montes, Mariliz).
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ralph Constantine served on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Miller, Scott) Modified on 9/13/2018 to correct answer deadline (Montes, Mariliz).
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed MAT-LIND-CHRIS CORP served on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Miller, Scott) Modified on 9/13/2018 to correct answer deadline (Montes, Mariliz).
July 25, 2018 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Proof of Service due by 10/23/2018. (Simeone, Maria)
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ralph Constantine, JAMIES OF SCITUATE, INC, JAMIES OF WHITMAN, INC, MAT-LIND-CHRIS CORP. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Employee List, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Miller, Scott) (Attachment 1& 2 replaced on 7/23/2018) (DaSilva, Carolina).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. MAT-LIND-CHRIS CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIES OF SCITUATE, INC. d/b/a
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIES OF WHITMAN, INC. d/b/a JAMIES GRILL & PUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAT-LIND-CHRIS CORP. d/b/a JAMIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Constantine
Represented By: Nathaniel C. Donoghue
Represented By: John A. Holland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAT-LIND-CHRIS CORP
Represented By: Nathaniel C. Donoghue
Represented By: John A. Holland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIES OF SCITUATE, INC
Represented By: Nathaniel C. Donoghue
Represented By: John A. Holland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIES OF WHITMAN, INC
Represented By: Nathaniel C. Donoghue
Represented By: John A. Holland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Scott M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?