AFH Holding & Advisory et al v. Stroever et al
Plaintiff: AFH Holding & Advisory, Steve Richards, Amir Heshmatpour, Dr. Bessie (Chia) Soo and AFH Holding & Advisory, LLC
Defendant: John Booth, Bruce Stroever, The Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation, Inc., James Delshad, Bret Hankey, Bone Biologics Corporation and Stephen Laneve
Case Number: 1:2018cv11612
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Boal
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bone Biologics Corporation, John Booth, James Delshad, Bret Hankey, Stephen Laneve, Bruce Stroever. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Tumilty, John)
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bone Biologics Corporation, John Booth, James Delshad, Bret Hankey, Stephen Laneve, Bruce Stroever.(Tumilty, John)
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bone Biologics Corporation. (Tumilty, John)
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (York, Steve)
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation, Inc.. (Radigan, Douglas)
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation, Inc..(Radigan, Douglas)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Tumilty on behalf of Stephen Laneve (Tumilty, John)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda R. Phillips on behalf of Bone Biologics Corporation, John Booth, James Delshad, Bret Hankey, Stephen Laneve, Bruce Stroever (Phillips, Amanda)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Tumilty on behalf of Bone Biologics Corporation, John Booth, James Delshad, Bret Hankey, Bruce Stroever (Tumilty, John)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants and Nominal Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint by The Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation, Inc.. (Radigan, Douglas)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas T. Radigan on behalf of The Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation, Inc. (Radigan, Douglas)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Steve Richards, Amir Heshmatpour, AFH Holding & Advisory, LLC, Bessie (Chia) Soo. The Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation, Inc. served on 8/7/2018. Acknowledgement filed by Steve Richards; Amir Heshmatpour; AFH Holding & Advisory, LLC; Bessie (Chia) Soo. (Felicello, Rosanne)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bone Biologics Corporation, John Booth, James Delshad, Bret Hankey, Amir Heshmatpour, Stephen Laneve, Bruce Stroever, The Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AFH Holding & Advisory. (Felicello, Rosanne)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7254449 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by AFH Holding & Advisory, Amir Heshmatpour, Steve Richards, Bessie (Chia) Soo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Demand Letter, #2 Rule 23.1 Verification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Felicello, Rosanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AFH Holding & Advisory et al v. Stroever et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Booth
Represented By: John J. Tumilty
Represented By: Amanda R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Stroever
Represented By: John J. Tumilty
Represented By: Amanda R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas T. Radigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Delshad
Represented By: John J. Tumilty
Represented By: Amanda R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Hankey
Represented By: John J. Tumilty
Represented By: Amanda R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bone Biologics Corporation
Represented By: John J. Tumilty
Represented By: Amanda R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Laneve
Represented By: John J. Tumilty
Represented By: Amanda R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFH Holding & Advisory
Represented By: Rosanne E. Felicello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Richards
Represented By: Rosanne E. Felicello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amir Heshmatpour
Represented By: Rosanne E. Felicello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Bessie (Chia) Soo
Represented By: Rosanne E. Felicello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFH Holding & Advisory, LLC
Represented By: Rosanne E. Felicello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?