PNE Energy Supply LLC v. Eversource Energy et al
Plaintiff: PNE Energy Supply LLC
Defendant: Eversource Energy and Avangrid, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11690
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Avangrid, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Iberdrola, S.A., Other Affiliate Avangrid Networks, Inc., Other Affiliate Avangrid Renewables Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate Avangrid Renewables, LLC for Avangrid, Inc... (Sullivan, Marguerite)
September 28, 2018 Filing 22 Joint MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Avangrid, Inc., Eversource Energy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Donovan, John)
September 28, 2018 Filing 21 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Avangrid, Inc., Eversource Energy.(Donovan, John)
September 27, 2018 Filing 20 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Marguerite M. Sullivan and Allyson M. Maltas. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew)
September 27, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marguerite M. Sullivan and Allyson M. Maltas Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7340562 by Avangrid, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marguerite Sullivan, #2 Declaration of Allyson Maltas, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, U.)
September 27, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by U. Gwyn Williams on behalf of Avangrid, Inc. (Williams, U.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 17 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Chong S. Park. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Chong S. Park Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7308688 by Eversource Energy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Chong S. Park in Support)(Donovan, John)
September 7, 2018 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eversource Energy. (Donovan, John)
September 7, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Donovan, Jr on behalf of Eversource Energy (Donovan, John)
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Defendants' brief(s) in support of their motion(s) to dismiss will be filed on or before 9/28/18; The Plaintiff's brief in opposition will be filed within thirty (30) days after the filing of any such motion(s); The Defendants will file a reply brief not to exceed ten (10) pages within fifteen (15) days of filing of the Plaintiff's opposition brief.(Hourihan, Lisa)
August 31, 2018 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to September 28, 2018 to File Answer by Eversource Energy.(Donovan, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Eversource Energy served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Verrier, Keith)
August 22, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by PNE Energy Supply LLC. Avangrid, Inc. served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. Acknowledgement filed by PNE Energy Supply LLC. (Verrier, Keith)
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by PNE Energy Supply LLC. Amendment to #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement Corrected PNE Energy Supply LLC Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. (Verrier, Keith)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Keith J. Verrier re 6 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,,, Corrected Affidavit of Keith J. Verrier in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PNE Energy Supply LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Verrier, Keith)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PNE Energy Supply LLC. (Tarricone, Anthony)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 , #5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Keith J. Verrier, Austin B. Cohen. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Austin B. Cohen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7272078 by PNE Energy Supply LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 1)(Tarricone, Anthony)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Keith J. Verrier Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7272012 by PNE Energy Supply LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 1)(Tarricone, Anthony)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Avangrid, Inc., Eversource Energy. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7269721 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by PNE Energy Supply LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Category Form)(Tarricone, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNE Energy Supply LLC v. Eversource Energy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eversource Energy
Represented By: John D. Donovan, Jr.
Represented By: Chong S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avangrid, Inc.
Represented By: Allyson M. Maltas
Represented By: U. Gwyn Williams
Represented By: Marguerite M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNE Energy Supply LLC
Represented By: Anthony Tarricone
Represented By: Austin B. Cohen
Represented By: Keith J. Verrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?