4M Fruit Distributors, Inc. et al v. Lord Ganeshji, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Boston Tomato & Packaging, LLC, Peter Condakes Company, Inc., S. Strock & Co., Inc, 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc., Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc., Coosemans Boston, Inc. and Matarazzo Brothers, LLC
Defendant: Anil Kumar, Lord Ganeshji, Inc., Vishal Ghai and Ram Lubhaya Selhi
Case Number: 1:2018cv11655
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants, filed by 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc., Coosemans Boston, Inc., Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc., Matarazzo Brothers, LLC, Peter Condakes Company, Inc., S. Strock & Co., Inc.(Osborne, Andrew)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ram Lubhaya Selhi served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Osborne, Andrew)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Anil Kumar served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (Osborne, Andrew)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Vishal Ghai served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Osborne, Andrew)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lord Ganeshji, Inc. served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Osborne, Andrew)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc., Boston Tomato & Packaging, LLC, Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc., Peter Condakes Company, Inc., S. Strock & Co., Inc, Matarazzo Brothers, LLC, Coosemans Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Certificate of Service)(Osborne, Andrew)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Vishal Ghai, Anil Kumar, Lord Ganeshji, Inc., Ram Lubhaya Selhi. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Devan)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc., Boston Tomato & Packaging, LLC, Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc., Peter Condakes Company, Inc., S. Strock & Co., Inc. (Osborne, Andrew)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7262088 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc., Boston Tomato & Packaging, LLC, Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc., Peter Condakes Company, Inc., S. Strock & Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Osborne, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc. et al v. Lord Ganeshji, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anil Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lord Ganeshji, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vishal Ghai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ram Lubhaya Selhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Tomato & Packaging, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Condakes Company, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Strock & Co., Inc
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coosemans Boston, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matarazzo Brothers, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?